Kirk Hinshaw v. Vizio Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:14-cv-00876

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 5:33 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kirk Hinshaw, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lakeshore Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey N Wilens +1 714 854 7205 +1 714 854 7206 jeff@lakeshorelaw.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Spencer Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey P Spencer +1 949 240 8595 jps@spencerlaw.net
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Vizio, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David I Hurwitz +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 dih@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER 59 by Judge David O. Carter: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The deadlines for VIZIO to commence the first and second phases of TV Notice are continued to August 10, 2016 and August 17, 2016, respectively; Settlement Class Members have until October 11, 2016 to opt out; and All other dates in the Order Granting Conditional Class Certification and Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement (Dkt. 58) remain unchanged. (lwag) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STIPULATION to Continue RE TV NOTICE AND OPT OUT DATE filed by Defendant Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 58 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Granting Conditional Class Certification and Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement by Judge David O. Carter. The Court sets a Hearing on the Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement for October 31, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement and for Attorneys Fees and Costs by October 3, 2016. Any Opposition or Objections shall be filed by October 17, 2016. Replies to any Opposition or Objections shall be filed by October 24, 2016. (see document for details). (dro) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                  LREF
                  Blank 57 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Order Vacating Hearing. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Amended Settlement Agreement, and basedon the revisions contained therein, the Court no longer finds another hearing on the Motion is necessary. Thus, the Court VACATES the hearing currently scheduled for June 16, 2016. The Court will issue an Order on the Motion shortly.(see document for further details) (mba) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                    LREF
                    Blank 56 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                    Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 43 Amended Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 43 . The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 6/17/2016 @ 1:30 PM has been rescheduled. Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED to 6/16/2016 @ 4:30 PM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 43 previously scheduled for 6/17/2016 7:30 AM has been rescheduled. Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED for hearing on 6/17/2016 @ 1:30 PM **TIME CHANGE ONLY** before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                          ORDER Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Amended Settlement Agreement and Continuing Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval 52 . (dgo) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Amended Settlement Agreement and Continuing Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Defendant Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTES OF Hearing on Motion for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement held before Judge David O. Carter: Motion hearing held. Oral argument heard. Amended Settlement Agreement to be filed by 6/6/2016. Motion Hearing adjourned to 6/10/2016 @ 7:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens; Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey P. Spencer, Jeffrey N. Wilens; Defendant Attorney: David I. Hurwitz, Ekwan E. Rhow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 50 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 43 filed by Defendant Vizio Inc. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 49 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 43 filed by Plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 48 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    SECOND MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 43 . If the parties desire, they may submit additional clarification on this issue on or before Tuesday, May 24, 2016. (dgo) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 47 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 43 JOINT RESPONSE TO MAY 16, 2016 ORDER filed by Defendant Vizio Inc. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 46 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 43 by Judge David O. Carter: Having conducted an initial review of the Motion, the Court seeks clarification and/or requests additional information on the issues listed in this order. The parties shall submit a joint response to these inquiries on or before May 20, 2016. See document for further information. (lwag) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 43 previously scheduled for 06/02/2016 8:30 a.m. has been rescheduled. Motion rescheduled for hearing on 5/27/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dro) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 43 previously scheduled for 06/06/2016 8:30 a.m. has been rescheduled. Motion rescheduled for hearing on 6/2/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dro) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 43 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey Spencer, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey Wilens, # 3 Declaration of Kirk Hinshaw, # 4 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Stipulation to Continue Motion Cut Off Date 41 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The motion cut off date in the Hinshaw v. Vizio Inc. action is continued to June 6, 2016. (mt) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION to Continue Motion cut off date from March 28, 2016 to June 6, 2016 filed by Plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order continuing motion cut off date)(Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Final Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 3/28/2016 @ 8:30 AM and the Jury Trial previously scheduled for 4/5/2016 @ 8:30 AM have been CANCELLED re 37 Notice of Settlement. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                          STIPULATION to Continue Motion Cut Off Date from February 8, 2016 to March 28, 2016 Re: Notice of Settlement 37 filed by plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION to Continue Motion Cut Off Date from February 8, 2016 to March 28, 2016 filed by plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Continuing Motion Cut Off Date)(Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION to Continue Motion Cut Off Date from February 8, 2016 to March 28, 2016 filed by plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Continuing Motion Cut Off Date)(Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      STIPULATION to Continue Discovery Cut off Date from January 8, 2016 to February 8, 2016 filed by Plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to February 18, 2016 filed by plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block (mt) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF LODGING filed Revised [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 27 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Order)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block: The parties are advised that the Court still declines to sign off on their proposedstipulated Protective Order because proposed 6.2 and 6.3 still do not comport withLocal Rules 37-1 and 37-2. 26 . (klg) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING filed Of Revised [Proposed] Protective Order Pursuant To February 18, 2015 Order re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 25 , Stipulation for Protective Order 24 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Discovery cut-off 12/18/2015, Motions set for 2/8/2016 @ 8:30 a.m., Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2016 @ 8:30 AM, Jury Trial set for 4/5/2016 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Scheduling Order to be issued. Court Reporter: CourtSmart. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Report
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Vizio Inc.(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, granting Stipulation Continuing Plaintiff's Deadline for filing Motion for Class Certification 16 . (twdb) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Class Certification Motion filed by Plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order extending Plaintiff's Deadline to File Class Certification Motion)(Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Remand Case to State Court
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: denying 9 Motion to Remand Case to State Court. (twdb) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY In support of Motion to Remand MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court 9 filed by Plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. (Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, granting Stipulation for Order to respond to first amended complaint 10 . Extended until 9/8/14. (twdb) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Opposition re: MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court 9 filed by Defendant Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Second STIPULATION for Order To Extend Time To Respond To First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by plaintiff Kirk Hinshaw. Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Spencer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) 7 . (twdb) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Vizio Inc answer now due 7/7/2014, re Amended Complaint filed by defendant Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Vizio Inc, re Notice of Removal, 1 served on June 9, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (dg) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. (dg) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Rob Brinkman in support of Notice of Removal, 1 filed by Defendant Vizio Inc. (dg) (dg). (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Vizio Inc, (dg) (dg). (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2014-00719115 with CONFORMED copy of summons and first amended complaint. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. Filing fee $400 PAID, filed by defendant Vizio Inc. (dg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2014: # 1 Civil cover sheet) (dg). (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 194 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?