Colon v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00325
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2019 at 4:44 PM EDT (5.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Arlene Davis, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Rush +1 813 963 1586 +1 813 265 2041 bpr.tampa@verizon.net

Represented by jowdylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Jowdy +1 203 792 1677
No Logo Milton Omar Colon, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Rush +1 813 963 1586 +1 813 265 2041 bpr.tampa@verizon.net

Represented by jowdylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Jowdy +1 203 792 1677
v.
No Logo DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION, Defendant

Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Jordano +1 860 808 5160 +1 860 808 5384 joseph.jordano@ct.gov
No Logo Metro-north Commuter Railroad Co., Defendant
Officially listed as "Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company"

Represented by Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gina Marie Von Oehsen +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 gvo@ryandelucalaw.com

Represented by Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP - Stamford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles A. Deluca +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 cdeluca@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beck S. Fineman +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 bsfineman@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert O. Hickey +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 rohickey@ryandelucalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas S. Lambert +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 tslambert@ryandelucalaw.com
Metropolitan Transportation Authority Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Defendant

Represented by Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP - Stamford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles A. Deluca +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 cdeluca@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beck S. Fineman +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 bsfineman@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert O. Hickey +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 rohickey@ryandelucalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas S. Lambert +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 tslambert@ryandelucalaw.com
Other Parties
No Logo Metro-north Commuter Railroad Co., ThirdParty Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Rush +1 813 963 1586 +1 813 265 2041 bpr.tampa@verizon.net

Represented by Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP - Stamford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles A. Deluca +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 cdeluca@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beck S. Fineman +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 bsfineman@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert O. Hickey +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 rohickey@ryandelucalaw.com
Metropolitan Transportation Authority Metropolitan Transportation Authority, ThirdParty Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Rush +1 813 963 1586 +1 813 265 2041 bpr.tampa@verizon.net

Represented by Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP - Stamford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles A. Deluca +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 cdeluca@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beck S. Fineman +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 bsfineman@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert O. Hickey +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 rohickey@ryandelucalaw.com
No Logo United Illuminating Company, ThirdParty Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Rush +1 813 963 1586 +1 813 265 2041 bpr.tampa@verizon.net

Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Efrem Ringold +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 jringold@lflaw.com

Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Glen Pierson +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 gpierson@lflaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Phillip Reed +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 creed@lflaw.com
Attributes
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Timeline
  Entries (550) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Page 1 Page 2

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on April 30, 2018 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2018. (Huntington, D.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re: 535 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Potter, A.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Notice of appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ACTDC-4876532. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re: 532 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Potter, A.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis re 532 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Notice of appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 528 Order on Motion for New Trial, 510 Judgment, 531 Judgment, by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ACTDC-4875439. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 judgment
FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, United Illuminating Company, Dept of Transportation against Arlene Davis, Milton Omar Colon.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2018.(Gutierrez, Y.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall close this case, and enter final judgment. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/23/2018. (Black, R.) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Order on Motion for JudgmentCourt Filing
RULING ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, the motion for judgment as to the third-party claim by third-party plaintiffs Metro-North and the MTA (Doc. # 514 ) is DENIED, and the motion for judgment as to the third-party claim by third-party defendant UI (Doc. # 520 ) is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/22/2018. (Black, R.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Order on Motion for New TrialCourt Filing
RULING DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, plaintiffs' motion for a new trial (Doc. # 511 ) is DENIED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/22/2018. (Black, R.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Motion Hearing held on 4/30/2018; taking under advisement 511 Motion for New Trial; taking under advisement 514 Motion for Judgment; taking under advisement 520 Motion for Judgment. Total Time: 1 hours and 29 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER revoking 379 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Margolis. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/18.(Bauer, J.) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 524 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gina M. Von Oehsen terminated. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/16/18. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Gina Von Oehsen to Withdraw as Attorney by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Von Oehsen, Gina)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Motion Hearing re: 514 MOTION for Judgment in Defendants' Favor on Third Party Complaint, 511 MOTION for New Trial, 520 Cross MOTION for Judgment in UI's favor on Third Party Complaint.( Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 520 Cross MOTION for Judgment in UI's favor on Third Party Complaint filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 520 Cross MOTION for Judgment in UI's favor on Third Party Complaint filed by United Illuminating Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Trial Exhibit 607), # 2 Exhibit B (RFA responses))(Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
Cross MOTION for Judgment in UI's favor on Third Party Complaint by United Illuminating Company.Responses due by 2/2/2018 (Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 516 Objection, 518 Objection, 517 Memorandum in Support of Motion for New Trial filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 511 MOTION for New Trial filed by United Illuminating Company. (Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 511 MOTION for New Trial filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Hickey, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Hickey, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 514 MOTION for Judgment in Defendants' Favor on Third Party Complaint filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Judgment in Defendants' Favor on Third Party Complaint by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 12/21/2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 397 Motion pretrial conference issues. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/9/2017. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 511 MOTION for New Trial filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for New Trial by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PARTIAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority against Arlene Davis, Milton Omar Colon.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2017.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL JUDGMENT. For the reasons stated in the attached order, defendants' motion for entry of judgment (Doc. #[5064) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall enter separate judgment with respect to plaintiffs Omar Colon and Arlene Davis's claims against defendants Metro-North and the MTA. Plaintiffs shall thereupon file any post-trial motions that they wish to file within the time limits set forth in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. As for the third-party claim, in accordance with the schedule proposed by Metro-North, MTA, and UI, defendants shall file their briefing by November 30, 2017; UI's briefing by January 15, 2018; and defendants' reply briefing by January 31, 2018. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/13/2017. (Black, R.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2017: # 2 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Gutierrez, Y.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RULING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AS TO LIABILITY UNDER THE KNOWN TRESPASSER AND CHILD TRESPASSER RULES. For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, defendants Metro-North and MTA's motion for judgment as a matter of law (Doc. # 471 ) is GRANTED as to plaintiffs' claims under the known trespasser and child trespasser rules. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/13/2017. (Black, R.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 504 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines as to 504 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Responses due by 9/25/2017 (Potter, A.) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER-Plaintiff is requested to file any objection or response to defendants' motion for entry of judgment (Doc. # 504 ) by September 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/19/17.(Potter, A.) Modified on 9/19/2017 (Potter, A.). (Entered: 09/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Docket Entry Correction- Entered on the wrong case re 502 Jury Verdict (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ENTERED IN ERROR - JURY VERDICT with foreperson's signature redacted for Daniel R. Conklin, Rentkowicz against Dennis R. Serfilippi. (Gutierrez, Y.) Modified on 9/13/2017 (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 09/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Excerpt of Jury Trial - Closing Arugment by Defendants and Third-Party Plaintiffs. Held on August 21, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Acknowledgment of Receipt of exhibits filed by United Illuminating Company. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Exhibits filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Gutierrez, Y.). Modified on 8/28/2017 (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Exhibits by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Marked Court Exhibit and Witness List. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Jury Instructions. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JURY VERDICT Unredacted with FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE. Access to the pdf document is restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(e). (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 494 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JURY VERDICT with foreperson's signature redacted for Defendants against Plaintiff. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial completed on 8/22/2017. Total Time: 9 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial held on 8/21/2017. Jury Trial Continued Until 8/22/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 6 hours and 27 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume X. Held on August 18, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume IX. Held on August 17, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume VIII - P.M. Session. Held on August 16, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume VIII - A.M. Session. Held on August 16, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume VII - P.M. Session. Held on August 15, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume VII - A.M. Session. Held on August 15, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume VI - P.M. Session. Held on August 14, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume VI - A.M. Session. Held on August 14, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume V. Held on August 11, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume IV. Held on August 10, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume III. Held on August 9, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume II. Held on August 8, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume I. Held on August 7, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Charge Conference held only on 8/18/2017. Jury Trial Continued Until 8/21/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 1 hours and 47 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SECOND MEMORANDUM RE CONTRIBUTORY NEGLIGENCE INSTRUCTION. The Court concludes in light of defendants' submissions (# 475 and # 476 ) that it should not instruct the jury on a subjective standard of negligence as proposed in its prior memorandum (#474). The Court concludes in light of the Connecticut Supreme Court's decision in Polmatier v. Russ, 206 Conn. 229 (1988), that the Supreme Court of Connecticut would follow the ordinary-reasonable-person standard as stated in the Restatement (Second) of Torts § 283B and that this standard should also apply to claims for contributory negligence for the reasons well-stated by the Wisconsin Supreme Court in Jankee v. Clark County, 235 Wis. 700, 745-50 (2000). