Anne McVicar et al v. Goodman Manufacturing Company LP et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-01223
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 19, 2016 at 8:30 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Andrea Gross, Plaintiff
No Logo Anne McVicar, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Audet +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 waudet@audetlaw.com
Space Joshua Caleb Ezrin +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 jezrin@audetlaw.com
Space Jonas Palmer Mann +1 415 982 1776 +1 415 568 2556 jmann@audetlaw.com
No Logo Archie McVicar, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeffrey Gross, Plaintiff
No Logo Rich Harlan, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Farmer, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Audet +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 waudet@audetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Goodman Company, LP, Defendant
No Logo Goodman Global, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Joseph Bedell, Jr. +1 216 586 3939 +1 216 579 0212 rjbedell@jonesday.com
Space Louis A Chaiten +1 216 586 7311 +1 216 579 0212 lachaiten@jonesday.com
Space Richard J Grabowski +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 rgrabowski@jonesday.com
Space Theodore M. Grossman +1 216 586 7268 +1 216 579 0212 tgrossman@jonesday.com
Space Elizabeth Gene Myers +1 832 239 3939 +1 832 239 3600 egmyers@jonesday.com
Space Sharyl Reisman +1 212 755 7306 sareisman@jonesday.com
Space John A. Vogt +1 949 553 7516 +1 949 553 7539 javogt@jonesday.com
No Logo Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP, Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (164) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Exclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Seal (to seal document)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Amended Minutes
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Exclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Exclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None For Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Certify Class Action
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Certify Class Action
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Certify Class Action
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Amended Document (Non-Motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
Joint STIPULATION to Strike Response in Opposition to Motion 83 filed by Plaintiff Robert Farmer, Andrea Gross, Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Discovery Conference held before Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 60 . The Court sets the matter for a further discovery conference on October 7, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. See minute order for more information. Discovery Conference set for 10/7/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block.Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (twdb) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Motion to Compel 60 Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block: The Court sets the matter for a further discovery conference on September 30, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. and orders both sides counsel to return on that date and time unless plaintiffs counsel advises the crd in the interim that the discovery dispute underlying this Motion has been completely resolved and there is no need for a further discovery conference at this juncture. Discovery Conference set for 9/30/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block.Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (twdb) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 , Amended Complaint, 42 , filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Archie McVicar, Andrea Gross, Anne McVicar, Robert Farmer (Audet, William) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 71 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Elizabeth Myers on behalf of defendants, designating John Vogt as local counsel. (ak) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint, 42 filed by Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vogt, John) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 66 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons explained above, the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Goodman's Motion to Dismiss. The Court orders the following: (see document for details). (dro) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Motion Related Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Vacating and taking under advisement 60 Motion to Compel. (twdb) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Discovery 60 filed by Plaintiffs Robert Farmer, Andrea Gross, Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonas P. Mann in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses)(Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANTS IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Discovery 60 filed by Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Vogt, John) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of CHRISTOPHER M. MCLAUGHLIN IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Discovery 60 filed by Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Vogt, John) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Discovery filed by Plaintiff Robert Farmer, Andrea Gross, Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. Motion set for hearing on 7/21/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Statement Regarding Motion to Compel, # 2 Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel)(Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Vacating Hearing and taking under advisement 48 Motion to Dismiss. (twdb) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joshua C Ezrin on behalf of Plaintiffs Robert Farmer, Andrea Gross, Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar (Attorney Joshua C Ezrin added to party Robert Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua C Ezrin added to party Andrea Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua C Ezrin added to party Jeffrey Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua C Ezrin added to party Rich Harlan(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua C Ezrin added to party Anne McVicar(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua C Ezrin added to party Archie McVicar(pty:pla))(Ezrin, Joshua) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Amended First Consolidated Complaint 48 filed by Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Vogt, John) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Amended First Consolidated Complaint 48 (Amended) filed by Plaintiffs Robert Farmer, Andrea Gross, Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. (Audet, William) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block, re Stipulation for