United States v. Callahan

Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cr-00453
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 15, 2022 at 8:26 PM EDT (2.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Adam J. Manson, Defendant (2)

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Robert James Anello +1 212 880 9320 +1 212 856 9494 ranello@maglaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Gates Salyers Hurand +1 212 880 9536 +1 212 856 9494 ghurand@maglaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Judith Leonore Mogul +1 212 856 9600 +1 212 856 9494 jmogul@maglaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Jonathan Scott Sack +1 212 702 9000 +1 212 702 9702 jonathansack@hotmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/15/2022, Entered: None Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Motion for Forfeiture of Property
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None sentencing memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None motion to modify conditions of release
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Motion for Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None order on motion to modify conditions of release
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None motion to modify conditions of release
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Motion for Forfeiture of Property
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Re: 106 Motion to adjourn the 1/29/16 SENTENCING of ADAM MANSON to 5/13/16 at 1:30 p.m. as to ADAM J. MANSON (2). Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 1/22/16. Movant to serve parties by fax. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: 1/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Adam J. Manson. (Frisch, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Re: 98 Motion to Continue SENTENCING to ADAM J. MANSON (2). Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 10/1/15. Movant to serve parties by fax. (Coleman, Laurie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Adam J. Manson. (Frisch, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 92 Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Adam J. Manson(2). Application Granted. Movant's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this order on all parties upon receipt via facsimile. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 5/28/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION to Continue Sentencing to October 2, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. by Adam J. Manson. (Frisch, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Re: 86 Motion to adjourn the 2/27/15 SENTENCING as to ADAM J. MANSON (2). Application granted. Sentencing is adjourned to 5/29/15 at 11:00 a.m.. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 2/5/15. Movant to serve parties by fax. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Adam J. Manson. (Frisch, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Re: 82 Motion requesting to adjourn the 2/13/14 SENTENCING of ADAM MANSON (2). Application granted with consent of the government. Sentencing is adjourned to 2/27/15 at 2:30 p.m. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 11/13/14. Movant to serve parties by fax. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
Letter MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Adam J. Manson. (Frisch, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to ADAM J. MANSON Re: 79 Letter to adjourn the sentencing of BRIAN CALLAHAN and ADAM MANSON which are presently scheduled for 11/7 and 11/21, respectively - Application grated. Adam Manson's SENTENCING is adjourned to 2/13/15 at 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 11/7/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
Letter requesting an adjournment to the sentencing of Callahan and Manson as to Brian R. Callahan, Adam J. Manson (Caffarone, Christopher) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Re: 77 Letter requesting to adjourn the 10/3/14 SENTENCING of ADAM MANSON. Application granted. Sentencing is adjourned to 11/21/14 at 1:30 p.m. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/23/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