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/21/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 8/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 474 Notice,,,,,,,,, (contib. negligence, joining MN brief) filed by United Illuminating Company. (Ringold, James) (Entered: 08/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 8/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 474 Notice,,,,,,,,, filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 08/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM RE CONTRIBUTORY NEGLIGENCE INSTRUCTION. At today's charge conference, Metro-North, MTA, and UI contended that the contributory negligence standard should incorporate an objectively reasonable person standard and not take into any account any evidence of plaintiff's diminished capacity. The Court's further research suggests that it may be appropriate for the contributory negligence instruction to be based on a standard that reflects any diminished mental capacity to the extent that such diminished capacity is not attributable to the use of illicit drugs. See, e.g., Banks by Banks v. U.S., 969 F.Supp. 884, 893 (S.D.N.Y. 1997) ("plaintiff with diminished mental capacity may not be held to any greater degree of care for his own safety than that which he is capable of exercising"); Stacy v. Jedco Const., Inc., 119 N.C.App. 115, 120 (N.C. 1995) (collecting cases for the proposition "that one whose mental faculties are diminished, not amounting to total insanity, is capable of contributory negligence, but is not held to the objective reasonable person standard" and that "such a person should be held only to the exercise of such care as he was capable of exercising, i.e., the standard of care of a person of like mental capacity under similar circumstances"); Callahan v. State, 2004 WL 503754, at *2 (Conn.Super. 2004) ("When evaluating the applicability of a contributory negligence defense in a mentally ill plaintiff, the modern trend appears to favor the use of a capacity-based standard... This standard tolerates a reduced standard of care for such persons"); cf. Stafford v. Roadway, 312 Conn. 184, 191-94 (2014) (contributory negligence standard may account for childs diminished capacity but alcohol intoxication does not relieve minor from contributory negligence charge). The Court has circulated a revised jury charge to the parties that includes a substantially revised contributory negligence charge. The parties are invited to submit any additional argument or precedent by 4:00pm tomorrow (Saturday) concerning this charge or other aspects of the Court's revised jury charge. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/18/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE. Today the Court held a charge conference. Attached are the initial drafts of the jury instructions and the jury verdict form used at the charge conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/18/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Jury Verdict Form) (Black, R.) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial & Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2017; denying 470 Motion for Directed Verdict; taking under advisement 471 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Jury Trial Continued Until 8/21/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 2 hours and 39 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) Modified on 8/21/2017 to add the correct hearing date(Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 08/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation, United Illuminating Company. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORAL MOTION for Directed Verdict by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation, United Illuminating Company. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions by United Illuminating Company. (Ringold, James) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Verdict Form by United Illuminating Company. (Ringold, James) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial Motion Hearing held on 8/16/2017; denying 466 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; Jury Trial Continued Until 8/17/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 6 hours and 24 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington and Sharon Montini.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation, United Illuminating Company. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Verdict Form by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial held on 8/15/2017. Jury Trial Continued Until 8/16/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 7 hours and 3 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington and Sharon Montini.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial held on 8/14/2017. Jury Trial Continued Until 8/15/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 6 hours and 43 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington & Sharon Montini.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE (# 456 AND # 458 ). The Court has granted in part and denied in part the pending motions in limine as set forth by the Court on the record and following oral argument during trial proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/15/2017. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial held on 8/11/2017. Jury Trial Continued Until 8/14/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 7 hours and 14 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 8/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine re: striking a portion of Dr. Stern's redirect examination by United Illuminating Company.Responses due by 9/3/2017 (Ringold, James) (Entered: 08/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial held on 8/10/2017. Jury Trial Continued Until 8/11/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 6 hours and 53 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine re Doody Testimony by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 8/31/2017 (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Settlement Conference held on 8/10/2017. Total Time: 0 hours and 50 minutes. (Saffir, Jaclyn) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial and Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2017 re 316 MOTION in Limine re: precluding expert evidence that UI Transmission System caused a sensation in Colon and/or his fall filed by United Illuminating Company. Jury Trial Continued Until 8/10/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 6 hours and 41 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RULING DENYING MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY EXPERT TESTIMONY THAT U.I.'S TRANSMISSION SYSTEM CAUSED A SENSATION IN MR. COLON AND/OR THAT IT DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY CAUSED HIS FALL. For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, UI's motion in limine (Doc. # 316 ) is DENIED. Dr. Stern will be permitted to testify concerning his opinions about what caused any electrical shock to plaintiff Colon, including his views concerning the likelihood or probability that UI's wires caused or contributed to any electric shock/sensation experienced by Colon. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/9/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial held on 8/8/2017. Jury Trial Continued Until 8/9/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 6 hours and 19 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial held on 8/7/2017; Jury Trial Continued Until 8/8/2017 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 6 hours and 55 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING PART MOTIONS TO QUASH. Defendants Metro-North and MTA, third-party defendant UI, and non-party Connecticut Department of Transportation have all moved to quash various subpoenas served on them by plaintiffs. See Docs. # 417 , # 437 , # 444 . To the extent that the subpoenas have been served on natural persons and call for those persons to testify in personam, the motions to quash are DENIED without prejudice to renewal on grounds of cumulative testimony or other unfair prejudice in light of the testimony of other witnesses. Plaintiff's counsel shall ensure that he communicates clearly with each of these named witnesses (or their legal representatives) concerning the dates when their testimony will actually be needed. To the extent that the subpoenas seek to compel the attendance of a corporate representative to testify on a range of listed subject matters rather than of a specific named person as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45, the motions to quash are GRANTED. A trial subpoena under Rule 45 may not be used to compel a corporate representative to testify in a manner analogous to Rule 30(b)(6). See Hill v. Homeward Residential, Inc., 799 F.3d 544, 552-53 (6th Cir. 2015); Donoghue v. Orange County, 848 F.2d 926, 931-32 (9th Cir. 1987). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/7/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 8/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 444 MOTION to Quash , 418 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 417 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas, 437 MOTION to Quash and/or Modify Corporate Rep. Subpoenas filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 08/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RULING GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING R.C.S.A. § 16-11-102. For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, defendants' motion in limine (Doc. # 329 ) regarding R.C.S.A. § 16-11-102(a) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are precluded from offering at trial any evidence, testimony, or argument regarding R.C.S.A. § 16-11-102. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/4/2017. (Black, R.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ORAL MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT: The Court GRANTS plaintiffs' oral motion (Doc. # 445 ) to amend their complaint to add Capital First Trust Company as a plaintiff in its capacity as conservator of plaintiff Colon's estate. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/4/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing held on 8/3/2017; granting absent objection 384 Motion for Order; granting in part and denying in part 417 Motion to Quash; denying as moot 427 Motion in Limine; withdrawing 428 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 437 Motion to Quash; taking under advisement 445 Motion to Amend/Correct; taking under advisement 316 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 329 Motion in Limine. Total Time: 2 hours and 24 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORAL MOTION to Amend 69 Amended Complaint by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Quash by United Illuminating Company.Responses due by 8/25/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a, # 2 Exhibit b, # 3 Exhibit c)(Conway, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Jury Selection
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 443 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Supplemental Jury Selection held on 8/3/2017. Total Time: 2 hours and 51 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Transcript of Alisa Savetamal, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RULING DENYING DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS. For the reasons given in the attached ruling, defendant MTA's motion to dismiss is DENIED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/3/2017. (Black, R.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/11/2017. Total Time: 12 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RULING GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND EXCLUDING FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION CASUALTY REPORTS. For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, defendant's motion for reconsideration (Doc. # 411 ) is GRANTED. The Court excludes from evidence the Federal Railroad Administration casualty reports and related summaries (Plaintiffs Exhibits #27 and #28 and underlying data) as well as any other evidence of injuries along the Metro-North rail line in the absence of a showing that these additional casualty incidents occurred under substantially similar circumstances as the incident at issue in this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/2/2017. (Black, R.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2017 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Quash and/or Modify Corporate Rep. Subpoenas by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 8/23/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
TRIAL MEMO Plaintiffs' Statement regarding Interpreter at Trial by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
TRIAL MEMO re Proposal for Court's Opening Statement by United Illuminating Company. (Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF HEARING - ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE TO 423 Order to Show Cause,,,,, by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 426 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Lambert, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Jury Selection set for 8/3/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE. The Court shall conduct a pre-trial conference at 1:00 p.m. on Thursday, August 3, 2017, to address the Department of Transportation's motion to quash or modify subpoenas (Doc. #417), as well as any remaining issues that need to be addressed before the start of trial. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/1/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS'S MOTION REGARDING ARGUMENTS CONCERNING DEFENDANTS' CONDUCT (Doc. # 398 ). The Court DENIES defendants' motion in limine regarding potential arguments by plaintiffs concerning defendants' conduct as moot. In light of plaintiffs' representations in their memorandum in opposition to the motion (Doc. # 409 ), it does not appear that plaintiffs intend to make the sort of improper arguments addressed in defendants' motion. The Court denies this motion without prejudice to defendants' ability to object at trial should plaintiff's counsel stray into forbidden territory at trial. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/1/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
