Cyberfone Systems LLC v. Xerox Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00112

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 12:59 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cyberfone Systems, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler, Andrew Wesley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Counter-Claimant
v.
Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith Edward Broyles +1 404 881 7558 +1 404 811 7777 kbroyles@alston.com
Space Matthew Wolff Howell +1 404 881 7349 +1 404 881 7777 matthew.howell@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
Space Sheria Dranise Smith +1 214 550 8162 +1 214 550 8185 ssmith@carterstafford.com
Space John Steven Torkelson +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jtorkelson@carterscholer.com
No Logo Cyberfone Systems, LLC, Counter-Defendant
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Xerox's Motion to Transfer Venue by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Transfer Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/11/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Xerox Motion to Transfer by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/19/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                Opposed SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Xerox's Sealed Motion to Transfer, # 2 Affidavit Beach Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer, # 3 Affidavit Carter Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Carter Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Carter Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Carter Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Carter Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Carter Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Carter Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Carter Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Carter Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Carter Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Carter Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Carter Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Carter Declaration)(Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Xerox's Motion to Transfer Under Seal)(Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                    DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew W Howell on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Howell, Matthew) Modified on 6/10/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                      DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Edward Broyles on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Broyles, Keith) Modified on 6/10/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:14-cv- 109. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/28/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xerox Corporation (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                            Defendant Xerox Corporation ANSWER to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Cyberfone Systems LLC by Xerox Corporation.(Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER GRANTING 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Xerox Corporation. The new deadline is MAY 23, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/21/14. (bas, ) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Steven Torkelson on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Torkelson, John) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Xerox Corporation.( Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                      DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Xerox Corporation. (Carter, Edgar) Modified on 3/18/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                        DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Xerox Corporation. (Carter, Edgar) Modified on 3/18/2014 (nkl, ). Modified on 3/18/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Leon Carter on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. Xerox Corporation served on 3/3/2014, answer due 3/24/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark S Raskin on behalf of Cyberfone Systems LLC (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Xerox Corporation. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                      DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                        COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Xerox Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4534714.), filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?