HARRIS, et al v. MCCRORY, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Middle District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00949
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2021 at 11:39 AM EDT (3.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo CHRISTINE BOWSER, Plaintiff

Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Devaney +1 202 434 1624 +1 202 654 9124 jdevaney@perkinscoie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc E. Elias +1 202 654 6200 +1 202 434 1690 melias@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin J. Hamilton +1 206 359 8000 khamilton@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Van Spiva +1 202 654 6203 +1 202 654 9664 bspiva@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William B. Stafford +1 206 359 6217 +1 206 359 7217 WStafford@perkinscoie.com

Represented by Poyner & Spruill LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CAROLINE P. MACKIE +1 919 783 1108 +1 919 783 1075 cmackie@poynerspruill.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder johale@poynerspruill.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR. +1 919 783 6400 +1 919 783 1075 espeas@poynerspruill.com
No Logo DAVID HARRIS, Plaintiff

Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Devaney +1 202 434 1624 +1 202 654 9124 jdevaney@perkinscoie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc E. Elias +1 202 654 6200 +1 202 434 1690 melias@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin J. Hamilton +1 206 359 8000 khamilton@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Van Spiva +1 202 654 6203 +1 202 654 9664 bspiva@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William B. Stafford +1 206 359 6217 +1 206 359 7217 WStafford@perkinscoie.com

Represented by Poyner & Spruill LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CAROLINE P. MACKIE +1 919 783 1108 +1 919 783 1075 cmackie@poynerspruill.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder johale@poynerspruill.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR. +1 919 783 6400 +1 919 783 1075 espeas@poynerspruill.com
No Logo SAMUEL LOVE, Plaintiff

Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Devaney +1 202 434 1624 +1 202 654 9124 jdevaney@perkinscoie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc E. Elias +1 202 654 6200 +1 202 434 1690 melias@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin J. Hamilton +1 206 359 8000 khamilton@perkinscoie.com

Represented by Poyner & Spruill LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CAROLINE P. MACKIE +1 919 783 1108 +1 919 783 1075 cmackie@poynerspruill.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder johale@poynerspruill.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR. +1 919 783 6400 +1 919 783 1075 espeas@poynerspruill.com
v.
No Logo JOSHUA HOWARD, Defendant

Represented by N.c. Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHERINE A. MURPHY +1 919 716 6920 +1 919 716 6764
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Douglas McKnight +1 919 789 3159 +1 919 783 9412 michael.mcknight@ogletreedeakins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip J. Strach +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 phil.strach@ogletree.com
No Logo NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, Defendant

Represented by N.c. Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHERINE A. MURPHY +1 919 716 6920 +1 919 716 6764
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Douglas McKnight +1 919 789 3159 +1 919 783 9412 michael.mcknight@ogletreedeakins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip J. Strach +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 phil.strach@ogletree.com
No Logo PATRICK MCCRORY, Defendant