Amended MOTION in Limine Absence of Trash from Ancient Landfill by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 8/22/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Absence of Trash from Ancient Landfill by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 8/22/2017 (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Reconsideration re 381 Order on Motion for Conference,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 413 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One and Three of Amended Complaint filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
TRIAL MEMO Amended Plaintiffs' Proposal for Court's Opening Statement by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF COLON'S CONSERVATOR SHOULD NOT BE SUBSTITUTED AS A PARTY IN PLACE OF PLAINTIFF COLON. On June 22, 2017, the Connecticut Probate Court appointed conservators of the person and of the estate of plaintiff Omar Colon. See Doc. #410-1. Rule 17 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure provides in part that the capacity of a person to sue is determined by state law. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(b). Under Connecticut law, conserved persons are in general not competent to sue or be sued. See Cottrell v. Connecticut Bank & Trust Co., 175 Conn. 257, 260 (Conn. 1978); Luster v. Luster, 128 Conn. App. 259, 267-76 (Conn. App. 2011); see also Lewis v. Newburgh Housing Auth., 2017 WL 2829075 (2d Cir. 2017) (district court abused discretion by failing sua sponte to consider whether a guardian ad litem should be appointed for party plaintiff who was in a mental hospital and who had been previously determined not to be competent). Therefore, plaintiff Colon is ordered to file a response on or before August 3, 2017, showing cause why he is legally qualified to continue as a named party in this action or, in the alternative, plaintiff Colon shall file a motion for substitution of parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(b); see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c) (permitting a conservator to bring suit on behalf of a minor or incompetent person). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/31/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL PROUCTION AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION. On the basis of evidence that plaintiff Omar Colon was examined again by plaintiffs' expert Dr. Wade Myers on May 9, 2017, for the purpose of submission of an affidavit in support of plaintiff Colon's conservatorship petition, defendants Metro-North and MTA have moved for an order to compel supplemental production and for an independent psychiatric examination of plaintiff Colon (Doc. #408). The Court GRANTS the motion in part and DENIES the motion in part for the reasons set forth below. The Court GRANTS the motion insofar as it seeks to compel the production of any additional medical records or notes of Dr. Myers not previously produced. Plaintiff shall forthwith disclose to defendants by August 3, 2017, any and all of Dr. Myers' notes and records relating to plaintiffs. The Court rejects plaintiff's counsel's argument that he is not responsible to have complied with his discovery obligations by virtue of the fact that it was another attorney who filed the conservatorship petition. Counsel are reminded that they have ongoing obligations to update discovery responses. The Court otherwise DENIES defendants' motion for an independent psychiatric examination for substantially the reasons stated by plaintiffs in their objection. On the basis of the Court's review of the materials submitted to the Probate Court as attached to plaintiffs' objection papers, the Court concludes that the filing for conservatorship does not reflect a substantial change in plaintiff's mental condition since the prior reports and affidavit of Dr. Myers in 2015 and 2016. The Court concludes that neither the act of filing the conservatorship petition nor the representations and findings set forth in the Probate Court record signify that plaintiff Colon has become legally incompetent to testify as a witness at trial. See, e.g., State v. Morant, 242 Conn. 666, 677-78 (Conn. 1997) (explaining "minimum credibility" standard for witness competence at trial). For example, according to Dr. Myers' report in support of the conservatorship petition, plaintiff is able to be on his own for a period of hours, is capable of independently getting coffee at Dunkin Donuts, and traveling between his wife's and brother's homes. Doc. #410-1 at 15. Because of the lack of evidence that there has been a substantial recent change in plaintiff Colon's mental condition, defendants' motion for an independent psychiatric examination is untimely and not otherwise warranted. See Morant, 242 Conn. at 679 (noting that "the drastic measure of ordering a psychiatric examination should be taken only upon compelling reasons") (internal citations and quotation marks omitted). However, the Court's ruling is without prejudice to defendants' right to challenge the competency of plaintiff Colon's testimony following the receipt of his testimony at trial. See, e.g., State v. Dearing, 133 Conn. App. 332, 340-41 (Conn. App. 2012). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/31/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Pretrial Conference and Motions Hearing. Held on July 20, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2017. (Huntington, D.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Document # 414 and 415 , Entered in Error-per the local rules, discovery is not to be filed. (Potter, A.) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
TRIAL MEMO Plaintiffs' Proposal for Court's Opening Statement by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 417 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas filed by Dept of Transportation. (Jordano, Joseph)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas by Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 8/21/2017 (Jordano, Joseph)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
TRIAL MEMO re Proposal for Court's Opening Statement by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Estimated trial time 15 days. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Specific Portions of Exhibits #29-#38 (Rush, Brian) Modified on 7/31/2017 (Potter, A.). Modified on 8/2/2017 (Pesta, J.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Deposition Transcript of Alisa Savetamal, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) Modified on 7/31/2017 (Potter, A.). Modified on 8/2/2017 (Pesta, J.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Counts One and Three of Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 8/17/2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Translating Medical Records (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Reconsideration re 381 Order on Motion for Conference,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 8/16/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 399 Trial Memo filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 398 MOTION in Limine re Arguments Concerning Conduct of Metro-North and MTA filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel Supplemental Production and Independent Examination by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 8/14/2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Pretrial Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 407 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Pretrial Conference andMotion Hearing held on 7/20/2017 re 327 MOTION in Limine Barrier on Tower 1043 051817 filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Dept of Transportation, 384 MOTION for filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis, 316 MOTION in Limine re: precluding expert evidence that UI Transmission System caused a sensation in Colon and/or his fall filed by United Illuminating Company, 326 MOTION in Limine Loss of Household Services filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Dept of Transportation, 339 MOTION in Limine Lack of Barrier filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Dept of Transportation, 397 MOTION pretrial conference issues filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis, 321 MOTION in Limine regarding drug use filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis, 345 MOTION in Limine Myers filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, 330 MOTION in Limine Child-Like Trespasser filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Dept of Transportation, 398 MOTION in Limine re Arguments Concerning Conduct of Metro-North and MTA filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, 329 MOTION in Limine RCSA 16-11-102 filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Dept of Transportation, Total Time: 2 hours and 45 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: As stated in today's pretrial conference, the Court sets the following deadlines for additional filings by the parties. Plaintiffs shall promptly produce any black-and-white photographs of which they desire color copies, and defendants shall promptly supply color copies if they can. Plaintiffs shall produce the medical report submitted to the probate court in connection with plaintiff's conservatorship by Friday, July 21, and shall produce the complete probate file by Monday, July 24. Defendants shall file their memorandum with alternative cost figures by Monday, July 24, and plaintiffs shall have until Wednesday, July 26 to respond. Plaintiffs shall file their responses to Doc. # 398 and Doc. # 399 , respectively defendants' motions to limit argument concerning the conduct of MetroNorth and the MTA and concerning the impact of the conservatorship, by Wednesday, July 26. Plaintiffs shall also produce translations of any Spanish language medical records by Wednesday, July 26. Plaintiffs shall furnish defendants with the specific portions of exhibits #29-38 that they intend to introduce at trial by Friday, July 28. Also by Friday, July 28, defendants shall file any motion to reconsider the Court's ruling on Doc. # 328 concerning the FRA Casualty Reports as well as any motion to dismiss the MTA from this case, and the parties shall file their proposed statements of the case for the Court's opening instructions to the jury. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/20/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Probate Guardianship Court Filings (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Settlement Conference held on 7/20/2017. 35 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS RE CHILD-TRESPASSER STATUS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. WADE COOPER MYERS, III (Docs. # 330 and # 345 ). The Court DENIES defendants' motions in limine insofar as they essentially seek reconsideration of the Courts prior summary judgment ruling with respect to the potential applicability of the child trespasser rule under § 339 of the Restatement (Second) of Torts. Defendants have not shown that Dr. Myers' testimony would not be reliable or that any unfair prejudice will result from the introduction of evidence at trial concerning plaintiff Colon's mental abilities. The Court's denial of these motions is without prejudice to the right of the defendants to contend after the presentation of evidence at trial that the jury should not be instructed with respect to the child trespasser rule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/20/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE RE BARRIER ON TOWER (Doc. # 327 ) and LACK OF BARRIER (# 339 ). The Court DENIES defendants' motions in limine insofar as they would preclude factual evidence that defendants did not build a barrier around Tower #1043 or fencing around the tracks area in the vicinity of Tower #1043. The Court concludes that this factual evidence is relevant to plaintiff's claim and that any concerns about the jury's misunderstanding of the significance of this evidence may be addressed by jury instructions concerning the duty and scope of care. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/20/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING GARY CRAKES, PH.D. (Doc. # 326 ). The Court DENIES defendants' motion in limine to preclude in part the testimony of Gary Crakes with respect to losses due to household services for substantially the reasons stated by the Court during the pretrial conference of June 1, 2017, and as set forth by plaintiffs in their objection to this motion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/20/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE DRUG USE (Doc. # 321 ). Plaintiff has moved in limine to preclude evidence of his drug use prior to the incident at issue in this case on the ground that his use of drugs is not relevant and is prejudicial. The Court DENIES this motion on the ground of the concerns expressed by the Court during the parties' pre-trial conference of June 1, 2017. In light of the fact that the jury will have to assess the credibility of plaintiff's account concerning the incident, the Court concludes that any drug use is relevant under Fed. R. Evid. 402 to his ability to remember the events. It is also relevant to plaintiffs argument that he lacked mental ability and should receive the benefit of the child-trespasser doctrine. Moreover, plaintiff's prior drug use and dependency is also relevant to the extent that plaintiff seeks damages for diminution in plaintiff's quality of life. The Court further concludes pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 403 that the probative value of this evidence concerning plaintiff's prior drug use is not substantially outweighed by any potential prejudice. Plaintiff may propose a limiting instruction that the Court will give upon request to the jury to clarify the limited grounds for which evidence of drug use is being introduced and to make clear that the jury should not consider such evidence for any other purpose. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/20/2017. (Black, R.) Modified on 7/20/2017 (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
