Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-01013

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 16, 2018 at 4:35 PM DT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua J. Bennett +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jbennett@carterscholer.com
Space E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
Space Ryan Scott Loveless +1 972 292 8303 +1 214 550 8185 rloveless@carterscholer.com
Space James Robert Arnett, II +1 214 550 8209 +1 214 550 8185 barnett@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com
Space Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
Space Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
Space Steven W. Hartsell +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 shartsell@nbclaw.net
Space Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
Space Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wick Phillips Gould & Martin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo 2k Games, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo 2k Games, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell William Faegenburg +1 908 518 6367 +1 908 654 7866 rfaegenburg@ldlkm.com
Space Alexander Solo +1 908 654 5000 asolo@ldlkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brittany A. Boswell +1 816 559 4010 +1 816 421 5547 bboswell@shb.com
Space Patrick Allan Lujin +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 plujin@shb.com
Space Basil Trent Webb +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara Dawn Sunderland +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 ssunderland@shb.com
No Logo Aladdin Knowledge System, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safenet, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer & Kern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Hsu +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 shsu@hdbdlaw.com
No Logo Take-two Interactive Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan N DeMatteo +1 212 209 4833 +1 212 209 4801 bdematteo@brownrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory S. Gewirtz +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ggewirtz@ldlkm.com
Space FAHD KHALID MAJIDUDDIN +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 fmajiduddin@lernerdavid.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aldo A. Badini +1 212 294 4601 +1 212 294 4700 abadini@winston.com
Space Floyd R Nation +1 713 651 2661 +1 713 651 2700 fnation@winston.com
Space Matthew B Weinstein +1 202 282 5000 +1 202 282 5100 mweinstein@winston.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Bitdefender LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carroll, Burdick & McDonough LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Harrison Wu +1 213 833 4500 dwu@cbmlaw.com
No Logo Cambridgesoft Corporation, Consol Defendant
No Logo Ipswitch Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Justin J. Daniels +1 617 526 9600 jdaniels@proskauer.com
Space Nathan T. Harris +1 617 395 7000 +1 617 395 7070 nharris@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Willi Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Norman Willi +1 512 288 3200 +1 512 288 3202 jwilli@willilawfirm.com
No Logo Nuance Communications Inc., Consol Defendant
Unknown Role, CERENCE INC

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
Space Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANTHONY L. PRESS +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 apress@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garland T. Stephens +1 212 310 8976 +1 212 310 8007 garland.stephens@weil.com
No Logo Perkinelmer Holdings, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Perkinelmer, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Ann Alquist +1 860 275 0137 +1 860 275 0343 EAAlquist@DayPitney.com
Space Cecilia Zhang Stiber +1 203 977 7300 +1 203 977 7301 cstiber@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacy Allen +1 512 236 2090 +1 512 391 2102 stacyallen@jw.com
Space Audra G Welter +1 713 752 4284 awelter@jw.com
No Logo Techsmith Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duby Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tom Cone Jim@Dubylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer & Kern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeff S Patterson +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 jpatterson@hdbdlaw.com
No Logo Hon. W. Royal Furgeson, Jr., Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by United States District Court For The Northern District of Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Royal Furgeson, Jr. +1 214 753 2355
  Entries (193) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony L Press terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 01/11/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 154 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Edgar Leon Carter; James Robert Arnett, II and Joshua James Bennett terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/15/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying without prejudice 115 Sealed Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions; granting 121 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jack Wesley Hill terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/19/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 131 Emergency MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Marking Issues in a Related Case , filed by 2K Games, Inc., Bitdefender LLC, CambridgeSoft Corporation, PerkinElmer Holdings, Inc., PerkinElmer, Inc., TechSmith Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1 - Correspondence, # 2 Exhibit A2 - Correspondence, # 3 Exhibit B - Correspondence)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 115 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Letter Brief filed by 2K Games, Inc., Bitdefender LLC, CambridgeSoft Corporation, Ipswitch, Inc., Nuance Communications, Inc., PerkinElmer Holdings, Inc., PerkinElmer, Inc., TechSmith Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Letter Brief re filing Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity)(Daniels, Justin) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions by 2K Games, Inc., Bitdefender LLC, CambridgeSoft Corporation, Ipswitch, Inc., Nuance Communications, Inc., PerkinElmer Holdings, Inc., PerkinElmer, Inc., TechSmith Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Original PICs, # 2 Exhibit B - Redlined portion of Proposed Amended PICs, # 3 Exhibit C - DEC/LMF Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Defendants' 4-2 Statement, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Claim Constructions, # 2 Exhibit B: Defendants' Claim Constructions)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 124 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Fahd K Majiduddin; Alexander Solo; Russell W Faegenburg and Gregory S Gewirtz terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by 2K Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions filed by TechSmith Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Support re 115 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions filed by TechSmith Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hsu, Sean) Modified on 7/10/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Safenet, Inc.. (Katz, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 72 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/7/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 