ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. DOWNEY
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:11-cv-06843

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 23, 2021 at 3:44 PM EST (10.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ecore International Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad O'Brien, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2014 MELISSA A. ANDERSON +1 215 864 9600 +1 215 864 9620 manderson@conradobrien.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nissen & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Nissen +1 202 730 1257 +1 202 686 2877 rnissen@nisseniplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens & Lee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSEPH E. WOLFSON +1 610 205 6019 +1 610 988 0808 jwo@stevenslee.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens & Lee, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELIZABETH A. WARE +1 610 478 2210 eaw@stevenslee.com
No Logo CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brinks Gilson & Lione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Harold Beaupre +1 312 245 5390 +1 312 321 4299 jbeaupre@usebrinks.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Harold Beaupre +1 312 245 5390 +1 312 321 4299 jbeaupre@usebrinks.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Sobieraj +1 312 321 4226 +1 312 321 4299 jrs@brinkshofer.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Sobieraj +1 312 321 4226 +1 312 321 4299 jrs@brinkshofer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad O'Brien

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW S. GALLINARO +1 215 864 8083 +1 215 864 7403 agallinaro@conradobrien.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW S. GALLINARO +1 215 864 8083 +1 215 864 7403 agallinaro@conradobrien.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN DOOLEY KENT +1 215 864 9600 kkent@cogr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN DOOLEY KENT +1 215 864 9600 kkent@cogr.com
No Logo PAUL DOWNEY, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brinks Gilson & Lione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Harold Beaupre +1 312 245 5390 +1 312 321 4299 jbeaupre@usebrinks.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Harold Beaupre +1 312 245 5390 +1 312 321 4299 jbeaupre@usebrinks.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Sobieraj +1 312 321 4226 +1 312 321 4299 jrs@brinkshofer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Sobieraj +1 312 321 4226 +1 312 321 4299 jrs@brinkshofer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad O'Brien

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW S. GALLINARO +1 215 864 8083 +1 215 864 7403 agallinaro@conradobrien.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW S. GALLINARO +1 215 864 8083 +1 215 864 7403 agallinaro@conradobrien.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN DOOLEY KENT +1 215 864 9600 kkent@cogr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN DOOLEY KENT +1 215 864 9600 kkent@cogr.com
No Logo Pliteq Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brinks Gilson & Lione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Harold Beaupre +1 312 245 5390 +1 312 321 4299 jbeaupre@usebrinks.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Harold Beaupre +1 312 245 5390 +1 312 321 4299 jbeaupre@usebrinks.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Sobieraj +1 312 321 4226 +1 312 321 4299 jrs@brinkshofer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Sobieraj +1 312 321 4226 +1 312 321 4299 jrs@brinkshofer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad O'Brien

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW S. GALLINARO +1 215 864 8083 +1 215 864 7403 agallinaro@conradobrien.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW S. GALLINARO +1 215 864 8083 +1 215 864 7403 agallinaro@conradobrien.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN DOOLEY KENT +1 215 864 9600 kkent@cogr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN DOOLEY KENT +1 215 864 9600 kkent@cogr.com
v.
No Logo CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brinks Gilson & Lione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Harold Beaupre +1 312 245 5390 +1 312 321 4299 jbeaupre@usebrinks.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Sobieraj +1 312 321 4226 +1 312 321 4299 jrs@brinkshofer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad O'Brien

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW S. GALLINARO +1 215 864 8083 +1 215 864 7403 agallinaro@conradobrien.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN DOOLEY KENT +1 215 864 9600 kkent@cogr.com
No Logo PAUL DOWNEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brinks Gilson & Lione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Harold Beaupre +1 312 245 5390 +1 312 321 4299 jbeaupre@usebrinks.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Sobieraj +1 312 321 4226 +1 312 321 4299 jrs@brinkshofer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad O'Brien

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW S. GALLINARO +1 215 864 8083 +1 215 864 7403 agallinaro@conradobrien.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN DOOLEY KENT +1 215 864 9600 kkent@cogr.com
No Logo Pliteq Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brinks Gilson & Lione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Harold Beaupre +1 312 245 5390 +1 312 321 4299 jbeaupre@usebrinks.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Sobieraj +1 312 321 4226 +1 312 321 4299 jrs@brinkshofer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad O'Brien

