WildEarth Guardians v. United States Forest Service et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00349

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2021 at 6:24 PM ST (4.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WildEarth Guardians, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carbone, Philip C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joro Walker +1 801 487 9911

Toggle Switch Represented by WESTERN RESOURCE ADVOCATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles R. Dubuc +1 801 529 3964
v.
No Logo John R. Erickson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Carson +1 303 312 7309 +1 303 312 7331 david.a.carson@usdoj.gov
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison D Garner +1 202 514 2855 +1 202 305 0506 alison.garner@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Gillespie +1 202 305 0490 +1 202 305 0506 stuart.gillespie@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
No Logo Juan Palma, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Carson +1 303 312 7309 +1 303 312 7331 david.a.carson@usdoj.gov
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison D Garner +1 202 514 2855 +1 202 305 0506 alison.garner@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Gillespie +1 202 305 0490 +1 202 305 0506 stuart.gillespie@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
No Logo Mike Stiewig, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Carson +1 303 312 7309 +1 303 312 7331 david.a.carson@usdoj.gov
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison D Garner +1 202 514 2855 +1 202 305 0506 alison.garner@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Gillespie +1 202 305 0490 +1 202 305 0506 stuart.gillespie@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Bureau of Land Management, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Carson +1 303 312 7309 +1 303 312 7331 david.a.carson@usdoj.gov
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison D Garner +1 202 514 2855 +1 202 305 0506 alison.garner@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Gillespie +1 202 305 0490 +1 202 305 0506 stuart.gillespie@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Forest Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Carson +1 303 312 7309 +1 303 312 7331 david.a.carson@usdoj.gov
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison D Garner +1 202 514 2855 +1 202 305 0506 alison.garner@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Gillespie +1 202 305 0490 +1 202 305 0506 stuart.gillespie@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
No Logo Berry Petroleum Company, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan R. Jibson +1 801 799 5800 rrjibson@hollandhart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark B. Machlis +1 801 799 5800 mbmachlis@hollandhart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily C. Schilling +1 202 393 6500 ecschilling@hollandhart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn T. Welch +1 801 799 5889 stwelch@hollandhart.com
  Entries (118) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Strike
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            DOCKET TEXT ORDER: In light of Berry Petroleum Company LLCs 112 Notice of Pendency of Bankruptcy, the remaining parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report as to the status of this case and Petitioners intention to proceed. The status report shall be filed on or before May 31, 2016. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on May 17, 2016. (ks) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Suggestion of Bankruptcy by Berry Petroleum Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Welch, Shawn) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Amending Briefing Schedule and granting 110 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/19/2016. (eat) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on January 26, 2016, before Judge David Nuffer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Brown Hicken CSR, RPR, RMR. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2016 (alt) Modified on 5/4/2016 by removing restricted text (las). (Entered: 02/04/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge David Nuffer: Counsel present for parties. Court GRANTED the motion to lift the stay. Court struck the original opening brief and all exhibits. Court set the briefing schedule as follows: response brief due 4/18/2016. Reply brief due 5/2/2016. Hearing set 5/20/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Court deferred ruling on fees until applications are made. Based on the court's statements, Ms. Walker withdrew WildEarth's motion for preliminary injunction.Counsel answered the questions email from the court for oral argument.Court adjourned.granting 55 Motion to Strike ; granting 57 Motion to Strike ; granting 59 Motion to Strike ; withdrawing 72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 93 Motion ; Motion Hearing held on 1/26/2016 re 55 MOTION to Strike filed by United States Bureau of Land Management, Mike Stiewig, Juan Palma, United States Forest Service, John R. Erickson, 93 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by WildEarth Guardians, 59 MOTION to Strike 54 Errata filed by Berry Petroleum Company, 72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WildEarth Guardians, 57 MOTION to Strike 53 Exhibits, 52 Opening Brief filed by Berry Petroleum Company ; ( Form due by 2/10/2016., Miscellaneous Hearing set for 5/20/2016 at 09:00 AM in Rm 3.100.). Attorney for Plaintiff: Joro Walker, Charles Dubuc, Attorney for Defendant Alison Garner, David Carson, Stuart Gillespie. Intervenors Attorney: Shawn Welch, Ben Machlis. Court Reporter: Kelly Hicken. (asb) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
                          STATUS REPORT by WildEarth Guardians. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 1/26/2016 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. (asb) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                              REQUEST re 93 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re 101 MOTION to submit. The document should not have been styled/filed as a motion: the correct document/filing event is "Request to Submit for Decision" to be linked only to the motion to be decided. The incorrectly-filed motion has been terminated. (alt) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 93 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Dubuc, Charles) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 93 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Intervenor Defendant Berry Petroleum Company. (Schilling, Emily) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 93 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Garner, Alison) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Amended Opening BRIEF filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A & B)(Dubuc, Charles) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                      REQUEST to Submit for Decision re 72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                        ERRATA to 89 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians . (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 05/30/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Filing Second Declaration of J. Scott Canonico by Berry Petroleum Company re 83 Response to Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Declaration of J. Scott Canonico) (Machlis, Mark) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Second Declaration of Stephanie Howard by John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Declaration of Stephanie Howard) (Carson, David) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING of Administrative Record for Supplemental Information Report filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service (*Record is contained on a single DVD-R whose contents are too large to be uploaded to the docket: Disc will be kept in permanent storage*) (alt) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Defendant Berry Petroleum Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1 Declaration of Scott Canonico Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-2 Declaration of Scott Canonico Part 2)(Machlis, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-- Declaration of Stephanie Howard, # 2 Exhibit B--Declaration of Kristy Groves)(Garner, Alison) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Lodging Administrative Record for Supplemental Information Report by John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Gillespie, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          REQUEST to Submit for Decision re 59 MOTION to Strike 54 Errata, 58 MOTION to Stay