TRIAL MEMO Bench Memorandum re Impact of Conservatorship by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine re Arguments Concerning Conduct of Metro-North and MTA by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 8/9/2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION pretrial conference issues by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 8/8/2017 (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE AND ORDER. The Court convened a telephonic status conference to discuss the communication from juror #4 (Doc. # 393 ). With the consent of all parties, the Court agreed to dismiss juror #4 and to hold a supplemental jury selection on August 3, 2017 to select two additional alternate jurors in this case. At that supplemental jury selection, plaintiffs will have two peremptory strikes, and all defendants and third-party defendants together will have a total of two peremptory strikes to exercise jointly. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/11/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Docket Entry Modified to add the correct hearing date July 20, 2017 at 9:30 AM re 394 PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE. The Court shall conduct a pre-trial conference at 9:30am on Thursday, July 20, 2017, at which time the parties should be prepared to address any pending motions and any remaining objections as stated in the parties' trial memorandum to anticipated evidence or testimony at trial. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/7/2017. (Black, R.) Modified on 7/10/2017 (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 07/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM RE COMMUNICATION FROM JUROR #4. The Court has received the attached email from Juror #4 (as redacted to remove references to juror's name and email address). The email was sent today to the Court's courtroom deputy following a conversation to the same effect between Juror #4 and the Court's courtroom deputy. The Court will conduct a teleconference with counsel at 2:15pm on Tuesday, July 11, 2017, to discuss this communication from Juror #4. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/7/2017.(Black, R.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Jury Selection
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Selection and Motion Hearing held on 7/6/2017( Jury Trial set for 8/7/2017 - 8/25/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer; granting 386 MOTION for filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis ; denying 387 MOTION for filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis; denying 388 MOTION to Disqualify Juror filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis; granting 391 MOTION for Additional Peremptory Challenges (UI) Order filed by United Illuminating Company. Total Time: 5 hours and 58 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.)(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Additional Peremptory Challenges (UI) Order by United Illuminating Company. (Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 388 MOTION to Disqualify Juror, 387 MOTION for filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 7/1/2017, Entered: 7/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 388 MOTION to Disqualify Juror filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 7/1/2017, Entered: 7/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Disqualify Juror by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
Motion by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Motion for Additional Peremptory Strikes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) Modified to correct event relief on 7/5/2017 (Potter, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
Motion by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Motion Requesting Judicial Notice of Demographic (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) Modified to correct event relief on 7/5/2017 (Potter, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Settlement Conference held on 6/26/2017. Total Time: 2 hours and 30 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
Motion to Use Video Deposition at Trial by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis (Rush, Brian) Modified to correct event relief on 6/27/2017 (Potter, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on June 1, 2017 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2017. (Huntington, D.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference/Motion Hearing held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: granting 315 UIs motion to preclude evidence that UI was negligent or owed a duty to Colon, taking under advisement 316 - UIs motion to preclude Stern expert testimony, taking under advisement 321 - Plaintiffs motion to preclude evidence of Colons drug use, granting in part and denying in part [3223 - Plaintiffs motion to preclude MTA police reports, evidence of copper theft, granting 323 - Plaintiffs motion in limine regarding summaries of bills, injuries, denying 325 - Defendants motion to preclude testimony of late-disclosed witnesses, taking under advisement 326 - Defendants motion to preclude Crakes Expert testimony, taking under advisement 327 - Defendants motion to preclude evidence re: barrier around tower 1043, granting 328 - Defendants motion to preclude evidence re: MTA duty to patrol, taking under advisement 329 - Defendants motion to preclude evidence re: RCSA § 16-11-102, taking under advisement 330 - Defendants motion to preclude evidence re: child-like status, denying 331 - Defendants motion to preclude evidence about constant intrusion and/or limit testimony to 1 mile in each direction, granting in part and denying in part 332 - Defendants motion to preclude Berkowitz expert testimony, granting in part and denying in part 333 - Defendants motion to preclude Stern expert testimony, taking under advisement 339 - Defendants motion to preclude evidence re: fencing along right of way, denying 340 - Defendants motion to preclude photos from Rushs trespass, granting in part and denying in part 343 - Defendants motion to preclude evidence about path spoliation, taking under advisement 345 - Defendants motion to preclude Myers expert testimony, denying without prejudice 350 - Plaintiffs motion for judicial notice of well-worn path and trash from photos, denying without prejudice 351 - Plaintiffs motion for judicial notice of nearby playgrounds, denying 352 - Plaintiffs motion for judicial notice of unreliability of urine toxicity test, denying without prejudice 353 - Plaintiffs motion for judicial notice of authenticity of pediatrician records, granting 360 - Plaintiffs motion to compel defendant to accept trial subpoenas for 30(b)(6) witnesses Total Time: 1 hours and 29 minutes(Court Reporter D. Huntington.) (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RULING ON PENDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE. In accordance with the reasons stated on the record during the pretrial conference on June 1, 2017, the Court issues the following orders:(1) Plaintiffs' motion to preclude MTA police reports and/or evidence of copper theft (Doc. # 322 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED as to Exh. 515, DENIED as to Exh. 518, and DENIED as to Exh. 516, which will be admitted at trial if defendants lay a proper foundation pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 803(6) or any other exception to the hearsay rules. The motion is DENIED as moot as to Exh. 517, in light of defendants' representation that the exhibit will be used, if at all, only to refresh a witness's recollection, but without prejudice to renewal in the event defendants determine at a later time that they intend, contrary to their representations, to offer the exhibit. The motion to preclude testimony about Colon's possible copper theft or attempt to steal MTA property is GRANTED. Defendants shall not elicit testimony or attempt to show that Colon was on defendants' property to commit a crime or steal copper wire.(2) Plaintiffs' motion in limine to allow various summaries (Doc. # 323 ) is GRANTED in the absence of any suggestion that the summaries are factually inaccurate.(3) Plaintiffs' motion to compel defendants to accept trial subpoenas (Doc. # 360 ) is GRANTED subject to the understanding that defendants will facilitate service of process by setting up a time and place for service of the witnesses, but will not themselves accept service of process. (4) Plaintiffs' motions for judicial notice regarding the authentication of photographs and pediatrician records, and regarding the proximity of schools and playgrounds (Docs. # 350, # 351, # 353 ) are DENIED without prejudice to renewal in the event the exhibits and testimony have not been admitted through conventional means at trial, i.e., by presenting witnesses and laying a proper foundations, as is custom during a trial. Plaintiffs' motion for judicial notice regarding the unreliability of urine toxicity tests (Doc. # 352 ) is DENIED as not the proper subject of judicial notice. (5) Defendants' motion to preclude testimony of late-disclosed witnesses (Doc. # 325 ) is DENIED, except that defendants are permitted to depose the witnesses identified in the motion within the next 30 days, with each deposition not to exceed two hours in duration. (6) Defendants' motion to preclude evidence regarding the MTA's duty to patrol (Doc. # 328 ) is GRANTED insofar as plaintiffs do not assert that the MTA owed Colon a duty to patrol. The parties remain free to inquire into the MTA's policing activities, and their efficacy, as relevant to other issues in the case. (7) Defendants' motion to preclude evidence about constant intrusion and/or limit the geographic scope of evidence of trespassing (Doc. # 331 ) is DENIED, subject to plaintiffs' representation that physical and testimonial evidence regarding trespass along the right-of-way will be limited, geographically, to within one-mile in either direction of Tower #1043. Evidence from the FRA Casualty Reports will not be limited geographically. (8) Defendants' motion to preclude the testimony of Carl Berkowitz, Ph.D, P.E. (Doc. # 332 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED insofar as Berkowitz may not comment on the evidence in a manner not requiring expertise, such as on topics (1), (2), (3), (4), and (5) of Doc. # 371 at 2. The motion is also GRANTED insofar as Berkowitz may not testify about applicable legal standards, such as topic (6) of Doc. #371 at 2, to the extent that such standard is not incorporated into Berkowitz's opinion concerning the industry standard of care. The motion is otherwise DENIED with respect to Berkowitz's opinions about accepted industry standards for the safety precautions at issue, see Doc. #371-2 at 35-37, particularly because defendants do not dispute that Berkowitz is qualified to opine on those standards. Berkowitz may also testify about the application of any accepted industry standards to defendants, and about the use of effective warnings if that use is tied to his testimony on accepted industry standards. If plaintiffs intend to have Berkowitz interpret photographs, they must lay a foundation for why expert testimony is needed, and why Berkowitz is qualified as an expert to interpret those photographs. (9) Defendants' motion to preclude the testimony of Elliot Stern, Ph.D (Doc. # 333 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED insofar as Stern may not comment on the evidence in a manner not requiring expertise, such as on topics (1), (2), (3), (4), and (5) of Doc. # 372 at 2. The motion is also GRANTED insofar as Stern may not testify about applicable legal standards, such as topic (6) of Doc. #372 at 2, to the extent that such standard is not incorporated into Berkowitz's opinion concerning the industry standard of care. The motion is otherwise DENIED as to Stern's accident-reconstruction testimony, as well as topics (7) and (8) of Doc. #372 at 2 as they relate to accepted industry standards for electrical issues, with the understanding that defendants have not challenged Stern's expertise in these matters and subject to the same general limits as set forth with respect to Berkowitz. (10) Defendants' motion to preclude photographs obtained by plaintiffs' counsel without defendants' consent (Doc. # 340 ) is DENIED, but defendants may inquire on cross-examination about how the photographs were obtained, if that information is relevant. (11) Defendants' motion to preclude evidence about spoliation of the path (Doc. # 343 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED as to any evidence about alleged bad faith conduct or culpability of defendants in covering the path by performing track maintenance, but DENIED so as to allow evidence about the fact that defendants caused the path to be covered if that evidence relates to, for example, inability of expert witnesses to make observations at a certain time. (12) UI's motion to preclude evidence that UI was negligent or owed a duty of care to Colon (Doc. # 315 ) is GRANTED, without prejudice to Metro-Norths ability to assert that any duty it might have owed was instead owed by UI. The remaining pre-trial motions (Docs. # 321, # 326, # 327, # 339, # 329, # 330, # 345, # 316 ) have been taken under advisement. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/2/2017. (Gruber, Sarah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference set for 6/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Parties must attend the conference. Please refer to Judge Margolis' webpage on the District of Connecticut's website for instructions regarding settlement conferences. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for Settlement Conference. The Court concludes that the interests of justice would be served by the parties meeting with Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for purposes of settlement discussions, and therefore orders that this matter be referred to Judge Margolis for a settlement conference. The parties should promptly contact her chambers for purposes of scheduling. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/30/2017.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. The motion to continue the pretrial conference (Doc. # 376 ) is DENIED for substantially the reasons set forth in plaintiffs' opposition. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/30/2017. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 376 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 5/27/2017, Entered: 5/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 328 MOTION in Limine MTA Duty to Patrol filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 331 MOTION in Limine Trespassing on Structure & Surrounding Area filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 345 MOTION in Limine Myers, 330 MOTION in Limine Child-Like Trespasser filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Report, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Deposition Transcript)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 333 MOTION in Limine Stern filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Stern Report, # 2 Stern Affidavit, # 3 Stern Deposition, # 4 ConnDOT Fencing Policy)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 332 MOTION in Limine Berkowitz filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Berkowitz Report, # 2 Berkowitz Affidavit, # 3 Berkowitz Deposition, # 4 ConnDOT Fencing Policy)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 326 MOTION in Limine Loss of Household Services filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit May 2017 Expert Report)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 327 MOTION in Limine Barrier on Tower 1043 051817, 339 MOTION in Limine Lack of Barrier filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 316 MOTION in Limine re: precluding expert evidence that UI Transmission System caused a sensation in Colon and/or his fall filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 340 MOTION in Limine Photos from Unauthorized Site Inspection filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Photograph on ROW, # 2 Exhibit Photograph on ROW)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 343 MOTION in Limine Ballast filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 329 MOTION in Limine RCSA 16-11-102 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 325 MOTION in Limine LATE DISCLOSED WITNESSES filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rule 26 Disclosure, # 2 Exhibit Photographs)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 350 MOTION for, 353 MOTION for, 351 MOTION for, 352 MOTION for filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 323 MOTION in Limine re Summary Exhibits filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 322 MOTION in Limine POLICE REPORTS filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel accept subpoenas or disclose addresses by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 6/14/2017 (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 316 MOTION in Limine re: precluding expert evidence that UI Transmission System caused a sensation in Colon and/or his fall filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 315 MOTION in Limine re: evidence of negligence/duty of care as to UI filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Docket Entry Correction re 355 Notice (Other), entry has been restored to docket per Joint Trial Memo. (Potter, A.) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ENTERED IN ERROR Docket Entry Correction re 355 Notice (Other) Entered in Error -Per the local rule, discovery is not to be filed (Potter, A.) Modified on 5/24/2017 to enter in error(Potter, A.). (Entered: 05/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Depo. Russell Colored (Attachments: # 1 Errata Depo. Russell Colored)(Rush, Brian) Modified on 5/24/2017 to enter in error(Potter, A.). Modified to remove Entered in Error notation on 5/24/2017 (Potter, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Doody Deposition Colored Lines and Pages (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Doody Depo.)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/20/2017, Entered: 5/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Judicial Notice - NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Motion Requesting Judicial Notice of Medical Records (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) Modified on 5/22/2017 to reflect motion filing (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Judicial Notice - NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Motion Requesting Judicial Notice of Toxicology (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Robert Powers Affidavit)(Rush, Brian) Modified on 5/22/2017 to reflect motion filing (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Judicial Notice - NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Motion Requesting Judicial Notice of Nearby Schools and Playgrounds (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) Modified on 5/22/2017 to reflect Motion filing (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Judicial Notice - NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Motion Requesting Judicial Notice of Burying Site (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) Modified on 5/22/2017 to reflect Motion filing (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority re 346 Trial Memo,,,,,,,,, Filing of Marked-Up Deposition Transcripts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Wilhelmy Deposition Transcript), # 2 Exhibit B (Berrang Deposition Transcript))(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
Docket Entry Correction re 340 MOTION in Limine Photos from Unauthorized Site Inspection (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Caffrey, A.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
Supplemental NOTICE by United Illuminating Company of filing "marked-up" transcripts re: deposition designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Bernick), # 2 Exhibit B (Berrang), # 3 Exhibit C (Bordiere), # 4 Exhibit D (Del Monte), # 5 Exhibit E (Doody), # 6 Exhibit F (Russell))(Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
TRIAL MEMO by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Estimated trial time 15 days. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Witness List and Defendants' Objections, # 2 Exhibit Defendant, MNR and MTA, Witness List and Objections, # 3 Exhibit Defendant, UIC, Witness List and Objections, # 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Depo. Designations and Objections, # 5 Exhibit Defendant, UIC, Depo. Designations, # 6 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Stipulations, # 7 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit List and Objections, # 8 Exhibit Defendant, MNR and MTA, Exhibits and Objections, # 9 Exhibit Defendant, UIC, Exhibits and Objections, # 10 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (Prior Drug Use), # 11 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (Police Reports), # 12 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (Summaries), # 13 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (Dr. Stern), # 14 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (Preclude Berkowitz), # 15 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (Preclude Late Witnesses), # 16 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (Dr. Crakes), # 17 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (Preclude Fencing), # 18 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (Barriers around Tower #1043), # 19 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (Police Patrol Duty), # 20 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (16-11-102), # 21 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (Preclude Re: Discovery), # 22 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine ("Covered Up"), # 23 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (Preclude Childlike Status), # 24 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Motion in Limine (Preclude Intrusion), # 25 Exhibit Def. UIC Motion in Limine (Experts Re: Sensation), # 26 Exhibit Def. UIC Motion in Limine (Purported Negligence), # 27 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Voir Dire Questions, # 28 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Voir Dire Questions, # 29 Exhibit Def. UIC Voir Dire Questions, # 30 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Prop. Jury Instructions, # 31 Exhibit Def. UIC Prop. Jury Instructions/Req. Charge, # 32 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Prop. Jury Instructions, # 33 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Prop. Verdict Form, # 34 Exhibit Def. MNR and MTA Prop. Verdict Form, # 35 Exhibit Def. UIC Prop. Jury Interrogatories and Verdict Form)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Myers by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION in Limine Re: Doc 330 Child-Like Exhibit A by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) Modified on 5/19/2017, uploaded as Attachment to Dkt. #330 (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Ballast by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION in Limine Re Household Services Doc 326 Exhibits A and B by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fineman, Beck) Modified on 5/19/2017, uploaded as Attachment to Dkt. #326 (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION in Limine Duty to Patrol by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) Modified on 5/19/2017 to reflect entered in error as duplicative of Dkt. #328 (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Photos from Unauthorized Site Inspection by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2017: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Lack of Barrier by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION in Limine Myers by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) Modified on 5/19/2017 to reflect entered in error as supplanted by Dkt #345 (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION in Limine Re Berkowitz Doc 332 Exhibit B by Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) Modified on 5/19/2017, uploaded as Attachment to Dkt. #332 (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION in Limine Re Berkowitz Doc 332 Exhibit A part 2 by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) Modified on 5/19/2017, uploaded as Attachment to Dkt. #332 (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION in Limine Re Berkowitz Doc 332 Exhibit A part 1 by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) Modified on 5/19/2017, uploaded as Attachment to Dkt. #332 (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION in Limine Re: Doc 330 Child-Like Exhibit B by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) Modified on 5/19/2017, uploaded as Attachment to Dkt. #330 (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Stern by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Berkowitz by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2017: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2) (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Trespassing on Structure & Surrounding Area by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Child-Like Trespasser by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2017: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2) (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine RCSA 16-11-102 by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine MTA Duty to Patrol by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Barrier on Tower 1043 051817 by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine Loss of Household Services by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Fineman, Beck) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2017: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2) (Caffrey, A.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine LATE DISCLOSED WITNESSES by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Trial Memo
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TRIAL MEMO by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, United Illuminating Company Estimated trial time 15 days. (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None In Limine
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 6/7/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine POLICE REPORTS by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 6/7/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine regarding drug use by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 6/7/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
Proposed Voir Dire by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
Proposed Verdict Form by United Illuminating Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (proposed Jury Interrogatories), # 2 Exhibit B (proposed Verdict forms))(Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
Proposed Voir Dire by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions by United Illuminating Company. (Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine re: precluding expert evidence that UI Transmission System caused a sensation in Colon and/or his fall by United Illuminating Company.Responses due by 6/7/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Berkowitz depo. excerpts), # 2 Exhibit B (Stern disclosure excerpts), # 3 Exhibit C (Stern report excerpts), # 4 Exhibit D (Stern depo. excerpts))(Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine re: evidence of negligence/duty of care as to UI by United Illuminating Company.Responses due by 6/7/2017 (Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Form (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Jury Verdict Form)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER. The motion to withdraw (Doc. # 312 ) is GRANTED, and the Court congratulates Attorney Pierson on his nomination. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for W. Glen Pierson to Withdraw as Attorney by United Illuminating Company. (Pierson, W.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE TRIAL DATES. After receipt of counsel's comments over the weekend, the Court amends the prior scheduling orders (Docs. #274, #307, #310) as follows: Jury selection will be held on July 6, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., with evidence to begin on August 7, 2017, and continue each weekday thereafter. All other dates set forth in the prior scheduling orders remain in effect. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/15/2017. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER RE TRIAL DATES. For the reasons discussed during this week's status conference, the Court hereby amends the prior scheduling order (Doc. #274) as follows: Jury selection will be held on August 3, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., with evidence to begin the day after jury selection and continue each weekday thereafter. All other dates set forth in Doc. #307 will remain in effect. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/12/2017. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/8/2017. Total Time: 27 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. In-Person Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2017 at 9:30 AM in Connecticut Financial Center, 17th Flr., 157 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record at today's status conference, the Court orders defendant Metro North to submit revised medical releases to plaintiff that specify the providers and dates since 2014 for which records are requested, and plaintiff shall promptly sign and return the releases to defendant within 7 days from today. The Court also GRANTS in part defendant Metro-North's motion for extension of time (Doc. # 303 ) and enters the following pre-trial scheduling order. The parties' joint trial memorandum and any motions in limine are due on May 17, 2017. Any responses to motions in limine are due on May 24, 2017. The Court will hold an in-person pre-trial conference on June 1, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. The Court shall advise the parties soon concerning further scheduling. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/8/2017. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES. The Court requests that the parties furnish two courtesy copies to chambers in lieu of the usual one copy. Please refer to the courtesy copy policies located on Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website ("Pretrial Preferences," "Trial Preferences," and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum"). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/8/2017. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 303 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 23, 2017 to file Joint Trial Memorandum filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference today, May 8, 2017, at 4:45 p.m. Plaintiffs shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203)-773-2105. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 23, 2017 to file Joint Trial Memorandum by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER RE EXCHANGE OF EXHIBITS AND JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM. The Court has reviewed the parties' most recent filings and states that the parties need not meet in person in order to exchange their anticipated trial exhibits and that they may exchange their exhibits by mail or by email or other electronic transmission. Counsel should otherwise communcate by telephone or email in the course of their cooperative effort to prepare and file the joint trial memorandum. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/27/2017. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 300 Response filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 299 Notice (Other) filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
