Ochoa et al v. McDonald's Corp et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-02098

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 4:51 PM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ernestina Sandoval, Plaintiff
No Logo Jasmine Hedgepeth, Plaintiff
No Logo Stephanie Ochoa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Altshuler Berzon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara Jane Chisholm +1 415 421 7151 +1 415 362 8264 bchisholm@altshulerberzon.com
Space MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY +1 415 421 7151 +1 415 362 8064 mmurray@altber.com
Space Patrick Casey Pitts +1 415 421 7151 +1 415 362 8064 cpitts@altshulerberzon.com
Space Michael Rubin , +1 415 421 7151 +1 415 362 8064 mrubin@altber.com
No Logo Yadira Rodriguez, Plaintiff
v.
McDonald's Corporation McDonald's Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "McDonald's Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred W. Alvarez +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 falvarez@jonesday.com
Space Allison B. Moser +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 amoser@jonesday.com
No Logo McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mcdonald's Usa, Llc, Defendant
No Logo The Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Rachel Gorman +1 415 689 1217 +1 415 394 9501 lgorman@fmglaw.com
Space Dennis Daniel Strazulo +1 415 394 9500 +1 415 394 9501 dstrazulo@fmglaw.com
Space Bruce E. Weisenberg +1 415 689 1219 +1 415 394 9501 jfitzgerald@fmglaw.com
  Entries (410) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Settlement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Settlement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  Order by Hon. James Donato granting 318 Administrative Motion to Replace Document Number 316 With Redacted Version. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    ORDER. The Court sets a status conference for August 3, 2016, at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 11 in San Francisco. The parties should be prepared to commit to a jury trial in October or November 2016, and agree upon a date for that. The Court will also consider any other case management issues the parties would like to raise. (Donato, James) (Filed on 7/8/2016) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      Order re Motion for Class Certification entered by Hon. James Donato. (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Replace Dkt. 316 with a Redacted Version re 316 Letter filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. Responses due by 7/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Version of Dkt. 316, # 2 Proposed Order)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 7/6/2016) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER re 315 Stipulated Continuance of Hearing. The Court grants the stipulated request. The hearing on plaintiffs' 306 motion for attorneys' fees and costs and 309 motion for final settlement approval and service awards is continued from July 20, 2016 to August 31, 2016, at 10 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/5/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                            Letter dated 6/22/2016 from William Navichoque. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016) (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION re 309 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Named Plaintiff Service Awards, 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs CONTINUING HEARING DATE filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                Declaration of Jasmine Hedgepeth in Support of 309 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Named Plaintiff Service Awards filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 309 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/22/2016) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Declaration of Yadira Rodriguez in Support of 309 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Named Plaintiff Service Awards filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 309 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/22/2016) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Declaration of Ernestina Sandoval in Support of 309 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Named Plaintiff Service Awards filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 309 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/22/2016) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Declaration of Stephanie Ochoa in Support of 309 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Named Plaintiff Service Awards filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 309 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/22/2016) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Declaration of Matthew J. Murray in Support of 309 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Named Plaintiff Service Awards filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 309 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/22/2016) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Named Plaintiff Service Awards filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 7/6/2016. Replies due by 7/13/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/22/2016) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Declaration of Joseph M. Sellers in Support of 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 306 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2016) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Declaration of Michael Rubin in Support of 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 306 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2016) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 5/31/2016. Replies due by 7/6/2016. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2016) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 297 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Smith Defendant and for Preliminary Certification of Settlement Class; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 12/7/2015. Smith defendants to provide Plaintiffs with final piece of information to finalize settlement agreement by Tuesday, December 8, 2015. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Rubin. Defendant Attorney: John Fitzgerald. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2015) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 11/5/2015. (Not Reported)Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Rubin. Defendant Attorney: John Fitzgerald. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2015) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. James Donato granting 290 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Defendants' motion to file a supplemental brief is granted. Plaintiffs may file a supplemental response not to exceed 10 pages by 10/27/15. No other briefs may be filed on this issue. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    In light of settlement discussions between the parties, further proceedings on 224 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are STAYED. All related deadlines, including deadlines for filing of opposition by the Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership, are vacated pending further notice from the Court. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 9/10/2015 and 9/11/2015. (Not Reported)Plaintiff Attorneys: Michael Rubin; Barbara Chisholm. Defendant Attorney: John Fitzgerald. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/11/2015) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          In light of the current state of settlement negotiations, and in response to the parties' 251 Stipulation, the Court will move forward with a ruling on 143 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement and briefing on 224 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are due by 9/23/2015; Replies are due by 9/30/2015. All other dates are vacated. The Court will reschedule additional future dates in a separate order. (This is a text-only order. No document is associated with this order.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 9/4/2015. Further telephone settlement conference with the plaintiffs and Smiths September 11, 2015 at 9 a.m. (Not Reported)Plaintiff Attorneys: Michael Rubin; Barbara Chisholm; Eve Cervantez; Matthew Murray. Defendant Attorneys: Lawrence DiNardo; John Fitzgerald. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2015) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Pretrial Conference set for September 2, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. has been VACATED. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER STAYING CASE. In light of the parties' continued commitment to settlement negotiations, the Court stays the case in all respects until September 5, 2015. The Court defers entry of an amended scheduling order. (Donato, James) (Filed on 8/12/2015) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 7/29/2015. Further telephone settlement discussions will occur by noon on Friday, August 7, 2015. (Not reported)Plaintiff Attorney: Michael RubinDefendant Attorneys: John Fitzgerald; Kacie Manisco; Lawrence DiNardo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/29/2015) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 224 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 7/6/2015. Case did not settle. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Michael Rubin; Joseph Sellers. Defendant Attorney: John Fitzgerald. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/6/2015) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. James Donato re 235 Discovery Letter Brief. The Court grants plaintiffs leave to exceed the Court's default ten-deposition limit to depose Valerie Smith. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Continued Exhibits to Jt. Opposition to Relief Requested in Plaintiffs' Fourth Administrative Motion to Seal (Dkt. No. 218) filed by McDonald's Corp., McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc., McDonald's U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.144 to C. Pitts Dec., # 2 Exhibit Redacted Ex.144 to C. Pitts Dec., # 3 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.145 to C. Pitts Dec., # 4 Exhibit Redacted Ex.145 to C. Pitts Dec., # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.206 to C. Pitts Dec., # 6 Exhibit Redacted Ex.206 to C. Pitts Dec., # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Part 1 of Ex.243 to C. Pitts Dec., # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Part 2 of Ex.243 to C. Pitts Dec., # 9 Exhibit Unredacted Part 3 of Ex.243 to C. Pitts Dec., # 10 Exhibit Unredacted Part 4 of Ex.243 to C. Pitts Dec., # 11 Exhibit Redacted Part 1 of Ex.243 to C. Pitts Dec., # 12 Exhibit Redacted Part 2 of Ex.243 to C. Pitts Dec., # 13 Exhibit Redacted Part 3 of Ex.243 to C. Pitts Dec., # 14 Exhibit Redacted Part 4 of Ex.243 to C. Pitts Dec., # 15 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 265 to C. Pitts Dec., # 16 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.265 to C. Pitts Dec., # 17 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.266 to C. Pitts Dec., # 18 Exhibit Redacted Ex.266 to C. Pitts Dec., # 19 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.296 to C. Pitts Dec., # 20 Exhibit Redacted Ex.296 to C. Pitts Dec., # 21 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.324 to C. Pitts Dec., # 22 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.325 to C. Pitts Dec., # 23 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.344 to C. Pitts Dec.)(McRee, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/23/2015) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Continued Exhibits to Jt. Opposition to Relief Requested in Plaintiffs' Fourth Administrative Motion to Seal (Dkt. No. 218) filed by McDonald's Corp., McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc., McDonald's U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unredacted Part 1 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 2 Exhibit Unredacted Part 2 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 3 Exhibit Unredacted Part 3 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Part 4 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Part 5 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Part 6 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Part 7 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 8 Exhibit Redacted Part 1 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 9 Exhibit Redacted Part 2 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 10 Exhibit Redacted Part 3 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 11 Exhibit Redacted Part 4 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 12 Exhibit Redacted Part 5 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 13 Exhibit Redacted Part 6 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 14 Exhibit Redacted Part 7 of Ex.106 to C. Pitts Dec., # 15 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.107 to C. Pitts Dec., # 16 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.109 to C. Pitts Dec., # 17 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.3 to J. Gordon Dec., # 18 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.112 to C. Pitts Dec., # 19 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 129 to C. Pitts Dec., # 20 Exhibit Redacted Ex.129 to C. Pitts Dec., # 21 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.130 to C. Pitts Dec., # 22 Exhibit Redacted Ex.130 to C. Pitts Dec., # 23 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.131 to C. Pitts Dec., # 24 Exhibit Redacted Ex.131 to C. Pitts Dec., # 25 Exhibit Unredacted Ex.142 to C. Pitts Dec., # 26 Unredacted Ex.143 to C. Pitts Dec.)