Currington v. XTO Energy, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00589

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 1, 2017 at 11:19 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Justin Currington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by North Miami, FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Carl Barkley +1 409 899 2277 +1 409 899 2477 baylorlawyer@aol.com
v.
No Logo Hertz Equipment Rental Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Flanagan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Wess H Tribble +1 713 622 0444 +1 713 622 0555 wtribble@tribblelawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 610

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Jason T Wagner +1 713 554 8450 +1 713 554 8451 jwagner@wsdllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TRIBBLE ROSS & WAGNER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Harold David Agron +1 713 622 0444 +1 713 622 0555 hagron@tribblelawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Margaret Jackson Graeff +1 713 622 0444 +1 713 622 0555 mgraeff@tribblelawfirm.com
No Logo Jlg Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holloway & Rowley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle M Rowley +1 713 951 1000 +1 713 951 1199 krowley@sheehyware.com
No Logo McNeely Service Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/01/2015 Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
No Logo SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 750

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brendan Patrick Doherty +1 504 561 0400 +1 504 561 1011 bdoherty@glllaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charlotte Ann Fields +1 832 255 6000 +1 832 255 6001 cfields@glllaw.com
No Logo Xto Energy Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by First City Tower,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2013 Michael A. Golemi +1 713 651 2900 +1 713 651 2908 magolemi@liskow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strong Pipkin Bissell & Ledyard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gordon David Barnett +1 409 981 1000 +1 409 981 1010 dbarnett@strongpipkin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Bridwell +1 409 981 1070 +1 409 981 1010 mbridwell@strongpipkin.com
  Entries (107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER of USCA dismissing the appeal as of December 14, 2015, for want of prosecution as to 104 Notice of Appeal filed by Justin Currington. The appellant failed to timely file appellant's brief and record excerpts. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Cover Letter)(dlc, ) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  First Amended ANSWER to 44 Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Second by SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC.(Fields, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by XTO Energy, Inc. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/6/2015 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2014. Discovery due by 10/6/2014. Motions due by 11/11/2014. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/30/14. (mrp, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 72 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. An amended scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/30/14. (mrp, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL granting 76 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Hertz Equipment Rental Corporation with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/30/14. (mrp, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 71 Motion to Dismiss Currington's claims against JLG with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/27/14. (mrp, ) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order, 74 MOTION for Joinder in Defendant XTO Energy, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Justin Currington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-mail dsated March 31, 2014)(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Hertz Equipment Rental Corporation by Justin Currington. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Dismissing Hertz lEquipment Rental Corporation)(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 71 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss JLG Industries, Inc. filed by JLG Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rowley, Kyle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2014: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ). (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    JOINDER in Defendant XTO Energy, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC. (Fields, Charlotte) Modified on 4/30/2014 (mrp, ). (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Justin Currington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email concerning extension of scheduling order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Justin Currington. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order dismissing defendant JLG Industries, Inc.)(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by XTO Energy, Inc. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation. (mrp, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation. (mrp, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JLG Industries, Inc. of First Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Rowley, Kyle) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC Expert Disclosures (Fields, Charlotte) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JLG Industries, Inc. (Rowley, Kyle) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by XTO Energy, Inc. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by McNeely Service Company Second Supplemental Disclosure (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JLG Industries, Inc. (Rowley, Kyle) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC Second Amended (Fields, Charlotte) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by XTO Energy, Inc. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by XTO Energy, Inc. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference is set for 11/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone., Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2014. Discovery due by 6/6/2014. Motions due by 7/11/2014. Motion terminated: 57 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Justin Currington. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/2/14. (mrp, ) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Justin Currington. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by XTO Energy, Inc. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Hertz Equipment Rental Corporation's ANSWER to 46 Amended Complaint by HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation.(Agron, Harold) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JLG Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oshkosh Corporation for JLG Industries, Inc.. (Rowley, Kyle) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Defendant's ANSWER to 46 Amended Complaint by JLG Industries, Inc..(Rowley, Kyle) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JLG Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oshkosh Corporation for JLG Industries, Inc.. (Rowley, Kyle) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** ANSWER to 46 Amended Complaint by JLG Industries, Inc..