O'Hara v. Florida Department of Corrections
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00254

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 6:52 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mary O'Hara, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jason L. Harr, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason L. Harr +1 386 226 4866 +1 386 226 4886 jasonharr@harrlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah James Prosser +1 386 226 4866 +1 386 226 4886 noahprosser@harrlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Siboni & Buchanan, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paige A. Bitter +1 352 629 7441 +1 352 629 7745 pbitter@sbtrial-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B. Buchanan +1 352 629 7441 +1 352 629 4516 rbuchanan@sbtrial-law.com
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Response
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Produce
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Produce
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of mediation conference/hearing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                      CASE REFERRED to Mediation; Gregory P. Miles appointed as Mediator. See Case Management and Scheduling Order 17 . (JET) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/13/2014. (TKW) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                          CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Buchanan, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER to strike re: 14 Case Management Report from the record inasmuch as it is not signed by the parties. The parties are directed to refile a properly-signed Case Management Report by May 22, 2014. Also, the parties are reminded to comply with Local Rule 1.05(d) when signing the Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/12/2014. (TKW) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                              (STRICKEN PER 15 ORDER) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Buchanan, Robert) Modified on 5/12/2014 (JET). (This document has no attorney signatures.) Modified on 5/13/2014 (JEV). (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 2 Complaint by Florida Department of Corrections.(Buchanan, Robert) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER by Florida Department of Corrections. (Buchanan, Robert) Modified on 3/3/2014 (IGC). (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 by Florida Department of Corrections. Related case(s): yes (Buchanan, Robert) Modified on 3/3/2014 (IGC). (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ENDORSED ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 4 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/26/2014. (Presnell, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 7 Interested persons order by Mary O'Hara. (Harr, Jason) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mary O'Hara. Related case(s): yes (Harr, Jason) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/5/2014. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/19/2014. Copies mailed.(LAM) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/5/2014. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/19/2014. Copies mailed.(LAM) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Mary O'Hara. (Harr, Jason) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , or, in the alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Florida Department of Corrections. (Buchanan, Robert) Modified on 2/18/2014 (JET). (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    RETURN of service executed on 01/16/2014 as to Florida Department of Corrections. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT) (SR) Modified on 2/18/2014 to correct filing date (JET). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by Mary O'Hara against Florida Department of Corrections with Jury Demand (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/6/14). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(SR) Modified on 2/18/2014 to correct filing date (JET). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Florida Department of Corrections from Volusia County, FL, case number 2014-30021-CICI filed in State Court on 01/06/2014. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number Orl-31700.(SR) Modified on 2/18/2014 to correct filing date (JET). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?