(McRee, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/23/2015) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Continued Exhibits to Jt. Opposition to Relief Requested in Plaintiffs' Fourth Administrative Motion to Seal (Dkt. No. 218) filed by McDonald's Corp., McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc., McDonald's U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. H to C. Pitts Dec., # 2 Exhibit Redacted Ex. H to C. Pitts Dec., # 3 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. I to C. Pitts Dec., # 4 Exhibit Redacted Ex. H to C. Pitts Dec., # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Part 1 of Ex. J to C. Pitts Dec., # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Part 2 of Ex. J to C. Pitts Dec., # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Part 3 of Ex. J to C. Pitts Dec., # 8 Exhibit Redacted Part 1 of Ex. J to C. Pitts Dec., # 9 Exhibit Redacted Part 2 of Ex. J to C. Pitts Dec., # 10 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 22 to C. Pitts Dec., # 11 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 22 to C. Pitts Dec., # 12 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 47 to C. Pitts Dec., # 13 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 47 to C. Pitts Dec., # 14 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 49 to C. Pitts Dec., # 15 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 50 to C. Pitts Dec., # 16 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 50 to C. Pitts Dec., # 17 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 51 to C. Pitts Dec., # 18 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 52 to C. Pitts Dec., # 19 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 53 to C. Pitts Dec., # 20 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 53 to C. Pitts Dec., # 21 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 69 to C. Pitts Dec., # 22 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 69 to C. Pitts Dec., # 23 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 71 to C. Pitts Dec., # 24 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 71 to C. Pitts Dec.)(McRee, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/23/2015) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Jt. Opposition to Relief Requested in Plaintiffs' Fourth Administrative Motion to Seal (Dkt. No. 218) filed by McDonald's Corp., McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc., McDonald's U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unredacted Plaintiffs' Opposition to the McDonald's Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Redacted Plaintiffs' Opposition to the McDonald's Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted Dec. of J. Gordon, # 4 Exhibit Redacted Dec. of J. Gordon, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. A to Dec. of C. Perna, # 6 Exhibit Redacted Ex. A to Dec. of C. Perna, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. B to Dec. of C. Perna, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Part 1 of Ex. 122 to Dec. of C. Perna, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted Part 2 of Ex. 122 to Dec. of C. Perna, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted Part 3 of Ex. 122 to Dec. of C. Perna, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted Part 4 of Ex. 122 to Dec. of C. Perna, # 12 Exhibit Unredacted Part 1 of Ex. 123 to Dec. of C. Perna, # 13 Exhibit Unredacted Part 2 of Ex. 123 to Dec. of C. Perna, # 14 Exhibit Unredacted Part 3 of Ex. 123 of Dec. of C. Perna, # 15 Exhibit Unredacted Part 4 of Ex. 123 to Dec. of C. Perna, # 16 Exhibit Unredacted Part 5 of Ex. 123 to Dec. of C. Perna, # 17 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. B to Dec. of C. Pitts, # 18 Exhibit Redacted Ex. B to Dec. of C. Pitts, # 19 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. C to Dec. of C. Pitts, # 20 Exhibit Redacted Ex. C to Dec. of C. Pitts)(McRee, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/23/2015) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held with plaintiff and the Smith defendants only on 6/22/2015. Further in-person settlement conference set for 7/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Not Reported)Plaintiff Attorneys: Michael Rubin; Barbara Chisholm. Defendant Attorneys: John Fitzgerald; Kacie Manisco. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2015) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 330 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 331 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 332 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 333 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 334 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 344 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 114 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 299 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 308 (Part I) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 308 (Part II) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 309 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 310 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 311 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 312 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 324 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 325 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 326 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 327 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 328 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 329 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 243 (Part I) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 243 (Part II) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 243 (Part III) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 243 (Part IV) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 244 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 246 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 249 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 250 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 251 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 254 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 265 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 266 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit 267 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit 272 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 15 Exhibit 283 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 16 Exhibit 296 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 17 Exhibit 300 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 