Barbee v. Ellis et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:14-cv-00265
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 4, 2017 at 11:41 PM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Sylvester O Barbee, Plaintiff

Represented by ADC #131311

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sylvester O Barbee
v.
No Logo Angelika Smarjesse, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Quentin Warren +1 501 868 2970 jonathan.warren@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Aundrea Weekly, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Quentin Warren +1 501 868 2970 jonathan.warren@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Cheri Ellis, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Quentin Warren +1 501 868 2970 jonathan.warren@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Jason Boyd, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Marie E Austin, Defendant

Represented by Humphries, Odum & Eubanks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Jay Eubanks +1 870 247 7035 +1 870 247 7459 brent@humphrieslaw.net
No Logo Troy Moore, Defendant

Represented by Humphries, Odum & Eubanks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/17/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Jay Eubanks +1 870 247 7035 +1 870 247 7459 brent@humphrieslaw.net
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Pence, Jr. +1 501 340 2626 richard.pence@usdoj.gov
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (173) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Sylvester O Barbee re 171 Public Notice. (ljb) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PUBLIC NOTICE: Effective immediately the Pine Bluff Division will be an unstaffed office. Entered by the Clerk of Court on 12/7/2016. (mcz) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 163 Notice of Appeal: Copies of Docket Entries 33 and 153 , SEALED DOCUMENTS. (mcz) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
USCA Briefing Schedule as to 163 Notice of Appeal filed by Sylvester O Barbee. The Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format. (mcz) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER of USCA as to 163 Notice of Appeal filed by Sylvester O Barbee: Appellant's motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is granted. (mcz) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER of USCA as to 163 Notice of Appeal filed by Sylvester O Barbee. The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by July 30, 2016, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. (fcd) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
USCA Docketing Letter as to 163 Notice of Appeal filed by Sylvester O Barbee. USCA Case Number 16-3009. (fcd) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to 163 Notice of Appeal filed by Sylvester O Barbee re: 160 Order and 161 Judgment 1983. (mcz) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 162 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of this order, Barbee must either pay to this court the $505.00 appellate filing and docketing fees, or file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, a motion with an attached affidavit that complies with each mandate of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(1). Barbee is directed to file any future documents or pleadings related to his appeal with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/30/2016. (mcz) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 160 Order and 161 Judgment, by Sylvester O Barbee. (mcz) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, by Sylvester O Barbee. (mcz) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 160 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case with prejudice with respect to Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Cheri Ellis and Aundrea Weekly, and without prejudice in all other respects; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/6/2016. (ljb) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 158 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting Defendants Cheri Ellis and Aundrea Weekly's 100 motion for summary judgment; dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's complaint with respect to his claims against Ellis and Weekly, and dismissing without prejudice in all other respects; denying as moot all other pending motions; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/6/2016. (ljb) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION to 158 Report and Recommendations by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Cheri Ellis and Aundrea Weekly 100 be granted and plaintiff's complaint be dismissed; further recommending plaintiff's complaint be dismissed with prejudice with respect to his claims against Ellis and Weekly and dismissed without prejudice in all other respects; all other pending motions be denied as moot; the Court should certify that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith; Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 5/16/16. (tjb) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 155 Response to Motion filed by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cheri Ellis, Aundrea Weekly. (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SECOND REPLY to 147 Response by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 153 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT. (kdr) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER defendants are ordered to produce to plaintiff the full Arkansas Department of Health Investigative Report of the Cummins Prison Salmonella Outbreak of August, 2012, except for page 2 and Appendix A (page 21) no later than Monday, 4/25/16; plaintiff must respond on the merits to defendants' pending motion for summary judgment no later than, Monday, 5/23/16 100 ; the hearing previously set for Wednesday, 4/20/16 is cancelled; the Clerk will file the entire Arkansas Department of Health Investigative Report under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/14/16. (tjb) Modified on 4/14/2016 to correct date(tjb).(Docket text modified on 4/15/2016 to correct the signature date). (jak) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY re 147 Response (Non Motion) by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST for Production of Documents by Sylvester O Barbee.(kdr) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Sanctions by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 141 Order, Set Hearings,, by Cheri Ellis, Aundrea Weekly (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 141 Order, by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Order by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST for Production of Documents and Interrogatories Propounded as to Cheri Ellis by Sylvester O Barbee.