United States v. The Real Property Located at 272 Old Montauk Highway, Montauk, New York 11954, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-01880
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 4:51 AM EDT (6.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura D. Mantell +1 718 254 6253 +1 718 254 6081 laura.mantell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian D. Morris +1 718 254 6512 +1 718 254 7489 brian.morris2@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin K. Orenstein +1 718 254 6188 +1 718 254 6321 karin.orenstein@usdoj.gov
No Logo CreXus S. Holdings, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Handy Culver, III +1 704 331 7400 +1 704 353 3153 john.culver@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanna Andrea Diakos +1 212 536 4807 +1 212 536 3901 joanna.diakos@klgates.com
No Logo Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morrison Cohen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Scott Lupion +1 212 735 8708 elupion@morrisoncohen.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yehuda David Scharf +1 212 735 8604 +1 212 735 8708 dscharf@morrisoncohen.com
No Logo OneWest Bank, FSB, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/15/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Nadel +1 212 801 2116 NADELS@GTLAW.COM
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric N. Whitney +1 212 801 9200 +1 212 801 6400 whitneye@gtlaw.com
v.
No Logo Any and All Shares of 93 Old Montauk Owners, Inc. Held in the Name of Brian Callahan and Sheri Callahan, Together with the Proprietary Lease for Cooperative Unit Salt Sea #4 at the Real Property, Defendant
No Logo Any and All Shares of 93 Old Montauk Owners, Inc. Held in the Name of Distinctive Ventures, LLC, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, Defendant
No Logo The Real Property Located at 272 Old Montauk Highway, Montauk, New York 11954, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, Defendant
No Logo The Real Property Located at 47 Clock Tower Lane, Old Westbury, New York 11568, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura D. Mantell +1 718 254 6253 +1 718 254 6081 laura.mantell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura D. Mantell +1 718 254 6253 +1 718 254 6081 laura.mantell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura D. Mantell +1 718 254 6253 +1 718 254 6081 laura.mantell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian D. Morris +1 718 254 6512 +1 718 254 7489 brian.morris2@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian D. Morris +1 718 254 6512 +1 718 254 7489 brian.morris2@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian D. Morris +1 718 254 6512 +1 718 254 7489 brian.morris2@usdoj.gov
Other Parties
No Logo CreXus S. Holdings, LLC, Claimant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alyssa Brooke Cohen +1 212 536 3928 +1 212 536 3901 alyssa.cohen@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Handy Culver, III +1 704 331 7400 +1 704 353 3153 john.culver@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanna Andrea Diakos +1 212 536 4807 +1 212 536 3901 joanna.diakos@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elise Margaret Gabriel +1 212 536 4854 elise.gabriel@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Adam Rogovin +1 212 536 3908 +1 212 536 3901 marc.rogovin@klgates.com
No Logo Denise L. Loring, Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise L. Loring +1 914 698 6291 +1 914 698 5847 deniselloring@gmail.com

Represented by Farrell Fritz, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/15/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P. Mulry +1 516 227 0620 +1 516 336 2262 kmulry@farrellfritz.com
No Logo Distinctive Investments LLC, Claimant

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert James Anello +1 212 880 9320 +1 212 856 9494 ranello@maglaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gates Salyers Hurand +1 212 880 9536 +1 212 856 9494 ghurand@maglaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Leonore Mogul +1 212 856 9600 +1 212 856 9494 jmogul@maglaw.com
No Logo Distinctive Ventures LLC, Claimant

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert James Anello +1 212 880 9320 +1 212 856 9494 ranello@maglaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gates Salyers Hurand +1 212 880 9536 +1 212 856 9494 ghurand@maglaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Leonore Mogul +1 212 856 9600 +1 212 856 9494 jmogul@maglaw.com
No Logo Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust, Claimant

Represented by Morrison Cohen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Scott Lupion +1 212 735 8708 elupion@morrisoncohen.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yehuda David Scharf +1 212 735 8604 +1 212 735 8708 dscharf@morrisoncohen.com
No Logo OneWest Bank, FSB, Claimant

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/06/2014 Rachel Lois Izower +1 212 801 6992 +1 212 805 9382 izowerr@gtlaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/15/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Nadel +1 212 801 2116 NADELS@GTLAW.COM
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric N. Whitney +1 212 801 9200 +1 212 801 6400 whitneye@gtlaw.com
No Logo Peter V. Pantaleo, Claimant

Represented by Farrell Fritz, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P. Mulry +1 516 227 0620 +1 516 336 2262 kmulry@farrellfritz.com
No Logo Sheri Manson Callahan, Claimant

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Knuts +1 646 200 6330 +1 646 200 6331 rknuts@parkjensen.com

Represented by Sher Tremonte LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Tremonte +1 212 202 2603 +1 212 202 4156 mtremonte@shertremonte.com
No Logo Jerry Keith Ostry, Interested Party

Represented by Jerry Keith Ostry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Keith Ostry +1 561 379 8608
No Logo Latus Partners LLC, Intervenor

Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Max Rosensaft +1 212 940 6631 +1 212 940 8776 michael.rosensaft@kattenlaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1345