18 Exhibit 301 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 19 Exhibit 303 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 192 (Part XIV) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 192 (Part XV) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 194 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 205 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 206 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 207 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 208 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 222 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 224 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 227 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 240 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 241 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 192 (Part VII) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 192 (Part VIII) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 192 (Part IX) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 192 (Part X) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 192 (Part XI) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 192 (Part XII) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 192 (Part XIII) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 192 (Part I) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 192 (Part II) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 192 (Part III) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 192 (Part IV) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 192 (Part V) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 192 (Part VI) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 172 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 176 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 177 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 178 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 182 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 188 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 190 (Part I) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 190 (Part II) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 190 (Part III) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 134 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 135 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 142 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 143 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 144 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 145 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 146 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 147 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 152 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 163 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 167 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 106 (Part VII) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 107 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 108 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 109 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 112 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 117 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 126 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 129 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 130 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 131 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 132 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 106 (Part I) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 106 (Part II) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 106 (Part III) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 106 (Part IV) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 106 (Part V) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 106 (Part VI) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 104 (Part I) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 104 (Part II) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 104 (Part III) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 104 (Part IV) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 105 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 86 (Part I) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 86 (Part II) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 87 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 88 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 89 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 99 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 100 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 101 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 69 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 71 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 78 (Part I) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 78 (Part II) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 78 (Part III) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 78 (Part IV) to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 84 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 85 to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit L to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit M to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit N to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit P to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit P to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit S to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit T to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 47 to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 49 to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 50 to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit 51 to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit 52 to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Redacted), # 15 Exhibit 52 to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted), # 16 Exhibit 53 to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Redacted), # 17 Exhibit 53 to Declaration of P. Casey PItts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit B to to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit C to to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit to to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit D to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit E to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit E to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit F to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Redacted), # 12 F to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit G to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit H to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted), # 15 