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW S. GALLINARO +1 215 864 8083 +1 215 864 7403 agallinaro@conradobrien.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN DOOLEY KENT +1 215 864 9600 kkent@cogr.com
No Logo ARTHUR DODGE, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nissen & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Nissen +1 202 730 1257 +1 202 686 2877 rnissen@nisseniplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens & Lee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELIZABETH A. WARE +1 610 478 2210 eaw@stevenslee.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSEPH E. WOLFSON +1 610 205 6019 +1 610 988 0808 jwo@stevenslee.com
No Logo Ecore International Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad O'Brien, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2014 MELISSA A. ANDERSON +1 215 864 9600 +1 215 864 9620 manderson@conradobrien.com
TERMINATED: 05/07/2014 MELISSA A. ANDERSON +1 215 864 9600 +1 215 864 9620 manderson@conradobrien.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nissen & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Nissen +1 202 730 1257 +1 202 686 2877 rnissen@nisseniplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Nissen +1 202 730 1257 +1 202 686 2877 rnissen@nisseniplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens & Lee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELIZABETH A. WARE +1 610 478 2210 eaw@stevenslee.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELIZABETH A. WARE +1 610 478 2210 eaw@stevenslee.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSEPH E. WOLFSON +1 610 205 6019 +1 610 988 0808 jwo@stevenslee.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSEPH E. WOLFSON +1 610 205 6019 +1 610 988 0808 jwo@stevenslee.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (150) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Praecipe/Request
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Strike
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Unseal Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Unseal Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None response
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None order on motion in limine
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, THE PARTIES SHALL JOINTLY ADVISE THE COURT IN WRITING WHETHER ANY PARTY SEEKS TO MAINTAIN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM UNDER SEAL AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 10/12/2018. 10/12/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY ROBERT C. NISSEN for ARTHUR DODGE AND ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 12/21/2015. 12/22/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.ECF APP FORWARDED(kp, ) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ECORE AND DODGE SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/5/2015 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 8/20/2015. 8/21/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kp, ) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC., filed by ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC..(kp, ) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ECORE IS PERMITTED TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A. ECORE'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM IS DEEMED WITHDRAWN, AND DEFENDANTS DOWNEY, CSR, AND PLITEQ SHALL FILE ANY REQUIRED RESPONSE, INCLUDING COUNTERCLAIMS, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/14/2015.7/15/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET: Settlement Conference held on 7/17/14. (va, ) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE: A settlement conference in the above-captioned case will be held on July 22, 2014, at 2:00 P.M., via telephone before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 6, Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building, 900 Market Street, Philadelphia, PA 19107. Joseph Wolfson, Esquire will contact defendants counsel and initiate the call to chambers when both are present on the line. (smcc) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE: The settlement conference that is presently scheduled for July 17, 2014, at 2:00 p.m., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 6, Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building, 900 Market Street, Philadelphia, PA 19107 will now be held via telephone. Jon Beaupre, Esquire will contact plaintiffs counsel and initiate the call to chambers when both are present on the line.(smcc) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE: A settlement conference in the above-captioned case will be held on July 17, 2014, at 2:00 P.M., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 6, Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building, 900 Market Street, Philadelphia, PA 19107. Please notify the court if settlement is not a real possibility. The conference will not be held unless counsel has clients with full and complete settlement authority physically present for the duration of the conference. Full and complete authority means the party's representative must possess authority consistent with the most recent demand. If the defendant does not intend to make a settlement offer, or intends to offer nuisance value only, defendant should arrange a telephone conference with chambers and parties. Please complete the attached summary and fax it to Chambers 267-299-5055 on or before July 10, 2014. (smcc) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE CASES ARE JOINTLY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET FOR SETTLEMENT. JUDGE LLORET SHALL SCHEDULE A CONFERENCE TO PURSUE SETTLEMENT OF THESE MATTERS TOGETHER WITHIN 45 DAYS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/3/2014. 6/5/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, ) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MELISSA A. ANDERSON on behalf of ARTHUR DODGE, ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ANDERSON, MELISSA) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL DEADLINES ARE EXTENDED BY SIX (6) MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THE COURT'S DISPOSITION OF THE NOW-PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTER-PLAINTIFFS' COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 1/31/2013. 2/1/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(GALLINARO, ANDREW) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ECORE AND DODGE SHALL HAVE UNTIL FRIDAY, 1/4/2013 TO FILE A REPLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 11/30/2012. 