BANNER HEART HOSPITAL et al v. BURWELL
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01195

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 3:15 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BANNER BAYWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mimi Hu Brouillette +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 mimi.brouillette@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sven C. Collins +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 sven.collins@squirepb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen P. Nash +1 303 894 6173 +1 303 894 6173 stephen.nash@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michihiro M. Tsuda +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 michi.tsuda@squirepb.com
No Logo BANNER BOSWELL MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mimi Hu Brouillette +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 mimi.brouillette@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sven C. Collins +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 sven.collins@squirepb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen P. Nash +1 303 894 6173 +1 303 894 6173 stephen.nash@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michihiro M. Tsuda +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 michi.tsuda@squirepb.com
No Logo BANNER DEL E. WEBB MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mimi Hu Brouillette +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 mimi.brouillette@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sven C. Collins +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 sven.collins@squirepb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen P. Nash +1 303 894 6173 +1 303 894 6173 stephen.nash@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michihiro M. Tsuda +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 michi.tsuda@squirepb.com
No Logo BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mimi Hu Brouillette +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 mimi.brouillette@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sven C. Collins +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 sven.collins@squirepb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen P. Nash +1 303 894 6173 +1 303 894 6173 stephen.nash@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michihiro M. Tsuda +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 michi.tsuda@squirepb.com
No Logo BANNER ESTRELLA MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mimi Hu Brouillette +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 mimi.brouillette@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sven C. Collins +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 sven.collins@squirepb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen P. Nash +1 303 894 6173 +1 303 894 6173 stephen.nash@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michihiro M. Tsuda +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 michi.tsuda@squirepb.com
No Logo BANNER GATEWAY MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mimi Hu Brouillette +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 mimi.brouillette@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sven C. Collins +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 sven.collins@squirepb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen P. Nash +1 303 894 6173 +1 303 894 6173 stephen.nash@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michihiro M. Tsuda +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 michi.tsuda@squirepb.com
No Logo BANNER GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mimi Hu Brouillette +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 mimi.brouillette@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sven C. Collins +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 sven.collins@squirepb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen P. Nash +1 303 894 6173 +1 303 894 6173 stephen.nash@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michihiro M. Tsuda +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 michi.tsuda@squirepb.com
No Logo Banner Health, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mimi Hu Brouillette +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 mimi.brouillette@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sven C. Collins +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 sven.collins@squirepb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen P. Nash +1 303 894 6173 +1 303 894 6173 stephen.nash@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michihiro M. Tsuda +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 michi.tsuda@squirepb.com
No Logo BANNER HEART HOSPITAL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen P. Nash +1 303 894 6173 +1 303 894 6173 stephen.nash@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP - Palo Alto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mimi Hu Brouillette +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 mimi.brouillette@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sven C. Collins +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 sven.collins@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michihiro M. Tsuda +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 michi.tsuda@squirepb.com
No Logo BANNER THUNDERBIRD MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mimi Hu Brouillette +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 mimi.brouillette@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sven C. Collins +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 sven.collins@squirepb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen P. Nash +1 303 894 6173 +1 303 894 6173 stephen.nash@squirepb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michihiro M. Tsuda +1 303 830 1776 +1 303 894 9239 michi.tsuda@squirepb.com
v.
No Logo SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None ERRATA
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Surreply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Joint Appendix
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None ERRATA
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Standing Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(kb) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 13-00776; 13-00643. (Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BANNER BAYWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER BOSWELL MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER DEL E. WEBB MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER ESTRELLA MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER GATEWAY MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER HEART HOSPITAL, BANNER THUNDERBIRD MEDICAL CENTER, MCKEE MEDICAL CENTER, NORTH COLORADO MEDICAL CENTER (Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3779797) filed by MCKEE MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER BOSWELL MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER ESTRELLA MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER GATEWAY MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER BAYWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER THUNDERBIRD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER HEART HOSPITAL, BANNER DEL E. WEBB MEDICAL CENTER, NORTH COLORADO MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons (Sylvia Burwell), # 4 Summons (US Attorney), # 5 Summons (US Attorney General))(Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 251 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?