Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00511

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 4:51 AM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
v.
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Richard DeFosse +1 202 508 8000 +1 202 661 7374 jonathan.defosse@friedfrank.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott W Doyle +1 202 639 7277 +1 202 639 7003 scott.doyle@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Augustine Phillips +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 larryphillips@siebman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clyde Moody Siebman +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 siebman@siebman.com
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Joinder, or in the alternative, Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Dripchak) (mll, ) (See docket entry #109 in Lead Case 6:11cv495) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?