USA v. Potillo
Criminal Case Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:14-cr-00128-JA-GJK

Tags
Last Updated September 15, 2020 at 9:24 AM DT (10.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Leonard G. Potillo, III, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Markovits, Stock & DeMarco LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained John E. Bergendahl +1 305 536 2168 +1 305 536 2170 lojeb1100@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NeJame, LaFay, Jancha, Vara, Barker & Joshi, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Rick L. Jancha +1 407 245 1232 +1 407 245 2980 rick@nejamelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Mark E. NeJame +1 407 245 1232 +1 407 245 2980 mark@nejamelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/27/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Angela G. Parrott +1 704 374 0720 +1 704 374 0722 angela_parrott@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (224) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 order on motion for release from custodyCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [218] Motion for Release from Custody as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Defendant is released from any further supervision. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 7/9/2019. (counsel mailed/emailed) (AKC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Reply to Response to motion
      REPLY TO [222] RESPONSE to Motion by Leonard G. Potillo, III re [218] MOTION for Early Termination of Supervised Release (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Waxman, Seth) Modified on 7/3/2019 (SPM).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Response In Opposition
        RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III re [218] MOTION for Early Termination of Supervised Release (Napier, Shawn)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 221 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019 Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript
          NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Court Reporter: Sandy Tremel (MAA)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 1/8/2016 before Judge Antoon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sandy Tremel(sandy.tremel@gmail.com). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/17/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2019. (MAA)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Order directing response to motionCourt Filing
              ORDER directing USA to respond to [218] MOTION for Early Termination of Supervised Release as to Leonard G. Potillo, III which shall include the probation officer's perspective. Responses due within 10 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 6/17/2019. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019, Terminated: 7/9/2019 motion for release from custody
                MOTION for Early Termination of Supervised Release by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Waxman, Seth) Modified on 6/14/2019 (SPM).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 217 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript
                  NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT, Doc. 213, 214, 215, 216. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (KS)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 06/30/15 before Judge Paul G. Byron. Court Reporter/Transcriber Koretta Stanford, stanarm2014@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 6/24/2019; Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2019; Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (KS)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 12/22/14 before Judge Paul G. Byron. Court Reporter/Transcriber Koretta Stanford, stanarm2014@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 6/24/2019; Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2019; Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (KS)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 10/21/14 before Judge Paul G. Byron. Court Reporter/Transcriber Koretta Stanford, stanarm2014@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 6/24/2019; Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2019; Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (KS)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 07/22/14 before Judge Paul G. Byron. Court Reporter/Transcriber Koretta Stanford, stanarm2014@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 6/24/2019; Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2019; Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (KS)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 212 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019 Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript
                            NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (SLT)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Initial Appearance on Superseding Information/Change of Plea Hearing as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 10/7/2015 before Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Court Reporter/Transcriber Suzanne Trimble, trimblecourtreporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 6/21/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2019. (SLT)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 210 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript
                                NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT, Doc. 209. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (KS)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Leonard G. Potillo, III, held on 02/17/15 before Judge Paul G. Byron. Court Reporter/Transcriber Koretta Stanford, stanarm2014@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 5/13/2019; Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2019; Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2019. (KS)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 208 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript
                                    NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Court Reporter: Diane Peede (MAA)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 3/16/15 before Judge Byron. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/30/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2019. (MAA)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [204] Motion to terminate garnishment with TD Ameritrade as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/25/2019. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019 Satisfaction
                                          SATISFACTION of Judgment as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Jewell, Jillian)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019, Terminated: 2/25/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                            MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to terminate garnishment by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Jewell, Jillian)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019, Terminated: 2/8/2019 Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                              WRIT of garnishment issued by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Clerk's Notice, # (2) Exhibit Blank Claim Form)(original and one certified copy mailed to AUSA in Tampa)(AKC)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Order on Motion for Writ of GarnishmentCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [201] Motion for writ of garnishment to TD Ameritrade. as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/7/2019. (counsel emailed) (AKC)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019, Terminated: 2/8/2019 Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                                  MOTION writ of garnishment by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Writ, # (3) Clerk's Notice)(Jewell, Jillian)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jillian M. Jewell appearing for USA. (Jewell, Jillian)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 199 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Notice - other
                                                      CERTIFICATE of return of Government's Exhibits from the June 17, 2016 restitution hearing held before the Honorable John Antoon II as to Leonard G. Potillo, III - re [156] Exhibit List. Exhibits return to Shawn Napier via Clerk's Office internal mailbox on 4/21/17. (AKJ)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Notice - other
