Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-02717

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 26, 2018 at 3:38 PM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Affinity Labs Of Texas, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
Space Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Looper Reed & McGraw, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Greer Henry, Sr. +1 214 954 4135 +1 214 953 1332 dhenry@grayreed.com
Space Russell E Jumper +1 214 954 4135 +1 214 953 1332 rjumper@lrmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Naman Howell Smith & Lee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Palmer +1 254 755 4100 +1 254 754 6331 palmer@namanhowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan - Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Martinez +1 310 552 0130 +1 310 229 5800 dmartinez@robinskaplan.com
Space Kristine Tietz +1 612 349 8492 ktietz@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew D. Hedden +1 612 349 8438 +1 612 339 4181 ahedden@RobinsKaplan.com
Space Wesley Wei-Liang Lew +1 310 552 0130 +1 310 229 5800 wlew@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick M. Arenz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 pmarenz@rkmc.com
Space Daniel R Burgess +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 drburgess@rkmc.com
Space Annie Huang ahuang@rkmc.com
Space William E. Manske +1 612 349 8786 +1 612 339 4181 wemanske@rkmc.com
Space Cyrus A. Morton +1 612 349 8722 +1 612 339 4181 camorton@rkmc.com
Space Angela M Munoz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 ammunoz@rkmc.com
Space Sharon Elizabeth Roberg-Perez +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 seroberg-perez@rkmc.com
Space Ronald J Schutz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjschutz@rkmc.com
Space Shira T Shapiro +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 stshapiro@rkmc.com
LG Electronics, Inc. LG Electronics, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Vodavi Technology, Inc.
v.
No Logo Blackberry Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
Space Sheria Dranise Smith +1 214 550 8162 +1 214 550 8185 ssmith@carterstafford.com
Space John Steven Torkelson +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jtorkelson@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Chapin Columbia +1 617 535 4074 +1 617 535 3800 scolumbia@mwe.com
Space Jon Stuart Dean +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 jdean@mwe.com
Space Russell Hayman +1 310 551 9334 rhayman@mwe.com
Space Hasan M. Rashid +1 617 535 4004 hrashid@mwe.com
Space Tala Katherine Toufanian +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 Ttoufanian@mwe.com
Space Henry B. Wong +1 713 653 1908 bwong@mwe.com
Space Rita J. Yoon ryoon@mwe.com
No Logo High Tech Computer Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Elizabeth Powley +1 214 296 0156 +1 214 302 0471 spowley@pattersonsheridan.com
Space Joseph John Stevens +1 650 384 4418 jstevens@pattersonsheridan.com
No Logo HTC America Inc, Defendant
Lg Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc. Lg Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., Defendant
LG Electronics USA, Inc. LG Electronics USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Christopher Wheeler +1 202 626 7771 +1 202 738 2331 kwheeler@fr.com
LG Electronics, Inc. LG Electronics, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Vodavi Technology, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank A DeCosta, III +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 frank.decosta@finnegan.com
Space Christopher M Kurpinski +1 202 408 4225 +1 202 408 4400 christopher.kurpinski@finnegan.com
Space Lily Lim +1 650 849 6600 +1 650 849 6666 lily.lim@finnegan.com
Space John Mulcahy +1 571 203 2751 +1 202 408 4400 john.mulcahy@finnegan.com
Space Cecilia Sanabria +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 cecilia.sanabria@finnegan.com
Space Andrew C. Sonu +1 571 203 2765 +1 202 408 4400 andy.sonu@finnegan.com
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Robin Selinger +1 214 272 0957 +1 214 296 0246 jselinger@pattersonsheridan.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd"

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Duncan Milvenan +1 512 495 6005 +1 512 505 6305 rmilvenan@mcginnislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
Space Christopher M. Bonny +1 650 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 christopher.bonny@ropesgray.com
Space Rebecca Rose Hermes +1 650 617 4019 rebecca.hermes@ropesgray.com
Space Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
Space Kathryn N. Hong +1 212 596 9000 +1 650 566 4124 kathryn.hong@ropesgray.com
Space Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
Space Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
Space Carolyn L. Redding +1 650 617 4013 +1 650 566 4269 Carolyn.Redding@ropesgray.com
Space Stephen J. Rosenman +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 stephen.rosenman@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
Space M. Dru Montgomery +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 dru@jth-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 105

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Prosen mattprosen@gmail.com
No Logo Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Defendant
  Entries (122) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Copy
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                          CLERK'S NOTICE In light of the parties' joint status report (Dkt. No. 104) in 14-cv-2717-YGR and (Dkt. no.104) in 14-cv-3030-YGR and (Dkt. No. 130) in 14-cv-3031-YGR; the Compliance Hearing set for Friday, November 6, 2015 is CONTINUED to Friday, May 6, 2016 at 9:01 a.m. A further status report is due by April 29, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                UNSEALING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/28/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None ~Util - Document Sealed
