UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-05407

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 2:01 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo department of environmental protection new jersey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by STATE OF NEW JERSEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD DEVINE +1 609 984 4987 edward.devine@dol.lps.state.nj.us
Space JOANNA E. GRAYER +1 609 984 5016 joanna.grayer@dol.lps.state.nj.us
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space COLETTE R. BUCHANAN +1 973 645 2700 colette.buchanan@usdoj.gov
Space Peter K. Kautsky +1 202 514 3907 +1 202 616 2427 peter.kautsky@usdoj.gov
Space RACHEL EVANS KING +1 202 514 5471 rachel.king@usdoj.gov
Space ALLAN B.K. URGENT +1 973 645 2700 allan.urgent@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Cornell-dubilier Electronics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Bodnar +1 973 422 6476 rbodnar@lowenstein.com
Space THOMAS E. REDBURN, JR. +1 973 597 2500 +1 973 597 2400 tredburn@lowenstein.com
No Logo Allstate Insurance Company, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEFANO V. CALOGERO scalogero@windelsmarx.com
No Logo LONDON MARKET INSURERS, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mendes & Mount

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM S. WACHENFELD +1 973 639 7300 +1 973 639 7350 william.wachenfeld@mendes.com
No Logo COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY AND CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Connell Foley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan P. McHenry +1 973 535 0500 +1 973 535 9217 jmchenry@connellfoley.com
ExxonMobil Corporation ExxonMobil Corporation, Intervenor
Officer/Director, MOBIL CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DUVOL M. THOMPSON +1 212 513 3200 duvol.thompson@hklaw.com
Space JOHN M. TORIELLO +1 212 513 3200 +3859 385 385 9010 john.toriello@hklaw.com
No Logo COMMISIONER, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by STATE OF NEW JERSEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOANNA E. GRAYER +1 609 984 5016 joanna.grayer@dol.lps.state.nj.us
No Logo THE ADMINISTRATOR OF THE NEW JERSEY SPILL COMPENSATION FUND, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo D.S.C. OF NEWARK ENTERPRISES, INC., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolff & Samson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN A. MCKINNEY, JR. +1 973 530 2036 jmckinney@wolffsamson.com
  Entries (130) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER the United States' Motion for Leave to File Short Response to Intervenors' August 22, 2014 Memorandum is GRANTED; and The United States' Response to Intervenors' August 22, 2014 Memorandum, attached to the Motion, is deemed filed in this action as if separately filed. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/2/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Brief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 112 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/12/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 114 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/11/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                              Letter re 115 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,. (GRAYER, JOANNA) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 114 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to Enter Consent Decree (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 3-4, # 3 Exhibit 5-11, # 4 Exhibit 12, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 12, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 13-18, # 7 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                    BRIEF in Reply and in Support of the Motion to Enter Consent Decree, Returnable June 16, 2014 (Attachments: # 1 Certification Certification of Robert Sanoff, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Sanoff Cert., # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Sanoff Cert., # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Sanoff Cert., # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Sanoff Cert., # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Sanoff Cert., # 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Sanoff Cert., # 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Sanoff Cert., # 9 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Sanoff Cert., # 10 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Sanoff Cert., # 11 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Sanoff Cert., # 12 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Sanoff Cert., # 13 Exhibit Ex. 12 to Sanoff Cert., # 14 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Sanoff Cert., # 15 Exhibit Ex. 14 to Sanoff Cert., # 16 Exhibit Ex. 15 to Sanoff Cert., # 17 Exhibit Ex. 16 to Sanoff Cert., # 18 Exhibit Ex. 17 to Sanoff Cert., # 19 Exhibit Ex. 18 to Sanoff Cert., # 20 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Sanoff Cert., # 21 Exhibit Ex. 20 to Sanoff Cert., # 22 Exhibit Ex. 21 to Sanoff Cert., # 23 Exhibit Ex. 22 to Sanoff Cert., # 24 Appendix Appendix of Unpublished Decisions, # 25 Certificate of Service)(BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding Reply Brief Filed June 9, 2014 by CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Brief)(BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 108 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/6/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 109 Response (NOT Motion) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 25, # 3 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE re 107 Order,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9, # 2 Exhibit 10-19, # 3 Exhibit 20-23, # 4 Exhibit 24-28, # 5 Exhibit 29-35, # 6 Exhibit 36-43, # 7 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Contained in Exxon's Opposition Brief by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER that Exxon Mobil Corporation, as indemnitor acting under a reservation of rights, Allstate Insurance Company, Columbia Casualty Company and Continental Casualty Company, and Certain London Market Insurers ("Intervenors") may collectively file an opposition to the Proposed Consent Decree no later than April 25, 2014, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/24/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Letter from Peter Kautsky. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER administratively terminating 79 Motion to deem its previously filed motion to approve and enter a consent decree [ECF No. 28] as having been re-filed, etc; that the parties shall meet and confer and jointly submit a proposed scheduling order by March 21, 2014, that sets forth deadlines for intervenors to file an opposition to the Proposed Consent Decree and when any reply by the United States and Cornell-Dubilier Electronics, Inc., and the State of New Jersey shall be submitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER denying 81 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/3/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lawrence R. Liebesman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 77 Order on Motion to Intervene,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 97 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Exxon shall file its Brief on or before 1/23/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/21/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Letter from R. Sanoff re: Briefing Schedule and in Response to the Letter by Exxon re 98 Letter. (BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Letter from Peter Kautsky re 98 Letter. (KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Letter