Stefanoni et al v. Darien Little League, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01234

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 2:03 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aldo Stefanoni, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Christopher Stefanoni, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher Stefanoni

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Stefanoni +1 203 202 2813

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Darien Little League, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery & Murphy, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James John Healy +1 860 278 5555 jhealy@cowderymurphy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery, Ecker & Murphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Ecker +1 860 278 5555 +1 860 249 0012 ecker@cemlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Arbitrio +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 michelle.arbitrio@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred N. Knopf +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 fred.knopf@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Dave Williams, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery & Murphy, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James John Healy +1 860 278 5555 jhealy@cowderymurphy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery, Ecker & Murphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Ecker +1 860 278 5555 +1 860 249 0012 ecker@cemlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Arbitrio +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 michelle.arbitrio@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred N. Knopf +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 fred.knopf@wilsonelser.com
No Logo James Batson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery & Murphy, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James John Healy +1 860 278 5555 jhealy@cowderymurphy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery, Ecker & Murphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Ecker +1 860 278 5555 +1 860 249 0012 ecker@cemlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Arbitrio +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 michelle.arbitrio@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred N. Knopf +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 fred.knopf@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Little League Baseball, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Arbitrio +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 michelle.arbitrio@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred N. Knopf +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 fred.knopf@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Mark, Gregory, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Arbitrio +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 michelle.arbitrio@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred N. Knopf +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 fred.knopf@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Ronald Drake, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery & Murphy, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James John Healy +1 860 278 5555 jhealy@cowderymurphy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery, Ecker & Murphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Ecker +1 860 278 5555 +1 860 249 0012 ecker@cemlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Arbitrio +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 michelle.arbitrio@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred N. Knopf +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 fred.knopf@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Todd Boe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery & Murphy, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James John Healy +1 860 278 5555 jhealy@cowderymurphy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery, Ecker & Murphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Ecker +1 860 278 5555 +1 860 249 0012 ecker@cemlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Arbitrio +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 michelle.arbitrio@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred N. Knopf +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 fred.knopf@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Tom Luz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery & Murphy, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James John Healy +1 860 278 5555 jhealy@cowderymurphy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery, Ecker & Murphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Ecker +1 860 278 5555 +1 860 249 0012 ecker@cemlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Arbitrio +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 michelle.arbitrio@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred N. Knopf +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 fred.knopf@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Tony Farren, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery & Murphy, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James John Healy +1 860 278 5555 jhealy@cowderymurphy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery, Ecker & Murphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Ecker +1 860 278 5555 +1 860 249 0012 ecker@cemlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Arbitrio +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 michelle.arbitrio@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred N. Knopf +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 fred.knopf@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Margaret Stefanoni, Movant
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER denying as moot 58 Motion to Intervene because the Court has granted 50 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on all counts with prejudice for the reasons set forth in its 77 Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/27/2015. (Dearing, S.) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
              Memorandum in Opposition re 50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Margaret Stefanoni. (Walker, A) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                ENTERED IN ERROR: Set Deadlines as to 58 MOTION to Intervene. Responses due by 3/20/2015 (Ghilardi, K.) Modified on 3/2/2015 (Corriette, M.). (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the telephonic status conference held on 2/27/2015, the Court will reserve judgment on the Motion to Intervene 58 . Before the Motion to Dismiss hearing on 3/27/2015, proposed intervenor, Margaret Stefanoni, may file a written submission on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 50 by 3/13/2015. Any response to proposed intervenor Stefanoni's filing is due by 3/20/2015. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/27/2015.(Dearing, S.) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/27/2015. 10 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Montini.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/27/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. The parties and the proposed intervenor should be prepared to discuss whether the Court should decide the Motion to Intervene 58 before the Motion to Dismiss 50 . Counsel and those proceeding pro se shall initiate the call to chambers at 203-579-5562 when all are on the line. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/18/2015. (Dearing, S.) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Fred N. Knopf terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/13/2015.(Dearing, S.) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          UPDATED CALENDAR - NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. As to 50 MOTION to Dismiss Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2015 2:00 PM in Hearing Courtroom 5 -3rd Floor-BPT- 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION., Set Hearing as to 50 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2015 4:00 PM in Chambers Room 333, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 1/26/15.(D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by Margaret Stefanoni. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support) (Walker, A) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None Set Deadlines/Hearings
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                          Set/Reset Deadlines regarding 58 MOTION to Intervene: Responses due by 12/18/2014. (Pannu, C.) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 58 MOTION to Intervene by 12/18/2014. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/03/2014. (Pannu, C.) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Intervene