Exhibit I to Declaration of P. Casey Pitts (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 196 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 123 (Part I) to Declaration of Carlina Perna (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 123 (Part II) to Declaration of Carlina Perna (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 123 (Part III) to Declaration of Carlina Perna (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 123 (Part IV) to Declaration of Carlina Perna (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 123 (Part V) to Declaration of Carlina Perna (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 196 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2015) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to McDonald's Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 6/15/2015) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 151 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule for 143 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' response brief is due 6/19/2015. McDonald's reply brief is due 6/29/2015. The hearing is set for 7/8/2015. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Settlement Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD:Please take notice that due to the unavailability of Mr. Fitzgerald, the settlement conference scheduled for June 2, 2015 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley is vacated. The Court will reschedule the settlement conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING HEARING TIME FROM 9:30 A.M. TO 10:00 A.M. ON JUNE 24, 2015.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 143 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 6/3/2015. Replies due by 6/10/2015. Motion Hearing reset to 6/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2015. re 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed by Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval, Stephanie Ochoa, Jasmine Hedgepeth Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/13/2015) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 129 McDonald's summary judgment motion. As discussed at the May 13, 2015, hearing, the Court strikes 129 the McDonald's defendants' motion for summary judgment. The McDonald's defendants will be given until May 20, 2015, to file a single 25-page summary judgment motion on all issues for which they intend to move for summary judgment. The Court expects the parties to work together to expedite any necessary discovery and to propose an efficient briefing schedule. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.)(jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 129 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp., McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc., McDonald's U.S.A., LLC re 128 Second Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (McRee, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/12/2015) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Bruce Steinhilper in Support of 129 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byMcDonald's Corp., McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc., McDonald's U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (Redacted))(Related document(s) 129 ) (McRee, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/12/2015) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) The Telephonic Discovery Hearing previously set for 5/6/2015 a 2:00 PM is continued to 5/7/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to schedule their appearance before the Court for the hearing. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 5/6/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to schedule their appearance before the Court for the hearing. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 108 and 116 Discovery Letter Briefs. The Court sets a telephonic hearing for 5/6/2015 at 2:00 p.m. to discuss the briefs. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 108 discovery letter brief. Plaintiffs will file a response to the brief by 5/4/2015. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015) Modified on 5/4/2015 (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/25/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/25/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/25/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/25/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/25/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted). Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order granting in part and denying in part 69 Stipulation entered by Hon. James Donato. The parties have bombarded the Court with multiple requests to extend case management dates set in August 2014. The Court previously advised the parties that those dates should be treated as firm unless genuine good cause exists to move them. In the multiple continuance requests the parties have made, little good cause is apparent. The effect of these creeping deadline continuances is to jam the Court's schedule to the prejudice of other pending cases. For this particular request, the Court grants no more than an extra 5 days for the opposition and reply briefs. The parties should have worked out the expert issues long ago. The May 13, 2015, class certification hearing date will not be moved unless the Court's schedule for other matters requires that. The Court will issue orders on the other pending requests separately. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 66, # 2 Exhibit 67, # 3 Exhibit 70, # 4 Exhibit 71, # 5 Exhibit 73, # 6 Exhibit 81, # 7 Exhibit 82, # 8 Exhibit 66, # 9 Exhibit 67, # 10 Exhibit 70, # 11 Exhibit 71, # 12 Exhibit 73, # 13 Exhibit 81, # 14 Exhibit 82)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 61, # 2 Exhibit 62, # 3 Exhibit 63, # 4 Exhibit 64, # 5 Exhibit 65, # 6 Exhibit 61, # 7 Exhibit 62, # 8 Exhibit 63, # 9 Exhibit 64, # 10 Exhibit 65 Part I, # 11 Exhibit 65 Part II, # 12 Exhibit 65 Part III)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 48, # 2 Exhibit 52, # 3 Exhibit 53, # 4 Exhibit 54, # 5 Exhibit 55, # 6 Exhibit 56, # 7 Exhibit 57, # 8 Exhibit 58, # 9 Exhibit 59, # 10 Exhibit 60, # 11 Exhibit 48 Part I, # 12 Exhibit 48 Part II, # 13 Exhibit 48 Part III, # 14 Exhibit 52, # 15 Exhibit 53, # 16 Exhibit 54, # 17 Exhibit 55, # 18 Exhibit 56, # 19 Exhibit 57, # 20 Exhibit 58, # 21 Exhibit 59, # 22 Exhibit 60)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 45, # 3 Exhibit 46, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 45 Part I, # 6 Exhibit 45 Part II, # 7 Exhibit 45 Part III, # 8 Exhibit 45 Part IV, # 9 Exhibit 46)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B Part I, # 2 Exhibit B Part II, # 3 Exhibit B Part I, # 4 Exhibit B Part II, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Matthew J. Murray, # 2 Exhibit