115 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Vertical Computer Sys., Inc. v. Interwoven, Inc., No. 2:10-cv-490 (E.D. Tex.), # 2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Strike)(Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steven R Katz on behalf of Safenet, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4731534. (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by TechSmith Corporation re 115 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions - Notice of Corrected and Supplemented Certificate of Conference (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Nuance Communications, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Privilege Log (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions by TechSmith Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit B1 - Prelim. Response to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, # 3 Exhibit B2 - First Suppl. Response to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit B3 - Second Suppl. Response to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, # 5 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Objs. and Responses to TechSmith's RFAs and Interrogatories, # 6 Exhibit D - Declaration of Dean Craven (5-30-14), # 7 Exhibit E - Draft Stipulation, # 8 Exhibit F - Correspondence, # 9 Exhibit G - Correspondence, # 10 Exhibit H - Declaration of Sean Hsu, # 11 Exhibit I - Declaration of Dean Craven (6-16-14), # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by CambridgeSoft Corporation, PerkinElmer Holdings, Inc., PerkinElmer, Inc. Defendants Notice of Compliance Regarding Privilege Logs (Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ipswitch, Inc. Regarding Privilege Logs (Daniels, Justin) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Bitdefender LLC Regarding Privilege Logs (Wu, Daniel) (Entered: 06/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by TechSmith Corporation re no current disputes as to claims of privileged documents (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance with Discovery Order (Privilege Log) (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by TechSmith Corporation of Opposition to Motion to Withdraw in Consolidated Case (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 106 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Wayne Hartsell; Edward R Nelson, III; Ryan Casey O'Neill; Jaime Kate Olin; Barry Bumgardner and Edward E Casto, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/02/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Change of Lead Counsel (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua James Bennett on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bennett, Joshua) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Robert Arnett, II on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Arnett, James) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Leon Carter on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Cecilia Zhang Stiber on behalf of CambridgeSoft Corporation, PerkinElmer Holdings, Inc., PerkinElmer, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4665302. (Stiber, Cecilia) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth A Alquist on behalf of CambridgeSoft Corporation, PerkinElmer Holdings, Inc., PerkinElmer, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4665259. (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Third Party Defendants SafeNet, Inc. and Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Inc. have to 7-08-2014 to answer Third Party Plaintiff TechSmith Corp.'s Third Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/12/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 59 Sealed Document Third Party Complaint by Aladdin Knowledge System, Inc., Safenet, Inc., TechSmith Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 96 Motion to Withdraw Attorney. Audra Gonzalez Welter is hereby withdrawn as counsel for PerkinElmer. Stacy Allen will remain as lead counsel for PerkinElmer in the above-styled case. The Clerk of the Court shall remove Audra Gonzalez Welter from the list of persons authorized to receive electronic notices. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Audra Gonzalez Welter as Attorney for Record for Defendants CambridgeSoft Corporation, PerkinElmer Holdings, Inc., and PerkinElmer, Inc by CambridgeSoft Corporation, PerkinElmer Holdings, Inc., PerkinElmer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to First Amended Counterclaims of Defendant 2K Games, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Safenet, Inc.'s Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Third Party Complaint (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Aladdin Knowledge System, Inc.'s Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Third Party Complaint (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to First 7 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by 2K Games, Inc.. (Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Nation, Floyd) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Dawn Sunderland on behalf of 2K Games, Inc. (Sunderland, Sara) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Aladdin Knowledge System, Inc..( Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Safenet, Inc..( Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DUPLICATE FILING. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brittany A Boswell on behalf of 2K Games, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4533022. (Boswell, Brittany) Modified on 2/24/2014 (mjc, ). (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of 2K Games, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brittany A Boswell on behalf of 2K Games, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4531451. (Boswell, Brittany) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Basil Trent Webb on behalf of 2K Games, Inc. (Webb, Basil) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick A Lujin on behalf of 2K Games, Inc. (Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION to Change Venue filed by 2K Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Fahd K. Majiduddin, # 2 Exhibit 20, # 3 Exhibit 21, # 4 Exhibit 22, # 5 Exhibit 23, # 6 Exhibit 24, # 7 Exhibit 25, # 8 Exhibit 26, # 9 Exhibit 27, # 10 Exhibit 28, # 11 Exhibit 29)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Russell W Faegenburg on behalf of 2K Games, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4478250. (Faegenburg, Russell) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by CambridgeSoft Corporation, PerkinElmer Holdings, Inc., PerkinElmer, Inc. ('216) Notice of Change of Lead Counsel from Audra Welter to Stacy Allen (Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration O'Neill, # 3 Affidavit Declaration Burdick, # 4 Affidavit Declaration Mangrum, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Change of Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Change Venue by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Toto, # 2 Declaration of Linda Zabriskie, # 3 Declaration of Fahd K. Majiduddin, # 4 Exhibits 1 - 15 to Majiduddin Declaration, # 5 Exhibits 16 - 19 to Majiduddin Declaration, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Solo on behalf of 2K Games, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4400903. (Solo, Alexander) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Garland T Stephens terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/12/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Bitdefender LLC Regarding Compliance with Discovery Order and Docket Control Order in connection with Identification of Email Custodians and P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Wu, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by TechSmith Corporation of Compliance with Discovery Order and Docket Control Order (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Ipswitch, Inc. of Compliance (Willi, James) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Garland T. Stephens by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan T Harris on behalf of Ipswitch, Inc. (Harris, Nathan) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin J Daniels on behalf of Ipswitch, Inc. (Daniels, Justin) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by 2K Games, Inc. (Notice of Compliance of P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 Document Production Accompanying Invalidity Contentions) (Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Nuance Communications, Inc. re 49 Order, 39 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, of Compliance (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corrected and Re-Filed Sealed Third Party Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by CambridgeSoft Corporation, PerkinElmer Holdings, Inc., PerkinElmer, Inc. (Notice of Compliance of P.R. 3-3. Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4. Document Production Accompanying Invalidity Contentions) (Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Third Party Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 54 Motion for an Extension of Time to Designate Email Custodians. TechSmith Corporation has until 11/8/2013 to supplement its list of email custodians as needed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/4/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave to Extend November 1, 2013 Deadline to Exchange E-mail Custodians. Deadline is extended to 11/8/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/4/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for an Extension of Time to Designate Email Custodians by TechSmith Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Extend November 1, 2013, Deadline to Exchange E-Mail Custodians Per Order Regarding E-Discovery by Bitdefender LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wu, Daniel) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The civil action 6:12cv1013 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions and All Oct. 21 Deadlines) by 2K Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) Modified on 10/15/2013 (mll, ). (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR*** PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) Modified on 10/15/2013 (mll, ). (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery, E-Discovery, and Protective Orders by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Disclosures Required by Paragraphs 2(B) and 2(C) of the Court's Discovery Order (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that the parties submit their agreed Discovery Orders, ESI Orders, and Protective Orders in compliance with this Order within ten days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by 2K Games, Inc. (Defendant 2K Games, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance) (Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Judge William Royal Furgeson Jr is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Mediation Completion due by 3/2/2015. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 10/9/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Disclosures (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Joint Notice of Dispute (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Def Exh 1)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re Notices of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order, and ESI Order. Parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint notice of dispute indicating the points that cannot be agreed upon, each partys proposal, and a brief statement of reasoning in support of each partys proposal. The joint notice SHALL be submitted on or before 9-03-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by 2K Games, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Dispute Concerning Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Dispute Concerning Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to File Additional Related Cases (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Fahd K Majiduddin on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4271863. (Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/29/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Floyd R Nation; Matthew B Weinstein; Aldo A Badini and Bryan N DeMatteo terminated as counsel for 2K Games, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/4/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by 2K Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Badini, Aldo) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gregory S Gewirtz on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4160681. (Gewirtz, Gregory) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 20 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Counterclaims of Defendant 2K Games, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 24 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal. All claims between pltf and deft Take-Two Interactive Software Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 21 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/02/13. cc:attys 4-03-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Stipulated Dismissal Without Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Uniloc's First Amended Complaint by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nation, Floyd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2013: # 4 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by 2K Games, Inc..(Nation, Floyd) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..( Nation, Floyd) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew B Weinstein on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3979472. (Weinstein, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2013: # 1 Sealed Attachment) (pkb, ). (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bryan N DeMatteo on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3979450. (DeMatteo, Bryan) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Badini, Aldo) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aldo A Badini on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Badini, Aldo) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. on 1/11/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/1/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to 2K Games, Inc. on 1/11/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/1/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..( Nation, Floyd) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Floyd R Nation on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Nation, Floyd) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against 2K Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3930482.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - United States Patent No. 5,490,216, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?