Hackman et al v. Wilson et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00221
District Judge Claude M. Hilton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 8:55 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Emory E. Hackman, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Emory E. Hackman, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emory E. Hackman, Jr. +1 703 288 2941 +1 703 237 2261

Toggle Switch Represented by Tesler & Werblood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Frederick Werblood +1 703 534 9300 +1 703 533 9487 mfw@markwerbloodlaw.com
No Logo Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Amy Huggard, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Suite, Defendant
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anastasia Poushkareva Cordova +1 703 712 5004 acordova@mcguirewoods.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Phillip Mulligan +1 703 712 5321 +1 703 712 5280 smulligan@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter Day Saints,, Defendant
No Logo Claudia Gutierrez, Defendant
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abid Riaz Qureshi +1 202 637 2240 +1 202 637 2201 abid.qureshi@lw.com
No Logo Edmund E. Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Florence Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Fountain Group of Companies, Defendant
HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Holdings PLC, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Jordon, Defendant
No Logo Jesus Martinez Cardona, Defendant
No Logo Ketih Fairchild, Defendant
No Logo Krystol Cameron, Defendant
No Logo Nancy Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Mohammed-Reynolds, Defendant
No Logo Paul Madsen, Defendant
No Logo Payge Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Gutierrez, Defendant
No Logo Simply Me, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Suhaya Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Tanya Wilson, Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Edward Shaffer +1 703 641 4200 +1 703 641 4340 mshaffer@reedsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Cyril Sullivan, Jr. +1 703 641 4200 rsullivan@reedsmith.com
No Logo Wendell V. Miller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendell V. Miller
No Logo Gadson H Woodall, III, Movant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gadson H Woodall, III
No Logo Roland Williams, Movant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roland Williams
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 430 - Banks and Banking
  Entries (98) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 94 Motion to Dismiss withou Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/29/14. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on July 18, 2014, before Judge Anderson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tracy Westfall, Telephone number 703-549-2080. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2014.(westfall, tracy) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
      Notice of Hearing Date set for 08/29/2014 re 94 MOTION to Dismiss Mandatory and also Voluntary with Roseboro,., 95 Roseboro Notice (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
        Roseboro Notice as to Motion For Mandatory Dismissal and for Voluntary Dismissal by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
          MOTION to Dismiss Mandatory and also Voluntary with Roseboro,. by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 88 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/7/14.(see order for details). (gwalk, ) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER denying 86 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/01/2014. (nbla, ) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Docket Call held on 8/1/2014. Matter was set for Plaintiff's motion for service by publication (docket #86). Case was called in open court. There were NO appearances made on behalf of neither party. Ruling on the motion is deferred. (Tape #ftr.)(nbla, ) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Krystol Cameron, Jesus Martinez Cardona, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Ketih Fairchild, Fountain Group of Companies, Claudia Gutierrez, Sandra Gutierrez, HSBC Holdings, PLC, Amy Huggard, Jerry Jordon, Paul Madsen, Wendell V. Miller, Patricia Mohammed-Reynolds, Simply Me, Inc., Anthony Suite, Edmund E. Wilson, Florence Wilson, Nancy Wilson, Payge Wilson, Suhaya Wilson, Tanya Wilson, filed by Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust, Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                    Notice of Hearing Date 08/01/2014 re 88 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Included in Motion to Publish with Roseboro No. (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Included in Motion to Publish with Roseboro No. by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                        Notice of Hearing Date set for 08/01/2014 re 86 MOTION for Service by Publication and Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Service by Publication and Dismissal as to Certain Defendants by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER denying 74 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/21/14. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Amend/Correct the complaint; denying 76 Motion for Service by Publication. SEE ORDER FORE MORE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 07/18/2014. (nbla, ) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson: Appearances of counsel for the defts and Pro se PlaintiffMotion Hearing held on 7/18/2014 re 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct As a Matter of Right, by Leave of Court, and Correct Errors of Fact filed by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust, Emory E. Hackman, Jr.,- the motionis ARGUED and GRANTED IN PART DENIED IN PART. 76 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust, Emory E. Hackman, Jr., - the motion is ARGUED and DENIED. ORDER TO FOLLOW (Tape #ftr.)(nbla, ) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 78 Motion for Leave to File. The court willconsider the rebuttal in deciding plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint.Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 7/14/14. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 80 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/11/14. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                      Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael D. Johnston and Certification of Local Counsel Abid R. Qureshi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4031268. by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Qureshi, Abid) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Hearing Date set for 7/18/2014 re 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct As a Matter of Right, by Leave of Court, and Correct Errors of Fact, 78 MOTION for Leave to File Rebuttal, Rebuttal, and Memorandum of Law (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Rebuttal, Rebuttal, and Memorandum of Law by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Hearing Date set for 07/18/2014 re 76 MOTION for Service by Publication (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Service by Publication by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Hearing Date 07/18/2014 re 74 MOTION to Strike 72 Answer to Complaint (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Strike 72 Answer to Complaint by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Opposition to 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct As a Matter of Right, by Leave of Court, and Correct Errors of Fact filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.. (Shaffer, Mark) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Wendell V. Miller.(gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER denying 63 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/23/14. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct As a Matter of Right, by Leave of Court, and Correct Errors of Fact "CORRECTED" filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct As a Matter of Right, by Leave of Court, and Correct Errors of Fact filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Qureshi, Abid) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.(Qureshi, Abid) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Hearing Date set for 07/18/2014 re 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct As a Matter of Right, by Leave of Court, and Correct Errors of Fact (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct As a Matter of Right, by Leave of Court, and Correct Errors of Fact by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Notice of Hearing Date set for 06/27/2014 re 63 MOTION for Service by Publication (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Service by Publication by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 24 Motion for Joinder; denying 26 Motion for Joinder; denying 28 Motion for Joinder; granting 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 39 Motion; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/2/14. (see order for further details). (gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. Simply Me, Inc. waiver sent on 4/22/2014, answer due 6/23/2014. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. Krystol Cameron waiver sent on 4/22/2014, answer due 6/23/2014. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. Nancy Wilson waiver sent on 4/22/2014, answer due 6/23/2014. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. Florence Wilson waiver sent on 4/22/2014, answer due 6/23/2014. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints waiver sent on 4/22/2014, answer due 6/23/2014. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Reply Waiver of Service Simply Me filed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Reply Waiver of Service Nancy Wilson filed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Reply Waiver Of Service Church of Latter Day Saints filed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Reply Waiver of Service Krystol Cameron filed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Reply Waiver of Service Florence Wilson filed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Rebuttal Brief re 39 MOTION to Add Mary Wilson as a Defendant Opposition by Bank of America filed by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Add Mary Wilson as a Defendant filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Cordova, Anastasia) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Reply to Motion re 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Gadson H. Woodall, III's Motion to Join the Case, 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Roland Williams' Motion to Join the Case Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Reply Memorandum of Law ISO its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.. (Shaffer, Mark) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Reply to Motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.. (Shaffer, Mark) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Response to 45 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion (Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Response to Roland Williams' Objection to Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank Motions to Dismiss, Roseboro Statement, and Memorandum of Law) filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Cordova, Anastasia) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Reply to Motion re 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Gadson H. Woodall, III's Motion to Join the Case, 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Roland Williams' Motion to Join the Case filed by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Roland Williams' Motion to Join the Case filed by Roland Williams. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 41 Motion to Extend Time Limit for Service. Plaintiffs shall have an additional thirty (30) days, until Monday, July 28, 2014, to effect service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 on defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/7/14. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Date Motion to Add Mary Wilson as a Defendant set for May 23, 2014 re 39 MOTION to Add Mary Wilson as a Defendant (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing Date of Motion to Extend Date for Service of Process set for May 23, 2014 re 41 MOTION to Extend Date for Service of Process (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Extend Date for Service of Process by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Date re 39 MOTION to Add Mary Wilson as a Defendant (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Add Mary Wilson as a Defendant by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on April 4, 2014, before Judge Hilton, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tracy Westfall, Telephone number 703-549-2080. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2014.(westfall, tracy) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Opposition to 24 MOTION for Joinder, 28 MOTION for Joinder, 26 MOTION for Joinder Filed by Ronald Williams and Gadson H. Woodall, III filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 18 MOTION for Leave to File re 13 Exparte, Reply to Response to Motion,, Statement and Amend Opposition MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Exparte, Reply to Response to Motion,, OF Disputed Facts filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Date May 23, 2014 @ 10:00 a.m. re 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Gadson H. Woodall, III's Motion to Join the Case (Shaffer, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Gadson H. Woodall, III's Motion to Join the Case filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.. (Shaffer, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Gadson H. Woodall, III's Motion to Join the Case by Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.. (Shaffer, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Date May 23, 2014 @ 10:00 a.m. re 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Roland Williams' Motion to Join the Case (Shaffer, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support re 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Roland Williams' Motion to Join the Case filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.. (Shaffer, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Roland Williams' Motion to Join the Case by Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.. (Shaffer, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 28 MOTION to Join the Case : Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, ) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Join the Case by Gadson H Woodall, III. (clar, ) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 26 MOTION to Join the Case: Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, ) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Join the Case by Gadson H Woodall, III. (clar, ) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 24 MOTION to Join the Case: Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, ) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Join the Case by Roland Williams. (clar, ) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.. (Sullivan, Richard) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing Date set for May 23, 2014 @ 10:00 a.m. re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Sullivan, Richard) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.. (Sullivan, Richard) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.. (Sullivan, Richard) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Date re 18 MOTION for Leave to File re 13 Exparte, Reply to Response to Motion,, Statement and Amend Opposition MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Exparte, Reply to Response to Motion,, (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File re 13 Exparte, Reply to Response to Motion,, Statement and Amend Opposition, MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Exparte, Reply to Response to Motion,, by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 3 Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 4/15/2014. (rban, ) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Claude M. Hilton: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2014. Appearance of Pltf, pro se and counsel for Dft, Bank of America. Pltf's 3 MOTION Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. - Argued and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Westfall)(tarm) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Anastasia Poushkareva Cordova on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Cordova, Anastasia) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing Date for Friday, April 25, 2014 re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 3 MOTION Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust, Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC.. (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDERED that Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff permission to submit his pleadings electronically through the Court's electronic case filing system. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/20/14. (clar, ) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDERED that the Defendant's 6 Motion to Continue is GRANTED and the hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court is continued to 10:00 a.m. on Friday, April 4, 2014. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/20/14. (clar, ) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/20/2014) (clar, ). (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Roseboro Notice as to Pro Se Plaintiff Emory Hackman by Bank of America, N.A. (Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service (Supplemental) re 6 MOTION to Continue Hearing On Motion To Remand to Bankruptcy Court, 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 8 Memorandum in Support, 5 Opposition by Stephen Phillip Mulligan on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue Hearing On Motion To Remand to Bankruptcy Court by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition to 3 MOTION Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mulligan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Date set for 03/21/2014 re 3 MOTION Remand to Bankruptcy Court (Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Remand to Bankruptcy Court by Emory E. Hackman, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hackman, Emory) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC., Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683042882.), filed by Mary Cook Hackman Arlington Trust, Emory E. Hackman, Jr, Gainesville Commerce Center, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Receipt)(gwalk, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?