A Part I, # 3 Exhibit A Part II, # 4 Exhibit A Part I, # 5 Exhibit A Part II)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kokaale Amissah-Aidoo, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Declaration Kokaale Amissah-Aidoo, # 9 Exhibit A, # 10 Exhibit B, # 11 Exhibit C, # 12 Exhibit D, # 13 Exhibit E, # 14 Exhibit F)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Declaration David M. Breshears, # 6 Declaration David M. Breshears, # 7 Declaration Richard Drogin, # 8 Declaration Richard Drogin)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 82 Declaration in Support, of Matthew J. Murray filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 62, # 2 Exhibit 63, # 3 Exhibit 64, # 4 Exhibit 65, # 5 Exhibit 66, # 6 Exhibit 67, # 7 Exhibit 70, # 8 Exhibit 71, # 9 Exhibit 73, # 10 Exhibit 81, # 11 Exhibit 82)(Related document(s) 82 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 82 Declaration in Support, of Matthew J. Murray filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 35, # 5 Exhibit 45, # 6 Exhibit 46, # 7 Exhibit 48, # 8 Exhibit 52, # 9 Exhibit 53, # 10 Exhibit 54, # 11 Exhibit 55, # 12 Exhibit 56, # 13 Exhibit 57, # 14 Exhibit 58, # 15 Exhibit 59, # 16 Exhibit 60, # 17 Exhibit 61)(Related document(s) 82 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Matthew J. Murray in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part I, # 2 Exhibit A Part II, # 3 Exhibit B Part I, # 4 Exhibit B Part II, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Joseph Sellers in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Michael Rubin in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Maria Matias in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Zamani Harris in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Stephanie Ochoa in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Jasmine Hedgepeth in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Yadira Rodriguez in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Ernestina Sandoval in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Richard Drogin in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) (Declaration Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of David M. Breshears in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) (Declaration Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Kokaale Amissah-Aidoo in Support of 70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) (Declaration Redacted) filed byJasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 70 ) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 4/20/2015. Replies due by 4/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. James Donato granting 25 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order resetting date for filing class certification motions. The deadline for filing class certification motions is reset to 4/06/2015. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Hon. James Donato granting 53 Stipulation Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information, except that to the extent the stipulation conflicts with the Court's standing orders, the standing orders control. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER resetting setting telephone conference to discuss 54 joint motion to modify case management deadlines. The Court resets the telephonic discovery conference for 1/20/15 at 1:30 pm. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting telephone conference to discuss 54 joint motion to modify case management deadlines. The Court sets a telephonic discovery conference for 1/19/15 at 1:30 pm. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Hon. James Donato granting 49 Stipulation. The stipulated protective order is entered with the proviso that to the extent any provision of the protective order conflicts with the Court's standing orders, the standing orders will control. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. James Donato denying 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. The request is denied for failure to provide a certificate of good standing from the highest court of the state in which counsel has been admitted to practice. Counsel is also advised to use the "Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice" form available on the Court's website for this request. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Moser, Allison) (Filed on 7/15/2014) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 7/15/2014) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 7/15/2014) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by McDonald's Corp., McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc., McDonald's U.S.A., LLC Per Civil Local Rule 3-15 (Moser, Allison) (Filed on 5/20/2014) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/20/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.Signed by Executive Committee on 5/19/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership.. (Weisenberg, Bruce) (Filed on 5/15/2014) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Allison B. Moser Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Moser, Allison) (Filed on 5/15/2014) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval.. (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 5/15/2014) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Casey Pitts (Pitts, Patrick) (Filed on 5/9/2014) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Jane Chisholm CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 11 (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE 12 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Jane Chisholm CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 7 (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rubin CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 5 (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Murray (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Jane Chisholm (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rubin (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership re 2 Notice of Removal. (Weisenberg, Bruce) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL (modied to include attachments) from Superior Court for County of Alameda. Their case number is RG14717102. (). Filed byThe Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaraton of Edward J. Smith ISO Notice of Removal, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weisenberg, Bruce) (Filed on 5/7/2014) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for County of Alameda. Their case number is RG14717102. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-8596857). Filed byThe Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership. (Weisenberg, Bruce) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1,932 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?