                                                        NOTICE Treasury Process Receipt and Return jewelry sold by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Notice - other
                                                          NOTICE of Termination of Government Counsel by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Napier, Shawn)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                            Treasury Process Receipt and Return $550,000 deposited 9/15/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                              Treasury Process Receipt and Return; Maserati sold on 9/21/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                Treasury Process Receipt and Return; 2007 Ferrari sold 9/21/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                  Treasury Process Receipt and Return; 2014 Jaguar sold 9/21/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                    Treasury Process Receipt and Return; 2010 aston sold 9/21/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                      Treasury Process Receipt and Return; 1997 Dodge Viper sold 9/21/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                        Treasury Process Receipt and Return; 1957 Chevrolet Nomad sold 9/21/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                          Treasury Process Receipt and Return; 1957 Chevrolet Bel Air sold 9/21/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                            Treasury Process Receipt and Return; 2012 Aston Martin Virage sold 10/19/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                              Treasury Process Receipt and Return; 2011 Mercedes Benz sold 9/21/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                Treasury Process Receipt and Return; 2004 Honda Rune motorcycle sold 9/21/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                  Treasury Process Receipt and Return 2008 Honda Shadow motorcycle sold 9/21/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                    Treasury Process Receipt and Return; 2012 Monterey boat sold 9/28/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                      Treasury Process Receipt and Return; TD Ameritrade account #891703 deposited 9/15/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                        Treasury Process Receipt and Return; TD Ameritrade account #930864 deposited by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                          Treasury Process Receipt and Return; TD Ameritrade account #090194 deposited 9/15/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                            Treasury Process Receipt and Return; TD Ameritrade account #194032 deposited 9/15/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                              Treasury Process Receipt and Return; TD Ameritrade account #201031 deposited 9/15/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                Treasury Process Receipt and Return; TD Ameritrade account #201185 deposited by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                  Treasury Process Receipt and Return; TD Ameritrade account #208545 NOT deposited by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                    Treasury Process Receipt and Return; Scottrade account deposited 9/15/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                      Treasury Process Receipt and Return; $20,269 deposited 9/15/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                        Treasury Process Receipt and Return; Western Union Money Order #5685 deposited 9/16/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                          Treasury Process Receipt and Return; Western Union Money Order #0179 deposited 9/16/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                            Treasury Process Receipt and Return; Western Union Money Order #1270 deposited 9/16/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                              Treasury Process Receipt and Return; Western Union Money Order #7037 deposited 9/16/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                Treasury Process Receipt and Return; Western Union Money Order #3146 deposited 9/16/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                  Treasury Process Receipt and Return; USPS Money Order #3698 deposited 9/16/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                    Treasury Process Receipt and Return; USPS Money Order #9375 deposited 9/16/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                      Treasury Process Receipt and Return; Moneygram Money Order was NOT deposited by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                        Treasury Process Receipt and Return; American Financial Integrity Money Order NOT deposited by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                          Treasury Process Receipt and Return; Wells Fargo Money Order deposited 10/11/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                            Treasury Process Receipt and Return; U.S. Bank Cashier's Check deposited 9/16/16 by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/10/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Release of Lis Pendens
                                                                                                                              RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS as to 2106 SE 7 Street, Pompano Beach, Florida by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE FOR CURRENCY IN LIEU OF POMPANO BEACH PROPERTY granting [161] Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 7/25/2016. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKJ)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016, Terminated: 7/26/2016 Motion for Forfeiture
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Forfeiture of Judgment of Forfeiture for Currency in lieu of Pompano Beach Property by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Nebesky, Suzanne)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [159] Motion for Final Judgment of Forfeiture; FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AS TO CERTAIN ASSETS. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 7/18/2016. (BRS)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016, Terminated: 7/18/2016 Motion for Forfeiture
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for final judgment of forfeiture as to certain assets by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 7/6/2016 (JET).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        RESTITUTION ORDER as to Leonard G. Potillo, III - re [137] Judgment. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 6/17/2016. (Counsel mailed/emailed)(AKJ)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 Order on Motion for Return of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER striking [154] Motion for Return of Property as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 6/17/2016. (Copy mailed to Leonard Potillo, III)(AKJ)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (AKJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2016: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8 - CD not scanned, # (9) Exhibit 9 - part 1, # (10) Exhibit 9 - part 2, # (11) Exhibit 10 - part 1, # (12) Exhibit 10 - part 2, # (13) Exhibit 10 - part 3, # (14) Exhibit 11 - part 1, # (15) Exhibit 11 - part 2, # (16) Exhibit 11 - part 3, # (17) Exhibit 11 - part 4, # (18) Exhibit 12 - part 1, # (19) Exhibit 12 - part 2, # (20) Exhibit 12 - part 3, # (21) Exhibit 13, # (22) Exhibit 14, # (23) Exhibit 15 - cd not scanned, # (24) Exhibit 16) (AKJ). Modified on 10/31/2016 (AKJ).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 Evidentiary HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Antoon II: RESTITUTION Hearing as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 6/17/2016. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (AKJ)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016, Terminated: 6/17/2016 Motion for Return of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                STRICKEN PER ORDER AT DOC. NO. [157] LETTER MOTION for Release of Account Data and Return of Property by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (filed pro se) (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (RDO). Modified on 6/17/2016 (AKJ).
