Babbage Holdings, LLC v. Capcom U.S.A., Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00751

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 11:52 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Babbage Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Chase Callahan +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 scallahan@ccrglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Matthew Garza +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 agarza@ccrglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ujaala Rashid +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 urashid@ccrglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin C. Robson, III +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 mrobson@ccrglaw.com
v.
No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
      USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER granting motion to voluntarily dismiss petition for writ of mandamus. The petition is dismissed. Each party will bear its own costs. The stay of the district court proceedings is lifted. All pending motions are moot re USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Case No. 15-104. (tkd, ) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                ORDER of USCA FEDERAL CIRCUIT for Temporary Injunction Pending Appeal. Proceedings before the district court, including the December 1, 2014 Markman hearing, are temporarily stayed pending this court's consideration of the papers submitted (per curiam) re USCA case 15-104. (tkd, ) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Additional Attachments to Main Document: 52 MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) .. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/15/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) by Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/28/2014. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR,CRR.) (jml) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                        SEALED RESPONSE by Babbage Holdings, LLC to 42 Memorandum & Opinion, Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions,,,,,, filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Seal Response to Show Cause Order by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Response to Show Cause Order by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal their reply in support of their motions to transfer venue. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/20/14. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 29 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/15/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE( Show Cause Hearing set for 5/28/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.), Motions granting: 25 MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's First Amended Complaints Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., denies-as-moot 13 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/14/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/13/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/13/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California by Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 34 Motion to Seal Response to Dft's Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 33 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER -the above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:13-CV-749. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/18/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California (Unopposed) by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's First Amended Complaints Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California by Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18-1, # 19 Exhibit 18-2, # 20 Exhibit 18-3, # 21 Exhibit 18-4, # 22 Exhibit 18-5, # 23 Exhibit 18-6, # 24 Exhibit 18-7, # 25 Exhibit 18-8, # 26 Exhibit 18-9, # 27 Exhibit 18-10, # 28 Exhibit 18-11, # 29 Exhibit 18-12, # 30 Exhibit 18-13, # 31 Exhibit 18-14, # 32 Exhibit 19, # 33 Exhibit 20, # 34 Exhibit 21, # 35 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's First Amended Complaints Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. . (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's First Amended Complaints Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 23 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/23/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's First Amended Complaints Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement by Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Sealed Document. Defendants' Supplemental Notice of Interested Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by Babbage Holdings, LLC of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Babbage Holdings, LLC re 20 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) Modified on 1/8/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Rashid, Ujaala) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT , First against All Defendants, filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Megan J Redmond on behalf of Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4461493. (Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark Christopher Lang on behalf of Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4461376. (Lang, Mark) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul R Hart on behalf of Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4460985. (Hart, Paul) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric A Buresh on behalf of Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4460903. (Buresh, Eric) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ujaala Rashid on behalf of Babbage Holdings, LLC (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement by Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Babbage Holdings, LLC of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Request for Injunction (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Babbage Holdings, LLC of Related Cases (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc..( Marriott, Michelle) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc..( Marriott, Michelle) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Capcom Entertainment, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Capcom USA Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Chase Callahan on behalf of Babbage Holdings, LLC (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4327386.), filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?