Letter requesting an adjournment to the October 3 sentencing as to Adam J. Manson (Caffarone, Christopher)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Re: 74 Motion to WITHDRAW Robert J. Anello, Judith L. Mogul, Jonathan S. Sack, and Gates S. Hurand as counsel for defendant ADAM J. MANSON, and the discontinuance of the transmission of Notices of Electronic Filing in the captioned matter. Motion granted. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 8/21/14. Attorneys Judith L. Mogul; Jonathan S. Sack; Robert J. Anello and Gates Salyers Hurand terminated as to Adam J. Manson (2). (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION by Adam J. Manson 74 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert J. Anello, Judith L. Mogul, Jonathan S. Sack, Gates S. Hurand. filed by Adam J. Manson (Hurand, Gates)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert J. Anello, Judith L. Mogul, Jonathan S. Sack, Gates S. Hurand. by Adam J. Manson. (Hurand, Gates)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew J. Frisch appearing for Adam J. Manson (Frisch, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN by USMS as to ADAM J. MANSON. (Coleman, Laurie) (Main Document 70 replaced on 6/20/2014) (Mahon, Cinthia). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2014: # 1 Sealed Document) (Mahon, Cinthia). Modified docket text on 6/20/2014 (Mahon, Cinthia). (Entered: 06/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Adam J. Manson held on 5/12/2014, before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Transcriber TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2014. (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Criminal Cause for CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING/GUILTY PLEA as to ADAM J. MANSON (2) held on 5/12/14 at 1:48 p.m.. Defendant (sworn) present on bail with retained counsel Robert J. Anello, Kevita Ramakrishnan. A.U.S.A.: Christopher Caffarone, Winston M. Paes. Courtroom Deputy: Mary Ryan. FTR: 1:48-2:20. Case called. Deft. states his true name to be Adam Judd Manson. Deft. withdraws not guilty plea and enters a plea of guilty to Count 1 (One) of the Indictment. Court finds a factual basis for the plea and recommends the plea of guilty be accepted by the District Court. Sentence date set for 10/3/14 at 10:00 a.m. before District Judge Arthur D. Spatt. PROBATION NOTIFICATION FORM completed by parties and given to defendant's attorney with instructions to return to Probation Department following proceeding. DEFENDANT CONTINUED ON BAIL with the following modification: Travel restrictions extended to include the continental United States. OTHER: Referral order received by Judge Spatt. Parties consent to proceed before Magistrate Judge on record. Transcript of proceeding ordered for District Judge Spatt. (Tape #1:48-2:20.) (Coleman, Laurie) Modified on 5/21/2014 to correct that this proceeding was held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson and not Judge Arthur D. Spatt as previously indicated. (Coleman, Laurie). (Entered: 05/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF REFERRAL - The matter is referred to Magistrate A. Kathleen Tomlinson for a guilty plea as to ADAM J. MANSON. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 5/6/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - The Court hereby accepts the guilty plea recommendation of Magistrate Judge Tomlinson as to ADAM J. MANSON. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 5/13/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Re: 55 Letter requesting to adjourn the 4/25/14 status conference until 5/9/14 at 9 am. as to ADAM J. MANSON. (Status Conference set for 5/9/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1020 before Judge Arthur D. Spatt.) So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 4/25/2014. Movant's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on all parties upon receipt via facsimile. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
Letter requesting adjournment of status conference and exclusion of speedy trial time as to Adam J. Manson (Hurand, Gates) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
Letter confirming adjournment of April 25, 2014 status conference to May 9, 2014, and consenting to exclusion of speedy trial time as to Adam J. Manson (Hurand, Gates) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Winston M. Paes appearing for USA. (Paes, Winston) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ADAM J. MANSON. Time excluded from 3/28/14 until 4/25/14. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 3/28/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Arthur D. Spatt: Criminal Cause for STATUS CONFERENCE as to BRIAN R. CALLAHAN, ADAM MANSON held on 3/28/14 at 9:13 a.m.. Defendant Brian Callahan present on bail with retained counsel Robert Knuts. Defendant Adam Manson present on bail with retained counsel Robert J. Anello. Govt: Christopher Caffarone. Deputy Clerk: M. E. Kirchner. Court Reporter: Mary Ann Steiger. Case called. Deft(s) 1 & 2 appear with counsel. Status conference for deft(s) 1 & 2 adjourned to 4/25/14 at 9:00 a.m.. Speedy Trial Information on deft(s) 1 & 2: Code Type: XT, Start Date: 3/28/14, Stop Date: 4/25/14. (Status Conference set for 4/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1020 before Judge Arthur D. Spatt.) (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 40 Motion requesting the Court modify the conditions of ADAM J. MANSON'S (2) pretrial release to permit travel to New Jersey and Florida. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 1/17/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ADAM J. MANSON. Time excluded from 1/24/14 until 3/28/14. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 1/24/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Arthur D. Spatt: Criminal Cause for STATUS CONFERENCE as to BRIAN R. CALLHAN (1), ADAM J. MANSON (2) held on 1/24/14 at 9:12 a.m. Defendant Brian Callahan present on bail with retained counsel Robert Knuts. Defendant Adam Manson present on bail with retained counsel Robert J. Anell & Gates S. Hurand. Govt: Christopher Caffarone. Deputy Clerk: M. E. Kirchner. Court Reporter: Dominick Tursi. Case called. Deft(s) 1 & 2 appear with counsel. Status conference for deft 1 & 2 adjourned to 3/28/14 at 9:00 a.m. Speedy Trial Information on deft(s) 1 & 2: Code Type: XT, Start Date: 1/24/14, Stop Date: 3/28/14. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Adam J. Manson. (Anello, Robert) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ADAM J. MANSON. Time excluded from 11/15/13 until 1/24/14. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 11/15/13. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Arthur D. Spatt: Criminal Cause for STATUS CONFERENCE as to BRIAN R. CALLAHAN (1), ADAM J. MANSON (2) held on 11/15/2013 from 2:46 pm - 2:53 pm. Defendant Brian Callahan present on bail with retained counsel Robert Knuts. Defendant Adam Manson present on bail with CJA counsel Robert J. Anello, Judy Mogul. Govt: Christopher Caffarone. Deputy Clerk: M. E. Kirchner. Court Reporter: Paul Lombardi. Case called. Deft(s) 1 & 2 appear with counsel. Status conference for deft 1 & 2 adjourned to 1/24/14 at 9:00 a.m. Speedy Trial Information on deft 1 & 2: Code Type: XT. Start Date: 11/15/13, Stop Date: 1/24/14. (Status Conference set for 1/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1020 before Judge Arthur D. Spatt.) (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 30 Motion to MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE to permit ADAM J. MANSON (2) to travel to Florida in November and December. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/20/13. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ADAM J. MANSON. Time excluded from 9/13/13 until 11/15/13. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/13/13. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Arthur D. Spatt: Criminal Cause for STATUS CONFERENCE as to BRIAN R. CALLAHAN (1), ADAM J. MANSON (2) held on 9/13/201 at 10:14 a.m. Defendant Brian Callahan present on bail with retained counsel Robert Knuts. Defendant Adam Manson present on bail with retained counsel Robert J. Anello, Judy Mogel, Gates Hurand. Govt: Christopher Caffarone. Deputy Clerk: M. E. Kirchner. Court Reporter: Harry Rapaport. Case called. Deft(s) 1 & 2 appear with counsel. Status conference/hearing for deft(s) 1 & 2 adjourned to 11/15/13 at 2:30 p.m. Speedy Trial Information on deft(s) 1 & 2: Code Type: XT, Start Date: 9/13/13, Stop Date: 11/15/13. Other: Counsel for defendant Manson to submit letter to the Court regarding 1) Defendant's request to travel in December 2) Change reporting to Pretrial by telephone and email every 2 weeks. Both requests consented to by the government. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Adam J. Manson. (Hurand, Gates) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gates Salyers Hurand appearing for Adam J. Manson (Hurand, Gates) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Judith L. Mogul appearing for Adam J. Manson (Mogul, Judith) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert J. Anello appearing for Adam J. Manson (Anello, Robert) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
Letter Concerning Discovery as to Adam J. Manson (Woll, David) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
Letter Concerning Discovery as to Adam J. Manson (Woll, David) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Adam J. Manson held on 8/01/2013, before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Transcriber AAA Electronic Sound Reporters, Telephone number 888-866-5135. Email address: electronicsound@court-transcripts.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the /Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2013. (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
Letter Concerning Discovery as to Adam J. Manson (Woll, David) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
Letter Concerning Discovery as to Adam J. Manson (Woll, David) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
Proposed MOTION for Bill of Particulars with respect to certain funds the government intends to seek towards forfeiture. by USA as to Brian R. Callahan, Adam J. Manson. (Morris, Brian) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