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [152] Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Restitution Hearing; the restitution hearing is rescheduled from Tuesday, June 7, 2016, to Friday, June 17, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 6/3/2016. (BRS)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016, Terminated: 6/3/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Continue Restitution Hearing by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Bergendahl, John)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [150] Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Restitution Hearing; the restitution hearing is rescheduled from Thursday, May 12, 2016, to Tuesday, June 7, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/09/2016. (BRS)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016, Terminated: 5/10/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Continue Restitution Hearing by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Bergendahl, John)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Judgment Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                          Judgment Returned Executed as to Leonard G. Potillo, III on 4/8/2016. Institution: FPC Pensacola. (JEV)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: 4/21/2016 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [147] Motion to Continue as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Restitution hearing rescheduled from Friday, April 22, 2016 to Thursday, May 12, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. Defendant's presence is not required at the hearing (See waiver at Doc. No. [145]). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/21/2016. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKJ)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: 4/20/2016, Terminated: 4/21/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Restitution Hearing by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Bergendahl, John)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Notice of rescheduling hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Restitution Hearing previously scheduled for April 1, 2016 at 11:30 A.M. is rescheduled as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. New hearing date and time: Restitution Hearing reset for 4/22/2016 at 2:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. Defendant's presence is NOT required at the hearing based on the Waiver filed at Doc. No. [145]. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKJ)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Waiver by Leonard G. Potillo, III (Attachments: # (1) Main Document Waiver)(Bergendahl, John)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 Notice of rescheduling hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Restitution hearing hearing previously scheduled for 3/4/16 is rescheduled as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. New hearing date and time: Restitution Hearing reset for 4/1/2016 at 11:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. Defendant's presence is required at the hearing. (parties mailed/emailed)(AKJ)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [142] Motion to Continue as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/2/2016. (counsel mailed/emailed) (AKJ)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016, Terminated: 3/2/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Continue Restitution Hearing by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Bergendahl, John)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Treasury Process Receipt and Return executed as to real property by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Proof of publication
                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF PUBLICATION as to Leonard G. Potillo, III newspaper: an official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) dates of publication: for at least 30 consecutive days, beginning on December 28, 2015 and ending on January 26, 2016. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(Nebesky, Suzanne)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: 1/12/2016 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Restitution Hearing set for 3/4/2016 at 09:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. Defendant's Presence is Required. CTP(DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: 1/12/2016 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT as to Leonard G. Potillo, III - Counts 1-7, 18-33, 18s-33s, 1s-7s, 34s-37s, 8-17, 8s-17s are Dismissed; Counts 1ss, 2ss - Imprisonment: 46 months on each of Cts. 1ss and 2ss, all such terms to run concurrently. Court recommends deft. be screened for the intensive drug rehab program and be incarcerated at a Federal Prison Camp within the State of Florida. Deft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal; Supervised release: 3 years on each of Cts. 1ss and 2ss, to run concurrently. Mandatory drug testing requirements are waived. Special conditions of supervised release: Participate in a substance abuse program; Deft. is prohibited from incurring new credit charges, opening additional lines of credit and shall provide probation access to any requested financial information. Deft. shall cooperate with the IRS regarding all oustanding taxes, interest and penalties relating to the offense of conviction and shall provide the IRS with lawful tax returns for the years 2009 through 2012 and pay all outstanding taxes, interest and penalties; Cooperate in the collection of DNA. Fine: Waived; Special assessment: $200.00. Forfeiture pursuant to the Forfeiture Money Judgment and Preliminary Order of Forfeiture. Restitution is deferred until March 4, 2016. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/12/2016. CTP(DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 order on motion for release from custodyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER denying [135] Motion for Release from Custody as to Leonard G. Potillo III. Rendered in Open Court by Judge John Antoon II on 1/8/2016. (DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 motion for release from custody