Amended NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. In light of plaintiff's failure to follow through on the Court's prescribed relief for the deposition of an additional Rule 30(b)(6) witness and for substantially the reasons set forth in defendants' motion to vacate, defendants' motion to vacate (Doc. # 295 ) is GRANTED with respect to the Court's prior ruling concerning defendants' non-compliance with discovery obligations and with respect to any award of attorney's fees and costs resulting from defendants' prior non-compliance with any prior discovery obligations.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/24/2017. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 295 MOTION to Vacate 274 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Attorneys Pretrial Meeting (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Vacate 274 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
Amended EXHIBIT A by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority re 288 Response. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Replacing Doc. 288-1 efiled Apr 9 2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RULING DENYING MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION TO APPEAL AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, defendants' motion for leave to certify an interlocutory appeal and for a stay of proceedings (Doc. # 276 ) is DENIED, and defendants' motion for reconsideration of the Court's discovery costs/fees order (Doc. # 278 ) is DENIED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/10/2017. (Gruber, Sarah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 4/10/2017. Total Time: 18 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE (Doc. #286). For the reasons noted on the record at today's teleconference re plaintiff's motion for intervention (Doc. # 286 ), the Court restates that the limited discovery permitted by its summary judgment ruling was for a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition limited to the issue of inspection, repair, and maintenance of the catenary towers and their warning signs. See Doc. #274 at 24. The Court has not ordered defendants to produce additional witnesses or documents. Based on representations of counsel that only one Rule 30(b)(6) witness is needed to cover the topics on which the Court permitted additional discovery, the Court hereby clarifies and modifies its prior ruling to provide that tomorrow's 30(b)(6) deposition shall not exceed seven (7) hours. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/10/2017. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The Court will hold a telephonic discovery conference today at 11:30 a.m. Defendants' counsel will call chambers at (203)-773-2105, and chambers will assist in getting plaintiffs' counsel on the line. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/10/2017. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: 4/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 286 MOTION to Intervene filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/8/2017, Entered: 4/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 286 MOTION to Intervene filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/8/2017, Entered: 4/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Intervene by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 4/29/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 278 MOTION for Reconsideration re 274 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to 276 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 282 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 278 MOTION for Reconsideration re 274 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,Order on Motion for Sanctions until April 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/5/2017. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 278 MOTION for Reconsideration re 274 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, until April 17, 2017 by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 276 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on July 13, 2016 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2017. (Huntington, D.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 278 MOTION for Reconsideration re 274 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Reconsideration re 274 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 4/17/2017 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 276 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT pursuant to Rulings on Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 274) Signed By Beck S. Fineman, Esq. filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RULING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 209 ) is DENIED, and defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 146 ) is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED as to wilful, wanton, and reckless conduct. UI's motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 206 ) is GRANTED as to common-law indemnity and apportionment, and DENIED as to contractual indemnity. All motions for sanctions and/or adverse inferences (Docs. # 190, # 194, # 203 ) are largely denied, save the limited discovery that will be allowed as set forth in this ruling. I also find as moot plaintiff's remaining documents mislabeled on my docket as "motions," including Docs. # 182, # 202, # 219, # 263, # 264, # 269 . Plaintiff's counsel is requested to learn how to file and label documents properly on CM/ECF. The parties shall file their joint trial memorandum by May 12, 2017, or within 30 days of completion of the 30(b)(6) depositions as set forth in this ruling. Please refer to the District of Connecticut website for my "Trial Preferences" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum." Jury selection will be held on July 6, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., with a back-up date of August 3, 2017. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/13/2017. (Gruber, Sarah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2016;taking under advisement 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company ; taking under advisement 190 MOTION for Sanctions Regarding Spoliation filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis; taking under advisement 194 ] MOTION for Sanctions Discovery Misconduct filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis; under advisement 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 22) filed by United Illuminating Company; taking under advisement 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. Total Time: 2 hours and 56 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 07/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Docket Entry Correction - Entered on the wrong case re 271 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Pretrial Conference held on 7/12/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENTERED IN ERROR - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Pretrial Conference held on 7/12/2016. Total Time: 7 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) Modified on 7/12/2016 (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 07/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Supplemental Authority (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment MTA/MNRR Memorandum by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 7/28/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 22) filed by United Illuminating Company. (Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment per Local Rule 56(a)2 filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Request for Judicial Notice Regarding 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices to MNRR and MTA by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 3/30/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Request for Judicial Notice Regarding Ballast Mound Google Aerials by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 3/30/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 207 Statement of Material Facts, filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 22) filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reset Deadlines as to 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 22 ). Responses due by 3/4/2016 (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 258 Motion for Extension of Time until March 4, 2016 to Respond to United Illuminating's Motion for Summary Judgment 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 22 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/22/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 4, 2016 to Respond to United Illuminating's Motion for Summary Judgment 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 22) by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 2/16/2016. Total Time: 14 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a response 3/17/2016 re: 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff shall file a reply memorandum by 4/18/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Motion Hearing re: 190 MOTION for Sanctions Regarding Spoliation, 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 22), 194 MOTION for Sanctions Discovery Misconduct, 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment .( Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Following today's telephonic status conference, the Court enters the following orders. Oral argument on the motions filed at Docs. #146, #190, #194, #206, and #209 will be held on July 13, 2016 at 10:00 am. Defendant's motion for an extension of time to file a response to plaintiff's summary judgment motions, Doc. #220, is DENIED, and defendant shall file a response to plaintiff's motion, Doc. #209, by March 17, 2016, and with any reply memorandum by plaintiff to be filed by April 18, 2016. Plaintiff's subsequent motions for summary judgment, Docs. #228, #229, #230, #234, #245, #248 and #251, are DENIED without prejudice as untimely filed under the terms of the Courts scheduling order as previously proposed by the parties, Docs. #127-128. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/16/16. (Adriance, S.) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 251 MOTION for Summary Judgment Theft Accusation filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 251 MOTION for Summary Judgment Theft Accusation 56A1 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Theft Accusation by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 3/7/2016 (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 248 MOTION for Summary Judgment Joint Business Operation filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 248 MOTION for Summary Judgment Joint Business Operation 56A1 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Joint Business Operation by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 3/7/2016 (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 245 MOTION for Summary Judgment Colon's Mental and Medical Disabilities filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 245 MOTION for Summary Judgment Colon's Mental and Medical Disabilities 56A1 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Colon's Mental and Medical Disabilities by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 3/7/2016 (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute Memorandum Final filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute Memorandum Part 4 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute Memorandum Part 3 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute Memorandum Part 2 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute Memorandum Part 1 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute 56A1 Complete filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute 56A1 Part 4 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute 56A1 Part 3 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute 56A1 Part 2 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute 56A1 Part 1 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Violated Railroad Trespass Statute and Criminal Trespass Statute by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 3/7/2016 (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial- Treatment and Bills 56(a)(1) filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial- Treatment and Bills filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial- Treatment and Bills filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial- Treatment and Bills by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 3/7/2016 (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Request for Judicial Notice- Hospital and Medical Bills, Reports, Summaries with Correct Exhibit F, Part 2 by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 3/7/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit F, Part 2 COMPLETE)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Request for Judicial Notice- Hospital and Medical Bills, Reports, Summaries by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 3/7/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 3, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 4, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 5, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit D, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit D, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit E, Part 1, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit E, Part 2, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit E, Part 3, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit F, Part 1, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit F, Part 2)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.RESET FROM 2/12/2016 at 3PM Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2016 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203)773-2105. It is so ordered. (Oakes, A.) (Entered: 02/12/2016) (Oakes, A.) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2016 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203)773-2105. It is so ordered. (Oakes, A.) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying as moot 222 Motion for Extension of Time until 02/23/2016 Response to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Sanctions and Reply to Defendants' Objection 204 Objection, 203 Objection. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/10/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 204 Objection, to Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions and the Violation of the Court's Discovery Order filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE Memorandum filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/23/2016 Response to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Sanctions and Reply to Defendants' Objection 204 Objection, 203 Objection by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition Indefinite Extension re 220 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment until 30 Days After Ruling on Defendants' MSJ filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment until 30 Days After Ruling on Defendants' MSJ by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Oral Argument by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 2/22/2016 (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment Breach Pt. 1 Cont. filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment Breach Pt. 5 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment Breach Pt. 1 Cont. filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment Part 4 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment Breach Pt. 3 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment Breach Pt. 1 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment Breach Pt. 1 Cont. filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment Breach Pt. 2 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment Breach filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 2/22/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 22) filed by United Illuminating Company. (Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 22) filed by United Illuminating Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. No. 22) by United Illuminating Company.Responses due by 2/19/2016 (Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 22 Third Party Complaint by United Illuminating Company.(Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 194 MOTION for Sanctions Discovery Misconduct filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 190 MOTION for Sanctions Regarding Spoliation filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Request for Judicial Notice by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 2/15/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Motion Hearing re: 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment Oral Argument.( Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE RESET FROM 3/2/2016 at 2:30 PM, Motion Hearing re: 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment Oral Argument.( Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 198 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 190 MOTION for Sanctions Regarding Spoliation, 194 MOTION for Sanctions Discovery Misconduct Responses due by 1/26/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/12/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 190 MOTION for Sanctions Regarding Spoliation, 194 MOTION for Sanctions Discovery Misconduct until January 26, 2016 by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 180 Statement of Material Facts filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: 12/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 194 MOTION for Sanctions Discovery Misconduct filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: 12/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Sanctions Discovery Misconduct by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 1/20/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 192 Motion for Extension of Time until January 7, 2016 to file reply brief 179 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/23/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 7, 2016 to file reply brief 179 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 190 MOTION for Sanctions Regarding Spoliation filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Sanctions Regarding Spoliation by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 1/7/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reset Deadlines as to 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 12/24/2015 (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 187 Motion for Extension of Time until December 24, 2015 to file brief replying to 179 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/14/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 24, 2015 to file brief replying to 179 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. . Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer re 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis re 179 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Amended Annotated Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Deposition Transcript of Phil Wilhelmy (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Request for Judicial Notice (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment Oral Argument by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 12/24/2015 (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit, # 43 Exhibit, # 44 Exhibit, # 45 Exhibit, # 46 Exhibit, # 47 Exhibit, # 48 Exhibit, # 49 Exhibit, # 50 Exhibit, # 51 Exhibit, # 52 Exhibit, # 53 Exhibit, # 54 Exhibit, # 55 Exhibit, # 56 Exhibit, # 57 Exhibit, # 58 Exhibit, # 59 Exhibit, # 60 Exhibit, # 61 Exhibit, # 62 Exhibit, # 63 Exhibit, # 64 Exhibit, # 65 Exhibit, # 66 Exhibit, # 67 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Elliot Stern, Ph.D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Wade Myers, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Carl Berkowitz, Ph.D., P.E., AICP (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Phil Wilhelmy, MNRR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Robert Powers, Ph.D. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis re 170 Notice (Other), Raymond Russell, MTA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis re 170 Notice (Other), Robert Doody, MNRR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis re 170 Notice (Other), Eduardo Del Monte, UIC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Corporate Representative Depositions Composite Exhibits 1-61 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Frank M. Grande (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Transcript of Robert Powers, Ph.D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Transcript Carl Berkowitz, Ph.D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Vincent Hendrick (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Jose Correa Ayala (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Jose Correa Ayala (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Heriberto Rodriguez (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Bob Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Transcript Omar Colon (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Transcript Arlene Davis (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Plaintiff's Supplement Answers to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Plaintiff's Initial Answers (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Transcript John Bernick (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Elliot Stern, Ph.D. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Wade Myers, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Angel Hernandez-Colon, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 149 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 12/2/2015. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/26/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment until December 2, 2015 by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R, # 2 Exhibit S, # 3 Exhibit T, # 4 Exhibit U, # 5 Exhibit V, # 6 Exhibit W, # 7 Exhibit X, # 8 Exhibit Y, # 9 Exhibit Z, # 10 Errata AA, # 11 Exhibit BB, # 12 Exhibit CC)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
Statement of Material Facts re 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Errata H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 11/12/2015 (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 144 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants allowed to file 10 excess pages and plaintiff allowed equal leave to file response that exceeds the page limititations by 10 pages. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/14/15. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. Plaintiff's 142 motion for order confirming Luis Chacon's attendance at his scheduled deposition on Friday, October 16, 2015, at 6:00 PM is GRANTED. Mr. Chacon shall appear for his deposition on that date and time.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/28/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Order Confirming Luis Chacon's Required Attendance of Deposition Order by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Defendant's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Third Request for Production (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Plaintiff's Third Request for Production, Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Third Request for Production, Defendants' Response to Third Request for Production (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Plaintiff's Second Request for Production, Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production, Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Defendant's Supplemental and Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production and Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. On Thursday, August 14, 2015, the Court held a telephonic status conference. The parties discussed the status of discovery and possibility of future motions. The Court encouraged the parties to file these motions as soon as feasibly possible. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/17/2015.(Oakes, A.) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/14/2015. Total Time: 13 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/14/2015 03:15 PM in Chambers Room 208, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Once all parties are on the line plaintiff shall initiate the call (203)-773-2105. (Oakes, A.) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Gina M. Von Oehsen on behalf of Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company (Von Oehsen, Gina)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Plaintiff's motion for extension of time from May 21 to June 5, 2015, is DENIED on the ground that it is not ripe, because there are no Court-scheduled matters slated for that time period. The parties are reminded that the Court does not otherwise intend to grant additional scheduling continuances in this case absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/12/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time until June 5, 2015 Unavailability by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 127 Motion Stipulation and Joint Motion to Confirm Deadlines for Expert Reports, Expert Disclosure, Expert Discovery, Dispositive Motions and Scheduling Order Deadlines. The Court will not grant a further extension of the parties' stipulated deadlines absent extraordinary and unforeseen circumstances.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/2/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 1/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION Joint Stipulation and Joint Motion to Confirm Deadlines for Expert Reports, Expert Disclosure, Expert Discovery, Dispositive Motions and Scheduling Order Deadlines by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, United Illuminating Company.Responses due by 2/20/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER The motion for extension of time (Doc. # 122 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. In view of the potential significance of the testimony of Luis Chacon and that he has been out of the country, the parties may take the deposition of Luis Chacon promptly upon his return, if at all, to the United States. However, because it appears highly uncertain when or if Luis Chacon will return to the United States, the Court will not extend any other discovery, motion, or trial date in anticipation of the possibility of the return of Luis Chacon to the United States. No good cause has been shown for the failure to depose Detective Timothy Corcoran within the discovery period, and therefore the Court will not extend the discovery period to allow the deposition of Detective Corcoran. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/16/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER terminating 112 Motion to Quash (See Order # 114 ).Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/16/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying as moot 101 Motion to Strike 93 Answer to Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/16/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER The motion for extension of time (Doc. # 121 ) is DENIED as moot in light of the filing of a superseding motion for extension of time (Doc. # 122 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/16/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time until Thirty (30) days after the deposition of Luis Chacon by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time until February 10, 2015 Taking Potential Witness Depositions by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Conference. Held on October 21, 2014 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2015. (Huntington, D.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Conference regarding discovery disputes 115 Motion for Protective Order held on 10/21/2014. Total Time: 25 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's motion for protective order (Doc. # 115 ). On October 21, 2014, I held a discovery teleconference with counsel for all parties. As stated on the record, plaintiff will not be permitted to depose MTA witnesses provided pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) regarding their legal interpretation of specific contractual provisions between MTA and Metro-North; however, defendant MTA shall produce a Rule 30(b)(6) witness to speak to MTA's operational activities with regard to the operations at issue in this case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/21/2014. (Ramesh, S) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference regarding discovery disputes 115 Motion for Protective Order set for 10/21/2014 12:00 PM in Chambers Room 417, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer.Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the call. Once all parties are on the conference call, they should call Chambers at (203) 579-5554. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Additional Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions by Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 11/10/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re Motion to Quash or for Protective Order 112 : The parties shall meet-and-confer forthwith concerning plaintiff's narrowed discovery requests (Doc. # 113 at 2-3. If disagreements persist, plaintiff shall file by October 17, 2014, a letter brief setting forth the text of each specific discovery request that remains disputed and, for each such request, a statement why each discovery request is relevant, why it is appropriately tailored, why it is not unduly burdensome, and why it is otherwise appropriate in light of discovery obtained from other sources. The movant Connecticut Department of Transportation shall file a response to plaintiff's letter brief on October 20, 2014, setting forth the basis for CDOT's continuing objection to each disputed request. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/14/2014.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: 10/13/2014 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Quash or for a Protective Order filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: 10/2/2014 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Quash or for a Protective Order by Dept of Transportation.Responses due by 10/23/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash or for a Protective Order)(Jordano, Joseph)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: 10/2/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Jordano on behalf of Dept of Transportation interested non-party (Jordano, Joseph)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephonic Conference re: Discovery Dispute held on 9/24/2014. Total Time: 7 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM of Discovery Conference. On September 24, 2014, I held a discovery conference at the request of the parties. Present were Brian P. Rush, attorney for plaintiffs Milton Colon and Arlene Davis, Beck S. Fineman, attorney for defendants/third-party plaintiffs Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company and the Metropolitan Transportation Authority, and James E. Ringold, attorney for third-party defendant United Illuminating Company. After reviewing the parties' letter briefs and considering the arguments made by counsel during the conference, I declined to issue an item-by-item order. I encouraged defendants' counsel to ensure full discovery and informed plaintiffs' counsel that they would have the opportunity to raise with the Court at a later time any problems resulting from late document production, in the event that they receive documents after the depositions to which such documents would have pertained. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/24/2014. (Ramesh, S) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 102 Objection, filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Conference re: Discovery Dispute set for 9/24/2014 12:30 PM in Chambers Room 417, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the call. Once all parties are on the conference call, they should call Chambers at (203) 579-5554. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time until Tuesday, September 23, 2014 Plaintiffs to file a Reply to Defendants' 102 Objection to 101 Motion to Strike 93 ANSWER.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/19/2014. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014 Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time until Tuesday, September 23, 2014 Plaintiffs to file a Reply to Defendants' Objection 102 Objection by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motion Hearing. Held on August 5, 2014 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2014. (Huntington, D.)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/4/2014 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION 101 First MOTION to Strike 93 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Lambert, Thomas) Entry Modified to add entry link to #101 on 9/19/2014 (Gutierrez, Y.).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
First MOTION to Strike 93 Answer to Amended Complaint by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 9/10/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Docket Entry Correction to change the incorrect ruling from taken under advisement, to granting in part and denying in part as set forth on the record in the hearing re 99 Order on Motion to Compel, Motion Hearing, (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Motion Hearing held on 8/5/2014, granting in part and denying in part as set forth on the record in the hearing re: 86 Motion to Compel 87 Motion to Compel. Total Time: 1 hours and 53 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) Modified on 8/8/2014 (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 08/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 87 MOTION to Compel Re: Defs Obj to Pls Mot to Compel re 3rd Set Discovery filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 86 MOTION to Compel Re: 1st & 2nd Set of Discovery filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fineman, Beck)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by James Efrem Ringold on behalf of United Illuminating Company (Ringold, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 94 Motion for Extension of Time until August 4, 2014 to respond to plaintiff's motions to compel 86 and 87 . The Court further orders that no later than August 4, 2014, at 4 p.m., counsel for all parties shall furnish courtesy copies to chambers of their motions, responses, and exhibits relating to the discovery issues to be presented for argument before the Court on August 5, 2014. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/31/2014. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 4, 2014 To Respond to Plaintiff's Motions to Compel 87 MOTION to Compel, 86 MOTION to Compel by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Lambert, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 69 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company.(Lambert, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Denying 70 Plaintiff's Rule 72 Objection. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/28/2014. (Ramesh, S)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S. Lambert on behalf of Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Lambert, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Motion Hearing re: 87 MOTION to Compel , 86 MOTION to Compel .( Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 81 Response filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel 86 and 87 within 14 days, by July 31. All parties are reminded that any future discovery motions must comply with Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Dispute," available online. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/17/2014. (Ramesh, S) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 8/6/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis.Responses due by 8/6/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re 69 Amended Complaint filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/30/3014.(Ramesh, S) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time until Thursday, July 17, 2014 to file Plaintiff's Reply 81 Response. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/26/2014. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time until Thursday, July 17, 2014 to file Plaintiff's Reply 81 Response by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 80 Response by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authorityand In Further Support of Defendants' Objection to Proposed Amended Complaint. (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 70 Objection to Magistrate Martinez's Discovery Order filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 75 Objection to Plaintiff's Proposed First Amended Complaint filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 55 MOTION to Compel PL TO RESPOND TO DEF'S FIRST SET OF I&Ps DATED 05/15/2013, 66 Order on Motion to Compel, Motion Hearing,, filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Response to Interrogatories and Notice of Production, # 2 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 77 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 3, 2014 Response to Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Purported First Amended Complaint 75 Objection by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davi. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/14/2014. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time until June 3, 2014 Response to Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Purported First Amended Complaint 75 Objection by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Mortion to Compel. Held on 4/2/14 before Judge Donna Martinez. Court Reporter: Suzanne Benoit. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/29/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2014. (Benoit, S.) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION to Plaintiffs' Purported First Amended Complaint by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to 69 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendants' Response is due by May 1, 2014. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 04/28/2014. (Steinfeld, Sarah) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Order to Compel 70 is due by June 16, 2014. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 04/28/2014. (Steinfeld, Sarah) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 1, 2014 To Respond To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 69 Amended Complaint by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/16/2014 To Respond to Plaintiffs' Objection to Order to Compel 70 Objection by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck) Modified on 4/25/2014 to correct event type (Lynch, K.). (Entered: 04/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION re 68 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 55 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 4/3/14. (Nichols, J.) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 4/3/14.(Walker, J.) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: taking under advisement 55 Motion to Compel; Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2014 re 55 MOTION to Compel PL TO RESPOND TO DEF'S FIRST SET OF I&Ps DATED 05/15/2013 filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. Total Time: 1 hour(Court Reporter FTR.) (Wood, R.) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Opposition re 55 MOTION to Compel PL TO RESPOND TO DEF'S FIRST SET OF I&Ps DATED 05/15/2013 filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit Part 1, # 5 Exhibit Part 2, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Rush, Brian) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The Third-Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 37 ) is hereby DENIED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/25/2014. (Lamb, D.) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 35 ) is hereby GRANTED, and the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 46 ) is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/25/2014. (Lamb, D.) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to which defendants consent. Response to 55 Motion to Compel due by 3/28/2014. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/6/14. (Nichols, J.) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 55 MOTION to Compel PL TO RESPOND TO DEF'S FIRST SET OF I&Ps DATED 05/15/2013 until Friday, March 28, 2014 by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing on 55 MOTION to Compel: Oral Argument is set for 4/2/2014 at 10:30 AM in the East Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. The scheduling of oral argument does not relieve the opposing party of its obligation to file responsive papers. Failure to file a timely opposition may result in the cancellation of oral argument and granting of the motion. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(a)(1), 37(b)(1). Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/5/14. (Nichols, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The Defendant's Motion to Compel (Doc. No. 55 ) is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/27/2014. (Lamb, D.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time Re: Scheduling Order (Doc. No. 54 ) is hereby GRANTED. All fact discovery shall be completed by January 15, 2015. All expert discovery shall be completed by December 15, 2015. Dispositive motions shall be filed by February 1, 2016. The extensions requested in this motion with respect to all other dates are also granted. A trial memorandum order will be issued once the dispositive motions deadline has passed. REMINDER: please refer to the electronic filing order in civil cases re: the requirements for submission of chambers copies. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/27/2014. (Lamb, D.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Memorandum in Support re 55 MOTION to Compel PL TO RESPOND TO DEF'S FIRST SET OF I&Ps DATED 05/15/2013 filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel PL TO RESPOND TO DEF'S FIRST SET OF I&Ps DATED 05/15/2013 by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority.Responses due by 3/18/2014 (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until January 15, 2015to Complete Fact Discovery by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Fineman, Beck) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis of Counsel's Non-Availability (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to 46 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Complaint Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to Amend the Complaint filed by Milton Omar Colon, Arlene Davis. (Rush, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to 35 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS THREE, FOUR AND SIX OF PL'S COMPLAINT filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Hickey, Robert) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 143 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?