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 10/27/2014. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/29/2014. (Pollack, R.) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to 46 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/21/2014. (Martin, M.) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 46 Amended Complaint by Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Dave Williams. (Arbitrio, Michelle) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Dave Williams, filed by Christopher Stefanoni.(Walker, A) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to thirty-day extension of time until July 8, 2014 to file an Amended Complaint ; granting 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John R. Williams terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/17/2014. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Appearance Pro Se by Christopher Stefanoni. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for John R. Williams to Withdraw as Attorney by Christopher Stefanoni. (Williams, John) (Entered: 06/08/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time thirty-day extension of time until July 8, 2014 to file an Amended Complaint by Christopher Stefanoni. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 5/8/2014 re 23 MOTION to Dismiss And Motion for Sanctions. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhill granting 23 Motion to Dismiss; denying 23 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by June 8, 2014. 45 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven David Ecker terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/22/14. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Steven D. Ecker to Withdraw as Attorney by Darien Little League, Inc.. (Ecker, Steven) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 4/29/2014 Hearing set for 5/8/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill (Martin, M.) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/15/2014. (Martin, M.) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time for Motion Hearing Scheduled for April 29, 2014 by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams. (Arbitrio, Michelle) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Sanctions. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/27/14.(Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Amended Memorandum in Support re 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Sanctions Reply in Further Support filed by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams. (Knopf, Fred) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Sanctions Reply in Further Support filed by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams. (Knopf, Fred) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to 23 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions. Reply due 1/24/2014. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/2/2014. (Pannu, C.) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Sanctions until January 24, 2014 by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams. (Arbitrio, Michelle) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 12/23/2013. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/27/2013. (Pannu, C.) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Sanctions filed by Aldo Stefanoni, Christopher Stefanoni. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/21/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Arbitrio on behalf of James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams (Arbitrio, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Sanctions until December 23, 2013 by Aldo Stefanoni, Christopher Stefanoni. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 22 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/11/13 to respond to 16 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/18/13. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions filed by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams. (Knopf, Fred) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT re 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions Signed By Fred N. Knopf filed by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Knopf, Fred) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams.Responses due by 11/28/2013 (Knopf, Fred). Added MOTION for Sanctions on 11/8/2013 (Blough, B.). (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until November 11, 2013 To respond to Plaintiffs' 16 amended complaint by Darien Little League, Inc.. (Knopf, Fred) Modified on 11/4/2013 TO LINK TO DOC #16 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/1/13 to respond to 16 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/24/13. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James John Healy on behalf of James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Tom Luz, Dave Williams (Healy, James) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Steven David Ecker on behalf of James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Tom Luz, Dave Williams (Ecker, Steven) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until November 1, 2013 to answer, move or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Amended Complaint 16 Amended Complaint by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams. (Knopf, Fred) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2013: # 1 REPLACEMENT OCR SEARCHABLE PDF) (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Gregory filed by Aldo Stefanoni, Christopher Stefanoni Signed by Clerk on 10/7/2013. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams, filed by Aldo Stefanoni, Christopher Stefanoni.(Williams, John) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Gregory by All Plaintiffs (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Fred N. Knopf on behalf of James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Mark Gregory, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams ( REPLACING DOC #10 ) (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Arbitrio on behalf of James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Mark Gregory, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams ( REPLACING DOC #9 ) (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time until October 18, 2013 to Respond to 1 Complaint. Signed by Clerk on 9/13/2013. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until October 18, 2013 To respond to plaintiff's 1 complaint by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Mark Gregory, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams. (Arbitrio, Michelle) Modified on 9/13/2013 TO LINK TO DOC #1 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION for Leave to Appear counsel Attorney Fred Knopf. by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Mark Gregory, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams. (Knopf, Fred) Modified on 9/13/2013 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION for Leave to Appear Appear as counsel Attorney Michelle Arbitrio. Filing Fee $0.00. by James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Mark Gregory, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams. (Arbitrio, Michelle) Modified on 9/13/2013 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aldo Stefanoni, Christopher Stefanoni. James Batson served on 8/28/2013, answer due 9/18/2013; Todd Boe served on 8/28/2013, answer due 9/18/2013; Darien Little League, Inc. served on 8/29/2013, answer due 9/19/2013; Ronald Drake served on 8/28/2013, answer due 9/18/2013; Tony Farren served on 8/28/2013, answer due 9/18/2013; Mark Gregory served on 8/28/2013, answer due 9/18/2013; Little League Baseball, Inc. served on 8/29/2013, answer due 9/19/2013; Tom Luz served on 8/28/2013, answer due 9/18/2013; Dave Williams served on 8/28/2013, answer due 9/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Darien Little League - Summons.pdf, # 2 Darien Little League - Marshal's Return.pdf, # 3 Little League Baseball - Summons.pdf, # 4 Little League Baseball - Marshal's Return.pdf, # 5 James Batson - Summons.pdf, # 6 James Batson - Marshal's Return.pdf, # 7 Tony Farren - Summons.pdf, # 8 Tony Farren - Marshal's Return.pdf, # 9 Dave Williams - Summons.pdf, # 10 Dave Williams - Marshal's Return.pdf, # 11 Ronald Drake - Summons.pdf, # 12 Ronald Drake - Marshal's Return.pdf, # 13 Todd Boe - Summons.pdf, # 14 Todd Boe - Marshal's Return.pdf, # 15 Tom Luz - Summons.pdf, # 16 Tom Luz - Marshal's Return.pdf, # 17 Mark Gregory - Summons.pdf, # 18 Mark Gregory - Marshal's Return.pdf)(Williams, John) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *James Batson, Todd Boe, Darien Little League, Inc., Ronald Drake, Tony Farren, Mark Gregory, Little League Baseball, Inc., Tom Luz, Dave Williams* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 4 Standing Protective Order, 1 Complaint filed by Aldo Stefanoni, Christopher Stefanoni, 5 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Williams on behalf of Aldo Stefanoni, Christopher Stefanoni Signed by Clerk on 8/27/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/26/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/26/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 11/26/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2013. Discovery due by 2/25/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2014 Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Aldo Stefanoni, Christopher Stefanoni (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-2982307.), filed by Aldo Stefanoni, Christopher Stefanoni.(Williams, John) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?