Earl Diamond v. Commissioner of Social Securi
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 13-2507

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 19, 2016 at 11:44 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2862 - Social Security: Black Lung
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011981164 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF filed by Party Earl Diamond. Certificate of Service:02/21/2014. (BLC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011959045 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
    APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Tamara Ulrich for Commissioner of Social Security. Certificate of Service:02/07/2014. Argument Request: waived. (TU)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011918268 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION filed by Ms. Tamara Ulrich for Commissioner of Social Security to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 12/23/2013. (TU)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011899323 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
        APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Earl Diamond. Certificate of Service:11/24/2013. Argument Request: waived. (BLC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011883863 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
          APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Commissioner of Social Security by Tamara Ulrich. Certificate of Service: 11/15/2013. (TU)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011876664 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
            CASE OPENING/BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/09/2013;. appellee brief due 01/08/2014. (BLC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
              RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [10] filed by Ms. Tamara Ulrich., resetting pro se briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 02/07/2014. (BLC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 147 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?