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 58 MOTION to Stay
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 59 MOTION to Strike 54 Errata filed by Intervenor Defendant Berry Petroleum Company. (Machlis, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION to Strike 53 Exhibits, 52 Opening Brief filed by Intervenor Defendant Berry Petroleum Company. (Machlis, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Email)(Garner, Alison) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Strike filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Garner, Alison) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 59 MOTION to Strike 54 Errata and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Errata Sheet filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 56 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support , 58 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Briefing filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 55 MOTION to Strike, 57 MOTION to Strike 53 Exhibits, 52 Opening Brief filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3)(Walker, Joro) Modified on 2/5/2015: removed excess text (alt) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 59 MOTION to Strike 54 Errata and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Errata Sheet filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Garner, Alison) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RE-FILED CORRECTLY AS 61 MOTION - STIPULATION re 51 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillespie, Stuart) Modified on 2/3/2015: added re-filing info (alt) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ERRATA to 52 Opening Brief filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians . (Walker, Joro) Modified on 2/2/2015: corrected entry text (alt) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS filed by WildEarth Guardians re 52 Opening Brief. (Walker, Joro) Modified on 2/2/2015: corrected entry text - document has no DUCivR10 cover page (alt) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/25/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Summary Judgment Opening Brief filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C & D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I)(Walker, Joro) Modified on 2/2/2015: entry corrected to show that document filed is an Opening Brief, not a Motion (alt) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Emily C. Schilling on behalf of Berry Petroleum Company (Schilling, Emily) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mark B. Machlis on behalf of Berry Petroleum Company (Machlis, Mark) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 44 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alison D. Garner for John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 11/20/14 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING of Federal Administrative Record filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. Filing consists of: - the USFS' admin record on 2 DVDs; - the USFS' Implementation Record on 1 USB flash drive labeled 'Main Records' and 1 DVD labeled 'GIS and Video'; - the BLM's admin record on 1 USB flash drive labeled 'BLM AR Public'. (contents are not uploadable to the docket due to size and some format types and so will be kept in permanent storage) (alt) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Lodging the Administrative Record by John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Kathleen Paulin, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Stephanie Howard) (Gillespie, Stuart) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Piropato, Marissa) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "1", # 2 Exhibit Exhbit "2", # 3 Exhibit Exhibit "3")(Walker, Joro) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for certified mail return receipt requested mailed on May 15, 2014; signed return receipt not returned from the US Postal Service served on United States Forest Service, filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by WildEarth Guardians. United States Bureau of Land Management served on 5/15/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by WildEarth Guardians. Mike Stiewig served on 5/15/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by WildEarth Guardians. Juan Palma served on 5/15/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by WildEarth Guardians as to John R. Erickson served on 5/19/2014, answer due 6/9/2014. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) in Support of Motion filed by Intervenor Defendant Berry Petroleum Company. (Welch, Shawn) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE OF ERROR re 26 MOTION for Extension of Time. Description of possible error: document has wrong judge initials in the case number. Filers are reminded to keep track of any/all judge reassignments and ensure that all case information on documents matches that appearing at the top of each CM/ECF screen before submitting same. (alt) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support (Partial) filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Piropato, Marissa) Modified on 7/23/2014: corrected text (alt) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Movant Berry Petroleum Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott Canonico, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene)(Jibson, Ryan) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/16/14 (alt) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (las) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated MOTION to Proceed per Olenhouse v. Commodity Credit Corp by John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Piropato, Marissa) Modified by changing event type from Stipulation to Motion for Miscellaneous Relief on 7/9/2014 (tls). Modified on 7/23/2014: corrected carry-forward text (alt) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the 13 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice. Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (las) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Carson for John R. Erickson,David A. Carson for Juan Palma,David A. Carson for Mike Stiewig,David A. Carson for United States Bureau of Land Management,David A. Carson for United States Forest Service. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/9/2014. (las) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of DAVID A. CARSON (no registration fee required) filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart C Gillespie for John R. Erickson,Stuart C Gillespie for Juan Palma,Stuart C Gillespie for Mike Stiewig,Stuart C Gillespie for United States Bureau of Land Management,Stuart C Gillespie for United States Forest Service. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/5/2014. (las) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marissa Piropato for John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. . Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/5/2014. (las) Modified on 6/6/2014 corrected names of who Pro Hac is for(las). (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service, Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. Form due by 6/17/2014. (las) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marissa Piropato (no registration fee required) filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart C. Gillespie (no registration fee required) filed by Defendants John R. Erickson, Juan Palma, Mike Stiewig, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Juan Palma. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mike Stiewig. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to John R. Erickson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Forest Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Forest Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Forest Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Bureau of Land Management. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by WildEarth Guardians. (Walker, Joro) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT Petition for Review of Agency Action against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2045727), filed by WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Walker, Joro) Modified by correcting receipt number on 5/8/2014 (blh). (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jwt) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?