Williams-Evans v. Methodist Medical Center of Illinois
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01318-MMM-JAG
District Judge Michael M. Mihm, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shiphrah Williams-Evans, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Methodist Medical Center of Illinois, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D Erf +1 312 372 2000 +1 312 984 7700 serf@mwe.com
Space Benjamin J Hanauer +1 312 984 7637 +1 312 984 7700 bhanauer@mwe.com
Office Peoria
Filed 12/18/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Peoria
Terminated 3/14/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12, 15, CLOSED, PROSE, REFER
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Remark
Remark: TEXT order entered 3/14/2007 mailed to pro se pla. Also mailed to conventioal filing Attorney with ECF Notice. (CL, ilcd)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Remark
    Remark: civil case terminated (HK, ilcd)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Order on Motion to Dismiss
      TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [5] Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Case. As Defendant has indicated that it has no opposition to this request, the Motion to Dismiss is granted and this action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. The clerk's office is directed to close this case. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 03/14/07. (MMM2, ilcd)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Response to Motion
        RESPONSE to Motion re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Methodist Medical Center of Illinois. (Erf, Stephen)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Order Striking/Vacating Document
          TEXT ONLY ORDER STRIKING/VACATING DOCUMENT: On 3/8/2007, document #6 Response to Motion was filed by Methodist Medical Center of Illinois without the signature of the filing attorney. Document #6 is accordingly STRICKEN. Counsel is ordered to re-file this document with proper signature pursuant to Administrative Procedures. Entered by Judge John A. Gorman on 3/9/2007. (CL, ilcd)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007, Terminated: 3/9/2007 Response to Motion
            DOCUMENT STRICKEN: RESPONSE to Motion re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Methodist Medical Center of Illinois. (Erf, Stephen) Modified on 3/9/2007 (CL, ilcd).
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007, Terminated: 3/14/2007 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION to Dismiss filed as motion to withdraw case by Plaintiff Shiphrah Williams-Evans.Responses due by 3/26/2007 (HK, ilcd)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Remark
                Remark: NEF -TEXT order granting extension of time to answer, mailed to pro se plaintiff by Clerk/labels produced (CL, ilcd)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007, Terminated: 2/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Agreed) by Defendant Methodist Medical Center of Illinois.Responses due by 3/5/2007 (Erf, Stephen)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                    NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Stephen D Erf on behalf of Methodist Medical Center of Illinois (Erf, Stephen)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                      TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Methodist Medical Center of Illinois' answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 3/9/2007. Entered by Judge John A. Gorman on 2/16/07. (JB, ilcd)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Request for Waiver of Service and Notice of Lawsui
                        REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to W. Michael Bryant for Methodist Medical Center of Illinois on 12/18/06 by Shiphrah Williams-Evans. (SM, ilcd)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against Methodist Medical Center of Illinois (Filing fee $ 350.), filed by Shiphrah Williams-Evans.(SM, ilcd)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Filing Fee Received
                            Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number P01772 (CL, ilcd)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 1,025 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?