(kdr) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Partial Report and Recommendations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Partial Report and Recommendations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTIONS to 132 and 133 Report and Recommendations by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION to 134 Report and Recommendations by Cheri Ellis, Aundrea Weekly (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending defendants' motion for summary judgment be granted as to the claim for monetary damages against defendants in their official capacities and that claims should be ordered dismissed with prejudice; the motion should be denied in all other respects, without prejudice to refiling once the outstanding discovery issues have been resolved 100 ; Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/16/16. (tjb) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending plaintiff's claims against defendants Jason Boyd and John Doe be dismissed without prejudice 2 ; Objections due within 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/11/16. (tjb) (Docket text modified on 2/12/2016 to correct a typographical error). (jak) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant Marie E. Austin's 121 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and that the complaint be dismissed as to her, without prejudice. Objections to these findings and recommendations are due no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/8/2016. (mcz)(Docket text modified on 2/9/2016 to correct the description of the document filed).(jak) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT and BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Copies by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST for Production of Documents and Interrogatories by Sylvester O Barbee.(kdr) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marie E Austin. (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sylvester O Barbee. (tjb) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response re 115 MOTION to Compel filed by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Take Deposition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 121 Motion for Summary Judgment, 122 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1), filed by Marie E Austin. (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 121 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marie E Austin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" ADC Inmate Grievance Policy, # 2 Exhibit "B" Declaration of Shelly Byers, ADC Inmate Grievance Coordinator, # 3 Exhibit "C" Plaintiff's Relevant Grievance Records)(Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Marie E Austin (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Objection re 108 Order on Motion to Stay, by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Sylvester O Barbee re 109 Response in Opposition to Motion, 110 Motion to Extend Time, and 111 Motion for Default Judgment. Previously mailed to updated address. (rhm) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 117 Motion to Take Deposition filed by Marie E Austin. (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Take Deposition from Sylvester Barbee by Marie E Austin (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 115 MOTION to Compel filed by Aundrea Weekly. (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address by Sylvester O Barbee. (thd) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 111 MOTION for Default Judgment against Aundrea Weekly filed by Aundrea Weekly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Sylvester O Barbee re 108 Order on Motion to Stay. (rhm) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Default Judgment against Aundrea Weekly by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Extend Time and MOTION to Clarify the Record by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION to 100 Motion for Summary Judgment and 103 Motion to Stay filed by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 106 Motion to Compel filed by Marie E Austin. (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel by Marie E Austin (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - ROGs and RFPs to Plaintiff, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Good Faith Letter)(Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Sylvester O Barbee re 99 Order on Motion for Service. (rhm) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 103 Motion to Stay filed by Cheri Ellis, Aundrea Weekly. (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Stay (discovery pending resolution of ADC Defendants motion for summary judgment) by Cheri Ellis, Aundrea Weekly (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 100 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cheri Ellis, Aundrea Weekly. (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 100 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cheri Ellis, Aundrea Weekly. (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cheri Ellis, Aundrea Weekly (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Service by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion re 93 MOTION to Compel filed by Marie E Austin, Troy Moore. (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTIONS by Sylvester O Barbee re 89 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations (tjb) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
LETTER and NOTICE of Change of Address by Sylvester O Barbee. (thd) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Marie Austin's Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST for Production of Documents to Aundrea Weekly by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sylvester O. Barbee re 89 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Partial Report and Recommendations, 88 Order, (jap) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Partial Report and Recommendations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sylvester O. Barbee re 80 Notice of Reassignment (jap) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sylvester O. Barbee re 79 Notice of Docket Correction, 76 Partial Report and Recommendations, (jap) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sylvester O. Barbee re 77 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (mef) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sylvester O. Barbee re 75 Order on Motion to Compel. (mef) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Marie E Austin served on 3/31/2015. Address under seal. (mef) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Marie E Austin.(Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Jay Eubanks on behalf of Marie E Austin (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. The Clerk's office has reassigned the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/31/2015. (thd) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 78 Mail Returned. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (inverted image file). The correct document was added to docket entry 78 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sylvester O. Barbee re 73 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Sylvester O Barbee (jap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2015: # 1 Main Document - Correct) (jak). (Entered: 03/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendant Moore's motion for summary judgment be granted, and Plaintiff's claims against Moore be dismissed without prejudice 69 . Moore's motion to compel be denied as moot 66 . Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/27/2015. (lej) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Administrative Exhaustion) filed by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sylvester O. Barbee re 68 Motion to Compel filed by Sylvester O Barbee (jap) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 69 Motion for Summary Judgment, 70 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1), filed by Troy Moore. (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 03/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 69 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Troy Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" ADC Inmate Grievance Procedure, # 2 Exhibit "B" Declaration of Shelly Byers, # 3 Exhibit "C" Plaintiff's Relevant Grievance Records)(Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 03/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment (Administrative Exhaustion) by Troy Moore (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 03/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel Summons and Response Upon all Defendants by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 66 Motion to Compel filed by Troy Moore. (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel by Troy Moore (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sylvester O Barbee (tjb) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Marie E Austin. Address under seal. (rhm) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address by Sylvester O Barbee (tjb) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Troy Moore.(Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Cheri Ellis.(Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Quentin Warren on behalf of Cheri Ellis (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cheri Ellis served on 11/5/2014. (rhm) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Troy Moore served on 11/4/2014. (rhm) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Jay Eubanks on behalf of Troy Moore (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Service by Sylvester O Barbee (tjb) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Incorrect Employer and Insufficient Service of Process as to Defendant Cheri Ellis by USA (jap) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST for Production of Documents and Interrogatories by Sylvester O Barbee.(tjb) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sylvester O Barbee (tjb) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 41 Order by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Order of Subpoena by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 09/30/2014. (rhm) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cheri Ellis served on 09/30/2014. (rhm) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney served on 09/24/2014. (rhm) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER directing the USM to serve deft Ellis at the address provided by pltf, the US Attorney General and the US Attorney for this district, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Pltf must provide an address at which deft Boyd may be served no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/15/2014. (lej) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Service Address for Cheri Ellis by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jason Boyd. (rhm) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint filed by Angelika Smarjesse, Aundrea Weekly. (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Amend 2 Complaint by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION to 32 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Sylvester O Barbee. (ljb) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT. (kdr) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the motion for summary judgment filed by defts Smarjesse and Weekly be granted in part and denied in part 17 . The motion be granted with respect to pltf's claims against Smarjesse be dismissed without prejudice and denied in all other respects. Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/3/2014. (lej) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re 23 MOTION to Stay discovery pending resolution of motion for summary judgment filed by Sylvester O Barbee. (kdr) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Angelika Smarjesse, Aundrea Weekly. (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jason Boyd. (rhm) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Cheri Ellis. (rhm) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE by Sylvester O Barbee to 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (on the issue of exhaustion) by Angelika Smarjesse and Aundrea Weekly. (kdr) Docket entry modified on 8/21/2014 to establish linkage and correct description of the document. (kbc) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 23 Motion to Stay filed by Angelika Smarjesse, Aundrea Weekly. (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Stay discovery pending resolution of motion for summary judgment by Angelika Smarjesse, Aundrea Weekly (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST for Production of Documents and Interrogatories by Sylvester O Barbee.(ljb) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cheri Ellis served on 8/6/2014. (rhm) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jason Boyd served on 8/6/2014. (rhm) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 17 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Angelika Smarjesse, Aundrea Weekly. (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 17 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Angelika Smarjesse, Aundrea Weekly. (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment (on the issue of exhaustion) by Angelika Smarjesse, Aundrea Weekly (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Angelika Smarjessi, Aundrea Weekly.(Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION re 6 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Sylvester O Barbee (tjb) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Order on Partial Report and Recommendations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Moore. Address under seal. (rhm) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION to 4 Report and Recommendations by Sylvester O Barbee (tjb) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (wrong case). (tjb) (Docket text modified on 7/22/2014.) (thd). (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Aundrea Weekly served on 7/15/2014. (rhm) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Marie E Austin. (rhm) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Angelika Smarjessi served on 7/15/2014. (rhm) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION to 4 Report and Recommendations by Angelika Smarjessi, Aundrea Weekly (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Quentin Warren on behalf of Angelika Smarjessi, Aundrea Weekly (Warren, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's claims against deft Ellis and Boyd be dismissed with prejudice and they be removed as party defts 2 . Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/9/2014. (lej) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting the motion to proceed ifp 1 . The USM is directed to serve defts without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/9/2014. (lej) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT filed by Sylvester O Barbee with Jury Demand against all defendants, (tjb) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sylvester O Barbee (tjb) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 16 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?