District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Central District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  1. Case No. 11-57187
    Filed 12/15/2011
  2. Case No. 14-56444
    Filed 9/4/2014
  3. Case No. 16-55977
    Filed 7/8/2016
United States Supreme Court

Courthouse News Service v. Michael Planet
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-08083

Tags
Last Updated March 20, 2021 at 1:05 AM DT (4.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Courthouse News Service, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leila Christine Knox +1 415 675 3400 +1 415 675 3434 leila.knox@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Matteo-Boehm +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 rachel.matteo-boehm@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Rex Myers +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 roger.myers@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/12/2014 David A Greene +1 415 436 9993 davidg@eff.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan G Fetterly +1 310 576 2179 +1 310 576 2200 jon.fetterly@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Michael Planet, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hayeslawoffice.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick B Hayes +1 310 698 8729 +1 310 388 0310 Fred.Hayes@hayeslawoffice.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel Peardon Garrett +1 415 626 3939 +1 415 963 6878 ngarrett@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Naeve +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 rnaeve@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica Lynn Reilley +1 213 489 3939 +1 213 243 2539 elreilley@jonesday.com
  Entries (250) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/20/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Non-Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Permanent Injunction
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Amended Document (Non-Motion)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None ERRATA
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Objection
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Chief District Judge Transferring Case
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Staying Case
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None For Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 199 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      JUDGMENT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFCOURTHOUSE NEWS SERVICE AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL PLANET AND AWARD COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS) by Judge S. James Otero. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 198 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE TO DEF'S OBJECTIONS TO PL'S [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE NEWS SERVICE AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL PLANET re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction 119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging, 196 Proposed Judgment filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 196 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, 195 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Judgment for Declaratory Relief and Permanent Injunction in Favor of Plaintiff Courthouse News Service and Against Defendant Michael Planet)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 195 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 119 ; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 163 by Judge S. James Otero: Plaintiff Courthouse News Service shall file a proposed judgment consistent with this Order that addresses the claims in this action within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this Order.(SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (vv) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES ARE VACATED IN LIGHT OF PENDING CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 193 by Judge S. James Otero (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS). (lc) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Court Trial, Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Trial Date And Deadlines In Light Of Pending Cross MSJ filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    The Court finds the following motions suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. 119 and the MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Michael Planet. 163 , set for hearing on April 18, 2016. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: The Court convened a settlement conference in this matter. The parties did not reach a settlement. (jm) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order Denying Defendant's re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 163 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief 171 . The following error(s) was found: It is unclear as to how many parties are represented. Attorney did not specify the entire group of parties for whom the motion to file amicus brief was filed, only names one and the remainder as "et al". or "12 other media organizations". The 12 organizations are named on page 2, paragraph 1. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Amicus Brief (Leave to File)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 167 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Errata. To find the correct efiling event, use the search feature for: Errata. Any request must be submitted as a separate document, with a [Prop] Order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of ERRATA filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. re Docket Entries Nos. 140 and 141 (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT M to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 163 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M part 1, # 2 Exhibit M part 2, # 3 Exhibit M part 3, # 4 Exhibit M part 4, # 5 Exhibit M part 5, # 6 Exhibit M part 6, # 7 Exhibit M part 7)(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT A-L to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 163 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: # 1 Declarations and Exhibits A-B, # 2 Exhibit C-E, # 3 Exhibit F-I, # 4 Exhibit J-L)(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Michael Planet. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 3 Proposed Order) (Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS HEARING DATE,BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS 114 by Judge S. James Otero: The hearing on the parties cross motions for summary judgment shall be April 18, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. The Motions shall be filed on or before March 14, 2016. Any opposition papers shall be filed on or before March 28, 2016. Any reply papers shall be filed on or before April 4, 2016. Opening and opposing memoranda shall not exceed 25 pages in length. Reply memoranda shall not exceed 10 pages in length. (lc) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: plaintiffs Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 115 . The following error(s) was found: Title page and its LR 11-3.8 required information is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, re Stipulation for Hearing 114 re Summary Judgment Motions served on 2/10/2016. (Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Hearing re Summary Judgment Motions filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Courthouse News Service Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order)(Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Frederick B Hayes counsel for Defendant Michael Planet. Changing Address & Firm Name to Hayes Law Office 2447 Pacific Coast Highway, 2nd Floor, Hermosa Beach, CA 90254. Changing email & Fax to Fred.Hayes@hayeslawoffice.net (310) 388-0310. Filed by Defendant Michael Plant. (Hayes, Frederick) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/24/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/21/15 8:39 a.m. re Transcript 107 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Zurborg, Carol) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/21/15 8:39 a.m. Court Reporter: Carol Jean Zurborg, phone number (213) 894-3539. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2016. (Zurborg, Carol) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff, Courthouse News Service Courthouse News Service Court Reporter. Court will contact Jonathan Fetterly at jon.fetterly@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Request Scheduling Conference Held on 9/21/15. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge S. James Otero : The Court sets the following schedule: last date to amended: 10/21/15; discovery cutoff: 3/21/16 ; motion hearing cutoff: 4/25/16 10:00 AM; pretrial conference: 6/6/16 9:00 AM; Court trial: 6/21/16 9:00 AM. The Court limits each side to four motions in limine. Settlement is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings. All discovery dispute to be brought before the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case; parties reminded of requirements of FRCP 26-1(a); counsel are advised all pretrial documents (as listed) must be filed in compliance with Courts Initial Standing order. Court Reporter: Carol Zuborg. (lc) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint 100 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by defendant Michael Planet.(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, Defendant's Answer shall be filed by Friday, 8/28/2015. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Association of Counsel Filed by Defendant Michael Planet (Attorney Frederick B Hayes added to party Michael Planet(pty:dft))(Hayes, Frederick) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero. This case having been returned on a mandate from the 9th CCA, reversing and remanding the Courts decision, the Court Orders this matter statistically reopened. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (lom) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Notice of Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only 92 Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge S. James Otero (re-assigned) served on 07/23/2015. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Reassignment of Case Upon Receipt of Mandate (A-4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 83 , CCA # 14-56444. The judgment of this Court, entered June 23, 2015, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellee in the amount of $865.80. (car) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 83 filed by Courthouse News Service. CCA # 14-56444. REVERSED and REMANDED with instructions to the Clerk to assignto a different district court judge. (mat) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 83 filed by Courthouse News Service, CCA # 14-56444. This panel will accept this appeal, and the motion is granted. Further, appellant's motion to expedite the appeal is granted. Brief schedules have been set. Order received in this district on 10/17/14. [See document for details] (mat) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/18/2014 10am re Transcript 86 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Kleeger, Sheri) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/18/2014 10am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SHERI KLEEGER, phone number 213-894-6604. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2015. (Kleeger, Sheri) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service Court Reporter. Court will contact Leila Knox at leila.knox@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - August 18, 2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Knox, Leila) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 14-56444, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 83 as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (mat) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Appeal of Order, 82 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14395413 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Order Granting MTD-08-28-14, # 2 Exhibit 2-Representation Statement)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court hereby GRANTS VSC's motion to dismiss CNS's Amended Complaint in its entirety with prejudice. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (bp) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT re Order on Motion to Dismiss, Motion Hearing,, 78 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order /MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Michael Planet Court Reporter. Court will contact Susan Ballard at sballard@jonesday.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motion Hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: RE Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 61 .The Court GRANTS Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for reasons as stated on the record. Counsel shall lodge the proposed order consistent with this Courts ruling.Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger.(MD JS-6. Case Terminated (lc) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Updated Proposed] Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint re MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint 61 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-[Updated Proposed] Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF UPDATED PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 66 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-20, # 3 Exhibit 21-30, # 4 Exhibit 31-41)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint 61 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel E Matteo-Boehm on behalf of Plaintiff Courthouse News Service (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MOTION HEARING DATE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Manuel L. Real, re Stipulation for Hearing, 63 , The June 30, 2014 Stipulation to Continue Motion Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule is approved. As such, it is hereby ORDERED that the hearing onDefendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Dkt. 61) is continued to August 18, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Any opposition to the Motion to Dismiss AmendedComplaint shall be due on or before July 21, 2014, and any reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint shall be due on or before August 4, 2014.PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. (pj) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Hearing re MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint 61 filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Motion Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule)(Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Michael Planet. correcting MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint 61 with attached Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by defendant Michael Planet. Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss)(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14 days, filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service.. (Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 467.00 in favor of Court house News Services and against Michael Planet. RE: 51 (mb) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Planet, in his capacity as Court executive Officer/Clerk of the Ventura County Superior Court Michael Planet amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 , filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct 56 . IT ISORDERED that Plaintiff Courthouse News Services Amended Complaint ForDeclaratory and Injunctive Relief shall be filed in this action. Plaintiff Courthouse News Service SHALL FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE CLERKS OFFICE FILING PROCEDURES forthwith. Any answer orresponsive pleading shall be due on or before twenty-one days from the filing of theAmended Complaint. (pj) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery), 1 filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Amended Complaint), # 2 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) PURSUANT TO U.S.C.A. 9TH CIRCUIT MANDATE by Judge Manuel L. Real. Pursuant to the Mandate of the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is reopened, and the action shall proceed pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and this Court's Order Re: Notice to Counsel. Any answer or responsive pleading shall be due on or before twenty-one (21) days from the date of this minute order. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (cch) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan G Fetterly counsel for Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Adding Jonathan G. Fetterly as attorney as counsel of record for Courthouse News Service for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Courthouse New Service. (Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan G Fetterly counsel for Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. David Allen Greene is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attorney Jonathan G Fetterly added to party Courthouse News Service(pty:pla))(Fetterly, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 40 , CCA # 11-57187. The Judgement of the District Court is REVERSED and REMANDED so that the First Amendment issues presented by this case may be adjudicated on the merits in federal court, where they belong. Mandate received in this district on 4/30/14. (mat) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against defendant Michael Planet filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Application set for hearing on 5/22/2014 at 11:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 40 filed by Courthouse News Service, CCA # 11-57187. This case is submitted as of the date of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Order received in this district on 4/7/14. (mat) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 40 filed by Courthouse News Service, CCA # 11-57187. This appeal is referred to the Ninth Circuit Mediation Program to explore a possible resolution of the appeal through mediation. Submission is vacated until further order of this court. The mediator shall report to the court every thirty (30) days as to the status of the mediation. The mediation unit shall contact the parties directly to confer. IT IS SO ORDERED. Order received in this district on 5/13/13. (mat) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 40 filed by Courthouse News Service CCA # 11-57187. Courthouse News Services Request for Judicial Notice is granted. Order received in this district on 5/7/2013. (dmap) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 11/28/2011 to 11/28/2011 re: Court of Appeal case number 11-57187, as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service Court Reporter Theresa Lanza. Civil Appeal, Court will contact Leila Knox at leila.knox@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 11/28/2011 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss/Preliminary Injunction. Civil case appeal. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 11/28/2011; Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza; Court of Appeals Case Number: 11-57187; Re: 40 (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Monday, 11-28-11; 10:59 AM (Lanza, Theresa) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, 11-28-11; 10:59 AM. Court Reporter Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2012. (Lanza, Theresa) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 40 as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service; Receipt Number: LA0033328 in the amount of $455. (dmap) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Rachel E Matteo-Boehm counsel for Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Changing firm name to Bryan Cave LLP. Filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 11-57187 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 40 as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (dmap) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 38 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF motion for preliminary injunction 3 and motion to dismiss and to abstain 21 . Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court DENIES plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction, and GRANTS defendants motion to dismiss and to abstain, for reasons as stated on the record Defendant shall submit a proposed order. Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza. (kti) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND ABSTAIN by Judge Manuel L. Real: 21 ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (pj) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain 21 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Manuel L. Real: re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 and MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain 21 previously scheduled for November 21, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. is hereby continued to NOVEMBER 28, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. for hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kti) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 Defendant's Responses to Courthouse News Service's Objections to the Declarations of J. Camacho, C. Kanatzar, R. Sherman, and K. Dalton-Koch Submitted by Defendant in Opposition to Courthouse News' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Michael Planet. correcting Reply (Motion related) 33 , MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain 21 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Corrected Reply In Support Of Motion to Dismiss and Abstain)(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain 21 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objections in support re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Serviceto Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 26 (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Julianna Krolak in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of William Girdner in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objections to Evidence in opposition to re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Declaration)(Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain 21 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service, served on Order re Notice to Counsel. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain 21 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain filed by Defendant Michael Planet. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: # 1 Notice, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, re Stipulation to Continue, 19 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's motion for Preliminary Injunction 10/31/2011; Reply on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 11/7/2011; Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.) (pj) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from November 7, 2011 to November 21, 2011 Re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FROM NOVEMBER 7, 2011 TO NOVEMBER 21, 2011)(Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Manuel L. Real: denying 12 Ex Parte Application to Continue. (bp) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Erica Lynn Reilley counsel for Defendant Michael Planet. Adding Erica L. Reilley as attorney as counsel of record for Defendant Michael Planet for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Michael Planet (Reilley, Erica) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from November 7, 2011 to January 17, 2012 12 Declaration of Erica L. Reilley filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, upon Defendant Michael Planet served on 10/4/2011, answer due 10/25/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Planet, in his Official Capacity as Court Executive Officer/Clerk of the Ventura County Superior Court in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, upon Attorney General's Office on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Planet, in his Official Capacity as Court Executive Officer/Clerk of the Ventura County Superior Court Michael Planet served on 9/29/2011, answer due 10/20/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Yolanda Sagarminaga in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from November 7, 2011 to January 17, 2012 12 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from November 7, 2011 to January 17, 2012 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Naeve, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service, re Memorandum in Support of Motion 4 , Declaration (Motion related) 8 , Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , Summons Issued, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 2 , Declaration (Motion related) 7 , Declaration (Motion related) 6 , Declaration (Motion related) 5 , Order 9 Michael D. Planet served on 10/04/11. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, re Memorandum in Support of Motion 4 , Declaration of Christopher Marshall 8 , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 , Declaration of William Girner 7 , Declaration of Julianna Krolak 6 , Declaration of Karen Covel 5 served on 9/29/11. (et) (amar). (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Judge Manuel L. Real, (pj) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of WILLIAM GIRNER in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of JULIANNA KROLAK in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of KAREN COVEL in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Motion set for hearing on 11/7/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (et) (mg). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, identifying Other Affiliate William Girdner, President, Courthouse News Service for Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Defendant Michael Planet. Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle.(Filing fee $ 350 Paid.), filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?