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORE TENUS MOTION for Release from Custody by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Antoon II: SENTENCING held on 1/8/2016 for Leonard G. Potillo, III - Counts 1-7, 18-33, 18s-33s, 1s-7s, 34s-37s, 8-17, 8s-17s are Dismissed; Counts 1ss, 2ss - Imprisonment: 46 months on each of Cts. 1ss and 2ss, all such terms to run concurrently. Court recommends deft. be screened for the intensive drug rehab program and be incarcerated at a Federal Prison Camp within the State of Florida. Deft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal; Supervised release: 3 years on each of Cts. 1ss and 2ss, to run concurrently. Mandatory drug testing requirements are waived. Special conditions of supervised release: Participate in a substance abuse program; Deft. is prohibited from incurring new credit charges, opening additional lines of credit and shall provide probation access to any requested financial information. Deft. shall cooperate with the IRS regarding all oustanding taxes, interest and penalties relating to the offense of conviction and shall provide the IRS with lawful tax returns for the years 2009 through 2012 and pay all outstanding taxes, interest and penalties; Cooperate in the collection of DNA. Fine: Waived; Special assessment: $200.00. Forfeiture pursuant to the Forfeiture Money Judgment and Preliminary Order of Forfeiture. Restitution is deferred until March 4, 2016. Court Reporter: Sandy Tremel (DJD) (DJD). (DJD).
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Antoon II: TELEPHONE Conference regarding restitution as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 1/7/2016. Court will defer restitution and set a hearing 45-60 days from the sentencing hearing. Court Reporter: Sandy Tremel (DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Exhibit Letters in Support of Sentencing by Leonard G. Potillo, III (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letters)(Bergendahl, John) Modified on 1/7/2016 (IGC).
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James Wesley Smith, III appearing for Leonard G. Potillo, III (Smith, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING regarding restitution as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. Counsel shall call the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (407) 835-4304 by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, January 6, 2016 to advise of a phone number where they can be reached for the conference. CTP(DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  FORFEITURE MONEY JUDGMENT AND PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE FOR SUBSTITUTE ASSETS - ORDER granting [124] Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Leonard G. Potillo III. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/18/2015. (DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Order on Motion for BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [120] Motion for Bond, with provisions as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 12/14/2015. Copies emailed. (HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker: Motion Hearing as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 12/14/2015 re [120] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Release on Bond PENDING SENTENCING AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING filed by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (digital) (HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015, Terminated: 12/22/2015 Motion for Forfeiture
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Forfeiture of forfeiture money judgment and preliminary order of forfeiture for substitute assets by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Nebesky, Suzanne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: [120] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Release on Bond PENDING SENTENCING AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2015 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 6 D before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Copies emailed.(HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: 12/8/2015 Notice canceling hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE canceling Emergency Motion for Temporary Release on Bond Pending Sentencing and Request for Expedited Hearing scheduled for 12/10/15 as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. ctp (KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: [120] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Release on Bond PENDING SENTENCING AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING: Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (SMB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: 12/4/2015, Terminated: 12/14/2015 Motion for BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Release on Bond PENDING SENTENCING AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A")(Bergendahl, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 12/7/2015 (IGC). (Chambers notified)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015 Notice of rescheduling hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Sentencing hearing previously scheduled for December 30, 2015 is rescheduled as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. New hearing date and time:Sentencing set for 1/8/2016 at 10:00AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. CTP(DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER discharging the restraining order entered by this Court on June 4, 2014 (Doc. 23) and shall have no further force and effect as to Leonard G. Potillo, III - re [116] Stipulation filed by Leonard G. Potillo, III, USA. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/18/2015. (DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION by USA and Leonard G. Potillo, III for Release of Restraining Order (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 11/3/2015 (JET).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 Release of Lis Pendens
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS as to 3357 Park Grove Ct., Longwood, FL by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 10/28/2015 (JET).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 Release of Lis Pendens
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS as to 1882 Oakbrook Dr., Longwood, FL by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 10/28/2015 (JET).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Sentencing set for 12/30/2015 at 09:30AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. All Objections to the Pre-Sentence Report or Motions pertaining thereto shall be in writing and filed no later than three (3) days prior to the sentencing hearing. Counsel is to notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as soon as possible if they believe the sentencing will be longer than 30 minutes. CTP(DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015 Acceptance of pleaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ACCEPTANCE OF PLEA of guilty and adjudication of guilt re: Counts One and Two of the Superseding Information as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/14/2015. CTP (DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Notice of no objection to report and recommendation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of no objection re [109] Report and Recommendations concerning plea of guilty by Leonard G. Potillo, III. ctp (KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Notice of no objection to report and recommendation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of no objection re [109] Report and Recommendations concerning plea of guilty by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. ctp (KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015, Terminated: 10/14/2015 Report and Recommendations concerning plea of guiltyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS concerning Plea of Guilty re: count(s) One and Two of the Information as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/7/2015. ctp(KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Consent to Inspection of PSI