(Rowley, Kyle) Modified on 9/18/2013 (bjc, ). (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by McNeely Service Company Notice of Filing of Supplemental Disclosures (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 46 Amended Complaint by SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC.(Fields, Charlotte) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 46 Amended Complaint by XTO Energy, Inc..(Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued as to JLG Industries, Inc. and emailed to plaintiff's counsel for service. (mrp, ) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint (signed) against All Defendants, filed by Justin Currington.(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC First Amended Initial Disclosures (Fields, Charlotte) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Justin Currington.(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by McNeely Service Company Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by McNeely Service Company (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC (Fields, Charlotte) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Hertz Corporation for HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation. (Wagner, Jason) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Status Conference set for 8/1/2014 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before Judge Marcia A. Crone. Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2014. Discovery shall be completed by 3/7/2014.. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/24/2013. (bjc) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia A. Crone: Scheduling Conference held on 7/24/2013. (bjc) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC (Fields, Charlotte) Modified on 7/25/2013 (tkd, ). (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Justin Currington (Fields, Charlotte) Modified on 7/25/2013 (tkd, ). (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  ORIGINAL ANSWER to 1 Complaint by McNeely Service Company.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Currington. McNeely Service Company served by CMRRR on 6/27/2013, answer due 7/18/2013. (mrp, ) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 29 Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Process.Plaintiff has taken steps to re-serve McNeely. As such, the court finds that there is a reasonable prospect that Plaintiff will be able to serve McNeely properly, and, thus, dismissal is not appropriate at this time. McNeely's motion to dismiss is denied, service on McNeely is quashed, and Plaintiff is permitted to cure the defect cited above. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/2/13. (mrp, ) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(4) MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(4) filed by Justin Currington. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Opinion in Bowman v. Sanofi Aventis U.S.)(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(4) MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(4) filed by Justin Currington. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order denying Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Opinion in Bowman v. Sanofi-Aventis, U.S.)(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Original ANSWER to Complaint Amended [Docket #15] by SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC.(Fields, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(4) by McNeely Service Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibt 1 of McNeely's Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Process)(Adams, Kent) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2013: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (mrp, ). (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 24 Motion for leave to designate Precision Drilling Company LP as a Responsible Third Party. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/15/13. (mrp, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by XTO Energy, Inc. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: 24 Unopposed MOTION Leave to Designate Responsible Third Party.. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION Leave to Designate Responsible Third Party by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint by XTO Energy, Inc..(Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Issued and emailed to plaintiff's counsel for service as to McNeely Service Company, SDS Petroleum Consultants LLC. (mrp, ) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/1/13. (mrp, ) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ron Clark recused. Case reassigned to Judge Marcia A. Crone for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/30/13. (tkd, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Original ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint by HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation.(Wagner, Jason) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gordon David Barnett on behalf of XTO Energy, Inc. (Barnett, Gordon) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File by Justin Currington. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Bridwell, Michael) Modified on 4/15/2013 (tkd, ). (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Parties, filed by Justin Currington. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by XTO Energy, Inc. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation (Saenz, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by XTO Energy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ExxonMobil Corporation for XTO Energy, Inc.. (Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint by XTO Energy, Inc..(Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Currington. XTO Energy, Inc. served on 1/23/2013. (tkd, ) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Currington. HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation served on 1/23/2013. (tkd, ) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 7 Motion to substitute counsel. Attorney Michael Golemi is allowed to withdraw for deft XTO Energy Inc, and Michael Bridwell is allowed to substitute in his place. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/25/13. (tkd, ) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Substitute Attorney by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bridwell, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance and substitution of counsel by Michael Thomas Bridwell on behalf of XTO Energy, Inc. (Bridwell, Michael) Modified on 2/22/2013 (bjc, ). (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by 3/8/13. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2013 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/18/13. (tkd, ) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint by HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation.(Graeff, Margaret) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re XTO Energy, Inc..( Golemi, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation and XTO Energy, Inc. and emailed to pla's atty for service (aam, ) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against HERTZ Equipment Rental Corporation, XTO Energy, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3913599.), filed by Justin Currington. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barkley, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?