Cyberfone Systems LLC v. Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A. Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00109

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 10:17 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cyberfone Systems, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler, Andrew Wesley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.s.a., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/23/2014 Steven John Routh +1 202 339 8400 +1 202 339 8500 srouth@orrick.com
No Logo Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A. Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/23/2014 Steven John Routh +1 202 339 8400 +1 202 339 8500 srouth@orrick.com
Space Steven John Routh +1 202 339 8400 +1 202 339 8500 srouth@orrick.com
No Logo Cyberfone Systems, LLC, Consol Counter Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-111 - Transferred per order # 22 Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-111 Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-110 Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-112 Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Cyberfone Systems, LLC, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Lexmark International, Inc., Consol Counter Claimant
No Logo Ricoh Americas Corp., Consol Counter Claimant
No Logo Ricoh Electronics, Inc., Consol Counter Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel R. Foster +1 949 757 7103 +1 949 851 9348 dfoster@mwe.com
Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Consol Counter Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-112
TERMINATED: 08/05/2014 Matthew Wolff Howell +1 404 881 7349 +1 404 881 7777 matthew.howell@alston.com
Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-112 Matthew Wolff Howell +1 404 881 7349 +1 404 881 7777 matthew.howell@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-112
TERMINATED: 08/05/2014 E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-112 E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
No Logo Lexmark International, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audra Carol Eidem Heinze +1 312 463 5000 aheinze@bannerwitcoff.com
No Logo Ricoh Americas Corp., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Devinsky +1 202 756 8369 +1 202 756 8087 pdevinsky@mwe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
No Logo Ricoh Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant
Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith Edward Broyles +1 404 881 7558 +1 404 811 7777 kbroyles@alston.com
Space Matthew Wolff Howell +1 404 881 7349 +1 404 881 7777 matthew.howell@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Konica Minolta Holdings, U.S.A., Inc. and Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/23/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                  Plaintiff CyberFone ANSWER to Complaint , Xerox Corporation's Counterclaim by Cyberfone Systems LLC.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Ricoh Americas Corp., Ricoh Electronics Inc (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew W Howell on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Howell, Matthew) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Edward Broyles on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Broyles, Keith) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:14-cv-109. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/28/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Konica Minolta Holdings USA Inc and Konica Minolta Business Solutions 6/23/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/20/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A. Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Routh, Steven) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline 5/23/14. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/23/14. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A. Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Routh, Steven) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A. Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A. Inc.( Routh, Steven) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A. Inc. served by Process Server on 3/3/2014, answer due 3/24/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark S Raskin on behalf of Cyberfone Systems LLC (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Konica Minolta Holdings USA Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Patent Group Inc. for Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A. Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A. Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4534622.), filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Space Space

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 96 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?