Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., LTD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-03030

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 26, 2018 at 3:38 PM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Affinity Labs Of Texas, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Looper Reed & McGraw, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Greer Henry, Sr. +1 214 954 4135 +1 214 953 1332 dhenry@grayreed.com
Space Russell E Jumper +1 214 954 4135 +1 214 953 1332 rjumper@lrmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Naman Howell Smith & Lee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Palmer +1 254 755 4100 +1 254 754 6331 palmer@namanhowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan - Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew D. Hedden +1 612 349 8438 +1 612 339 4181 ahedden@RobinsKaplan.com
Space Wesley Wei-Liang Lew +1 310 552 0130 +1 310 229 5800 wlew@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick M. Arenz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 pmarenz@rkmc.com
Space Daniel R Burgess +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 drburgess@rkmc.com
Space William E. Manske +1 612 349 8786 +1 612 339 4181 wemanske@rkmc.com
Space Cyrus A. Morton +1 612 349 8722 +1 612 339 4181 camorton@rkmc.com
Space Angela M Munoz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 ammunoz@rkmc.com
Space Sharon Elizabeth Roberg-Perez +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 seroberg-perez@rkmc.com
Space Ronald J Schutz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjschutz@rkmc.com
Space Shira T Shapiro +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 stshapiro@rkmc.com
Space Kristine A Tietz +1 612 349 8492 +1 612 339 4181 KATietz@rkmc.com
v.
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co Ltd"

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Duncan Milvenan +1 512 495 6005 +1 512 505 6305 rmilvenan@mcginnislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
Space Christopher M. Bonny +1 650 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 christopher.bonny@ropesgray.com
Space Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
Space Kathryn N. Hong +1 212 596 9000 +1 650 566 4124 kathryn.hong@ropesgray.com
Space Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
Space Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
Space Carolyn L. Redding +1 650 617 4013 +1 650 566 4269 Carolyn.Redding@ropesgray.com
Space Stephen J. Rosenman +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 stephen.rosenman@ropesgray.com
No Logo Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Defendant
  Entries (116) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Copy
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                      CLERK'S NOTICE In light of the parties' joint status report (Dkt. No. 104) in 14-cv-2717-YGR and (Dkt. no.104) in 14-cv-3030-YGR and (Dkt. No. 130) in 14-cv-3031-YGR; the Compliance Hearing set for Friday, November 6, 2015 is CONTINUED to Friday, May 6, 2016 at 9:01 a.m. A further status report is due by April 29, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            UNSEALING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/28/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Corley for all Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/17/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 3/13/2015 is CONTINUED to Friday, 11/6/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Status Report due by 10/30/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/12/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (76) Stipulation Extending Date of the Compliance Hearing to 3/13/2015 and Deadline for the Joint Status Report to 3/2/2015 in case 4:14-cv-02717-YGR (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER STAYING ACTIONS PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW PROCEEDINGS AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARINGS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, terminating (65) Motion to Stay in case 4:14-cv-02717-YGR; granting (94) Stipulation in case 4:14-cv-03030-YGR; granting (121) Stipulation in case 4:14-cv-03031-YGR. Pursuant to the Stipulation to Stay Actions Pending Inter Partes review proceedings, Case Nos. 4:14-cv-3030-YGR and 4:14-cv-3031-YGR are hereby STAYED pending final exhaustion of inter partes review proceedings.Compliance hearing set Friday, February 13, 2015 at 9:01am. Joint Statement filed five days prior. The Compliance hearing scheduled for Tuesday, August 19,2014 is VACATED.As previously ordered, Case No. 4:14-cv-2717-YGR is the lead case in this series of patent cases and all documents shall be filed in the 4:14-cv-2717-YGR docket. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/6/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/5/2014 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 8/5/2014). Compliance Hearing is set for Tuesday, 8/19/2014 02:01 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/5/2014) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Wesley Wei-Liang Lew re John P. Palmer, David Greer Henry, and Russell Erin Jumper (Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 8/5/2014) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Mail sent to Richard D. Milvenan returned as undeliverable re 81 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 82 Clerks Notice. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Andrew D. Hedden ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8771769.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hedden, Andrew) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for William E. Manske ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8771719.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Manske, William) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER RELATING CASES C-14-2717-YGR; C-14-2966-YGR; C-14-3030-JSC and C-14-3031-PSG. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/8/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RELATE CASES, SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case No. 14-cv-2717 shall serve as the lead case. All documents shall be filed in that case's docket. Case Management Conference specially set for Tuesday, 8/5/2014 02:01 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/8/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) Modified on 7/9/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Consent/Declination Form) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE acknowledging receipt of transferred action (mailed to non e-filers) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:13-cv-00364. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Wlliam E. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 78 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Sealed Motion filed (tb) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER DENYING 74 Motion To Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William E. Manske ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6594859) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, re 74 MOTION AFFINITY LABS' MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF ITS MOTION TO RECONSIDER TRANSFER OF VENUE re 73 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab A, # 2 Exhibit Tab B, # 3 Exhibit Tab C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION AFFINITY LABS' MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF ITS MOTION TO RECONSIDER TRANSFER OF VENUE re 73 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Motion to Reconsider Transfer of Venue, # 2 Sealed Document Proposed Order Motion for Leave, # 3 Sealed Document Proposed Order Motion to Reconsider) (Henry, David) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 58 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sharon E. Roberg-Perez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Angela M. Munoz-Kaphing. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry on behalf of Sharon E. Roberg-Perez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6484710) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry on behalf of Angela M. Munoz-Kaphing ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6484493) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ADR Report Filed - Affinity Labs' Individual ADR Docketing Statement by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ADR Report Filed - CONSENT to Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority and Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue (DKT 46) to 46 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, re 46 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. AFFINITY LABS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO THE SAMSUNG DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Henry, David) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ORDERED that Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is admonished that failure to timely file an amended complaint will bar it from reasserting the induced infringment claim in this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Order Concerning Courtroom Decorum and Trial Procedures. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 10/27/2014 09:00AM before Judge Walter S. Smith, Jury Trial set for 10/27/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Walter S. Smith, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/9/2014, Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2014, Discovery due by 8/29/2014, Joinder of Parties due by 5/14/2014, Motions due by 8/29/2014. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 52 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 59 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Sealed Document filed. (mc5) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Sealed Motion filed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C3, # 6 Exhibit C5, # 7 Exhibit R1, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit R1 cont., # 9 Exhibit Exhibit R1 cont., # 10 Exhibit R2, # 11 Exhibit R3, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit R3 cont., # 13 Exhibit Exhibit R3 cont., # 14 Exhibit Exhibit R3 cont., # 15 Exhibit Exhibit R3 cont., # 16 Exhibit Exhibit R3 cont., # 17 Exhibit Exhibit R3 cont., # 18 Exhibit R4, # 19 Exhibit R6, # 20 Proposed Order) (mc5) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE Affinity Lab's Reply In Support Of Motion To Consolidate to 56 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Henry, David) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, re 52 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases Affinity Labs' Opposed Motion to Consolidate filed by Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Moore Declaration w/Exhs A-G, # 2 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Redding Dec w/exhs A-E in Support of Dkt #54 Reply in Support of Samsung Motion to Transfer, # 2 Proposed Order) (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, re 46 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Reply in Support of Samsung Motion to Transfer (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Moore Declaration, w/exhsA_K)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, re 41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Induced Infringement filed by Defendant Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases Affinity Labs' Opposed Motion to Consolidate by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, re 41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Induced Infringement filed by Defendant Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Affinitys Lab's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Dismiss Affinity Labs' Claim of Induced Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Henry, David) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Dkt. 47 - Affinity Lab's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Entry of a Proposed Schedule and In Opposition to Samsung's Motion by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Henry, David) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, re 46 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC's Opposition to the Samsung Defedants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit I-1, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit I-2, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit I-3, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit I-4, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit I-5, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit I-6, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit I-7, # 19 Exhibit Exhibiy I-8, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Henry, David) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC Corrected COS re Motion to Seal Opposed Motion to Transfer 46 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 45 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Moore Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Moore Dec - Ex A, # 3 Exhibit Moore Dec - Ex B, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Defs' Opposed Motion and Memo of Law to Transfer to NDCA, # 2 Sealed Document Lim Declaration, # 3 Sealed Document Troisi Declaration, # 4 Sealed Document Rochford Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Moore Declaration,wExA-C2, # 6 Exhibit Moore Dec, ExC3-C4, # 7 Exhibit Moore Dec, ExC5-ExQ, # 8 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR1pgs1-8, # 9 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR1pgs9-12, # 10 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR1pgs13-17, # 11 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR2, # 12 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR3pgs1-50, # 13 Exhibit Moore Dec ExR3pgs51-90, # 14 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR3pgs91-125, # 15 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR3pgs126-132, # 16 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR3pgs133-148, # 17 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR3pgs149-159, # 18 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR3pgs160-169, # 19 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR4-R5, # 20 Exhibit Moore Dec. ExR6-R7, # 21 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer, # 22 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal) (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Opposed Motion for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Induced Infringement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathryn N. Hong for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,Kathryn N. Hong for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,Kathryn N. Hong for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julian D. Moore for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,Julian D. Moore for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,Julian D. Moore for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carolyn L. Redding for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,Carolyn L. Redding for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,Carolyn L. Redding for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen J. Roseman for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,Stephen J. Roseman for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,Stephen J. Roseman for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher M. Bonny for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,Christopher M. Bonny for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,Christopher M. Bonny for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gabrielle E. Higgins for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,Gabrielle E. Higgins for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,Gabrielle E. Higgins for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian P. Biddinger for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,Brian P. Biddinger for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,Brian P. Biddinger for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan for Jesse J. Jenner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6198517) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan (for attorney Stephen J. Rosenman) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6191971) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan (for attorney Carolyn L. Redding) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6191941) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan (for attorney Julian D. Moore) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6191926) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan (for attorney Kathryn N. Hong) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6191916) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan (for attorney Gabrielle E. Higgins) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6191896) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan (for attorney Christopher M. Bonny) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6191864) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan (for attorney Brian P. Biddinger) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6191820) by on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ORDER re 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Patrick M. Arenz ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6152841) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick M. Arenz for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Patrick M. Arenz ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6152841) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shira T. Shapiro for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald J. Schutz for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. Burgess for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristine A. Tietz for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cyrus A. Morton for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Shira T. Shapiro ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6062786) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Ronald J. Schutz ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6059939) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Daniel R. Burgess ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6059897) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Kristine A. Tietz ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6059773) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Cyrus A. Morton ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6057540) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (mc5) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Ronald J. Schutz re attorney admission requirements. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Cyrus A. Morton re attorney admission requirements. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to Daniel R. Burgess re attorney admission requirements. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to Shira T. Shapiro re attorney admission requirements. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Kristine A. Tietz re attorney admission requirements. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Henry, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Henry, David) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-6039617). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, David) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?