Protective Order 54 . (twdb) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Robert Farmer, Andrea Gross, Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Continuing Hearing Date on Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion To Dismiss 49 . ( Motion hearing continued to 6/23/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.)Plaintiffs to file their opposition on or before June 2, 2014 and Defendants to file their reply on or before June 9, 2014. (twdb) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation and Proposed Order 49 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (nbo) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Robert Farmer, Andrea Gross, Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. of Withdrawal as Moot Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing Date and SEtting Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Amended First Consolidated Complaint 48 filed by Plaintiffs Robert Farmer, Andrea Gross, Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Anne McVicar. (Attorney Jonas Palmer Mann added to party Robert Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney Jonas Palmer Mann added to party Andrea Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Jonas Palmer Mann added to party Jeffrey Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Jonas Palmer Mann added to party Rich Harlan(pty:pla))(Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Robert Farmer, Andrea Gross, Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar (Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended First Consolidated Complaint filed by Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. Motion set for hearing on 6/2/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss Amended First Consolidated Complaint, # 2 Declaration of Tripple Martin ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint, # 3 Proposed Order)(Vogt, John) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block, re Stipulated Electronically Stored Information Protocol 45 . (twdb) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block: re: Stipulation for Protective Order 44 , Stipulation for Discovery 45 . (twdb) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Discovery as to Electronically Stored Information filed by defendants Goodman Global Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vogt, John) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendants Goodman Global Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vogt, John) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Order Consolidating Into Lead Case No. 13-1223. The Court hereby CONSOLIDATES Robert Farmer, et al. v. Goodman Global Inc., et al., Case No. EDCV 14-0088-DOC (RNBx) into the lead case, McVicar v. Goodman Global Inc., et al., Case No. SACV 13-1223-DOC (RNBx). Robert Farmer, et al. v. Goodman Global Inc., et al., Case No. EDCV 14-0088-DOC (RNBx) be will be closed, and any further filings should be made in the lead case, McVicar v. Goodman Global Inc., et al., Case No. SACV 13-1223-DOC (RNBx). (nbo) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 , filed by Plaintiffs Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar, Robert Farmer, Jeffrey Gross, Rich Harlan, Andrea Gross (Attorney William M Audet added to party Robert Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney William M Audet added to party Jeffrey Gross(pty:pla), Attorney William M Audet added to party Andrea Gross(pty:pla), Attorney William M Audet added to party Rich Harlan(pty:pla))(Audet, William) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE filed by Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LPto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines,, 33 (Vogt, John) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Anne McVicar, Archie McVicarto Scheduling Conference,, 38 Response to Order of 2/24 (Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Anne McVicar, Archie McVicarto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines,, 33 (Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. The matter is called. Counsel state their appearances. The Court confers with counsel and the matter is trailed to 6:00 p.m. Counsel are ordered to return at 6:00 p.m.Later in the P.M., the case is recalled. The Court sets deadlines dates and directs counsel to submit a stipulation with the agreed upon dates, including their selection for a settlement procedure pursuant to Local Rule16-15.4, by March 14, 2014.Court Reporter: C/S 2/24/14; Maria Dellaneve. (twdb) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting in Part and Denying in Part MOTION to Dismiss Case 10 . (twdb) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Dismiss 10 by Judge David O. Carter. For the reasons explained above, the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Goodman's Motion to Dismiss. The Court orders the following: (see document for details). (dro) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Docket entry 32 failed to deliver NEF's to all parties. Order was re-docketed as entry 34 so that all parties would receive NEF's. (lt) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Granting APPLICATION for attorney Louis A. Chaiten to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 27 by Louis A. Chaiten to appear on behalf of Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP.John A. Vogt is designated as local counsel. Fee PAID. (lt) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE CONSOLIDATED. The attorneys for plaintiffs in 13-1223 and 14-88Audet & Partnersmust show cause on or before March 7, 2014. Attorneys fordefendants in the actions may respond, if at all, on or before March 14, 2014.( Show Cause Response due by 3/7/2014.) (twdb) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 27 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Louis A. Chaiten on behalf of Defendants, designating John A. Vogt as local counsel. (lt) (lt). (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 26 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard J. Bedell on behalf of Defendants, designating John A. Vogt as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 28 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Theodore M. Grosman on behalf of Defendants, designating John A. Vogt as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule) ; estimated length of trial N/A, filed by Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP.. (Grabowski, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Theodore M. Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Vogt, John) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Louis A. Chaiten to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Vogt, John) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Richard J. Bedell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vogt, John) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiffs Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar.. (Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Lifting Stay by Judge David O. Carter. On November 25, 2013, this Court granted a motion to stay this action pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") as to whether this case should be consolidated with others. November 25, 2013 Order (Dkt. 22). The Court also ordered parties to notify the Court when the JPML issued its decision. Id. The parties did so on December 13, 2013. Notice of Decision (Dkt. 23). In short, the JPML declined to consolidate the cases. Therefore, this Court hereby LIFTS the STAY. The Scheduling Conference is reset for February 24, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (Made JS-5, Case reopened) (dro) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Decision: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Plaintiffs Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. (Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter:granting 18 Motion to Stay Case Pending JPML Ruling. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (twdb) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
REPLY In Support of MOTION to Stay Case pending JPML ruling on MDL 18 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 10 filed by Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Grabowski, Richard) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Stay Case pending JPML ruling on MDL 18 filed by Plaintiffs Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonas P. Mann in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings)(Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Vacating Hearing and Taking Matter Under Advisement by Judge David O. Carter. Before the Court is Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint 10 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for November 18, 2013 at 8:30 a.m., is removed from the calendar. The Court also notes that there is a pending Motion to Stay Case, which is set for hearing on December 9, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. (Dkt. 18). This hearing date is not affected by this order. Furthermore, the Court reminds Plaintiffs that opposition to the Motion to Stay Case is due on November 18, 2013. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on all parties to the action. (dro) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending JPML ruling on MDL filed by defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of John A. Vogt, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of John A. Vogt, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of John A. Vogt, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of John A. Vogt, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of John A. Vogt, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of John A. Vogt, # 8 Proposed Order)(Attorney Richard Joseph Grabowski added to party Goodman Company LP(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Joseph Grabowski added to party Goodman Global Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Joseph Grabowski added to party Goodman Manufacturing Company LP(pty:dft))(Grabowski, Richard) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Granting Modification of Briefing Schedule Pursuant to Stipulation 16 . Having considered the Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule filed jointly by the Parties, it is ORDERED that the Stipulation is GRANTED. The Parties shall propose a briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification as part of their 26(f) report on December 30, 2013. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Reset filed by Plaintiff Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Approving Stipulation to Continue, 13 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, upon consideration of the parties' joint stipulation, the hearing date for the Goodman Defendants' motion to dismiss will be continued from November 11, 2013, to November 18, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. The Goodman Defendants' reply shall be filed and served on or before October 28, 2013. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Case 10 Complaint filed by Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Vogt, John) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from November 11, 2013 to November 18, 2013 Re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 10 filed by defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vogt, John) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case 10 filed by Plaintiffs Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. (Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2014 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See Order for details.) (jba) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. Motion set for hearing on 11/11/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Vogt, John) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar, upon Plaintiff Goodman Global Inc served on 8/14/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonas Palmer Mann on behalf of Plaintiffs Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar (Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP, identifying Daikin Industries, Ltd. (parent corporation of Defendants and publicly traded company on the Tokyo Stock Exchange); Goodman Company, L.P.: Defendant; Goodman Global, Inc.: Defendant; Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P.: Defendant; Goodman Holding Company (general partner of Goodman Manufacturing, L.P.); Goodman Appliance Holding Company (limited partner of Goodman Manufacturing, L.P.); Goodman Manufacturing, LLC (limited partner of Goodman Manufacturing, L.P.); and Goodman Global Holdings, Inc. (limited partner of Goodman Manufacturing, LLC). (Vogt, John) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Goodman Manufacturing Company LP answer now due 10/4/2013; Goodman Company LP answer now due 10/4/2013; Goodman Global Inc answer now due 10/4/2013, re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 filed by defendants Goodman Manufacturing Company LP; Goodman Company LP; Goodman Global Inc.(Vogt, John) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Mann, Jonas) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (nbo) (lwag). (Entered: 08/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (nbo) (lwag). (Entered: 08/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Anne McVicar, Archie McVicar. (nbo) (lwag). (Entered: 08/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against Defendants Goodman Company LP, Goodman Global Inc, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP.Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block.(Filing fee $ 400 Paid) Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiffs Anne McVicar and Archie McVicar.(nbo) (lwag). (Entered: 08/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 141 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?