from John M. Toriello to Magistrate Michael A. Hammer, requesting confirmation of the briefing schedule for various motions. (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File (Doc #95) Reply in Further Support of Exxon's Motion for Reconsideration by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE re 95 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 77 Order on Motion to Intervene,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 79 MOTION Deem Motion to Enter Consent Decree Re-Filed and Establish Briefing Schedule (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE in Support filed by CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. re 79 MOTION Deem Motion to Enter Consent Decree Re-Filed and Establish Briefing Schedule Reply in Support of Motion to Establish the Briefing Schedule (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 77 Order on Motion to Intervene,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. re 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 77 Order on Motion to Intervene,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 79 MOTION Deem Motion to Enter Consent Decree Re-Filed and Establish Briefing Schedule (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Substitution of Attorney (URGENT, ALLAN) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER ON INFORMAL APPLICATION permitting Mary Ann D'Amato to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/18/13. (sr, ) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Letter from W S Wachenfeld. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Letter from W S Wachenfeld. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Joinder Exxon Mobil Motion for Reconsideration by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(CALOGERO, STEFANO) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Joinder in Exxon Mobil Motion for Reconsideration by LONDON MARKET INSURERS. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                STIPULATED ORDER Consolidating 12-5410 with 12-5407. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/12/13. (jd, ) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 77 Order on Motion to Intervene,,,,, (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re 77 Order on Motion to Intervene,,,,, by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION Consolidating Actions by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION Deem Motion to Enter Consent Decree Re-Filed and Establish Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on November 27, 2013, before Judge MICHAEL A. HAMMER. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). RECORDED OPINION. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2014. (ek) (Main Document 78 replaced on 12/12/2013) (ek). Modified on 12/12/2013 (ek). (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/27/13. (sr, ) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Substitution of Attorney - Attorney EDWARD DEVINE terminated. Attorney JOANNA E. GRAYER for department of environmental protection new jersey added.. (GRAYER, JOANNA) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                BRIEF Response Pursuant to September 17, 2013 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-G, # 3 Exhibit H-J, # 4 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Letter from John M. Toriello in response to the Government's reference to Liberty Mutual Ins. Co. v. Treesdale, 419 F.3d 216 (3d Cir. 2005), during oral argument of this matter on September 17, 2013 and to address the question raised by the Court regarding discovery that has been provided to Exxon.. (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on September 17, 2013, before Judge MICHAEL A. HAMMER. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). HEARING. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 10/11/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2013. (ek) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER: As discussed on the record during the hearing on September 17, 2013, the Intervenors may file, on or before September 26, 2013, a single legal memorandum addressing Liberty Mutual Ins. Co. v. Treesdale, 419 F.3d 216 (3d Cir. 2005). The Government and/or CDE may file a single responsive legal memorandum on or before October 3, 2013. Each memorandum also shall clarify what discovery or other materials have been produced to the parties seeking intervention, whether through the state court litigation, FOIA, or otherwise. The page limit for each memorandum is hereby be expanded from five pages to ten pages. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/17/2013. (MAH) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER: The Oral Argument set for 9/12/2013 has been converted to a Telephone Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/12/2013. (jqb, ) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 21 MOTION to Intervene (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER: Oral Argument on the motions to intervene set for 9/12/2013 at 2:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/16/2013. (jqb, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by COLETTE R. BUCHANAN on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (BUCHANAN, COLETTE) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. identifying CDE Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Letter from Robert Sanoff to the Hon. Michael A. Hammer re 62 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Letter from United States. (KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Letter from John M. Toriello in Response to United States' Letter of May 21, 2013 (Docket No.63). re 63 Letter. (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Letter from United States. (KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2013 at 10:30 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/21/2013. (jqb, ) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 57 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, DUVOL) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Letter from Robert Sanoff, Esq. re 58 Letter. (REDBURN, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/6/13. (ak, ) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Letter from John M. Toriello re 55 Response to Motion,. (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 05/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lawrence R. Liebesman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/1/13. (jd, ) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion filed by CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. re 29 MOTION to Intervene , 21 MOTION to Intervene , 31 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Certification Certification of Robert Sanoff, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A, # 3 Exhibit Ex. B, # 4 Exhibit Ex. C)(REDBURN, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Duvol M. Thompson re 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence R. Liebesman, Returnable on May 20, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, DUVOL) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Joinder in Exxon's Reply Memorandum by LONDON MARKET INSURERS. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion filed by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY AND CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY re 21 MOTION to Intervene (MCHENRY, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of LAWRENCE R. LIEBESMAN re 21 MOTION to Intervene by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION in Support filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 21 MOTION to Intervene (CERTIFICATION OF MARISA MARINELLI IN FURTHER SUPPORT) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 21 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY re 21 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(CALOGERO, STEFANO) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence R. Liebesman, Returnable on May 20, 2013 by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, DUVOL) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 29 MOTION to Intervene , 21 MOTION to Intervene , 31 MOTION to Intervene , 43 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER administratively terminating without prejudice 28 Motion to Approve Consent Decree to the refiling of same once the pending motions to intervene have been decided. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/18/13. (jd, ) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response re 41 Response (NOT Motion). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Stefano V. Calogero re 21 MOTION to Intervene by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, # 2 Entry of Appearance, # 3 Certificate of Service)(CALOGERO, STEFANO) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter re 40 Letter. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 40 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Marisa Marinelli requesting a 45 day extension of time to file a response to the Motion to enter a consent decree filed by the United States on 4/11/13 re 28 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment . (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from John A. McKinney, Jr. To: The Clerk Of The United States District Court Of NJ Re: An Extension Of Time To File A Response To The Motion To Enter A Consent Decree Filed By The United States On 4/11/13. (MCKINNEY, JOHN) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Joinder by department of environmental protection new jersey. (DEVINE, EDWARD) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. re 28 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Cornell-Dubilier's joinder of United States's Motion (BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene by LONDON MARKET INSURERS. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene by LONDON MARKET INSURERS. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene by LONDON MARKET INSURERS. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene by LONDON MARKET INSURERS. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene by LONDON MARKET INSURERS. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene by LONDON MARKET INSURERS. (WACHENFELD, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/12/13. (jd, ) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY AND CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Notice of Appearance, # 3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), # 4 Certification, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 9 Certificate of Service)(MCHENRY, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Text of Proposed Order, # 16 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 20 Notice of Appearance, 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 23 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 21 MOTION to Intervene , 22 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 25 Certification (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 21 MOTION to Intervene (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re 21 MOTION to Intervene (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. TORIELLO on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Consent Decree entered into by CDE. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/1/13. (jd, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. of Filing Consent Decree in Lieu of Answer (REDBURN, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Johathan M. Ettinger and Robert S. Sanoff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/24/13. (jd, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of Robert S. Sanoff on behalf of CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. Re 14 Letter,. (BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of Jonathon M. Ettinger on behalf of CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. Re 14 Letter,. (BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Thomas Redburn as Local Counsel to Judge Hammer re: admission of attorneys pro hac vice. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Certification of Local Counsel, # 2 Certification Certification of Admission and Good Standing for Robert Sanoff, # 3 Certification Certification of Admission and Good Standing for Jonathon Ettinger, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(REDBURN, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 5 Motion to Intervene; that DSC may intervene in this case, at this time, solely for the purpose of filing a brief and presenting oral argument (if argument is requested by the Court) in opposition to a Motion by the United States to Enter the Consent Decree, etc. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/7/12. (jd, ) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Counsel for United States and D.S.C. of Newark Enterprises, Inc. re 5 MOTION to Intervene . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD A. BODNAR on behalf of CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. (BODNAR, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS E. REDBURN, JR on behalf of CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. (REDBURN, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that pltf is to serve & file its response to the pending Motion to Intervene on or before 12/10/12. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/3/12. (sr, ) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. waiver sent on 11/26/2012, answer due 1/25/2013. (KAUTSKY, PETER) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by D.S.C. OF NEWARK ENTERPRISES, INC. (MCKINNEY, JOHN) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene by D.S.C. OF NEWARK ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, # 2 Declaration of John A. McKinney, Jr. in Support of Motion to Intervene, # 3 Exhibit A through C to foregoing Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to foregoing Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E through F to foregoing Declaration, # 6 Exhibit G(1) to foregoing Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G(2) to foregoing Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G(3) to foregoing Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G(4) to foregoing Declaration, # 10 Exhibit G(5) to foregoing Declaration, # 11 Exhibit G(6) to foregoing Declaration, # 12 Exhibit G(7) to foregoing Declaration, # 13 Exhibit G(8) to foregoing Declaration, # 14 Exhibit G(9) to foregoing Declaration, # 15 Exhibit G(10) to foregoing Declaration, # 16 Exhibit G(11) through I to foregoing Declaration, # 17 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure), # 18 Certification (Rule 11.2), # 19 Text of Proposed Order, # 20 Certificate of Service)(MCKINNEY, JOHN) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. MCKINNEY, JR on behalf of D.S.C. OF NEWARK ENTERPRISES, INC. (MCKINNEY, JOHN) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS ISSUED as to CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, ) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL EVANS KING on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (ld, ) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against CORNELL-DUBILIER ELECTRONICS, INC. (Filing fee $ None Required), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 NOTICE OF LODGING OF CONSENT DECREE, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 265 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?