Babbage Holdings, LLC v. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00764

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 11:54 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Babbage Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Chase Callahan +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 scallahan@ccrglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Matthew Garza +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 agarza@ccrglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ujaala Rashid +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 urashid@ccrglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin C. Robson, III +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 mrobson@ccrglaw.com
v.
No Logo 2k Games, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo 2ksports, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Rockstar Games, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Take-two Interactive Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
    USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER granting motion to voluntarily dismiss petition for writ of mandamus filed by petitioners Take-Two Interactive Software Inc, Rockstar Games Inc, 2KSports Inc and 2K Games Inc. The petition is dismissed. Each party will bear its own costs. The stay of the district court proceedings is lifted. All pending motions are moot re USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Case No. 15-107. (tkd, ) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
        ORDER of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT for temporary injunction pending appeal. Proceedings before the district court, including the December 1, 2014 Markman hearing are temporarily stayed pending this court's consideration of the papers submitted (per curiam) re USCA case 15-107. (tkd, ) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                          FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Additional Attachments to Main Document: 52 MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) .. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/15/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                            FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/15/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                SEALED RESPONSE by Babbage Holdings, LLC to 42 Memorandum & Opinion, Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions,,, filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Seal Response to Show Cause Order by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Response to Show Cause Order by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 45 DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/21/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/16/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 30 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California. Replies due by 5/19/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/16/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE( Show Cause Hearing set for 5/28/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.), Motions granting: 26 MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's First Amended Complaints Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by 2KSports, Inc., 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/14/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/13/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 36 Motion to Seal Document 35 Sealed Response to Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/13/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 35 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 30 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit, # 43 Exhibit, # 44 Exhibit)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:13-CV-749. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/19/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 32 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Motions to Transfer Venue. Responses due by 3/20/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/07/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's First Amended Complaints Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18-1, # 19 Exhibit 18-2, # 20 Exhibit 18-3, # 21 Exhibit 18-4, # 22 Exhibit 18-5, # 23 Exhibit 18-6, # 24 Exhibit 18-7, # 25 Exhibit 18-8, # 26 Exhibit 18-9, # 27 Exhibit 18-10, # 28 Exhibit 18-11, # 29 Exhibit 18-12, # 30 Exhibit 18-13, # 31 Exhibit 18-14, # 32 Exhibit 19, # 33 Exhibit 20, # 34 Exhibit 21, # 35 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's First Amended Complaints Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's First Amended Complaints Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 24 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's First Amended Complaints Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Sealed Document. Defendants' Supplemental Notice of Interested Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE by Babbage Holdings, LLC of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/8/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE by Babbage Holdings, LLC re 20 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT , First against All Defendants, filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Megan J Redmond on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4461534. (Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark Christopher Lang on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4461432. (Lang, Mark) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul R Hart on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4461310. (Hart, Paul) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric A Buresh on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4460966. (Buresh, Eric) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ujaala Rashid on behalf of Babbage Holdings, LLC (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Babbage Holdings, LLC's Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE by Babbage Holdings, LLC of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Request for Injunction (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Babbage Holdings, LLC of Related Cases (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..( Marriott, Michelle) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..( Marriott, Michelle) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to 2K Games, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 2KSports Inc, # 2 Rockstar Games Inc, # 3 Take-Two Interactive Software Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Chase Callahan on behalf of Babbage Holdings, LLC (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4333473.), filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?