Letter Concerning Discovery as to Adam J. Manson (Woll, David) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
Letter Concerning Discovery as to Adam J. Manson (Woll, David) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
Letter MOTION to Compel the Court to issue a permanent order of detention purs. to 18 U.S.C. 3142(e), with regard to the pre-trial detention of the defts by USA as to Brian R. Callahan, Adam J. Manson. (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release and Bond as to ADAM J. MANSON (2). Secured Appearance Bond IN THE SUM OF $1,000,000.00. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/1/13. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL as to ADAM J. MANSON. Time excluded from 8/1/13 until 9/13/13. Ordered by Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/1/13. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Criminal Cause for Arraignment as to BRIAN CALLAHAN (1) Count 1,2-3,4-5,6-17,23,24 and ADAM J. MANSON (2) Count 1,2-3,5,13-22 held on 8/1/2013 at 2:36 p.m. Defendant Brian Callahan present in custody with retained counsel Michael Tremonte for Robert Knunts. Defendant Adam Manson present in custody with retained counsel Judy Mogul, Jonathan S. Sack. FTR: 2:36-3:15 (Adam Manson) (39 minutes). 3:24-3:59 (Brian R. Callahan) (35 minutes). Govt: Christopher Caffarone. Interpreter: N/A. Courtroom Deputy: Mary Ryan. Pretrial Report prepared by: Robert Stehle (Brian Callahan) not present. Christina Bourque (Adam Manson) present. Defendant, Adam J. Manson, arraigned on Counts 1, 2, 3, 5 and 13 through 22 of the 24 Count Indictment. Defendant, Brian R. Callahan, arraigned on Counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 through 15, 16, 17, 23, 24 of the 24 Count Indictment. Defendant's initial appearance. Defendant, Adam J. Manson waives public reading and pleads not guilty Counts 1, 2, 3, 5 and 13-22 of the 24 Indictment. Defendant, Brian R. Callahan waives public reading and pleads not guilty to Counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 through 15, 16, 17, 23, 24 of the 24 Indictment. Speedy Trial Order Information (as to Brian R. Callahan and Adam J. Manson): Code Type: X-, Start Date: 8-01-2013 XStart, Stop Date: 9-13-13 Xstop. Order Setting Conditions of Release and Bond executed defendant, Adam J. Manson Brian R. Callahan. Bail set Adam J. Manson and Brian R. Callahan for: See bonds details. Status Conference set to Brian R. Callahan and Adam J. Manson: 9/13/13 at 10:00 a.m. before District Judge Arthur D. Spatt. Defendants, Brian R. Callahan and Adam J. Manson, release on Bond. As to Adam J. Manson: Attorneys for Adam J. Manson appear for arraignment and bail application purposes only. Passport to be turned over to Pretrial Services today. Confession of Judgment and Financial Affidavit due within two weeks. Suretor advised of risk of signing bond and signs bond.As to Brian R. Callahan: Attorney for Brian R Callahan appears for arraignment and bail application purposes only. Passport to be turned over to Pretrial Services today. Confession of Judgment and Financial Affidavit due within three weeks. Suretors advised of risks of signing bond and sign bond. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Judith L. Mogul appearing for Adam J. Manson for Arraignment and Bail only. (Coleman, Laurie) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/6/2013) (Coleman, Laurie). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan S. Sack appearing for Adam Manson for Arraignment and Bail only. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Karin K. Orenstein appearing for USA. (Orenstein, Karin) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Granting the 6 Motion to Unseal Case as to Brian R. Callahan (1), Adam J. Manson (2). Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/1/2013. (Mahon, Cinthia) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Brian R. Callahan, Adam J. Manson. (Mahon, Cinthia) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson as to Brian R. Callahan and Adam J. Manson. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 8/1/2013. (Mahon, Cinthia) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter of AUSA, Christopher Caffarone to Clerk and Judge Arthur D. Spatt dated 7/31/13 re: related case as to Brian R. Callahan and Adam J. Manson. (Mahon, Cinthia) Modified on 8/1/2013 to unseal. (Mahon, Cinthia). (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
SEALED INDICTMENT as to Brian R. Callahan (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4-5, 6-17, 23, 24; Adam J. Manson (2) count(s) 1, 2-3, 5, 13-22. (Attachments: #(1) Criminal Information Sheet) (Mahon, Cinthia) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1,274 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?