Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. v. TechSmith Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-01018

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 12:18 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Arnett, II +1 214 550 8209 +1 214 550 8185 barnett@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Scott Loveless +1 972 292 8303 +1 817 887 5950 ryan@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Arnett, II +1 214 550 8209 +1 214 550 8185 barnett@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Scott Loveless +1 972 292 8303 +1 817 887 5950 ryan@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Techsmith Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duby Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom Cone Jim@Dubylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer, LLP - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff S Patterson +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 jpatterson@hdbdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Techsmith Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duby Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom Cone Jim@Dubylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer & Kern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Hsu +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 shsu@hdbdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer, LLP - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff S Patterson +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 jpatterson@hdbdlaw.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Hon. W. Royal Furgeson, Jr., Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by United States District Court For The Northern District of Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Royal Furgeson, Jr. +1 214 753 2355
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Robert Arnett, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Arnett, James) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 45 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by TechSmith Corporation. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
              RESPONSE to Motion re 45 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Amended Reply in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Change of Lead Counsel (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Robert Arnett, II on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Arnett, James) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Leon Carter on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                        ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 52 FOR CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY.*** RESPONSE to Motion re 45 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) Modified on 6/13/2014 (gsg). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by TechSmith Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                            Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Change of Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The civil action 6:12cv1013 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION to Extend Certain Deadlines re 29 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by TechSmith Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ***FILED IN ERROR*** PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) Modified on 10/15/2013 (mll, ). (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery, E-Discovery, and Protective Orders by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Disclosures Required by Paragraphs 2(B) and 2(C) of the Court's Discovery Order (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER that the parties submit their agreed Discovery Orders, ESI Orders, and Protective Orders in compliance with this Order within ten days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE by TechSmith Corporation of Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Judge William Royal Furgeson Jr is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Mediation Completion due by 3/2/2015. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 10/9/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Disclosures (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Joint Notice of Dispute (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Def Exh 1)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER re Notices of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order, and ESI Order. Parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint notice of dispute indicating the points that cannot be agreed upon, each partys proposal, and a brief statement of reasoning in support of each partys proposal. The joint notice SHALL be submitted on or before 9-03-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Hsu on behalf of TechSmith Corporation (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE by TechSmith Corporation Defendants' Notice of Dispute Concerning Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Dispute Concerning Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to File Additional Related Cases (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/29/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TechSmith Corporation (Patterson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE to 14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Counterclaims of Defendant TechSmith Corporation filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by J R Duby, Jr on behalf of TechSmith Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4052955. (Duby, J) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Defendant TechSmith Corporation's ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by TechSmith Corporation.(Patterson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Techsmith Corporation's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is extended to 3-18-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-01-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of Defendant Techsmith Corporation by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to TechSmith Corporation on 1/11/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/1/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to TechSmith Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against TechSmith Corporation, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3930580.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - United States Patent No. 5,490,216, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?