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2015 re 80 MOTION For Leave to Move to Reopen for the Limited Purpose of Modifying the Prosecution Bar filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. The matter was argued, submitted, and taken under submission. (FTR Time 9:30-10:01)Plaintiff Attorney: Seth Northrop Defendant Attorneys: Gabrielle Higgins & Christopher Bonny (Samsung); Jerry Selinger (HTC); Tala Toufanian (Blackberry) This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2015) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                                            CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, APRIL 10, 2015 AT 9:01AM ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING IN CASE 14-CV-2717-YGR AND IN CASE 14-CV-2966-YGR. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Motion Hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that the hearing on Plaintiffs MOTION For Leave to Move to Reopen for the Limited Purpose of Modifying the Prosecution Bar (Dkt. No. 80) is scheduled for April 16, 2015 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 92 Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                        (Renewed ) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Bonny ISO Renewed Administrative Motion, # 2 Declaration of M. Yang ISO Renewed Administrative Motion, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Renewed Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 4 Samsung's Opposition to (D.I. 80) Motion for Leave to Move to Reopen for the Limited Purpose of Modifying the Prosecution Bar [UNREDACTED], # 5 Samsung's Opposition to (D.I. 80) Motion for Leave to Move to Reopen for the Limited Purpose of Modifying the Prosecution Bar [REDACTED], # 6 Declaration of C. Bonny ISO Opposition to Motion for Leave, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E [UNREDACTED], # 12 Envelope E [REDACTED], # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Proposed Order Denying Motion For Leave To Move To Reopen For The Limited Purpose Of Modifying The Prosecution Bar, # 15 Affinitys Exhibit 4 [UNREDACTED], # 16 Affinitys Exhibit 4 [REDACTED], # 17 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Higgins, Gabrielle) (Filed on 3/23/2015) Modified on 3/24/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Corley for all Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/17/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Corley for all Discovery purposes, ORDER REFERRING MOTION: in Lead Case No. 14-cv-2717 Dkt. no 80 MOTION For Leave to Move to Reopen for the Limited Purpose of Modifying the Prosecution Bar filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/17/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause why case 14-cv-2966 should not be administratively terminated as duplicative of Lead Case No. 14-cv-2717 Hearing set for Friday, 4/10/2015 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/3/2015.Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/12/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 3/13/2015 is CONTINUED to Friday, 11/6/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Status Report due by 10/30/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/12/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Reopen Case
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (76) Stipulation Extending Date of the Compliance Hearing to 3/13/2015 and Deadline for the Joint Status Report to 3/2/2015 in case 4:14-cv-02717-YGR (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER STAYING ACTIONS PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW PROCEEDINGS AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARINGS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, terminating (65) Motion to Stay in case 4:14-cv-02717-YGR; granting (94) Stipulation in case 4:14-cv-03030-YGR; granting (121) Stipulation in case 4:14-cv-03031-YGR. Pursuant to the Stipulation to Stay Actions Pending Inter Partes review proceedings, Case Nos. 4:14-cv-3030-YGR and 4:14-cv-3031-YGR are hereby STAYED pending final exhaustion of inter partes review proceedings.Compliance hearing set Friday, February 13, 2015 at 9:01am. Joint Statement filed five days prior. The Compliance hearing scheduled for Tuesday, August 19,2014 is VACATED.As previously ordered, Case No. 4:14-cv-2717-YGR is the lead case in this series of patent cases and all documents shall be filed in the 4:14-cv-2717-YGR docket. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/6/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/5/2014 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 8/5/2014). Compliance Hearing is set for Tuesday, 8/19/2014 02:01 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/5/2014) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Wesley Wei-Liang Lew re John P. Palmer, Charles W. Goehringer, Jr., Lawrence Louis Germer, David Greer Henry, and Russell Erin Jumper (Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 8/5/2014) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (54) Motion to Stay ; Staying Civil Action 14-cv-2966-YGR. Motion hearing set for August 5, 2014 is VACATED. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 2/13/15 at 9:01am re submission of joint status report. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Statement of Recent Decision
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 54 MOTION to Stay THIS ACTION PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW, INTER PARTES REEXAM, AND EX PARTE REEXAM PROCEEDINGS ) filed byHTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of C. Bonny ISO Reply ISO Defendants' Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit Q, # 3 Exhibit R, # 4 Exhibit S, # 5 Exhibit T, # 6 Exhibit U, # 7 Exhibit V, # 8 Exhibit W, # 9 Exhibit X, # 10 Exhibit Y)(Higgins, Gabrielle) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Andrew D. Hedden ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8771831.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hedden, Andrew) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for William E. Manske ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8771677.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Manske, William) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of DANIEL R. BURGESS IN SUPPORT OF AFFINITYS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY THIS ACTION PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW, INTER PARTES REEXAM, AND EX PARTE REEXAM PROCEEDINGS in Opposition to 57 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byAffinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 57 ) (Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 54 MOTION to Stay THIS ACTION PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW, INTER PARTES REEXAM, AND EX PARTE REEXAM PROCEEDINGS ) filed byAffinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER RELATING CASES C-14-2717-YGR; C-14-2966-YGR; C-14-3030-YGR and C-14-3031-YGR. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/8/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 51 Motion to Relate Cases; Case No. 14-cv-2717 shall serve as the lead case. All documents shall be filed in that case's docket. Setting Case Management Conference. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) Modified on 7/9/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay THIS ACTION PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW, INTER PARTES REEXAM, AND EX PARTE REEXAM PROCEEDINGS filed by HTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/9/2014. Replies due by 7/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher M. Bonny, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Proposed Order)(Higgins, Gabrielle) (Filed on 6/25/2014) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (NOTICE OF ORDERS DENYING MOTIONS TO RECONSIDER TRANSFER OF VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab A, # 2 Exhibit Tab B, # 3 Exhibit Tab C)(Higgins, Gabrielle) (Filed on 6/25/2014) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 51 MOTION to Relate Case (ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED) ) filed byAffinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Relate Case (ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF KATHRYN N. HONG IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED)(Higgins, Gabrielle) (Filed on 6/16/2014) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Rose Hermes (Hermes, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/16/2014) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E Prosen (Prosen, Matthew) (Filed on 6/12/2014) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE: Conditional Transfer and Assignment of Civil Case Number. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/11/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael Bonny (Bonny, Christopher) (Filed on 6/10/2014) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC of Transfer to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Tab A)(Redding, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/6/2014) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE MAY 9, 2014 AT 9:01AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 43 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice All Claims between Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC and the LG Defendants. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AND AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN AFFINITY LABS OF TEXAS, LLC AND THE LG DEFENDANTS filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN AFFINITY LABS OF TEXAS, LLC AND THE LG DEFENDANTS)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 4/15/2014) Modified on 4/16/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 40 Order, Terminate Hearings, Set Hearings. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/3/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CLARIFICATION by HTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 40 Order. (Higgins, Gabrielle) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 4/3/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 5/9/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/2/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 4/2/2014 (fs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/3/2014 (fs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Between Affinity Labs of Texas and the LG Defendants filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lim, Lily) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on January 6, 2014, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2014. (Related documents(s) 36 , 37 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Redding, Carolyn) (Filed on 1/22/2014) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Tietz, Kristine) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/6/2014 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 1/6/2014). (Recording #FTR 3:47pm-5:00pm.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Julian Moore representing Defendants Samsung Electronics, Co., LTD, Samsung Electronics America,Inc. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald R. Burgess representing Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cyrus A. Morton representing Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald J. Schutz representing Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristine Tietz representing Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shira T. Shapiro representing Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John Mulcahy representing LG Electronics, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jesse J. Jenner representing Defendant Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Frank A. Decosta representing LG Electronics, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Sonu representing LG Electronics, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Kurpinski representing LG Electronics, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kathryn Hong representing Defendants Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd; Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cecilia Sanabria representing LG Electronics, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8269138.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Moore, Julian) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel R. Burgess ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8268766.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Cyrus A. Morton ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8265725.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald J. Schutz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8265708.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Kristine A. Tietz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8265661.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Shira T. Shapiro ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8265572.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David Martinez (Martinez, David) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Wei-Liang Lew (Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8260195.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mulcahy, John) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Lily Lim (Lim, Lily) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8259438.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Jenner, Jesse) (Filed on 12/27/2013) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8254277.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(De Costa, Frank) (Filed on 12/24/2013) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8253032.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sonu, Andrew) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8252760.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kurpinski, Christopher) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8252639.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Hong, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8247906.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sanabria, Cecilia) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jerry R. Selinger representing Defendants HTC Corporation and HTC America Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8235883.) filed by HTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Selinger, Jerry) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 1/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Eastern District of Texas (Beaumont) re 1:12-cv-00557 RC signed by Judge Ron Clark. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?