USA v. Bantis
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cr-00388

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 3:00 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chris Bantis, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Flamhaft, Levy, Kamins, Hirsch & Rendeiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Andrew S. Rendeiro +1 718 237 1900 +1 718 624 5626 asrendeiro@yahoo.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Sentencing
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Judge Eric N. Vitaliano: AUSA Kristin Mace; Defense Counsel: Andrew S. Rendeiro, Esq.Sentencing held on 1/8/2016 for Chris Bantis (1), Count(s) 1, IMPRISONMENT: 42 MONTHS ON COUNT 1; SUPERVISED RELEASE: 3 YEARS; SPECIAL ASSESSMENT: $100.00; NO FINE; RESTITUTION: $7,800.00.; Count(s) 2, DISMISSED ON GOVT'S MOTION. (Court Reporter Charleane Heading.) (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Order for Forfeiture of Property
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER DIRECTING FORFEITURE OF PROPERTY as to Chris Bantis. granting 19 Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Chris Bantis (1). (Signed by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/1/2016) C/M (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Forfeiture of Property
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Change of Plea Hearing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak: AUSA Kristin Mace. Defense Counsel: Andrew Renderio.Allocution as to Chris Bantis held on 10/14/2014. Change of Plea Hearing as to Chris Bantis held on 10/14/2014. Plea entered by Chris Bantis (1) Guilty Count 1. (Court Reporter Mariam Hinds.) (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak as to Chris Bantis.(Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/14/2014) (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Continue
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Chris Bantis. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mace, M. Kristin) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew S. Rendeiro appearing for Chris Bantis (Rendeiro, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER OF DETENTION as to Chris Bantis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/14/2014. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy:AUSA Kristin Mace and Michael Weil for the deft.Detention Hearing as to Chris Bantis held on 7/14/2014, ( Status Conference set for 7/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4C South before Judge Eric N. Vitaliano.) (Tape #2:24 - 2:28.) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                            CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Chris Bantis (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Chris Bantis Time excluded from 7/10/14 until 7/18/14.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/10/2014. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PENDING HEARING PURSUANT TO BAIL REFORM ACT as to Chris Bantis. Detention Hearing Set for 7/14/14 at 2:00 before Mag. Levy.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/10/2014. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Arraignment as to Chris Bantis (1) Count 1,2 held on 7/10/2014, Initial Appearance as to Chris Bantis held on 7/10/2014, Plea entered by Chris Bantis (1) Count 1,2. by Chris Bantis Not Guilty to all counts. ( Detention Hearing set for 7/14/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy., Status Conference set for 7/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4C South before Judge Eric N. Vitaliano.) Temporary Order of Detention entered. AUSA Kristin Mace; Defense Counsel, Michael Weil. (Tape #3:15 - 3:17.) (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                    PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM in Support of Pretrial Detention as to Chris Bantis (Mace, M. Kristin) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Unsealing Order, that the Indictment and the case in its entirety be unsealed as to Chris Bantis.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/10/2014. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                        SEALED INDICTMENT as to Chris Bantis (1) count(s) 1, 2. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Information Sheet, # 2 Sealing Cover Sheet) (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 657 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?