USA v. Ruud et al
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cr-00586

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 12:44 PM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael O' Brien, Defendant (2)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Charles Samuel Hochbaum +1 718 855 4800 +1 718 422 7562 crimdefend@aol.com
TERMINATED: 12/17/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Gary Schoer +1 516 496 3500 +1 516 496 3530 gschoer@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Ephraim Savitt +1 212 679 4470 +1 212 679 6770 EPHRAIM@SAVITTESQ.COM

Toggle Switch Represented by Law office of Adam D. Perlmutter PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/04/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Daniel A. Mcguinness +1 212 679 1990 dam@adplegal.com
TERMINATED: 05/04/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Adam D Perlmutter +1 212 679 1990 +1 212 679 1995 adp@adplegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of B. Alan Seidler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/17/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Bernard Alan Seidler +1 212 334 3131 +1 212 334 2211 snedens66@aol.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (169) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Order for Forfeiture of Property
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for New Trial
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None CJA 20 - Appointment
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Continue Sentencing
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None New Trial
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None New Trial
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None New Trial
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Jury Notes
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Jury Instructions
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Jury Verdict
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Order of Sustenance/Lodging/Transportation
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf: AUSA Margaret Lee and Erik Paulsen. Michael O'Brien (Pro Se). Attorney Ephraim Savitt (Stand By).Jury Trial as to Michael O' Brien held on 7/27/2015. Deft rest. Gov't summation. Defendant summation. Jury charged. Deliberations continued to 7/28/2015 09:15 AM in Courtroom 6A South. (Court Reporter Richard Barry.) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/26/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/26/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Order of Entry
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Order of Entry
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf: AUSA Margaret Lee and Erik Paulsen. Michael OBrien (pro se). Stand by attorney Ephraim Savitt.Jury Trial as to Michael O' Brien held on 7/22/2015. Jury Trial set for 7/23/2015 09:15 AM in Courtroom 6A South before. Exhibits marked and entered into evidence. Witnesses sworn and testified. (Court Reporter Richard Barry.) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf:AUSA Margaret Lee and Erik Paulsen. Michael OBrien (pro se). Stand by attorney Ephraim Savitt.Jury Trial as to Michael O' Brien held on 7/21/2015. Jury Trial set for 7/22/2015 09:15 AM in Courtroom 6A South. Exhibits marked and entered into evidence. Witnesses sworn and testified. Alternate Juror #4 was excused by the Court. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf:AUSA Margaret Lee and Erik Paulsen. Michael O' Brien (Pro Se) Stand by Attorney Ephraim Savitt.Jury Trial as to Michael O' Brien held on 7/20/2015. Jury trial continued to 7/21/15 at 9:15. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Voir Dire
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:AUSA Margaret Lee and Erik Paulson. Defendant Pro Se. Ephraim Savitt - Stand by counsel.Voir Dire held on 7/20/2015 as to Michael O' Brien. Jury Trial set for 7/21/2015 09:15 AM in Courtroom 6A South before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/19/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/19/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Request for Special Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 109 First MOTION in Limine - Rule 404(b) Opposition Letter (Savitt, Ephraim) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT (S-3) as to Michael O' Brien (2) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, 4ss, 5ss. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Information Sheet) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Michael O' Brien. That Ephraim Savitt, appointed by the Court as the CJA attorney for the deft Michael O'Brien is authorized to submit interim CJA form 20 vouchers for compensation and reimbursement of necessary expenses, without any withholding in approved interim CJA compensation, upon submission of a copy of this signed Order to the CJA clerk. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 5/13/2015. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 41 First MOTION to Suppress physical evidence and statements (surreply) (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 First MOTION to Suppress physical evidence and statements (McGuinness, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated 11/9/14 from Michael O' Brien to Judge Mauskopf, advising that he has not seen his attorney he was appointed. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re 41 First MOTION to Suppress physical evidence and statements (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 First MOTION to Suppress physical evidence and statements (Seidler, Bernard) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter dated 10/3/14 from Michael O' Brien to Judge Mauskopf, advising of his concerns with his legal representation. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 41 First MOTION to Suppress physical evidence and statements (post-hearing memorandum) (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 41 First MOTION to Suppress physical evidence and statements (surreply) (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter requesting leave to file a surreply as to Michael O' Brien (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re 41 First MOTION to Suppress physical evidence and statements (Seidler, Bernard) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 41 First MOTION to Suppress physical evidence and statements (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter regarding Rule 16 discovery as to Michael O' Brien (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter regarding Rule 16 discovery as to Michael O' Brien (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 First MOTION to Suppress physical evidence and statements (Seidler, Bernard) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter status as to Michael O' Brien (Seidler, Bernard) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF BILL of PARTICULARS as to Kimberly Ruud, Michael O' Brien (Lipari, Vincent) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Suppress physical evidence and statements by Michael O' Brien. (Seidler, Bernard) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION for Return of Property/PreTrial by Michael O' Brien. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Conflict check conducted pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated November 1, 2009. (Valentin, Winnethka) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter regarding updated conflict check as to Kimberly Ruud, Michael O' Brien (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Amended Bill of Particulars as to Kimberly Ruud, Michael O' Brien (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter regarding Rule 16 discovery as to Michael O' Brien (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter advising of intent to make bail application as to Michael O' Brien (Seidler, Bernard) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION to Suppress Search of Location by Michael O' Brien. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION to Suppress Consent to Search Form by Michael O' Brien. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION to Suppress Search of Cellular Phone by Michael O' Brien. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Bill of Particulars as to Kimberly Ruud, Michael O' Brien (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf:AUSA Margaret Lee. Status Conference as to Kimberly Ruud counsel Joseph Mure, and Michael O' Brien counsel Alan Seidler for the deft. held on 2/28/2014, ( Status Conference set for 3/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A South before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf.) (Court Reporter Mary Agnes Drury.) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue by Michael O' Brien. (Seidler, Bernard) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:AUSA Margaret Lee and Alan Seidler for the deft.Arraignment as to Michael O' Brien (2) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s,6,6s,7,7s held on 2/4/2014, Plea entered by Michael O' Brien Not Guilty on counts All Counts., ( Status Conference set for 2/14/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6A South before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf.) (Tape #2:20 - 2:22.) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter re: Discovery as to Michael O' Brien (Baldwin, Peter) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT (S-2) as to Kimberly Ruud (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss-4ss, 5ss, Michael O' Brien (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 6s, 7s. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Information Sheet) (Chee, Alvin) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bernard Alan Seidler appearing for Michael O' Brien (Seidler, Bernard) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter regarding Rule 16 discovery as to Michael O' Brien (Lee, Margaret) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application and Order of Excludable Delay as to Michael O' Brien Time excluded from 12/4/13 until 12/20/13. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/4/2013. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:AUSA Margaret Lee.Arraignment as to Kimberly Ruud (1) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s-4s,5s and Michael O' Brien (2) Count 1,2,3,6,7 held on 12/4/2013, Plea entered by Kimberly Ruud, Michael O' Brien Not Guilty on counts All Counts., ( Status Conference set for 12/20/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6A South before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf.) (Tape #11:30 - 11:33.) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT (S-1) as to Kimberly Ruud (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s-4s, 5s, Michael O' Brien (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 6, 7. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Information Sheet) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA 20 as to Michael O' Brien: Appointment of Attorney Charles Samuel Hochbaum for Michael O' Brien.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 10/30/2013. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:13-mj-00936-LB] (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael O' Brien (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:13-mj-00936-LB] (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF DETENTION as to Michael O' Brien. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 10/30/2013. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:13-mj-00936-LB] (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Arraignment as to Michael O' Brien (1) Count Complaint held on 10/30/2013, Initial Appearance as to Michael O' Brien held on 10/30/2013, Attorney Appointment of cja counsel Charles Hochhabum for the deft present. AUSA Margaret Lee present. No bail package presented. Order of detention entered. Deft waived Preliminary hearing. (Tape #3;34-3;39.) (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:13-mj-00936-LB] (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order to Unseal Case as to Michael O' Brien.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 10/30/2013. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:13-mj-00936-LB] (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED COMPLAINT as to Michael O' Brien (1). (DiLorenzo, Krista) [1:13-mj-00936-LB] (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 5,404 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?