French v. The City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-02922

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 22, 2019 at 11:18 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Willie French, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Subin & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert Subin +1 212 285 3800 +1 646 867 8058 hs@subinlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Stephen Subin +1 212 285 3800 ms@subinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Subin Associates, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Howard McCasland +1 212 285 3800 +1 646 867 8059 tm@subinlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric David Subin +1 212 285 3800 +1 646 867 8059 es@subinlaw.com
v.
No Logo Frederick Manney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie Mary Speight +1 212 788 0577 +1 212 788 9776 mspeight@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lamar DeVaughn Winslow +1 212 356 2579 +1 212 356 3558 lwinslow@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Georin Duran, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie Mary Speight +1 212 788 0577 +1 212 788 9776 mspeight@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Michael Bergmann, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie Mary Speight +1 212 788 0577 +1 212 788 9776 mspeight@law.nyc.gov
New York City Police Department New York City Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/03/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Gainfort Moe +1 212 676 1307 +1 212 788 9776 amoe@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lamar DeVaughn Winslow +1 212 356 2579 +1 212 356 3558 lwinslow@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Robert Agate, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie Mary Speight +1 212 788 0577 +1 212 788 9776 mspeight@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lamar DeVaughn Winslow +1 212 356 2579 +1 212 356 3558 lwinslow@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/03/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Gainfort Moe +1 212 676 1307 +1 212 788 9776 amoe@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie Mary Speight +1 212 788 0577 +1 212 788 9776 mspeight@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lamar DeVaughn Winslow +1 212 356 2579 +1 212 356 3558 lwinslow@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
    ANSWER to 22 Amended Complaint by Robert Agate, Michael Bergmann, Georin Duran, Frederick Manney, The City of New York. (Speight, Melanie)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Willie French (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Subin, Herbert)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Stephen Subin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Subin, Marc)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
          [Incorrect Entry Information. See 34 for Correction.] NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert Subin on behalf of Willie French (notification declined or already on case) (Subin, Herbert) Modified on 12/8/2015 (Barrett, C).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/5/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Status Conference held on 12/2/2015. Attorney Marc Rubin, who was advised to file a Notice of Appearance on ECF, appeared by phone, on behalf of plaintiff. Attorney Melanie Mary Speight appeared on behalf of defendants City of New York, Frederick Manney, and Robert Agate. Deadlines were set pursuant to the attached scheduling order. The next Status Conference is scheduled for 1/27/2016 at 10:00 am, in Courtroom 322 North, before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. (Tape #3:10-3:34.) (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 12/05/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie French. Georin Duran served on 7/31/2015, answer due 8/21/2015. (Subin, Herbert)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie French. Michael Bergmann served on 8/3/2015, answer due 8/24/2015. (Subin, Herbert)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: 10/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery On Consent by Willie French. (McCasland, Terrell)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                      Letter MOTION by Willie French (Subin, Herbert)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER for Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: finding as moot 23 Motion to Compel; The next conference will be held in person on October 13, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. as previously scheduled. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE to Motion re 23 First MOTION to Compel filed by Robert Agate, Frederick Manney, The City of New York. (Speight, Melanie) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                              Amended Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Barrett, C)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                Proposed Summons. Re 22 Amended Complaint by Willie French. (Barrett, C)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  First MOTION to Compel by Willie French. (Attachments: # 1 Document Requests and Interrogatories) (McCasland, Terrell)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, against All Defendants, filed by Willie French. (Barrett, C)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held on 6/23/15 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Scheduling order entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. A status conference will e held on October 21, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Terrell Howard McCasland on behalf of Willie French (aty to be noticed) (McCasland, Terrell)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                            Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference from Friday June 19, 2015, until the following week by Robert Agate, Frederick Manney, The City of New York. (Speight, Melanie)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                              First MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for May 22, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. by Robert Agate, Frederick Manney, The City of New York. (Speight, Melanie)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Subin on behalf of Willie French (aty to be noticed) (Subin, Eric)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Mary Speight on behalf of Robert Agate, Frederick Manney, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Speight, Melanie)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference held on 2/19/15 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: The next conference will be held on May 22, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. See annexed conference calendar for detailed scheduling and rulings (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 1/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Robert Agate, Frederick Manney, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Complaint with renumbered paragraphs) (Winslow, Lamar)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The City of New York, Robert Agate, and Frederick Manney. (Winslow, Lamar) Modified on 1/21/2015 (Toritto, Jim).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                            Letter regarding the status of the criminal charges against plaintiff by The City of New York (Winslow, Lamar)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lamar DeVaughn Winslow on behalf of New York City Police Department, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Winslow, Lamar)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie French. The City of New York served on 5/15/2014, answer due 6/5/2014. (Subin, Herbert)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie French. New York City Police Department served on 5/15/2014, answer due 6/5/2014. (Subin, Herbert)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie French. Frederick Manney served on 5/28/2014, answer due 6/18/2014. (Subin, Herbert)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie French. Robert Agate served on 5/28/2014, answer due 6/18/2014. (Subin, Herbert)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 5 Motion to Stay. See annexed order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 6/16/2014. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Stay by New York City Police Department, The City of New York. (Moe, Alison) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            COURT ORDER ON CASE FILING. Magistrate Judge Pohorelsky is respectfully requested to expedite this case. The case manager is to set a conference before the undersigned 45 days from today's date. Plaintiff and a knowledgeable person for the defendant shall appear at the hearing. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 5/22/2014. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Summons Issued as to Robert Agate, Frederick Manney, New York City Police Department, The City of New York. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Robert Agate, Frederick Manney, New York City Police Department, The City of New York, filed by Willie French. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?