Colyer v. Chicago et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-04855

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 6:35 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Darius Pinex, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa T DaMico +1 312 229 1244 +1 312 663 6406 ldamico@ameritech.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Loevy & Loevy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan I. Loevy +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 jon@loevy.com
Space Scott R. Rauscher +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 scott@loevy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Allen Greenberg +1 312 879 9500 greenberglaw@me.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Rameau Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven H. Fine +1 312 922 0855 sfinelaw@hotmail.com
No Logo Matthew Colyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by chicagocivilrightslawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M. Baranyk +1 773 517 2904 james.b@chicagocivilrightslawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by EQUIP FOR EQUALITY Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda C Antholt +1 312 341 0022 +1 312 541 7544 amanda@equipforequality.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Susan V. Tipograph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Wade Johnson +1 773 485 2267 robwjlaw@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith, Johnson & Antholt LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Rudolf Smith +1 312 432 0400 chris@lawsja.com
Space Emily J. Stine +1 312 432 0400 +1 312 850 2704 emily@lawsja.com
v.
City of Chicago City of Chicago, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. A. Pasquinelli +1 312 744 3283 +1 312 744 6566 michael.pasquinelli@cityofchicago.org
Space Thomas Jon Aumann +1 312 744 1566 +1 312 744 3989 thomas.aumann@cityofchicago.org
Space Victoria Rose Benson +1 312 742 1842 victoria.benson@cityofchicago.org
Space Jonathan Clark Green +1 312 744 0226 +1 312 744 6566 jonathangreen@cityofchicago.org
Space Jordan E. Marsh +1 312 744 8362 jmarsh@cityofchicago.org
Space Dana Marie Pesha +1 312 744 3982 +1 312 744 6566 dana.pesha@cityofchicago.org
Space George John Yamin, Jr. +1 312 744 9010 gyamin@cityofchicago.org

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colin B White +1 312 814 6135 CWhite@atg.state.il.us
No Logo G. Sierra, Defendant
No Logo R. Mosqueda, Defendant
No Logo Independent Police Review Authority, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derek B. Payette dpayette@dykema.com
  Entries (456) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Compel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 444 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                SUR-REPLY by Respondent Law Department Respondents to reply 435 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Notice of Filing)(Leinenweber, Justin) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Motion by Justin L. Leinenweber for presentment of motion for leave to file 440 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 12/22/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Leinenweber, Justin) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None
                        Notice of vacated sanctions order in Fields v. City of Chicago by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex , cited in Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Renewed Motion for Directed Verdict (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - minute order vacating Fields sanctions order)(Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Motion by Scott R. Rauscher for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 436 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 12/9/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                REPLY by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex to motion for directed verdict, 422 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                  EXHIBIT by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra, Respondents Law Department Respondents, Non-Law Department Respondents Exhibits 36 - 42 regarding response in opposition to motion, 431 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 38, # 2 Exhibit 39 Part I, # 3 Exhibit 39 Part II, # 4 Exhibit 40, # 5 Exhibit 41, # 6 Exhibit 42)(Gainer, Brian) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                    EXHIBIT by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra, Respondents Law Department Respondents, Non-Law Department Respondents Exhibits 18-35 regarding response in opposition to motion, 431 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19-22, # 2 Exhibit 23, # 3 Exhibit 24, # 4 Exhibit 25, # 5 Exhibit 26-32, # 6 Exhibit 33, # 7 Exhibit 34, # 8 Exhibit 35)(Gainer, Brian) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                      EXHIBIT by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra, Respondents Law Department Respondents, Non-Law Department Respondents Exhibits 8 - 17 regarding response in opposition to motion, 431 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9-10, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 13-14, # 5 Exhibit 15-16, # 6 Exhibit 17)(Gainer, Brian) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE by City of Chicago, Law Department Respondents, R. Mosqueda, Non-Law Department Respondents, G. Sierrain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex for directed verdict or, in the Alternative, a New Trial 422 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit 1-4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6-7)(Gainer, Brian) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Motion by Brian Patrick Gainer for presentment of extension of time 428 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/12/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Gainer, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Brian Patrick Gainer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply 425 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/20/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Gainer, Brian) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                        EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Darius Pinex; Disc containing audio exhibits 1,7,8, and 9 in Dkt. 422 . (Document not scanned) (Attachments: # 1 CD)(lk, ) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Directed Verdict
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Steven Allen Greenberg for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 419 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 9/8/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: At Plaintiff Pinex's request and no objection by Defendants, the status hearing is reset to 09/11/2015 at 1:00 p.m. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Jon Aumann for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 415 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/26/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7-14-15 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3-4-15 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 8 of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3-3-15 p.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 7B of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3-3-15 a.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 7A of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3-2-15 p.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 6B of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3-2-15 a.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 6A of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-27-15 p.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 5B of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-27-15 a.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 5A of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-26-15 p.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 4B of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-26-15 a.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 4A of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-25-15 p.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 3B of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-25-15 a.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 3A of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-24-15 p.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 2B of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-24-15 a.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 2A of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-23-15 p.m. session before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Volume 1B of Jury Trial. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1-26-15 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. PTC. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status and motion hearing held on the Law Department Respondents' motion to permit non-disclosure of privilege materials 395 . The Court directs the Law Department Respondents to confer with their client on the motion 395 to determine whether the same inspection-and-notes disclosure is authorized. If there is an objection, the Law Department Respondents shall re-notice the motion for hearing. The parties reported that the remaining 8 depositions are scheduled in keeping with the 08/03/2015 deadline. The Court discussed parameters of privilege assertions to be made (or not made) by the individual Defendants. Additionally, the Court discussed how to brief the issue going forward, and whether an in-court evidentiary hearing might be needed. Plaintiffs believe a hearing is unnecessary, but the parties may deliberate about this further. Plaintiffs' supplement to their motion for a new trial 367 is due by 09/08/2015. Status hearing set for 09/11/2015 at 1:30 p.m., to discuss whether to simply set a response and reply, or instead whether a hearing is likely to be necessary. The Court encouraged the parties to engage in settlement negotiations, bearing in mind, at the very least, that (1) even with a strong instruction about the non-disclosure of the recording, the jury found no liability; and (2) if a new trial is granted, then the relief might very well include not just the new trial itself, but payment of fees and costs incurred for unnecessarily undertaking the first trial (precisely who or which entity must pay will be determined). Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-19-15 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. PTC. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 396 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SEALED EXHIBIT by Respondent Law Department Respondents regarding MOTION by Respondent Law Department Respondents for Non-Disclosure of Privileged Materials 395 (Leinenweber, Justin) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:The motion of the Law Department Respondents 393 on Pinex_Priv_0000242-313 is granted, as a reasonable interim accommodation to facilitate production of the documents. As Plaintiffs' counsel will see, there is a lot of duplication of materials within the Bates range, so it will not be burdensome to simply inspect the materials, at least for now, rather than obtain copies. If it ever becomes necessary to cite the materials, then a final decision on the propriety of public disclosure will be made at that point. Accordingly, the Law Department Respondents shall make the materials in the Bates range available for inspection but not copying; Plaintiffs' counsel may make notes concerning the materials; and Plaintiffs and their counsel may use the materials only in connection with this case. The tracking status hearing of 06/09/2015 is vacated. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: With regard to the first privilege issue that the Court discussed with the defense at the ex parte and under seal hearing on 06/01/2015, the Court has reviewed the interrogatory response, R. 390. In view of the concession that, on or about February 19, 2015, Maderak informed Marsh that Lamperis had requested and was sent the Zone 6 audio transmission, R. 390 at 3, the Court maintains the decision articulated at the ex parte hearing. The second issue remains pending, and the supplement (see R. 391) is still due on 06/05/2015. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held on the status of post-trial discovery. The parties and respondents reported that they conferred over search terms used for records searches, and Defendants will be running a follow-up search and producing additional records by 06/08/2015. Before depositions begin, the Court directed, the parties and respondents shall confer over attorney-client and work-product issues to minimize the need to assert privileges at depositions (and thus delay the end of discovery). Because of the need to inquire into matters relating to the privilege log and production, the Court held an ex parte and under seal with Defendants' and respondents' attorneys on the motion to authorize non-disclosure of privileged material 385 . For the reasons stated during the ex parte and under seal hearing, the Law Department Respondents shall file a supplement to the privilege motion ex parte and under seal on the docket electronically. The filing is due by 06/05/2015. To track the privilege motion (the case will not be called), a tracking status hearing is set for 06/09/2015 at 8:30 a.m. Status hearing set for 07/14/2015 at 1:30 p.m. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Discovery Response by Law Department Respondents (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Leinenweber, Justin) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5-6-15 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3-26-15 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Justin L. Leinenweber for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 384 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/28/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Leinenweber, Justin) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 385 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SEALED EXHIBIT by Respondent Law Department Respondents regarding MOTION by Respondent Law Department RespondentsUnopposed Motion for Leave to File Instanter A Motion to Permit Non-Disclosure of Privileged Materials 384 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Leinenweber, Justin) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Darius Pinex regarding status report, 381 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CD (Document not imaged))(as, ) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None 1 - Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ORDER signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Status hearing held. This Order summarizes decisions made at the hearing. Status hearing set for 06/01/2015 at 1:30 p.m. Briefing on the motion for new trial remains suspended, as post-trial discovery continues. Emailed notice(slb, ) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 381 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STATUS Report (Joint) by Matthew Colyer, Law Department Respondents, Non-Law Department Respondents, Darius Pinex (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Ex. 1, # 2 Plaintiffs' Ex. 2, # 3 Plaintiffs' Ex. 3, # 4 Plaintiffs' Ex. 4, # 5 Respondents' Ex. A, # 6 Respondents' Ex. B, # 7 Respondents' Ex. C)(Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Law Department Respondents by James Vincent Daffada (Daffada, James) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Thomas More Leinenweber for presentment of extension of time 376 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/29/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Leinenweber, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT by Defendants R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex for new trial 367 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(as, ) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Matthew Colyer regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex for new trial 367 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D)(Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS Report (Joint Position Paper on Motion for New Trial Briefing) by Non-Law Department Respondents (Thompson, Molly) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11-12-14 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2015. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None order on motion to file instanter
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra by Monica Gutowski (Gutowski, Monica) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM bill of costs 368 by City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Bill of Costs (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        BILL of Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Itemization for Defendants' Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit B - Supporting Invoices)(Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None New Trial
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by James M. Baranyk for presentment of motion to file instanter, 365 , motion for leave to file 364 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/7/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None File Instanter
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra by Brian Patrick Gainer (Gainer, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Law Department Respondents by Justin L. Leinenweber (Leinenweber, Justin) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Clerk is directed to add the following as additional parties in the case: (1) Non-Law Department Respondents and (2) Law Department Respondents. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None 1 - Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. This Order summarizes decisions made at the 03/26/2015 status hearing on the post-trial OEMC discovery plan. The next status hearing is 05/06/2015 at 1:30 p.m. Please note that the Order sets forth a conflict-waiver requirement that was not discussed during the status hearing. Emailed notice(slb, ) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 3/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Position Paper Regarding Sanctions Discovery by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 03/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 358 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS Report by Respondents and Defendants by City of Chicago (Thompson, Molly) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Molly E. Thompson (Thompson, Molly) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Daniel Matthew Noland (Noland, Daniel) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Paul A. Michalik (Michalik, Paul) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Terrence Michael Burns (Burns, Terrence) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS Report by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Thomas More Leinenweber for presentment of motion for extension of time to file 350 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/18/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Leinenweber, Thomas) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Thomas More Leinenweber (Leinenweber, Thomas) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JURY Verdict entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. (Mailed Notice) (RESTRICTED) (as, ) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JURY Notes. (RESTRICTED DOCUMENT)(as, ) . (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Judgment - AO450
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED JUDGMENT on 3/4/2015:Emailed notice(slb, ) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Jury trial deliberations continued. Jury verdict issued in favor of Defendants on all claims. As explained after the verdict's publication, the preservation order, R. 336, and the communication bar, R. 320, remain in full effect. The parties shall confer on a discovery plan for the OEMC recording discovery violation, and submit a joint statement 03/16/2015, setting forth areas of agreement and disagreement. Status hearing set for 03/26/2015 at 3 p.m. As discussed, the Court will enter judgment under Rule 58(b), but will consider newly discovered evidence arising from the discovery inquiry in support of any Rule 59(a) or Rule 59(e) motion, as well as under Rule 60(b)(2). If all of the parties are jointly interested in convening a settlement conference with the Court, they may jointly call the courtroom deputy to report the joint interest. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The jury sent a note asking for the depositions of Colyer, Mosqued, and Sierra. The Court convened a conference call with all counsel, who all agreed that there was no need to appear in Court to formulate a response to the note and that the attached response was the appropriate answer. This minute entry makes the record on the note and the response. Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Note to Jurors) (slb, ) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:After alerting the parties via e-mail copied to all parties, the Court sent the attached scheduling note to the jury (the original was signed). Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Scheduling Note) (slb, ) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 342 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Jury trial held. Jury deliberation began. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Reflecting changes from the instructions conference, attached are (1) the revised jury instructions, labeled as Court Set 2; and (2) the revised Verdict Forms. An Order will be entered explaining the substantive decision that had been taken under advisement and the non-substantive removal of the references to the Wrongful Death Act and the Survival Act in the headings.Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Jury Instructions Court Set 2, # 2 Exhibit Verdict Forms (Revised)) (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra to proposed jury instructions 335 in Opposition (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Jury trial held and continued to 03/03/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: During the trial, the Court and the parties have discussed a possible limiting instruction barring the jury from speculating about the results of the IPRA investigation and from considering the existence of the investigation as having any impact on the jury's decision. The Court offers this proposal to advance the discussion: You have heard references to an agency called the Independent Police Review Authority, which took a statement from Plaintiff Matthew Colyer on January 7, 2011. You must not speculate about what further investigation, if any, might have been conducted or what the results were, if any, because you are going to make your own decision--based on the evidence you heard in this courtroom and the law that I give you--as to what happened and whether Plaintiffs have proved their claims. Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 03/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED Jury Instructions by City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 03/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 3/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the remaining defense witnesses, it appears that trial testimony should readily conclude on Monday, 03/02/2015. Accordingly, as a follow-up to R. 328 and Plaintiffs' motion for an instruction or to call Maderak 327 , the parties should be prepared to present on Monday any witness needed to finish testimony. The Court then would hold the instructions conference during Monday afternoon, and closings would begin first thing on Tuesday morning, 03/03/2015.Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 03/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: At the end of the trial day on Friday (02/27/2015), counsel for Colyer asked the Court to provide a copy of the instruction on the OEMC recording. The instruction stated as follows: You have heard testimony from Defendant Mosqueda that, sometime earlier in his shift on the night of the shooting, he heard a police radio broadcast that was broadcast on the radio for Radio Zone 6, which includes the 7th District. Mosqueda testified that the broadcast reported that a dark-colored vehicle with rims and a temporary license plate had fled from 4th District officers, was presumed to be armed, and had something to do with a shooting. Before this trial, Plaintiffs made a valid request for a recording of that alleged broadcast. The defense failed to turn over any recording before trial, as is required by the Rules. Yesterday, the defense turned over the only recording during that shift that could be the broadcast about which Mosqueda testified or that Mosqueda could have related to Sierra. I have authorized further examination of witnesses about the broadcast, and you will hear the recording as Plaintiffs' Exhibit 108. The recording was made on January 6, 2011, at around 10 p.m. You also heard a stipulation describing broadcasts over the Fourth District's Zone Radio on January 6, 2011. You must disregard the part of that stipulation that described what was in those broadcasts. The stipulation still remains that neither Defendant heard those Fourth District Zone Radio broadcasts, and that the Oldsmobile Aurora identified in those broadcasts was later towed and taken into Chicago custody, and was not the vehicle owned or operated by Darius Pinex. Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 03/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 3/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On Plaintiffs' motion for instruction or to call Maderak 325 : (1) the parties' counsel must appear at 8:30 a.m. on 03/02/2015 so that the motion can be argued before the 9 a.m. start of testimony; (2) in the event that Maderak will be required to testify, the defense must arrange for her availability at the Courthouse at 9 a.m. (it might be sensible to have her testify, if that relief is granted, before Dix); (3) defense counsel is authorized to arrange the appearance and to confirm that Maderak was the one who provided the CDs to Lamperis. The Court notes that the parties might also wish to confer on a stipulation as to the disclosure of the CDs to Lamperis, the time period in which the disclosure of the CDs was made, and Lamperis's role in the investigation. With those facts established, the parties would then be free to argue the circumstantial inference (or not) of whether Mosqueda heard the recordings before last Thursday evening. Plaintiffs do have a point that, as the testimony stands now, it is not clear that the recordings had ever been even possibly available in 01/2011, as distinct from during discovery. Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 03/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 3/1/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REVISED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Attached are (1) the revised jury instructions, labeled as Court Set 1; and (2) the revised Verdict Forms. An Order will be entered explaining the substantive decisions.Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Jury Instructions Court Set 1, # 2 Exhibit Verdict Forms) (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 03/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/28/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 2/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 02/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Jury trial held and continued to 03/02/2015. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Laura Dunaj and Jill Maderak are ordered to be available for testimony in the courtroom at 9 a.m. today, 02/27/2015. The Court directs (and authorizes, in light of the communications bar) defense counsel to communicate with them to arrange for this availability. Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the OEMC recording disclosure and the need, either now or eventually, to determine why the recording was not disclosed earlier, the Court will limit the communications between defense counsel and Laura Dunaj, Jill Maderak, or any other OEMC records custodian who might have responded to any request for the recording (including any request in 01/2011 going forward). The communications limitations is as follows: no communications about this case, except for in-court examination and as otherwise pre-approved by the Court.Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS Report by Darius Pinex (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS Report Regarding Zone 6 OEMC Audio by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deposition of Matthew Noedel by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deposition of Matthew Colyer by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deposition by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra Deposition of Gloria Pinex (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Jury trial held and continued to 02/27/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Jury trial held and continued to 02/26/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Jury trial held and continued to 02/25/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: During the trial day of 02/23/2015, the parties' counsel represented that Patrick Malik has been served with a trial subpoena. The Court orders that Malik appear as directed by the trial subpoena. Absent a basis for non-appearance in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, which must be litigated by Malik promptly filing a motion to quash, Malik must comply with the trial subpoena and appear, regardless of whether there is a dispute over compensation. Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Darius Pinex Expert Report of Matthew Noedel (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Jury trial begins. Jury selection concluded. Trial continued to 02/24/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: After reviewing the parties' competing proposals on a limiting instruction to the jury concerning the alleged possession of a firearm by Pinex, which the Court decided was relevant to his motive to flee, the Court will instruct the jury as follows (when the evidence is introduced, or mentioned during opening statements): You are instructed that, as of January 7, 2011, it was illegal, and punishable by imprisonment, for Darius Pinex to possess a firearm. If you find that Mr. Pinex possessed a firearm, you may consider this evidence for one reason and one reason only: whether he had a motive to flee in order to avoid being found with a firearm in the car that he was driving. You cannot consider the alleged possession of a firearm for any other reason. Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 02/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/21/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Final pretrial conference held. A separate order will be entered to summarize the decisions. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Chicago, G. Sierra by Thomas Jon Aumann (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/18/2015: For the reasons stated in the Order, Plaintiffs' proposed policy violations 277 is granted in part and limited in part. Emailed notice(Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Court has under advisement the various remaining pretrial motions. Rather than hold the status hearing today, the Court resets it for 02/19/2015 at 10:45 A.M.Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Attached are (1) the voir dire letter from which the venire will answer background questions; and (2) supplemental voir dire questions. The combined questions, and particularly the supplemental questions, will provide sufficient information for the exercise of peremptories and the determination of for-cause challenges, without unduly lengthening the voir dire process. The parties should review Supplemental Question 4 in particular, which is a combination of an instruction with a voir dire question. Bear in mind too that the venire will be asked if they know of, or have heard of, any of the parties (and the lawyers). Also, the venire will be read the case statement and asked whether they have heard of this case. The voir dire questions may be discussed at the 02/18/2015 status hearing. Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Voir Dire Letter, # 2 Exhibit Supplemental Voir Dire Questions) (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra by Jordan Marsh (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 02/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 293 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Offer of Proof STATEMENT by City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 02/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda by Dana Marie Pesha (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 02/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/14/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra to response in opposition to motion, 287 , MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra for reconsideration regarding order on motion in limine,,,,, order on motion to bar,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 260 , order on motion in limine,,,, 270 280 (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Plaintiff Darius Pinex (Greenberg, Steven) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 2/13/2015 (as, ). (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra for reconsideration regarding order on motion in limine,,,,, order on motion to bar,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 260 , order on motion in limine,,,, 270 280 (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED Jury Instructions by City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to order on motion for miscellaneous relief,, pretrial conference, set/reset hearings,,,,,,,, 278 (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Jordan Marsh for presentment of motion in limine 283 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/13/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Jordan Marsh for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 280 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/10/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex for reconsideration regarding response in opposition to motion, 190 , order on motion in limine,,,, 270 275 (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Conference Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 01/26/2015. ORDER signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 02/02/2015: This Order summarizes the decisions made at the pretrial conference, including the under-advisement issues. Also, the motion for jury questionnaire 206 is denied, as explained in the pretrial conference and in this Order. Attachment A to this entry is a chart of the exhibit rulings. Status hearing set for 02/18/2015 at 10:30 A.M. Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A (Exhibit Chart))(Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The defense communicated, through an email to the courtroom deputy copying each Plaintiff's counsel, that the defense will not be conducting juror background checks during voir dire. This moots the issue that was the subject of a motion in limine. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to Response to Plaintiffs' MIL 7 (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Jordan Marsh for presentment of motion for reconsideration,, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 268 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/26/2015 at 01:00 PM. (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Jon Aumann for presentment of motion to supplement 266 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/27/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to Docket No. 214 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Baranyk, James) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Colyer by James M. Baranyk (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Judge Chang's prior (and current) Standing Order Governing Proposed Pretrial Orders require the parties to email an MS Word copy of the proposed pretrial order to the Judge's proposed-order email account (Proposed_Order_Chang@ilnd.uscourts.gov). The parties shall do so forthwith.Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by James M. Baranyk for presentment of motion for leave to appear 258 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/26/2015 at 01:00 PM. (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex to order on motion for extension of time to file,, order on motion for leave to appear,, order on motion for leave to file,, add and terminate attorneys,, set/reset hearings, 253 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darius Pinex by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darius Pinex by Scott R. Rauscher (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinexin limine To Bar Opinions 175 Supplemental Response per Court order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to order, 224 , response in opposition to motion, 184 , motion in limine 179 (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to order, 224 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Reports)(Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to response to motion in limine 4. (Attachments: # 1 CD Marked 14cv4855 EX A #4)(ea, ) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Robert Wade Johnson for presentment of motion for leave to file 247 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/21/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra in support of their motions in limine (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Scott R. Rauscher for presentment of motion for leave to appear 244 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/21/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex for leave to appear as Additional attorney appearance Unopposed (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by Plaintiff Darius Pinex (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to response in opposition to motion,,,,,, 226 To Bar Gun (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex to motion in limine 218 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex to motion to bar 216 (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 404(b) (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 No. 15 (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 No. 14 (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 No. 9 (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 No. 8 (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 No. 7 (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 No. 5 (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 Prohibit Audio (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine 221 Indemnification (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Claim by Officers That Audio Was Not Working (Amended) 207 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Plaintiffs Prior Convictions 211 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Evidence a Gun was Found in Pinex Car 217 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Personal Finances without Indemnification 214 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Plaintiffs Finances 215 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinexin limine 13 219 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinexin limine 12 218 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Evidence of tatoos, ect. 212 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Evidence of Blood Alcohol 209 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Plaintiffs Motive is Money 210 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Argument of a Dangerous Neighborhood 208 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Bolstering of Police 216 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to bar Use of LEADS 213 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - McCoy Report, # 2 Exhibit B - General Progress Report re Transport Officers, # 3 Exhibit C - January 2, 2015 Email from Jordan Marsh, # 4 Exhibit D - July 22, 2013 Hearing Transcript, # 5 Exhibit E - Defendants' August 30, 2012 Joint 26(a)(1) Disclosures, # 6 Exhibit January 3, 2015 Email Exchanges re Transport Officers)(Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the expert-testimony motions, the Court concludes that no testimonial pretrial hearing is necessary to resolve the motions. In advance of the pretrial conference, the Court will issue an order resolving the motions on the briefs to the extent possible, but the parties should expect at least one, and possibly more, expert issues to be flagged in the order as requiring further discussion at the pretrial conference. The status hearing of 01/08/2015 is thus vacated, with the pretrial conference being the next in-court date. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT D to the Pre Trial Order inadvertantly omitted by Darius Pinex (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff Will Call A, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiff May Call B, # 3 Exhibit Defendants Will Call C, # 4 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit List E, # 5 Exhibit Defendants Exhibit List F, # 6 Exhibit Plaintiffs Proposed Instructions G, # 7 Exhibit Defendants Proposed Instructions H, # 8 Exhibit Agreed Instructions, # 9 Exhibit Defendants Proposed Voir Dire)(Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/3/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by James M. Baranyk for presentment of motion for leave to appear 204 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 12/8/2014 at 09:45 AM. (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 12/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: There are two attachments to this entry: (1) revised Proposed Pretrial requirements; and (2) revised JERS exhibit-naming conventions. The parties need not follow the revisions in the Proposed Pretrial requirements if there is insufficient time to do so before its submission. But the parties must follow the revised JERS exhibit-naming conventions, which hopefully should not take long (the convention is simplified from the prior version). Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Pretrial Order Requirements, # 2 Exhibit JERS Exhibit-Naming Convention) (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The status hearing of 12/22/2014 is reset to 01/08/2015 at 9:45 a.m. The Court will be reviewing the expert motions in limine advance of that status hearing. With regard to Plaintiffs' motion to correct 201 , the motion is granted. Plaintiffs are authorized to substitute a corrected version of R. 190 on the docket. Plaintiffs shall contact the Docketing or CM/ECF department in the Clerk's Office to work with them to substitute a new.pdf in place of the current R. 190, such that the new.pdf will be designated R. 190 with a filing date of 12/05/2014. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The defense motion to clarify 197 is granted: the statement concerning Colyer being shot was for summary-judgment purposes only. Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Jon Aumann for presentment of motion to clarify 197 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 12/18/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra to response in opposition to motion, 184 in limine No. 1 to Bar Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Shaku Teas (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra to response in opposition to motion 190 in limine No. 3 to Bar Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Joseph Stine (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra to response in opposition to motion 191 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Darius Pinex to response in opposition to motion 185 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinexin limine To Bar Expert Opinions of Hueske 176 (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine No. 2 to Bar Testimony and Expert Opinions of Dennis Waller 180 (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine No. 3 to Bar Testimony and Expert Opinions of Joseph Stine 181 (Greenberg, Steven) (Main Document 190 replaced on 12/22/2014) (ea, ). (Modified on 12/22/2014 per court order dated 12/19/2014)(ea, ). (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinexin limine To Bar Opinions 175 of Dr. McCoy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinexin limine 178 re Daniel Spitz (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Spitz Report))(Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinexin limine to Bar Opinions of Dix 177 (CORRECTED with attachment of exhibit) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Dix Report))(Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinexin limine to Bar Opinions of Dix 177 (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinexin limine To Bar Expert Opinions of Hueske 176 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Sierra Deposition) and B (Colyer Deposition))(Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierrain limine No. 1 To Bar Opinins and Testimony of Dr. Shaku Teas 179 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:By agreement of the parties, the status hearing of 12/22/2014 is reset to 1:00 p.m. on the same date, 12/22/2014. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the pendency of the reply briefs on the expert-exclusion motions (the replies are due on 12/12/2014), the status hearing of 12/03/2014 is reset to 12/22/2014 at 10 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Matthew Colyer to order on motion to strike, text entry,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 166 , reply 162 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: With confirmation from both sides to the courtroom deputy, on the parties' agreement, the motion hearing of 11/06/2014 is reset to 11/12/2014 at 11:00 AM.Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:On the Court's own initiative, the hearing on Plaintiff Darius Pinex's motion to re-open discovery is reset to 11/06/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:It is beyond strange that the City sent an email to the Court's Proposed Order email account as a way to substantively respond to the discovery motion 167 filed by Plaintiff Pinex (there is apparently a scheduling issue too, but the email went well beyond that). Pinex then replied, again via email. To avoid off-record arguments, the parties shall immediately stop substantive back-and-forth on this issue (and any other issues in the future) via the Proposed Order email account. For the record's sake, the email trail is attached to this minute entry. The parties shall immediately confer about the date and time of the motion hearing, and if they agree to a new date and time, then Plaintiff may re-notice the motion. If they cannot agree, then counsel may jointly contact the courtroom deputy to explore scheduling options (such as a phone-in appearance and/or a lunch-time appearance). Otherwise, the motion hearing remains as scheduled unless a motion is filed to reschedule.Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Emails) (slb, ) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On Plaintiff Pinex's motion to reopen fact discovery 167 , the defense shall be as prepared as possible to fully report on the underlying facts.Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Steven Allen Greenberg for presentment of motion for discovery 167 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/6/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The parties are alerted that Judge Chang's jury-deliberations room is equipped with the Jury Evidence Recording System (JERS). JERS permits the jury to view and listen-to exhibits on a touch-screen computer system, and using standard file formats (for examples,.pdf,.jpg,.mpg). The parties must review the attached memorandum on JERS and, importantly, use the exhibit-naming conventions in that memorandum. Any questions about JERS may be directed in the first instance to the courtroom deputy. Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 JERS) (slb, ) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Robert Wade Johnson for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief 163 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/4/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Defendant R. Mosqueda to Rule 56 statement, 146 , response in opposition to motion 158 , motion for summary judgment 147 , Rule 56 statement 161 In support of Mosqueda's Motion for Summary Judgment (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 56.1(b)(3) Statement by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra regarding motion for summary judgment 147 , motion for summary judgment 144 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Defendant G. Sierra to memorandum in opposition to motion 157 In support of Sierra's Motion for Summary Judgment (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Matthew Colyer, Darius Pinex compact disc containing Exhibits A and C to Plaintiff's Local Rule 56.1(C) Statements of Additional Facts. 156 (ea, ) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Matthew Colyerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant R. Mosqueda for summary judgment as to Plaintiff Colyer 147 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Darius Pinex Defendants request for partial summary judgment. 144 (Greenberg, Steven) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.) Modified on 10/10/2014 (ea, ). (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 56 56.1(c) Statement by Darius Pinex regarding motion for summary judgment 147 , motion for summary judgment 144 LOCAL RULE 56.1(C) STATEMENTS OF ADDITIONAL FACTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit OEMC Recording Disc, # 2 Exhibit Chicago Police Department Event Inquiry, # 3 Exhibit In-Dash Camera Recoding Video, # 4 Exhibit Deposition of Officer Sierra, # 5 Exhibit Deposition of Officer Mosqueda, # 6 Exhibit Expert Opinion Report: Joseph J. Stine, # 7 Exhibit Deposition of Mathew Colyer, # 8 Exhibit Expert Opinion Report: Mathew Noedel)(Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE By plaintiffs' to defendants' joint 56.1 Statement of undisputed material facts. (Greenberg, Steven) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.) Modified on 10/10/2014 (ea, ). (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Dana Marie Pesha for presentment of extension of time 152 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/9/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Via email, the parties raised the issue of whether Daubert motions will be briefed separately from the motions in limine. In this case, it makes sense to start the briefing now, in light of the long lead time before trial (might as well make use of it), the potential need to hold a hearing on the motions, and no other reason is preventing Daubert motions (e.g., the partial summary judgment motions do not directly bear on them). Accordingly, any motions to exclude expert testimony shall be filed by 10/14/2014. Responses are due by 10/28/2014. Replies are due by 11/04/2014. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. Plaintiff Colyer's attorney did not appear. With regard to the motions for summary judgment (144, 147), Plaintiffs' responses due 10/09/2014. Defendants' replies due 10/23/2014. Trial set for 02/23/2015 at 9:00 a.m. The proposed pretrial order is due on 01/05/2015, based on the format described in Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures (available on Judge Chang's website). Motion in limine are due on 01/05/2015. Responses to the in-limine motions are due on 01/12/2015. Any replies are due on 01/15/2015. Pretrial conference set for 01/26/2015 at 1:00 p.m. Status hearing set for 12/03/2014 at 8:30 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by R. Mosqueda in support of motion for summary judgment 147 as to Plaintiff Colyer (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 56.1(A)(3) Statement by R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra regarding motion for summary judgment 144 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by G. Sierra in support of motion for summary judgment 144 (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Robert Wade Johnson for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 142 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 9/2/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04-28-14 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, krista_burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2014. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Rudolf Smith for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 138 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/29/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Matthew Colyer to withdraw as attorney with regard to James Baranyk and Emily J. Stine (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. As reported during the hearing, expert discovery is closed and Plaintiff Pinex is voluntarily dismissing the Monell claim against the City with prejudice (only the indemnification claim remains). That claim is dismissed with prejudice. Both individual defendants wish to file partial summary judgment motions. The opening briefs are due by 08/21/2014, which also gives the parties enough time to confer on whether the motions are necessary. Status hearing set to 08/28/2014 at 8:30a.m. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, the status hearing of 07/07/2014 is reset to 9 a.m. The parties must be prepared to discuss the next step following the close of expert discovery, whether it is a settlement referral, dispositive motion schedule, or a trial schedule. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held on Defendants' motion to compel 131 production from Plaintiff Pinex's experts. For the record, co-Plaintiff Colyer joined in the response filed by Pinex. For the reasons stated in open court, the motion is granted in part 131 . By 05/07/2014, as specified in open court, Plaintiffs shall produce the identified documents to Defendants. The status hearing of 07/07/2014 remains as scheduled. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Darius Pinexin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra to compel Plaintiff Pinex to Respond to Defendants' Request for Expert Production 131 (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 04/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, the defense motion to compel 131 is reset to 9 a.m. on 04/28/2014. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Jon Aumann for presentment of motion to compel 131 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/28/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra to compel Plaintiff Pinex to Respond to Defendants' Request for Expert Production (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-O)(Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Subject to the conditions stated, the agreed motion for extension of time to complete discovery 127 is granted to 06/30/2014. In light of the prior delays in completing discovery, and the length of this extension all the way out to the end of June, this extension is final and cannot be extended. All counsel and the experts must immediately set firm dates for any further disclosures and for depositions. At the status hearing following expert discovery, if the parties will be filing dispositive motions on the entirety of the case, then the briefing schedule will call for a 30-day opening brief deadline (so start ordering any transcripts that are needed), unless the parties jointly ask for a settlement conference referral. If no motions will be filed and no referral entered, then the parties must be prepared to set a Fall trial schedule. Status hearing of 04/10/2014 is reset for 7/7/2014 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Jordan Marsh for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 127 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/19/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Jordan Marsh for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 127 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant G. Sierra for extension of time to complete discovery (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. The parties reported on the status of expert discovery; all parties disclosed experts. Any responsive expert reports due by 02/14/2014, as well as Pinex's police-procedure disclosure. The rebuttal report, if any, is due 30 days after the responsive reports are tendered. Expert discovery deadline extended to 04/08/2014. Status hearing set for 04/10/2014 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held on Plaintiff Pinex's amended motion 122 to compel and for extension of time to complete discovery. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's motion is granted as follows: opening expert disclosures and reports (the reconstruction reports and any reports that are not dependent on those reports) for both sides are due 01/15/2014. Any responsive expert reports due 02/14/2014. All expert discovery to be completed by 03/31/2014. Fact discovery is reopened to 12/31/2013 for the limited purposes as stated in open court: on the late-disclosed GPS and tow-truck information. The status hearing of 11/06/2013 is reset for 01/16/2014 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held on Plaintiff Darius Pinex amended motion 122 to compel and for extension of time to complete discovery. Motion number 120 is terminated as moot. For the reasons stated in open court, the motion to compel is entered and continued to 10/30/2013 at 10:30 a.m. The motion for extension of time to complete discovery is entered and continued to 10/30/2013. The November 1, 2013 date for the opening expert disclosures and reports for both sides is stayed and will be reset on 10/30/2013. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 123 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE by City of Chicago, R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra to MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to compel MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex for extension of time to complete discovery Amended 122 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Benson, Victoria) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to compel , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex for extension of time to complete discovery Amended (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Steven Allen Greenberg for presentment of motion to compel 120 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/24/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to compel Electronic Data (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status and motion hearing held on Plaintiff Pinex's joint motion to extend the time for expert disclosures 116 . For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's joint motion 116 is granted as follows: opening expert disclosures and reports for both sides are due 11/01/2013, particularly the "reconstruction" expert, except that opening expert disclosures and reports on use-of-force and pathology are due on 12/02/2013. Any responsive expert report due 01/06/2014. All expert discovery to be completed by 02/20/2014, so start scheduling expert deposition dates as far in advance as needed to take depositions between 01/06/2014 and 02/20/2014. Status hearing set for 11/06/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Hearing held on Plaintiff's motion to depose Adriana Sierra 106 . For the reasons stated in open court, the motion 106 is granted in part. Adriana Sierra may be questioned about her observations of Defendant Sierra on the day he left for the shift during which the shooting occurred, and the day he returned. Adriana Sierra (as well as Defendant Sierra, for the follow-up discovery) shall sit for their depositions by 11/18/2013. By 10/03/2013, the City shall turn over to Plaintiffs' attorneys a copy of the digital photos taken by the evidence technicians. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 118 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE by G. Sierra to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Matthew Colyer 106 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Benson, Victoria) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Steven Allen Greenberg for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 116 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 9/19/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex for extension of time to complete discovery (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07-22-2013 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, krista_burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2013. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 09/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07-03-2013 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, krista_burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2013. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 09/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 06-27-2013 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, krista_burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2013. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 09/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: No court appearance required on September 4, 2013, Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On Plaintiff's motion to depose Adriana Sierra 106 , Defendants may respond on or before 09/17/2013. No reply is needed. Motion hearing is continued to the previously set 10/10/2013 status hearing. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the remainder of Plaintiff's motion to compel 86 concerning mental health of Defendant Sierra, the Court has reviewed Defendants' sealed response, R. 105, and concludes that the 06/21/2012 letter and evaluation summary and the 08/07/2012 physical-exam report are discoverable. Both documents were disclosed beyond the psychotherapist-patient setting, specifically, to the Chicago Police Department. That does not mean, however, that psychotherapist-patient communications are discoverable. Given the limited disclosure of the documents to the CPD, those communications are still privileged, so long as not disclosed beyond the psychotherapist-patient setting. But Plaintiffs are entitled to the documents and to question Sierra about what was causing the stress. The time gap between what is described in the documents and the shooting in this case is not so distant as to sap this information's relevancy, and indeed one of the documents refers to the shooting (along with other shootings). Defendants shall disclose the documents by 09/10/2013, governed strictly by the protective order over discovery.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS Report as to DISCOVERY by Darius Pinex (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Darius Pinex Progress of Discovery (Fine, Steven) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by James M. Baranyk for presentment of Sealed motion 106 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 9/4/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Matthew Colyer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baranyk, James) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Benson, Victoria) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: At the 07/03/2013 motion hearing, the Court granted Defendant Sierra's motion to quash the deposition 83 of his spouse. See R. 91. The ruling was based on the spousal-testimonial privilege, which the Court had raised at a prior hearing and on which Sierra filed a supplemental brief, R. 89. At the 07/03/2013 motion hearing, Plaintiff Colyer's counsel candidly stated that he could not point to an exception to the spousal testimonial privilege, so the motion to quash was granted. But there is an exception that the Court overlooked and came across recently in another case: the spousal testimonial privilege applies only in criminal--not civil--cases. See United States v. Brock, -- F.3d --, 2013 WL 3887091 (7th Cir. July 30, 2013) (no pinpoint pagination is yet available). Plaintiffs may file a motion to re-open discovery as to Sierra's spouse, but the motion should address the specific proposed lines of questioning and the discoverability of those specific lines of questioning. The motion is due on or before 08/26/2013. Plaintiff should also consider, in deciding whether to seek reopening of the discovery on Sierra's spouse, that the marital-communications privilege does apply in civil cases. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Upon review of the filings of the City and Defendant Sierra, the Court has ordered (in a separate, under-seal and ex-parte entry) further filing and information from the City and Sierra. To track this issue, a status hearing is set for 09/04/2013 at 9:30 a.m. The parties should call in advance of that status hearing to determine whether they need to appear at it. The in-court status hearing of 10/10/2013 remains as scheduled. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 101 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE Pursuant to Court's July 22, 2013 Order (Benson, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant G. Sierra (Marsh, Jordan) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held on various motions [86, 94, 97]. With regard to Plaintiff's motion to compel 86 , by 07/29/2013, the City and Sierra shall file, ex parte and under seal for in camera review, a response to the discovery that discloses as to Defendant Sierra: (1) any alcohol abuse evaluation or treatment; (2) mental health screening, evaluation, or treatment during his employment with the Chicago Police Department; (3) any mental health counseling or guidance he received after any of his shooting incidents; and (4) any anger management evaluation or treatment that he received. If there are disclosures of any of that information, then the response also shall explain, in detail, the context of the evaluation and treatment, as well as whether the privacy expectation was undermined by disclosure of the prognosis or result of the evaluation or treatment to someone other than Sierra. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendant's motion for extension of time to complete discovery 94 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs may depose IPRA Investigator Galindo and Officer Alvarado. As discussed in open court, Defendants' motion 97 to bar is denied without prejudice. Reports from retained experts for both sides due 10/07/2013. Any responsive expert report due 11/06/2013. All expert discovery to be completed by 01/22/2014. The status hearing of 07/31/2013 will remain for tracking purposes only, no court appearance will be required on 07/31/2013. In-court status hearing set for 10/10/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Dana Marie Pesha for presentment of motion to bar 97 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/23/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendants R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra to bar Plaintiffs' Rule 404(b) Witnesses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Matthew Colyer to sealed response, 93 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Matthew Colyer TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SIERRA TO ANSWER QUESTIONS AND PROVIDE CERTAIN DISCOVERY 86 (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Victoria Rose Benson for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 94 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/22/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Benson, Victoria) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for extension of time to complete discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Benson, Victoria) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE by City of Chicago, G. Sierra to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Matthew Colyer TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SIERRA TO ANSWER QUESTIONS AND PROVIDE CERTAIN DISCOVERY 86 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Benson, Victoria) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darius Pinex by Steven H. Fine (Fine, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated during the hearing, Defendant Sierras motion for protective order and to quash notice of deposition of Sierra's spouse 83 is granted. Defendant Sierras response to Plaintiffs motion to compel Defendant Sierra to answer questions and provide certain discovery 86 is due on or before 7/10/2013. Reply is due on or before 7/17/2013. Status hearing set for 7/31/2013 at 8:30 a.m. to stand. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to motion for protective order 83 , supplement 89 Amended Supplement to Motion To Quash (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to motion for protective order 83 To Quash Deposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held on Defendant Officer Sierra's motion for protective order and to quash notice of deposition 83 . By 07/01/2013, Defendant shall supplement the motion 83 to report whether Mrs. Sierra will be asserting, in addition to the marital communications privilege, the spousal/marital testimonial privilege (if so, an under-oath declaration from her must be filed). Hearing on the motion 83 is continued to 07/03/2013 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel reported that Plaintiff will be filing a motion to compel. Plaintiff shall notice the motion for presentment to coincide with the 07/03/2013 motion hearing. Defendant may concisely respond by 07/02/2013 to Plaintiff's motion to compel, but the Court will also consider giving more time for a fuller response. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by James M. Baranyk for presentment of Sealed motion 86 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/3/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Matthew Colyer TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SIERRA TO ANSWER QUESTIONS AND PROVIDE CERTAIN DISCOVERY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baranyk, James) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Victoria Rose Benson (Benson, Victoria) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Dana Marie Pesha for presentment of motion for protective order 83 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/27/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 06/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant G. Sierra for protective order And To Quash Notice of Deposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 06/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Emily J. Stine of Change of Address (Stine, Emily) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Robert Wade Johnson of Change of Address (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Christopher Rudolf Smith of Change of Address (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Amanda C Antholt of Change of Address (Antholt, Amanda) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by James M. Baranyk of Change of Address (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff Coyler's motion to compel Defendant City of Chicago (via IPRA) to produce certain document 68 is granted in part: IPRA shall produce the 1044135 and the 1042532 files. As directed by the Court, the City to produce the documents to Plaintiff by the close of business on June 3, 2013, attorney's and expert's eyes only. Status hearing set for July 31, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by Darius Pinex to response in opposition to motion, 73 (Corrected) (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by Plaintiff Matthew Colyer to Sealed motion 68 , response in opposition to motion, 73 (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by Darius Pinex to the independent police review authority response to motions to compel 73 (Greenberg, Steven) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks' on 5/29/2013) (vcf, ). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Independent Police Review Authorityin Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Matthew Coyler to compel 68 , MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to compel discovery 66 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Payette, Derek) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Independent Police Review Authority by Derek B. Payette (Payette, Derek) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held on Plaintiffs' motions [66, 68] to compel discovery. As explained in detail during the hearing, Defendants' full and complete response to the motions to compel are due 05/23/13. Plaintiffs' replies are due 05/28/13. Status hearing set for May 30, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. The Clerk' s Office is directed to correct the spelling of Plaintiff's last name: the correct spelling of Plaintiff's last name is Colyer. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Jonathan Clark Green (Green, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by James M. Baranyk for presentment of Sealed motion 68 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/9/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Matthew Coyler to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Baranyk, James) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Steven Allen Greenberg for presentment of motion to compel 66 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/9/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex to compel discovery (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. The parties reported on the status of discovery. The progress of discovery has been unreasonably slow. On 01/17/13, the Court granted a second extension of discovery to 06/03/13, yet depositions supposedly cannot be finished by that date, for no good cause. And the parties did not bother to file an extension motion before appearing for today's status hearing (this Court's case management procedures require written motions for discovery extensions (see Motion Practice section on the Court's website)). Plaintiffs will be filing a motion to compel IPRA to produce the investigative file. That motion too should have been filed much earlier, if conferral did not resolve the issue. In any event, just to avoid the mockery of a discovery period ending without one of the defendants not being deposed, fact discovery is extended to 07/18/13. No more extensions. The parties must start lining up any experts now; the parties are forewarned that the Court will set an expert disclosure date of around 30 to 45 days after the close of fact discovery. Status hearing set for 06/27/13 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The status hearing of 04/24/13 is reset to 05/01/13 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status and hearing held on Plaintiff Pinex's motion to extend discovery and for the Court to set no final deadline 60 . For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's motion 60 is denied without prejudice. All overdue discovery responses are due by 03/27/13. The parties must bring to a head any discovery disputes, whether it is with each other or non-parties, and if that means serving formal discovery requests or subpoenas, then those shall be served promptly. Status hearing set for 04/24/13 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant G. Sierra by Dana Marie Pesha (Pesha, Dana) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Steven Allen Greenberg for presentment of before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/20/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiff Darius Pinex for extension of time to complete discovery and to not set a further cutoff or deadline (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion by Attorney Michael J. A. Pasquinelli to withdraw his appearance on behalf of the Defendant, Officer Sierra is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Michael J. A. Pasquinelli for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 57 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/20/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Pasquinelli, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by counsel for Defendant G. Sierra to withdraw as attorney (Pasquinelli, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/4/2013:Mailed notice(slb, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant City of Chicago's agreed motion 53 to enter protective order is granted. The tracking status hearing of 02/06/13 is vacated and the 03/20/13 status hearing at 8:30 a.m. remains in place.