J and J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Humberto Villalobos Torres
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-06749

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2018 at 6:38 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than April 17, 2014 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 4/17/2014. (pg)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than December 17, 2013 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant.. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/17/2013. (pg)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?