Represented by N.c. Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHERINE A. MURPHY +1 919 716 6920 +1 919 716 6764
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Douglas McKnight +1 919 789 3159 +1 919 783 9412 michael.mcknight@ogletreedeakins.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (193) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None USCA Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Cost and Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Cost and Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None USCA Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None USCA Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT OPINION IN CASE NO.: 15-1262 re: 174 Notice of Appeal and 144 Notice of Appeal. (Coyne, Michelle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2017: # 1 Envelope) (Coyne, Michelle). Modified on 6/6/2017 (Coyne, Michelle). (Entered: 06/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Appeal Remark
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice from the Supreme Court of the United States: In this case probable jurisdiction is noted. USSC Case No.: 15-1262. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of William B. Stafford filed by Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS re 176 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Invoices)(SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, to Response to 165 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Summary of Additional Time Records)(SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0418-1942595. (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE (FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 165 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses filed by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. Replies due by 7/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas A. Farr, # 2 Declaration of Alec McC. Peters)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by ROGER L. GREGORY, United States Circuit Judge on 06/02/2016. The Court denies the plaintiffs' objections as presented. The Court reiterates that the denial of the plaintiffs' objections does not constitute or imply an endorsement of, or foreclose any additional challenges to, the Contingent Congressional Plan. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 165 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Stay Decision on Fee Petition by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. Responses due by 6/13/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 4/21/2016, that Defendants shall have an additional thirty (30) days from the date of this Order within which to serve their response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 165 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS re 165 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Proposed Reply Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exceed Page Limit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None To Exceed Page Limit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 142 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Memorandum and Opinion
LREF
Legal Document 141 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Order
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Clarification
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, to Response to 114 MOTION to Exclude in Part Testimony of Dr. Thomas Hofeller filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Trial Calendar
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Objection - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
OBJECTION - Other re 104 Final Pretrial Disclosures,,, by Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 - Objections)(SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Objection - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/26/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Exclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Trial Brief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Trial Brief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Exclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Final Pretrial Disclosures
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Designation of Deposition Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Witness List
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Amend
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Motion to Continue
Joint MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 7/23/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014 Notice of Trial Calendar
NOTICE of Trial Calendar: Bench Trial set for 8/4/2014 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1 before CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR., JUDGE MAX O. COGBURN, JR., JUDGE ROGER L. GREGORY. (Welch, Kelly) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY TO 76 RESPONSE TO 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 7/14/2014 to link to plaintiff's motion (Welch, Kelly). (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY TO 78 RESPONSE TO 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA - Excerpt and Exhibit from Peterson Deposition, # 2 Exhibit BB - Excerpt from Arrington Deposition) (FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 7/7/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE entitled "MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO 77 MOTION TO EXPAND PAGE LIMITATION" filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. Replies due by 7/18/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 7/3/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KATHERINE A. MURPHY on behalf of Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. (MURPHY, KATHERINE) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. Replies due by 7/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John M. Devaney, # 2 Appendix 1 - Copy of NAACP v. Fordice) (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 6/25/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. Responses due by 7/17/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expand Page Limitation)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. Replies due by 7/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - First District Population (Under 2000 Census), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Congressional Election Results) (FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 6/25/2014 to edit text and correct response deadline. See Minute Entry entered by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. on 4/7/2014 for Court's ruling. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 Memorandum
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 6/6/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 Memorandum
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. (FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 6/6/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., on 6/5/2014, that Defendants' consent motion (Doc. 71 ) is GRANTED and that the page limitation for Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment is expanded to 25 pages (exclusive of a signature page and certificate of service). Defendants shall file and serve their Memorandum of Law within five (5) days of this Order. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., on 6/5/2014, that Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. 70 ) is GRANTED and that the page limitation for Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby expanded to thirty-five (35) pages (exclusive of an index, signature page, and certificate of service). Plaintiffs shall file and serve their Memorandum of Law within five (5) days of this Order. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Consent Motion to Expand Page Limitation) (FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Proposed Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 6/4/2014 to edit duplicate text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. Responses due by 7/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John M. Devaney and Exhibits Thereto) (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. Responses due by 7/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q - Hofeller Deposition (Part 1 of 1), # 2 Exhibit Q - Hofeller Deposition (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit R - Hofeller Trial Testimony, # 4 Exhibit S - Ansolabehere Deposition (Part 1 of 1), # 5 Exhibit S - Ansolabehere Deposition (Part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit T - Harris Deposition Excerpts and Exhibits, # 7 Exhibit U - Bowser Deposition Excerpts and Exhibits, # 8 Exhibit V - Barber Deposition Exceprts and Exhibits, # 9 Exhibit W - Peterson Deposition Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit X - Churchill Affidavit, # 11 Exhibit Y - Frey Affidavit Exhbits 34 through 53, # 12 Exhibit Z - Public Hearing Statements) (FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: 5/27/2014 Notice of Intent to File Dispositive Motions
NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. (STRACH, PHILLIP) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: 5/27/2014 Notice of Intent to File Dispositive Motions
NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Order on Motion to Stay
MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. on 5/22/2014, that for the aforementioned reasons, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 18 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and that Defendants' Motion to Stay, Defer, or Abstain (Doc. 43 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Response to Motion
RESPONSE TO 62 SECOND RENEWED MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND RENEWED MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE. Replies due by 6/9/2014. (FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 5/22/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: 5/7/2014 Memorandum
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR 62 SECOND MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND RENEWED MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 5/8/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: 5/7/2014 Motion for Oral Argument
SECOND RENEWED MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND RENEWED MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. Responses due by 6/2/2014. (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Stipulation
STIPULATION REGARDING RECORD IN DICKSON v. RUCHO, CIVIL ACTION NO. 11-CVS-16896 AND NAACP v. STATE, CIVIL ACTION NO. 11-CVS-16940 by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - February 25, 2013 Stipulation) (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 5/6/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: 4/7/2014 Memorandum
SUPPLEMENT TO 53 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF 48 RENEWED MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 4/8/2014 to edit text and add document links. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/2/2014 Order on Motion to Supplement
ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., on 4/2/2014, that Plaintiff's motion (Doc. 55 ) is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs shall file the Supplement attached as Exhibit 1 to the motion within five (5) days of this Order. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Notice of Hearing.
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/7/2014 02:00 PM in Greensboro Courtroom #1 before CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. (Welch, Kelly) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Memorandum
BRIEF REGARDING SCHEDULING AND REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT by Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Email correspondence with Plaintiffs regarding scheduling, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Scheduling Order in Voting Rights Cases) (FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 3/26/2014 to edit text to accurately reflect document title. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Memorandum
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED CASE SCHEDULE by Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS. (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Motion to Supplement
Consent MOTION to Supplement Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Expedite by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. Responses due by 4/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Supplement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 3/14/2014 to add text and remove duplicate text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - partys
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) SAMUEL LOVE, filed by Plaintiff SAMUEL LOVE (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to 50 RESPONSE to 48 MOTION to Expedite and RENEWED MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 3/10/2014 to remove duplicate text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY MEMORANDUM to 47 RESPONSE to 43 MOTION to Stay , Defer, or Abstain filed by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 2/27/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL DOUGLAS MCKNIGHT on behalf of Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS (MCKNIGHT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to 48 MOTION to Expedite and RENEWED MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. Replies due by 3/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order entered in Shaw v. Hunt, filed 03/09/94, # 2 Exhibit B - Order entered in Shaw v Hunt, filed 07/30/96, # 3 Exhibit C - Hunt v. Cromartie)(FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 2/27/2014 to remove duplicate text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Memorandum
Filed & Entered:  02/21/2014 Notice of Docket Text/Event Modification
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Motion to Expedite
RENEWED MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 2/21/2014 to edit text to accurately reflect document title. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE in Opposition to 43 MOTION to Stay, Defer, or Abstain filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. Replies due by 2/26/2014. (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 2/21/2014 to correct reply deadline. (See Minute Entry entered 2/12/2014.) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Rule 26f - JointCourt Filing
ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., on 2/20/2014, approving 45 RULE 26F (JOINT) without modification. Mediation is not required under Local Civil Rule 16.4 for this case. Case-management track is established as: Complex. Discovery due by 5/1/2014. Plaintiffs' Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 3/14/2014. Defendants' Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 4/14/2014. The parties have discussed special procedures for managing this case, including reference of the case to a Magistrate Judge on consent of the parties under 28 U.S.C. §§ 636(c), or appointment of a master, and they do not wish to use any such procedures. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately 3 days. A jury trial has not been demanded. (Lloyd, Donna) Modified on 2/21/2014 to correct discovery deadline. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Rule 26f Report - Joint
Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF 43 MOTION TO STAY, DEFER, OR ABSTAIN filed by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - NAACP Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint - Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit 1 NAACP Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint - Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Dickson Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint - Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Dickson Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint - Part 2 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 - NAACP Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Order of Three-Judge Panel Denying Motion to Dismiss) (FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 2/18/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay, Defer, or Abstain by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. Responses due by 3/7/2014. (FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., on 2/11/2014, that Defendants' consent motion for leave to file a Sur-Reply (Doc. 41 ) is GRANTED and that Defendants shall file and serve their Sur-Reply within ten (10) days of this order. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Consent MOTION For Leave to File a Sur-Reply to 37 Reply to Response to Motion by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. Responses due by 3/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 2/10/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Memorandum