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Timeline
  Entries (132) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 122 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion re 119 Letter MOTION to Compel the SEC and the Department of Justice to turn over all of the excess funds to the receivership and allow the receiver to pay me off whatever share was determined that I was entitled to as determined by the receiver determin filed by United States of America. (Orenstein, Karin) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re the government's 120 motion for an extension of time until 7/15/16 to file its letter response explaining what, if any, relief is available to Jerry Ostry. Request granted. Final extension. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 7/1/16. c/ecf. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order entered on June 29, 2016 by United States of America. (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 119 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION to Compel the SEC and the Department of Justice to turn over all of the excess funds to the receivership and allow the receiver to pay me off whatever share was determined that I was entitled to as determined by the receiver determination of my claim. Filed by Jerry Keith Ostry. (Coleman, Laurie) Modified on 7/27/2016 to correct date motion terminated. (Coleman, Laurie). (Entered: 06/29/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN by United States of America re 116 Decree of Forfeiture and Order for Delivery; Serve at USMS; Remarks: $139,254.79 transferred to AFF on Mar 21, 2016 $139,254.79 return to Sheri T. Manson-Callahanon on Mar 24, 2016. (Ortiz, Grisel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (USM-285 Form) by United States of America re 112 Decree of Forfeiture served at USMS. Remarks: $40,312.077.60 transferred to asset forfeiture fund on 3/21/16. (Coleman, Laurie) Modified on 3/30/2016 (Coleman, Laurie). (Entered: 03/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 114 Motion for Decree of Forfeiture and Order for Delivery; ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that pursuant to the Callahan Forfeiture Stipulation, upon the Court so-ordering this Decree of Forfeiture, Manson-Callahan shall submit a completed ACH form to the United States and the United States shall then return to Manson-Callahan the $139,254.79 (the "Released Funds"), less any debt owed to the United States, any agency of the United States, or any other debt which the United States is authorized to collect, in full and complete satisfaction of her claim to the Property; and it is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §§ 981(a)(l)(C) and 981(a)(1)(A), the Forfeited Funds are hereby forfeited and condemned to the use and benefit of the United States, and this action shall be discontinued as to the Trust and Mason-Callahan; and is it further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the District Court shall retain jurisdiction over this action to enforce this Decree of Forfeiture and Order of Delivery; and it is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Forfeited Funds shall be deposited into the Department of Justice, Assets Forfeiture Fund; and that the Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. See Order for further details. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 2/12/2016. Civil Case Terminated. Four (4) certified copies forwarded to Brian Gappa, Asset Forfeiture Specialist, U.S. Attorney's Office via inter-office mail on 2/16/16. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
Proposed MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Cover Letter for Docket Number 114 by United States of America. (Orenstein, Karin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
Proposed MOTION for Forfeiture of Property PROPOSED DECREE of FORFEITURE and ORDER for DELIVERY with respect to the real property and premises located at 47 Clock Tower Lane, Old Westbury, New York 11568 by United States of America. (Orenstein, Karin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: 1/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (USM-285 Form) by United States of America Re: Stipulation of Settlement. $40,312,077.69 deposited into SADF from interlocutory sale on 12/9/15. (Coleman, Laurie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Order - Decree of Forfeiture and Order of Delivery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
DECREE of Forfeiture and Order of Delivery. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 12/18/15. Certified copies mailed to Brian Gappa, Asset Forfeiture Specialist and Annaly and Gibraltar are dismissed from this action. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER dated 12/16/15 from Brian D. Morris, AUSA and Karin Orenstein, AUSA to Judge Spatt Re: The government requests that the Court enter the proposed Decree forfeiting the net proceeds of the Interlocutory Sale. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Order of Settlement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Re: STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT; Subject to the terms hereof, the Loring Claim and the government's Standing Submission shall each be deemed withdrawn without prejudice and costs, upon the Court's so-ordering of this Stipulation. See Order for further details. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 5/8/15. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Order of Settlement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Settlement and Interlocutory Sale. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 5/11/15. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Letter Requesting Entry of Stipulation of Settlement by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Morris, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER IN RE CASES RE-ASSIGNED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 AYS Rules) (Torres, Jasmine)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Letter Requesting Entry of Stipulation and Interlocutory Sale Order by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Interlocutory Sale) (Morris, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER - On April 3, 2015, this Court issued an order (the Recusal Order) of recusal from the above-captioned case. (Dkt. No. 104.) Subsequently, this action was reassigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. The Court has determined that it does not have a potential conflict of interest, and thus, the Recusal Order was made in error. Therefore, the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to vacate the 104 Recusal Order and subsequent reassignment to Judge Feuerstein. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 4/6/15. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF RECUSAL - I hereby recuse myself from the above-captioned case. Judge Arthur D. Spatt recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein for all further proceedings. Type of Recusal Attorney. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 4/3/2015. (Coleman, Laurie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by United States of America (Orenstein, Karin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Elise Margaret Gabriel on behalf of CreXus S. Holdings, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Gabriel, Elise)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Order Reopening Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REOPENING CASE Re: 100 Status Report in Compliance with Order entered on August 1, 2014 - The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reopen this case and to assign Judge Tomlinson as the Magistrate Judge for this case. Should the parties wish to request a settlement conference, they should direct their request to Judge Tomlinson. The Government is directed to file a Status Report within thirty days of the date of this Order. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/9/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT in Compliance with Order entered on August 1, 2014 (dkt. #96) by United States of America (Orenstein, Karin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Re: 97 Motion for Robert J. Anello, Judith L. Mogul, and Gates Hurand to withdraw as counsel for claimants Distinctive Ventures, LLC and Distinctive Investments, LLC, and the discontinuance of the transmission of Notice of Electronic Filings in the captioned matter. Motion granted. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 8/21/14. Attorney Judith L. Mogul; Robert J. Anello and Gates Salyers Hurand terminated. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION re 97 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC (Hurand, Gates)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC. (Hurand, Gates)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDERED that request is granted. The govt is directed to file a status report within 30 days of the date of this order. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 8/1/2014. (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT in Compliance with Order entered on June 27, 2014 (Dkt. #94) by United States of America (Morris, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STATUS REPORT ORDER Re: 93 Status report requesting an additional thirty days to file a further status report with the Court in regards to the consensual interlocutory sale of the Distinctive Shares and the Unsold Units. Request granted. The parties are directed to submit a status report on or before 7/28/14. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 6/27/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT in Compliance with Order entered on June 6, 2014 (Dkt. #92) by United States of America (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Re: 91 Status Report requesting an additional period of thirty days to file a further status report in regards to the consensual interlocutory sale of the Distinctive Shares. Request granted. The government is directed to submit a status report on or before 6/28/14. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 6/6/2014. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT in Compliance with Order entered on April 29, 2014 (Dkt. #88) by United States of America (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Re: 89 Letter requesting to remove Rachel Louis Izower-Fadde as counsel of record for One West Bank. Request granted. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 5/6/14. Attorney Rachel Lois Izower-Fadde terminated. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter requesting that Rachel Lois Izower-Fadde be removed as attorney of record from this action by OneWest Bank, F.S.B. (Whitney, Eric) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Re: 87 Status Report and request for an additional period of thirty days to file a further status report with regards to the consensual interlocutory sale of the Distinctive Shares - Request granted. The government is directed to submit a status report on or before 5/28/14. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 4/29/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT in Compliance with Order entered on March 27, 2014 (Dkt. #82) by United States of America (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: to the extend the Trust seeks to be substituted as a claimant in this action in place of Denise Loring, the Trust is directed to file a motion.. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 4/17/2014. (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Ltr of Denise L. Loring to Judge Spatt dated 4/14/14 in response to the Court's 3/15/14 Order. (Attachments: #(1) Notice of Appearance) (Mulry, Kevin) Modified docket text and order of documents attached on 4/14/2014 (Mahon, Cinthia). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter Requesting Conference in Regards to Submission by HFZ Capital Group, LLC dated March 27, 2014 by United States of America (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC (Attachments: # 1 Supplement) (Hurand, Gates) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER - For these reasons and given that the Contract is subject to the Courts approval, the Court declines to approve the Contract entered into by HFZ and the Receiver and orders that it is set aside. In addition, the Court modifies the June 4, 2012 Order as follows: (1) the Court removes the Notes from the Receivership Estate; and (2) the Court withdraws the Receivers authority to sell the Notes. The Government is directed to proceed forward with the Proposal and to provide the Court with a status report within thirty days of the date of this Order. See Order for further details. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 3/27/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Re: 80 Letter Pursuant to Court's February 22, 2014 Ruling on Government's Application for Interlocutory Sale and Order directing Distinctive Claimants to produce an accounting of revenue and expenses associated with the Montauk Property. Request granted. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 3/22/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter Pursuant to Court's February 22, 2014 Ruling on Government's Application for Interlocutory Sale and Order directing Distinctive Claimants to produce an accounting of revenue and expenses associated with the Montauk Property by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC (Hurand, Gates) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter Pursuant to Court's February 22, 2014 Ruling on Government's Application for Interlocutory Sale by United States of America (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Arthur D. Spatt: Civil Cause for Pre-Motion Conference held on 3/13/14 from 1:30 p.m. - 2:34 p.m.. Court Reporter: Dominick Tursi. Case called. Conference held. Rulings on the record. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Re: 75 Letter confirming, Farrell Fritz, P.C.'s, request to withraw as counsel for claimant Denise Loring - Request granted. Denise Loring is directed to notify the Court on or before 4/16/14 whether she has obtained new counsel; intends to proceed pro se, or without counsel; or wishes to withdraw her claim. Farrell Fritz, PC is directed to serve this Order on Denise Loring within one week of the date of this Order. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 3/15/14. Attorney Kevin Patrick Mulry terminated for Denise Loring.. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Adam Rogovin on behalf of CreXus S. Holdings, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Rogovin, Marc) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to Honorable Arthur D. Spatt, dated March 14, 2014, Confirming, Farrell Fritz, P.C.'s, Request to Withraw as Counsel for Claimant Denise Loring, and that Request was Granted by the Court, by Denise L. Loring (Mulry, Kevin) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 70 Letter requesting a pre-motion conference. The parties are directed to appear for a pre-motion conference on 3/13/14 at 11:30 a.m. The receiver is enjoined from signing any contract with HFZ or from taking any further steps to sell the unsecured notes until after the pre-motion conference is held. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 3/8/14. ( Pre-Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Arthur D. Spatt.) (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Gates Salyers Hurand on behalf of Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC (aty to be noticed) (Hurand, Gates) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Judith L. Mogul on behalf of Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC (aty to be noticed) (Mogul, Judith) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Anello on behalf of Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC (aty to be noticed) (Anello, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter requesting premotion conference by United States of America (Orenstein, Karin) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER denying 50 Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property - It is hereby ORDERED that an interlocutory sale of the Montauk property is both appropriate and necessary in this case pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 981(g)(6) and Supplemental Rule G(7); and it is further ORDERED, that because the Court finds that the Government and HFZ-BGSs sale is commercially unreasonable, the Court denies the Governments motion without prejudice and permits the Government and HFZ-BGS to submit a revised proposal for the sale of the Montauk Property within thirty days of the date of this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that the Distinctive Claimants are directed to produce an accounting of revenue and expenses associated with the Montauk Property within thirty days of the date of this Order and to tender all excess income to the United States Marshals Service; and it is further ORDERED, that the letter motion by Latus seeking to intervene in this civil forfeiture action is denied. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 2/22/2014. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Re: 66 Stipulation and Order. 1/24/14 $278,509.58 deposited into the Seized Asset Deposit Fund. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER - The parties stipulate and agree to the withdrawal of the motion for interlocutory sale of as to the property located at 47 Clock Tower Lane, Old Westbury, New York, so that the Proposed Sale of the Property may proceed on consent in accordance with the terms as further set forth herein. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 1/23/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter Enclosing Proposed Stipulation and Order by Sheri Manson Callahan (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Order) (Tremonte, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY in Opposition re 64 Response to Motion filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Steven Weinberg)) (Orenstein, Karin) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion re 50 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property filed by Latus Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Rosensaft, Michael) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Max Rosensaft on behalf of Latus Partners LLC (aty to be noticed) (Rosensaft, Michael) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY in Support re 50 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property filed by United States of America. (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Karin K. Orenstein on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Orenstein, Karin) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property filed by Sheri Manson Callahan. (Tremonte, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property filed by Sheri Manson Callahan. (Tremonte, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property by Harvey O'Brien filed by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property by Andrew J. Frisch filed by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18) (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property filed by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter by Any and All Shares of 93 Old Montauk Owners, Inc. Held in the Name of Distinctive Ventures, LLC, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC, The Real Property Located at 272 Old Montauk Highway, Montauk, New York 11954, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion re 50 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property Notice of Joinder in this Motion filed by OneWest Bank, F.S.B.. (Whitney, Eric) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion re 50 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property filed by CreXus S. Holdings, LLC. (Culver, John) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter in Response to May 20, 2013 Letter of Andrew Frisch by CreXus S. Holdings, LLC (Culver, John) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter by Any and All Shares of 93 Old Montauk Owners, Inc. Held in the Name of Distinctive Ventures, LLC, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC, The Real Property Located at 272 Old Montauk Highway, Montauk, New York 11954, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto (Attachments: # 1 Government Letter) (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Property by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Assistant United States Attorney Brian D. Morris, # 3 Proposed Order) (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT in Compliance with January 18, 2013 Order by United States of America (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Lois Izower-Fadde on behalf of OneWest Bank, F.S.B. (aty to be noticed) (Izower-Fadde, Rachel) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLAIM by Denise L. Loring. (Mulry, Kevin) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Consent MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding Due to Pendency of Related Criminal Investigation, MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled For January 24, 2013 Before Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle by United States of America. (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Steven M. Nadel by OneWest Bank, F.S.B.. (Nadel, Steven) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Sheri Manson Callahan. (Tremonte, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION Extending Time to File Verified Claim, dated November 19, 2012 by Denise L. Loring, Peter V. Pantaleo (Mulry, Kevin) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION Letter to the Hon. Leonard D. Wexler Enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint by Sheri Manson Callahan, Letter by Sheri Manson Callahan (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order) (Tremonte, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to the Hon. Leonard D. Wexler Enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint by Sheri Manson Callahan (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order) (Tremonte, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION requesting an adjournment of the initial conference from Spetember 28 to October 10, 2012 due to a scheduling conflict by Gibraltar Private Bank and Trust (Lupion, Evan) Modified on 9/21/2012 (Lundy, Lisa). (Entered: 09/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION Extending Time to File Verified Claim, dated September 19, 2012, by Denise L. Loring, Peter V. Pantaleo (Mulry, Kevin) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Nadel on behalf of OneWest Bank, F.S.B. (aty to be noticed) (Nadel, Steven) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/18/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle. Counsel for plaintiff(s) or plaintiff pro se is obligated to serve a copy of this order on each defendant. See order for further instructions.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 9/13/2012. (Lundy, Lisa) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RECUSAL ORDER; That the undersigned hereby recuses himself from this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455 (a) and it is requested that the Clerk of the Court reassign this matter to another Magistrate Judge in the ordinary course of business. Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle for all further proceedings Type of Recusal Attorney( Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/22/2012.) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to the Hon. Leonard D. Wexler Enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint by Sheri Manson Callahan (Tremonte, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLAIM Amended Verified Claim - Admiralty and Maritime Claim Pursuant to FRCP G(5) by CreXus S. Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Note, # 2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, # 3 Exhibit C - Pledge and Security Agreement, # 4 Exhibit D - Release, # 5 Exhibit E - Apartment property) (Culver, John) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: An initial conference is scheduled on 9/18/2012. See order and attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/20/2012. (Attachments: # 1 GRB Individual Rules) (Brienza, Lauren) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America by Gibraltar Private Bank and Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lupion, Evan) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Culver on behalf of CreXus S. Holdings, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Culver, John) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re 25 Stipulation; That the time for Claimants, Peter V. Pantaleo andDenise L. Loring, ("Claimants"), to file a verified claim with respect to the defendant properties in rem is hereby extended to and including September 21, 2012.( Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 7/18/2012.) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America by OneWest Bank, F.S.B.. (Whitney, Eric) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION Extending Time to File Verified Claim, dated July 16, 2012, by Peter V. Pantaleo, Denise L. Loring (Mulry, Kevin) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America by CreXus S. Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Diakos, Joanna) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER re [20-1] Proposed Order, and 1 Complaint; That the time for Claimant Sheri Manson Callahan to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned matter is extended to and including August 30, 2012.( Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 6/28/2012.) c/m (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Gibraltar Private Bank and Trust. (Scharf, Yehuda) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLAIM Verified Caim of OneWestBank, FSB Pursuant to Rule G(5) of the Supplemental Rules by OneWest Bank, F.S.B.. (Whitney, Eric) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to the Hon. Leonard D. Wexler Enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint by Sheri Manson Callahan (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Tremonte, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION, Legal Notice was published on the government website, www.forfeiture.gov from May 25, 2012 through and including June 23, 2012 (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim by OneWest Bank, F.S.B.. (Whitney, Eric) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Nevins Whitney on behalf of OneWest Bank, F.S.B. (aty to be noticed) (Whitney, Eric) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Distinctive Investments LLC, Distinctive Ventures LLC. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , John H. Culver Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-5557802. by CreXus S. Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Cohen, Alyssa) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO ANSWER RE: 6 STIPULATION and (proposed) Order to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint; That the time for Claimant CreXus S Holdings, LLC, to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including July 5, 2012; CreXus S. Holdings, LLC answer due 7/5/2012; ( Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 6/18/2012.) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Tremonte on behalf of Sheri Manson Callahan (aty to be noticed) (Tremonte, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLAIM Notice of Claim by Sheri Manson Callahan. (Knuts, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Scott Lupion on behalf of Gibraltar Private Bank and Trust (aty to be noticed) (Lupion, Evan) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLAIM Verified by Gibraltar Private Bank and Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Scharf, Yehuda) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Yehuda David Scharf on behalf of Gibraltar Private Bank and Trust (aty to be noticed) (Scharf, Yehuda) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Any and All Shares of 93 Old Montauk Owners, Inc. Held in the Name of Distinctive Ventures, LLC, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, The Real Property Located at 272 Old Montauk Highway, Montauk, New York 11954, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Any and All Shares of 93 Old Montauk Owners, Inc. Held in the Name of Distinctive Ventures, LLC, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, The Real Property Located at 272 Old Montauk Highway, Montauk, New York 11954, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION and Order to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including July 5, 2012 by CreXus S. Holdings, LLC (Cohen, Alyssa) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to the Honorable Leonard D. Wexler by CreXus S. Holdings, LLC (Cohen, Alyssa) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLAIM Verified Claim of CreXus S. Holdings, LLC Pursuant to Rule G(5) of Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims by CreXus S. Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Cohen, Alyssa) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CreXus S. Holdings, LLC re 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Cohen, Alyssa) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CreXus S. Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CreXus Investment Corp. for CreXus S. Holdings, LLC. (Cohen, Alyssa) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT IN REM against Any and All Shares of 93 Old Montauk Owners, Inc. Held in the Name of Brian Callahan and Sheri Callahan, Together with the Proprietary Lease for Cooperative Unit Salt Sea #4 at the Real Property, Any and All Shares of 93 Old Montauk Owners, Inc. Held in the Name of Distinctive Ventures, LLC, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, The Real Property Located at 272 Old Montauk Highway, Montauk, New York 11954, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, The Real Property Located at 47 Clock Tower Lane, Old Westbury, New York 11568, and All Proceeds Traceable Thereto Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Related Case Letter, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 15 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?