12/3/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Praecipe to Substitute Exhibit by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC.. (GALLINARO, ANDREW) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR ECORE AND DODGE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS IS HEREBY EXTENDED 21 DAYS FROM 10/22/2012. IN ADDITION, THE COUNSEL FOR ECORE WILL ACCEPT SERVICE OF THE COUNTERCLAIMS ON BEHALF OF DODGE. FINALLY, EXHIBIT 4 TO THE COUNTERCLAIMS SHALL BE SUBSTITUTED WITH THE CORRECT EXHIBIT FILED AT 32-1. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 10/22/2012. 10/23/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kp, ) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Praecipe to Substitute Exhibit No. 4 to Defendants' Counterclaims by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4)(KENT, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM against ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC. and ARTHUR DODGE, filed by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 EX. 1, # 2 EX. 2, # 3 EX. 3, # 4 EX. 4, # 5 EX. 5, # 6 EX. 6)(tomg, ) (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/23/2012) (kp, ). (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM Counter Claim by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (KENT, KEVIN) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY RE-SUBMITTED IN HARD COPY) Modified on 10/12/2012 (nd, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/24/2012) (tomg, ). (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/24/2013 02:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK. DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/29/2013. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 7/31/2013. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 10/3/2013. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 10/28/2013 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8A BEFORE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 10/1/2012; 10/2/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/25/2012 (tomg, ) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Joint Case Report by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC., PLITEQ, INC.. (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/25/2012 AT 11:00 A.M., IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 8614), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 9/19/2012. 9/20/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. ANDERSON on behalf of ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANDERSON, MELISSA) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Order To Remove From Civil Suspense filed by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC., PLITEQ, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS STAYED PENDING A DECISION BY THE COURT OF APPEALS OF ONTARIO, CANADA IN THE CASE DOWNEY V. ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC., CV-11-420561, WHICH IS PRESENTLY PENDING BEFORE THAT COURT. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO PLACE THIS MATTER IS CIVIL SUSPENSE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 3/30/2012; 4/2/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, filed by ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT /Joint Case Report by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC., PLITEQ, INC.. (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative,, MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, filed by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order (alternative), # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5)(KENT, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/21/2012 AT 4:30 P.M., IN CHAMBERS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/10/2012; 2/13/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC. with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (KENT, KEVIN) Modified on 2/7/2012 (nd, ). (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PLITEQ, INC..(GALLINARO, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC..(GALLINARO, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JAMES R. SOBIERAJ, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 1/13/2012.1/17/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(tomg, ) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JON H. BEAUPRE, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 1/13/2012.1/17/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of James R. Sobieraj filed by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE055988) (KENT, KEVIN) Modified on 1/11/2012 (tomg, ). (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jon H. Beaupre filed by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE055988) (KENT, KEVIN) Modified on 1/11/2012 (tomg, ). (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S. GALLINARO on behalf of CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC. with Certificate of Service(GALLINARO, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN DOOLEY KENT on behalf of CSR INDUSTRIES, INC., PAUL DOWNEY, PLITEQ, INC. with Certificate of Service(KENT, KEVIN) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PLITEQ, INC.. PLITEQ, INC. waiver sent on 11/7/2011, answer due 2/6/2012. (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CSR INDUSTRIES, INC.. CSR INDUSTRIES, INC. waiver sent on 11/7/2011, answer due 2/6/2012. (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PAUL DOWNEY. PAUL DOWNEY waiver sent on 11/7/2011, answer due 2/6/2012. (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRAECIPE to Issue Summons as to all defts filed by ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (tomg, ) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC..(WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 2,398,262; 6,920,723 & RE41945. (tj, ) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC.(tj, ) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to PAUL DOWNEY; CSR INDUSTRIES, INC. & PLITEQ, INC. on 11/1/11 by ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Waiver of Service due by 12/1/2011. (tj, ) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 052430.), filed by ECORE INTERNATIONAL, INC.(tj, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2011: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D-G, # 5 Ex. H) (tj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2011: # 6 Civil Cover Sheets) (tj, ). (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 419 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?