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 39 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual) filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 2/10/2014 to edit text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Rule 26f Report - Individual
Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). Responses due by 3/3/2014 by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE.(SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Rule 26f Report - Individual
Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). Responses due by 3/3/2014 by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS.(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to 29 RESPONSE to 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Ansolabehere Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Second Declaration of John M. Devaney) (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 2/4/2014 to remove duplicate text and add document link. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Memorandum
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 1/27/2014 to remove duplicate text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. on 1/23/2014; that Plaintiffs' Motion to Expand Page Limitation (Doc. 19 ) and Defendants' Motion to Expand Page Limitation (Doc. 34 ) are GRANTED. FURTHER that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 25 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. Responses due by 2/10/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expand Page Limitation)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Appendix
APPENDIX re 29 Response in Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M - Excerpts of Samuelson and Rucho Testimony at Dickson v. Rucho Trial, # 2 Exhibit N - Hofeller Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit O - First Bartlett Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit P - Second Bartlett Affidavit)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Appendix
APPENDIX re 29 Response in Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G - Erika Churchill Deposition Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit H - Excerpt from NC NAACP Plaintiffs Responses to First Request for Production of Documents, # 3 Exhibit I - WRAL Butterfield Story, # 4 Exhibit J - Mel Watt Letter, # 5 Exhibit K - Steven Gerontakis Testimony, # 6 Exhibit L - David Lewis Statement)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Appendix
APPENDIX re 29 Response in Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E - Fourth Affidavit of Dan Frey (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit E - Fourth Affidavit of Dan Frey (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Robert Rucho (Part 1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Robert Rucho (Part 2 of 2))(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Appendix
APPENDIX re 29 Response in Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Dickson v. Rucho Judgment and Memorandum (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit A - Dickson v. Rucho Judgment and Memorandum (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B - First Affidavit of Dan Frey, # 4 Exhibit C - Second Affidavit of Dan Frey, # 5 Exhibit D - Third Affidavit of Dan Frey)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. Replies due by 2/3/2014. (FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Motion for Oral Argument
MOTION for Oral Argument 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. Responses due by 2/6/2014 (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 2/12/2014 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1 before CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. Replies due by 1/27/2014. (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PHILLIP JOHN STRACH on behalf of Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS (STRACH, PHILLIP) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THOMAS A. FARR on behalf of Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS (FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ALEXANDER MCCLURE PETERS on behalf of Defendants JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS (PETERS, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Answer
Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Waiver of Service Executed
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE, CHRISTINE BOWSER. JOSHUA HOWARD waiver sent on 10/28/2013, answer due 12/27/2013. (O'HALE, JOHN) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. Responses due by 1/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 12/26/2013 to remove duplicate text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE. Responses due by 1/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Stephen Ansolabehere, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of John M. Devaney, # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 12/26/2013 to remove duplicate text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Waiver of Service of Summons
WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE, CHRISTINE BOWSER. NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS waiver sent on 10/28/2013, answer due 12/27/2013. (O'HALE, JOHN) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER signed by WILLIAM B. TRAXLER, JR, CHIEF JUDGE, U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FOURTH CIRCUIT on 11/06/2013; that THEREFORE, I DO HEREBY DESIGNATE the Honorable Roger L. Gregory, United States Circuit Judge for the Fourth Circuit; the Honorable William L. Osteen, Jr., United States Chief District Judge for the Middle District of North Carolina; and the Honorable Max O. Cogburn, Jr., United States District Judge for the Western District of North Carolina, to serve in the hearing and determination of this matter, as provided by law, the three to constitute a district court of three judges as provided by 28 U.S.C. § 2284. (Garland, Leah) Modified on 12/16/2013. (Powell, Gloria). (Entered: 11/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 Waiver of Service Executed
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE, CHRISTINE BOWSER. PATRICK MCCRORY waiver sent on 10/28/2013, answer due 12/27/2013. (O'HALE, JOHN) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN J. HAMILTON on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE (HAMILTON, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN M. DEVANEY on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE (DEVANEY, JOHN) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARC E. ELIAS on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN M. DEVANEY on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE (DEVANEY, JOHN) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN J. HAMILTON on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE (HAMILTON, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Notice of Appearance
*** FILED IN ERROR *** NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARC E. ELIAS on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE (ELIAS, MARC) Modified on 10/30/2013 to reflect filed in error. Document will be refiled to correct deficiency. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE re 7 Notice of Right to Consent (O'HALE, JOHN) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Notice of Right to Consent
Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to JOSHUA HOWARD, PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to NC Board of Elections, # 2 Summons to Howard) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN WARD O'HALE on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINE BOWSER, DAVID HARRIS, SAMUEL LOVE (O'HALE, JOHN) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAROLINE P. MACKIE on behalf of Plaintiffs Christine Bowser, David Harris, Samuel Love (MACKIE, CAROLINE) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR on behalf of Plaintiffs Christine Bowser, David Harris, Samuel Love (SPEAS, EDWIN) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Complaint
COMPLAINT (THREE-JUDGE COURT REQUESTED) against Joshua Howard, Patrick McCrory, North Carolina State Board of Elections ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-1397999.), filed by David Harris, Samuel Love, Christine Bowser. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPEAS, EDWIN) Modified on 11/7/2013 (Powell, Gloria). (Entered: 10/24/2013)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 141 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?