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Colin B White for presentment of motion for protective order 53 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/6/2013 at 08:30 AM. (White, Colin) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for protective order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit)(White, Colin) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held and continued to 03/20/13 at 8:30 a.m. The parties reported on the progress of discovery, which has been too slow. But the Court extends the fact discovery deadline from 03/04/13 to 06/03/13. There shall be no more extensions to that deadline absent extraordinary circumstances. The parties shall confer and resolve any disputes concerning the protective order by 01/24/13. On or before 01/28/13, the City shall file the motion for entry of a protective order. If there are still disputes, then Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion on or before 02/04/13. Status hearing to track a ruling on the protective order is set for 02/06/13 at 9:00 a.m.; the parties need not appear for that hearing.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant G. Sierra by Jordan E. Marsh (Marsh, Jordan) (Linked document has the incorrect case number.)Modified by Clerk's Office on 1/17/2013 (mgh, ). (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Darius Pinex (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darius Pinex by Lisa T Damico (Damico, Lisa) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by George John Yamin, Jr (Yamin, George) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. With regard to the Pinex case, Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due 11/27/12. The fact discovery cutoff date of 02/01/13 is extended to 03/04/13, for both cases. The deadline includes treating physicians. Status hearing set for 01/17/13 at 8:30 a.m.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant G. Sierra by Michael J. A. Pasquinelli (Pasquinelli, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by G. Sierra (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Pasquinelli, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses as to Plaintiff Pinex by R. Mosqueda(Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by City of Chicago re answer to complaint 42 (Yamin, George) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Chicago(Yamin, George) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status and motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendants' motion 34 to reassign case number 12 C 7471 to this Court is granted. Plaintiff's counsel shall electronically file a copy of the complaint in 12 C 7471 on the docket in this case. Any attorney in the Pinez case who does not have an appearance on file in this case shall promptly file their appearance in 12 C 4855. On or before 10/23/12, Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the Pinex complaint. Status hearing set for 11/06/12 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will administratively terminate case 12 C 7471, and all filings will be made in 12 C 4855. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  by Darius Pinex Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darius Pinex by Steven Allen Greenberg (Greenberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First AMENDED complaint by Matthew Coyler against R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra (Stine, Emily) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: By agreement of the parties, hearing reset to 10/02/12 at 9:00 a.m on the motion to reassign 12-cv-7141 34 . Status hearing reset to 10/02/12 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiff Colyer's unopposed motion to file first amended complaint 32 is granted. The motion to reassign 12-cv-7471 34 will likely be granted, but shall be heard at 9:30 a.m. to coincide with the previously-scheduled 09/26/12 status in 12-cv-4855. Counsel in 12-cv-4855 shall notify Plaintiff Pinex's counsel in 12-cv-7471 as to the time of the status/motion hearing. If Pinex's counsel is not available at that time, then the parties shall call the courtroom deputy to reschedule the status/motion hearing for a date this week or next week. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Jon Aumann for presentment of motion to reassign case 34 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 9/26/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendants R. Mosqueda, G. Sierra to reassign case number 12 CV 7471 (related case) to this Court AGREED (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Case 12 CV 7471)(Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Emily J. Stine for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief 32 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 9/26/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Stine, Emily) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Matthew Coyler to amend/correct complaint 1 UNOPPOSED (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stine, Emily) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiff's counsel called the courtroom deputy and reported that Plaintiff does not object to the dismissal of the complaint as to the City of Chicago. In light of that concession, and the lack of factual allegations of a municipal policy required for liability under 42 U.S.C. 1983, Defendant Chicago's motion to dismiss 28 is granted. The City of Chicago is dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant Sierra's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by G. Sierra(Pasquinelli, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Colin B White for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 28 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/22/2012 at 08:30 AM. (White, Colin) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (White, Colin) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by R. Mosqueda(Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant City of Chicago's motion to substitute counsel 22 and motion to withdraw appearance 24 are granted: Colin White is now counsel of record for the City, while Michael Pasquinelli's appearance for the City is terminated. Mr. Pasquinelli continues to be counsel of record for Defendant Sierra. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Michael J. A. Pasquinelli for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 24 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/21/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Pasquinelli, Michael) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by counsel for Defendant City of Chicago to withdraw as attorney of record (Pasquinelli, Michael) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Colin B White for presentment of motion to substitute attorney 22 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/21/2012 at 08:30 AM. (White, Colin) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago to substitute attorney (White, Colin) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Colin B White (White, Colin) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion and status hearing held. Defendants' motions for an extension of time to 08/17/12 to answer or otherwise plead [R. 13 and R. 17] is granted. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due 08/30/12. Fact discovery (which includes discovery related to treating physicians) to be completed by 02/01/13. Status hearing set for 09/26/12 at 9:30 a.m. If possible, the parties should try to sequence discovery in a way to get to a settlement conference as soon as practicable.Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Michael J. A. Pasquinelli for presentment of extension of time 17 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/2/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Pasquinelli, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, G. Sierra for extension of time to Answer or otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (Pasquinelli, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Chicago, G. Sierra by Michael J. A. Pasquinelli (Pasquinelli, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The status hearing of 07/25/12 is reset to 08/02/12 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Jon Aumann for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 13 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/2/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant R. Mosqueda for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint UNOPPOSED (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant R. Mosqueda by Thomas Jon Aumann (Aumann, Thomas) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing set for July 25, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached order at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, ) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Coyler as to City of Chicago on 6/22/2012, answer due 7/13/2012. (Antholt, Amanda) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Coyler as to R. Mosqueda on 6/22/2012, answer due 7/13/2012. (Antholt, Amanda) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Coyler as to G. Sierra on 6/22/2012, answer due 7/13/2012. (Antholt, Amanda) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Coyler by James M. Baranyk (Baranyk, James) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Coyler by Robert Wade Johnson (Johnson, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Coyler by Christopher Rudolf Smith (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Coyler by Emily J. Stine (Stine, Emily) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Coyler by Amanda C Antholt (Antholt, Amanda) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL Cover Sheet (Antholt, Amanda) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Coyler; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7268857.(Antholt, Amanda) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 980 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?