Cyberfone Systems LLC v. Ricoh Americas Corp. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00111

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 11:51 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cyberfone Systems, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Ricoh Americas Corp., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Foster +1 949 757 7103 +1 949 851 9348 dfoster@mwe.com
No Logo Ricoh Electronics, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Foster +1 949 757 7103 +1 949 851 9348 dfoster@mwe.com
v.
No Logo Ricoh Americas Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Devinsky +1 202 756 8369 +1 202 756 8087 pdevinsky@mwe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Foster +1 949 757 7103 +1 949 851 9348 dfoster@mwe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Yoder +1 949 581 0633 +1 949 851 9348 gyoder@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
No Logo Ricoh Electronics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Devinsky +1 202 756 8369 +1 202 756 8087 pdevinsky@mwe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Foster +1 949 757 7103 +1 949 851 9348 dfoster@mwe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Yoder +1 949 581 0633 +1 949 851 9348 gyoder@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
No Logo Cyberfone Systems, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Change Venue. Case is transferred to District of Delaware. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/18/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Change Venue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANT RICOH AMERICAS CORP. AND RICOH ELECTRONICS, INC.'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER TO THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Cyberfone)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
            REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Change Venue To The District of Delaware filed by Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc. (Devinsky, Paul) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Change Venue To The District of Delaware filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying motion to transfer)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                MOTION to Change Venue To The District of Delaware by Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Yoder, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2014: # 10 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:14-cv-109. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/28/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                    ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Cyberfone Systems LLC.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory David Yoder on behalf of Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc (Yoder, Gregory) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul Devinsky on behalf of Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4633855. (Devinsky, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc identifying Corporate Parent Ricoh Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Ricoh Americas Holdings, Inc. for Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc. (Foster, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                              Ricoh Americas Corp. and Ricoh Electronics, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Cyberfone Systems LLC by Ricoh Electronics Inc, Ricoh Americas Corp..(Foster, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                ***FILED IN ERROR.PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel R Foster on behalf of Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4626996. (Foster, Daniel) Modified on 4/26/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. for Ricoh Electronics, Inc. (mrm, ) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc.( Foster, Daniel) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Foster on behalf of Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc (Foster, Daniel) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. Ricoh Americas Corp. served by Process Server on 3/3/2014, answer due 3/24/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark S Raskin on behalf of Cyberfone Systems LLC (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Ricoh Americas Corp., (Attachments: # 1 Ricoh Electronics Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Patent Group Inc. for Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4534676.), filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?