Joann Anderson et al v. Hyundai Motor Company Ltd et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-01842

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 20, 2016 at 9:05 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jerome Jeffries, Plaintiff
No Logo Joanne Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by casperfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ari S Casper +1 410 989 5097 +1 410 630 7776 acasper@casperfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steve William Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hagens-berman.com
Space Elaine T Byszewski +1 213 330 7150 +1 213 330 7152 elaine@hbsslaw.com
Space Sean Russell Matt +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 sean@hagens-berman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stein, Mitchell & Mezines, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Kovner +1 202 737 7777 +1 202 296 8312 rkovner@steinmitchell.com
No Logo TERRI HILL, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Hyundai Motor America, Defendant
No Logo Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karis Ann-Yu Chi +1 310 201 2100 kac@birdmarella.com
Space Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
Space Michelle C Tam +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 mct@birdmarella.com
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Strike
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, having considered the motion to withdraw Stein Mitchell Muse & Cipollone, LLP 55 , hereby GRANTS the motion. Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and The Casper Firm, LLC continue to be counsel of record for Plaintiffs. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendant Hyundai Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint 44 , Defendant Hyundai Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint 45 , and Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Stein Mitchell Muse & Cipollone, LLP 55 presently scheduled for hearing on June 27, 2014, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/24/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
          REPLY in further support of MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint 44 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company Ltd. (Chi, Karis) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On the Court's own motion, Defendant Hyundai Motor Companys Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint 44 and Defendant Hyundai Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint 45 presently set for June 20, 2014 are hereby continued to June 27, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/28/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Stein Mitchell Muse & Cipollone LLP to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw Stein Mitchell Muse & Cipollone LLP filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matt, Sean) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ekwan E Rhow counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company Ltd. Changing Firm Name to Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C.. Filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. and Hyundai Motor America. (Attorney Ekwan E Rhow added to party Hyundai Motor Company Ltd(pty:dft))(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Karis Ann-Yu Chi counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company Ltd. Changing Firm Name to Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C.. Filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd and Hyundai Motor America. (Chi, Karis) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                    OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Class Allegations and Portions of Amended Class Action Complaint 45 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Hyundai Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                      OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint 44 Plaintiff's Opposition to Hyundai Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michelle C Tam on behalf of Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company Ltd (Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER RE STIPULATION TO SET HEARING AND BRIEFING FOR HYUNDAI CO. RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation 48 , it is hereby ordered that the hearing on Hyundai Co.'s Motion to Dismiss 44 and Motion to Strike 45 is hereby continued to 6/20/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Plaintiffs shall file and serve their opposition to the Hyundai Co.'s Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike on or before 5/9/2014. Hyundai Co. shall file and serve its reply briefs in support of the Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike on or before 6/6/2014. (gk) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation re: Hearing and Briefing For Hyundai Co. Response to Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matt, Sean) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karis Ann-Yu Chi counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company Ltd. Filed by defendants Hyundai Motor Company and Hyundai Motor America. (Attorney Karis Ann-Yu Chi added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney Karis Ann-Yu Chi added to party Hyundai Motor Company Ltd(pty:dft))(Chi, Karis) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor Company Ltd. (Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Class Allegations and Portions of Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor Company Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 5/30/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor Company Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 5/30/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                      OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof 28 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Hyundai Motor America's Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Steve W. Berman filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendant Hyundai Motor Americas Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Portions of Amended Class Action Complaint 27 and Defendant Hyundai Motor Americas Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint 28 presently scheduled for hearing on April 11, 2014 is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motions is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                          REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Its Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                            Evidentiary Objection In Support re: MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof 28 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                              REPLY In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof 28 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Its Reply In Support of Its Motion To Strike Class Allegations and Portions of Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY in Support of MOTION to Strike Class Allegations and Portions of Amended Class Action Complaint 27 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Sean R Matt attorney for Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. Changing firm name to The Casper Firm, LLC and address to One South Street, 27th Floor, Baltimore, MD 21202. Filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Matt, Sean) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                      OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Class Allegations and Portions of Amended Class Action Complaint 27 filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Hyundai's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof 28 filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Berman, Steve) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                          OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof 28 filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company Ltd.(Attorney Michelle C Tam added to party Hyundai Motor Company Ltd(pty:dft))(Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, identifying Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd., Joann Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Defendant Hyundai Motor America's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Portions of Amended Class Action Complaint filed 2/11/2014 27 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Class Allegations and Portions of Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Michelle C Tam added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Tam, Michelle) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Hyundai America shall file and serve its response to the Amended Complaint on or before February 11, 2014. Plaintiffs shall file and serve their opposition to any motions filed by Hyundai America in response to the Amended Complaint on or before March 11, 2014. Defendants shall file and serve their reply in support of any motions filed by Hyundai America in response to the Amended Complaint on or before March 25, 2014. The hearing on any motions filed by Hyundai America in response to the Amended Complaint will be noticed for April 11, 2014 at 9:30 a.m., re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 23 (bp) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          DECLARATION of Sean R. Matt Regarding Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, and Jerome Jeffries. (gk) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffriesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines,, 21 (bp) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule for Response to Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matt, Sean) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. and Hyundai Motor America; amending Complaint 1 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, and Jerome Jeffries. (gk) (gk). (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Plaintiffs have failed to adequately allege the existence of diversity jurisdiction. Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall file their response by no later than 1/24/2014. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Motor America.(Attorney Ekwan E Rhow added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 14 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ronald Kovner on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Elaine T. Byszewski as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ari S. Casper on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Elaine T. Byszewski as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sean R. Matt on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Elaine T. Byszewski as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steve W. Berman on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Elaine T. Byszewski as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/25/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kirstin Edralin, Corporate Operations Specialist of CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Hyundai Motor America, a California Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Ronald Kovner to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13066930 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice - Ronald Kovner)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Ari S. Casper to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13066889 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice - Ari S. Casper)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Sean R. Matt to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13066775 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice - Sean R. Matt)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      APPLICATION for attorney Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13066724 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice - Steve W. Berman)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: PILOT PROJECT RE SEALED DOCUMENTS by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (ms) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (ms) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Ronald Kovner for Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Ari S Casper for Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Sean R Matt for Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Steve W Berman for Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company Ltd. (et) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company Ltd. Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Joanne Anderson, Terri Hill, Jerome Jeffries. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 43 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?