Earl v. Smith
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-00358

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2018 at 12:08 AM EDT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Christine McLean, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Institute for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul V Avelar +1 480 557 8300 pavelar@ij.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica Smith +1 703 682 9320 +1 703 682 9321 esmith@ij.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanford Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Wesley Burks +1 501 221 0088 +1 888 787 2040 chris@sanfordlawfirm.com
No Logo Nivea Earl, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Institute for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul V Avelar +1 480 557 8300 pavelar@ij.org
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica Smith +1 703 682 9320 +1 703 682 9321 esmith@ij.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanford Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Wesley Burks +1 501 221 0088 +1 888 787 2040 chris@sanfordlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Adrian Tabb, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Merritt +1 501 682 1319 +1 501 682 2591 jennifer.merritt@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Angela Jackson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Merritt +1 501 682 1319 +1 501 682 2591 jennifer.merritt@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Cynthia Steele, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Merritt +1 501 682 1319 +1 501 682 2591 jennifer.merritt@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Jessica Peck, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Merritt +1 501 682 1319 +1 501 682 2591 jennifer.merritt@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Kelli Kersey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Merritt +1 501 682 1319 +1 501 682 2591 jennifer.merritt@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Kimberly Ford, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Merritt +1 501 682 1319 +1 501 682 2591 jennifer.merritt@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Nathaniel Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Merritt +1 501 682 1319 +1 501 682 2591 jennifer.merritt@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Trish Anderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Merritt +1 501 682 1319 +1 501 682 2591 jennifer.merritt@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Wendy Sullivan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Merritt +1 501 682 1319 +1 501 682 2591 jennifer.merritt@arkansasag.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. (Avelar, Paul) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Legislative Action (Avelar, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: This action is hereby stayed pending the completion of the 2015 session of the Arkansas General Assembly. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action administratively. However, should the State seek to enforce the challenged laws against hair braiders, the plaintiffs may move to reopen this action and seek an injunction. Furthermore, either party may move to reopen this action within 30 days after the close of the 2015 session of the Arkansas General Assembly. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/16/2014. (ks)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Declaratory Order)(Merritt, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants must file their reply to plaintiff's 17 Response on or before August 6, 2014. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/29/2014. (ks)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
            INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/25/2014; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/9/2014; proposed bench trial date the week of 7/20/2015 in Little Rock. Signed at the direction of the Court. (cdw)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Authority)(Avelar, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Based on 19 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge J. Leon Holmes. (plm) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER OF RECUSAL: Due to the Court's professional relationship with attorney Jennifer L. Merrit, Judge Baker recuses from this case in order to avoid the appearance of impropriety. The Clerk will reassign this action. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/29/2014. (rhm)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss by All Defendants (Merritt, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE to Motion re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. (Avelar, Paul) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Merritt, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Merritt, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Merritt on behalf of All Defendants (Merritt, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. Wendy Sullivan served on 6/17/2014. (Burks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. Trish Anderson served on 6/17/2014. (Burks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. Nathaniel Smith served on 6/17/2014. (Burks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. Kimberly Ford served on 6/17/2014. (Burks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. Kelli Kersey served on 6/17/2014. (Burks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. Jessica Peck served on 6/17/2014. (Burks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. Cynthia Steele served on 6/17/2014. (Burks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. Angela Jackson served on 6/17/2014. (Burks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nivea Earl, Christine McLean. Adrian Tabb served on 6/17/2014. (Burks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 2 3 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. For good cause shown, the Court grants Ms. Smith and Mr. Avelar's motions. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 06/19/2014. (rhm) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Paul V Avelar. Fee $100 receipt number LIT046472. (rhm) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Erica J Smith. Fee $100 receipt number LIT046471. (rhm) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      COMPLAINT filed by Nivea Earl and Christine McLean against all Defendants. (Fee of $ 400 Paid - Receipt No. LIT046473.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rhm) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?