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT TO INSPECTION of Presentence Investigation Report by Leonard G. Potillo, III. ctp (KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Notice re: guilty plea
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE regarding plea of guilty furnished to counsel by Leonard G. Potillo, III. ctp (KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Acceptance of waiver of indictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ACCEPTANCE OF THE WAIVER OF INDICTMENT as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/7/2015. ctp (KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly: Initial Appearance on Information/Change of Plea Hearing as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 10/7/2015. (digital) (KKA) (KKA).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: re: [102] Information - Felony, [101] Plea Agreement. Arraignment set for 10/7/2015 at 2:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly., Change of Plea Hearing set for 10/7/2015 at 2:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. ctp (KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (GJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 information - felony
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INFORMATION (filed as Superseding Information) as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (1) Counts 1ss and 2ss. (GJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 plea agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLEA AGREEMENT re: count(s) One and Two of the Superseding Information as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Napier, Shawn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing 11/2/2015 in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. Status Conference set for 10/16/2015 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. CTP(DJD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER of speedy trial through November 30, 2015 by Leonard G. Potillo, III (NeJame, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case as to Leonard G. Potillo, III Reassigned to Judge John Antoon II. New case number: 6:14-cr-128-ORL-28GJK. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (RDO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF TRANSFER as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. This case is transferred to the Honorable District Judge John Antoon, II, with his consent for all further proceedings to include entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/11/2015. (MMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Notice of lis pendens
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS re-noticing as to 2106 SE 7 Street, Pompano Beach, FL by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Notice of lis pendens
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS re-noticing as to 3357 Park Grove Ct, Longwood, FL by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Notice of lis pendens
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Re-noticing as to 1882 Oakbrook Dr., Longwood, FL by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Nebesky, Suzanne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE to the NOVEMBER 2015 TRIAL TERM as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Jury Trial is continued to the November 2015 Trial term, term commencing 11/2/2015. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Notice canceling hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE as to Leonard G. Potillo, III cancelling Criminal Status Conference set for 9/14/2015 at 4:00 pm before Judge Byron and cancelling Jury Trial scheduled to commence on October 1, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Byron. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Order on motion to continue trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Daniel C. Irick appearing for USA. (Irick, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015, Terminated: 9/10/2015 Motion to Continue trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to continue trial by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Napier, Shawn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/3/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CRIMINAL PRETRIAL ORDER as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/3/2015. (RML)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 Notice of substitution of AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of substitution of AUSA. Shawn P. Napier substituting for AUSA David Haas. (Napier, Shawn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER of speedy trial through October 31, 2015 by Leonard G. Potillo, III (NeJame, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DATE CERTAIN JURY TRIAL as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Jury Trial shall commence Monday, 10/1/2015 at 9:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd., Orlando, Florida. Trial is estimated at (2) weeks. Defendant's presence is required. (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Order on motion to continue trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015, Terminated: 6/30/2015 Motion to Continue trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL JOINT MOTION to continue trial to the October 2015 Trial term by USA, Leonard G. Potillo, III as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry (TELEPHONIC CRIMINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron as to Leonard G. Potillo, III on 6/30/2015. This case is continued to the OCTOBER 2015 TRIAL TERM for the reasons stated on the record. The Court sets this case for a DATE CERTAIN trial date of OCTOBER 1, 2015 at 9:00 am. Trial is estimated at 2 weeks. A status conference will be held on September 14, 2015 at 4:00 pm. Defendant shall file a Waiver of Speedy Trial through October 31, 2015. Order to follow. Attorneys present: David Haas, John Bergendahl, Mark NeJame. Time: 10:05 am to 10:11 am. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Telephonic Status Conference is set for Tuesday, 6/30/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Byron, U.S. District Court, Orlando, Florida. Counsel are directed to appear by phone by calling the Toll Free Meeting Number 1-888-363-4735, Access Code 3126210 and Security Code 063015. Counsel are directed to call into the conference at least 4 minutes prior to hearing time.(NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: 6/24/2015 Notice canceling hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE cancelling the Criminal Status Conference scheduled for June 24, 2015 at 4:00 pm as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. The status conference will be rescheduled. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Notice canceling hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE cancelling Change of Plea hearing scheduled for June 24, 2015 at 4:00 pm as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. The Court will hold a Criminal Status Conference in its place. Defendant's presence is NOT required for the Status. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CRIMINAL STATUS CONFERENCE as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Status Conference is set for Wednesday, 6/24/2015 at 4:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd., Orlando, Florida. Defendant's presence is NOT required. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE RESCHEDULING CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Change of Plea Hearing is rescheduled for Wednesday, 6/24/2015 at 4:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd., Orlando, Florida. Defendant's presence is required. *(previously set for 5/27/15) (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry (CRIMINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron as to Leonard G. Potillo, III on 5/11/2015. Upon request of the parties the change of plea hearing set for May 27, 2015 at 3:00 pm is cancelled. The Court resets the "tentative" change of plea date for June 24, 2015 at 4:00 pm. This matter remains on the AUGUST 2015 TRIAL term. Attorneys present: David Haas, Mark NeJame, John Bergendahl. Time: 4:07 pm to 4:12 pm. Court Reporter: Kara Reynolds 407.847.0330 (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER of speedy trial through August 31, 2015 by Leonard G. Potillo, III (NeJame, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Order on motion to continue trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER GRANTING [73] Defendant's Oral Motion to continue trial as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Jury Trial is continued to the AUGUST 2015 TRIAL TERM, term commencing August 3, 2015 in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. A new Waiver of Speedy Trial through August 31, 2015 shall be filed. Status Conference is set for May 11, 2015 at 4:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. *May 27, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. is reserved for a Change of Plea hearing. Rendered in Open Court by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/16/2015. (NBL) *Modified to correct typing error for change of plea date on 3/17/2015 (NBL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Motion to Continue trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL MOTION to continue trial by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry (CRIMINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron as to Leonard G. Potillo, III on 3/16/2015. For the reasons stated on the record, this case is continued to the AUGUST 2015 Trial Term. Court directs filing of a new Waiver of Speedy Trial through August 31, 2015. Court sets a Status Conference date for May 11, 2015 at 4:00 pm, and a Change of Plea hearing date for May 27, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. Separate order/notice to issue. Attorneys present: David Haas, John Bergendahl, Mark NeJame. Time: 4:18 pm to 4:28 pm. Court Reporter: Diane Peede (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/reset hearings-PUBLIC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/reset hearings as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Change of Plea hearing date reserved for 5/27/2015 at 3:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER of speedy trial through July 31, 2015 by Leonard G. Potillo, III (NeJame, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John E. Bergendahl appearing for Leonard G. Potillo, III as Co-Counsel (Bergendahl, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Order on motion to continue trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER GRANTING [68] Defendan's Oral Motion to continue trial as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Jury Trial is continued to the APRIL 2015 TRIAL TERM, term commencing 4/6/2015 in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Status Conference is set for 3/16/2015 at 4:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Rendered in Open Court by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/17/2015. (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Motion to Continue trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL MOTION to continue trial by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Notice canceling hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE CANCELLING Jury trial scheduled for March 2, 2015 as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry (CRIMINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron as to Leonard G. Potillo, III on 2/17/2015. The date certain trial date of March 2, 2015 is cancelled. This case is continued to the APRIL 2015 trial term for the reasons stated on the record. Defendant shall file a new Waiver of Speedy trial. Attorneys present: David Haas, Mark NeJame. Time: Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Status Conference is reset for 2/17/2015 at 3:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd., Orlando, Florida. Defendant's presence IS NOT required. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [63] Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Status Conference as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). The status conference is rescheduled to February 17, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/14/2015. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/13/2015, Terminated: 1/14/2015 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Jancha, Ricky)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CRIMINAL STATUS CONFERENCE as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Status Conference set for Friday, 1/16/2015 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron,U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd., Orlando, Florida. Defendant's presence IS NOT required. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry (CRIMINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron as to Leonard G. Potillo, III on 12/22/2014. Trial remains set to commence March 2, 2015. Counsel now estimate trial at (2) weeks, rather than (4) weeks. Attorneys present: David Haas, Rick Jancha. Time: 9:38 am to 9:40 am. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Notice canceling hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE cancelling Criminal Status Conference scheduled for January 20, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. The Court has set this matter for a Status Conference on December 22, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. The Court will set a new January 2015 status conference date at the 12/22/14 status. (NBL) copies e-mailed *Modified on 11/25/2014 (NBL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CRIMINAL STATUS CONFERENCE as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Status Conference is set for Monday, 12/22/2014 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd., Orlando, Florida. Defendant's presence IS NOT required.(NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER of speedy trial through 4/30/15 by Leonard G. Potillo, III (Jancha, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly: ARRAIGNMENT as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1) Count 1-7, 1s-7s, 8-17, 8s-17s, 18-33, 18s-33s, 34s-37s held on 10/31/2014 Defendant(s) pled not guilty. (digital) (KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: re: [55] Superseding Indictment. Arraignment set for 10/31/2014 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 C before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. ctp(KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (1) counts 1s-7s, 8s-17s, 18s-33s and 34s-37s. (GJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF DATE CERTAIN JURY TRIAL as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Jury Trial shall commence on Monday, 3/2/2015 at 9:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd., Orlando, Florida. Trial is estimated at (4) weeks. Defendant's presence is required.(NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Order on motion to continue trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014, Terminated: 10/21/2014 Motion to Continue trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL MOTION to continue trial by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry (CRIMINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron as to Leonard G. Potillo, III on 10/21/2014. For the reasons stated on the record, this matter is continued to the MARCH 2015 TRIAL TERM, with a date certain trial setting of March 2, 2015 at 9:00 am. Defendant is directed to file a written Waiver of Speedy Trial through April 30, 2015. Attorneys present: David Haas, Rick Jancha. Time: 9:48 am to 9:57 am. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 order on motion to revokeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [47] Defendant's Motion to Revoke Order of Detention and Incorporated Memorandum of Law as to Leonard G. Potillo III. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/17/2014. (RML)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III re [47] MOTION to Revoke Order of Detention and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Haas, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Order no pdfCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER directing the United States of America to respond to [47] Defendant's Motion to Revoke Order of Detention on or before Monday, September 15, 2014. The Court will then set a detention hearing in this matter. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/9/2014. (RML)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014, Terminated: 9/17/2014 motion to revoke
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Revoke Order of Detention and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Jancha, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Treasury Process Receipt and Return executed as to service of Restraint Order issued by the Honorable Helene Di Salvo, J.S.C., Superior Court, District of Montreal on Leonard G. Potillo, III and Magnacarta Asset, LLC by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Andrejko, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Bill of particulars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BILL of particulars as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Andrejko, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ORDER as to Leonard G. Potillo, III re [43] Order on motion to continue trial. *Amended to include an "ends of justice" finding. This case is continued November 2014 trial term, with another status conference on October 21, 2014 at 9:15 am. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/28/2014. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 Order on motion to continue trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [41] Defendant's Oral Motion to continue trial as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Jury Trial is continued to the NOVEMBER 2014 TRIAL TERM, term commencing 11/3/2014 in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Another Status Conference is set for 10/21/2014 at 9:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/28/2014. (NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER of speedy trial through December 31, 2014 by Leonard G. Potillo, III (Jancha, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Motion to Continue trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL MOTION to continue trial by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry (CRIMINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron as to Leonard G. Potillo, III on 7/22/2014. Upon Defendant filing a Waiver of Speedy Trial through December 31, 2014 this matter will be continued to the NOVERMBER 2014 TRIAL TERM. The Waiver of Speedy Trial shall be filed on or before 8/4/2014. Until the Waiver is filed this matter will remain on the August 2014 trial term. Attorneys present: David Haas, Rick Jancha. Time: 10:46 am to 10:48 am. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (NBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Order on Motion To Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [37] Motion to Withdraw and Substition of Counsel as to Angela Parrott for defendant Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/9/2014. ctp (KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING as to Leonard Potillo: Jury Trial set for the August 2014 term commencing 8/4/2014 at 9:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Status Conference set for 7/22/2014 at 10:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron.(NBL) copies e-mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014, Terminated: 7/9/2014 Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to substitute attorney by Angela Parrott as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Parrott, Angela) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 7/3/2014 (LAK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER as to Leonard G. Potillo, III Status Conference set for 7/22/2014 at 10:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 7/1/2014. Copies emailed.(HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker: ARRAIGNMENT as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1) Count 1-7, 8-17, 18-33 held on 7/1/2014 Defendant(s) pled not guilty. (digital) (HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case as to Leonard G. Potillo, III Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:14-cr-128-Orl-40GJK. Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell no longer assigned to the case. (GJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Leonard G. Potillo, III: Arraignment set for 7/1/2014 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 D before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Copies emailed.(HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [25] Government's Motion to Unseal as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). The Clerk is directed to unseal these documents. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/27/2014. (BGS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rick Jancha appearing for Leonard G. Potillo, III (Jancha, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Court Reporter: Sandy Tremel (SKT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of detention hearing as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on June 12,2014 before Judge David A. Baker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sandy Tremel, Telephone number 407-245-3110, sandy.tremel@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/16/2014, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2014, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2014. (SKT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: 6/24/2014 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Angela Parrott appearing for Leonard G. Potillo, III (Parrott, Angela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: 6/18/2014 Order on motion to extend timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting [24] Motion to extend time as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/18/2014. ctp (KKA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document  Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document S-26. (MAA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014, Terminated: 6/27/2014 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically unseal Motion for Restraining Order and Restraining Order by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (MAA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: 6/13/2014, Terminated: 6/18/2014 Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to extend time to File Financial Accounting by Leonard G. Potillo, III. (Parrott, Angela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: 6/12/2014 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 6/12/2014. Copies emailed.(HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: 6/12/2014 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker: Detention Hearing as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 6/12/2014. (digital) (HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014 Notice of estimated length of trial by USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of estimated length of trial by USA. Estimated trial length: Seven days. (Haas, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by USA (Haas, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014 Notice of pendency of related cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of pendency of related cases re order of compliance to Local Rule as to Leonard G. Potillo, III by USA. Related case(s): No (Haas, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014 Notice of possible conflict of interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of possible conflict of interest by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III No conflict of interest. (Haas, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David L. Haas appearing for USA. (Haas, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014 warrant returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 6/9/14 as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (RDO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Order Setting HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing as to Leonard G. Potillo, III : Detention Hearing set for 6/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 D before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 6/9/2014. Copies emailed.(HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. Defendant is directed to file complete finiancial accounting UNDER SEAL by 6/16/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 6/9/2014. Copies emailed.(HSL) Modified on 6/10/2014 (MAA).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Leonard G. Potillo, III (HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker: Initial Appearance as to Leonard G. Potillo, III held on 6/9/2014. (digital) (HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Notice of lis pendens
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS as to 2106 SE 7 Street, Pompano Beach, FL by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Andrejko, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Notice of lis pendens
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS as to 3357 Park Grove Ct., Longwood, Florida by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Andrejko, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Notice of lis pendens
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS as to 1882 Oakbrook Dr., Longwood, Florida by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (Andrejko, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Arrest of Leonard G. Potillo, III on 6/9/14 (HSL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document  Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document S-23 (MAA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document  Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document S-22 (MAA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document  Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document S-21 (MAA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [2] Motion to Seal as to Leonard G. Potillo III (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/4/14. (RDO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Indictment and related documents filed by USA as to Leonard G. Potillo, III. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Leonard G. Potillo, III (1) count(s) 1-33. (RDO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document  Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document S-20 (MAA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 13,810 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?