Smartflash LLC v. Google LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00435

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 7, 2019 at 4:37 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Google, Inc. Google, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Bonus XP, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gearbox Software, L.l.c., Defendant
Google LLC Google LLC, Defendant
No Logo Smartflash LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Smartflash Technologies Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Smartflash Technologies Limited"
No Logo David Keyzer, Technical Advisor
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator
No Logo Robert W Faulkner, Mediator
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (208) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: 10/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Jones, Michael)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 192 Motion to Reflect Name Change from Google Inc. to Google LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/6/17. (mjc, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: 10/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
            Unopposed MOTION to Reflect Name Change by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Conversion, # 2 Exhibit 2: Formation, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER denying 122 Sealed Motion; denying 124 Sealed Motion; denying 150 Sealed Motion; denying 157 Sealed Motion, in light of the Courts previous Order staying this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/28/2017. (gsg)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Change of Address by Claire Abernathy Henry (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE by Google, Inc. Notice of Covered Business Method Review Final Written Decision (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 187 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam Botzenhart terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/29/2016. (gsg) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Adam Botzenhart by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE by Google, Inc. Notice of Covered Business Method Review Final Written Decision (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Kevin)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 184 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner terminated as attorney of record for Defendant Google, Inc. Ordered that the Clerk shall terminate any further ECF notices to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/8/16. (mjc, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 182 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kristin J Madigan terminated and is no longer counsel of record for Google in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/15/2015. (gsg)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kristin J. Madigan by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Madigan, Kristin)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/9/2015. (gsg)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER CORRECTING CLERICAL ERROR re 179 Order Staying Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/02/15. (mll, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER STAYING CASE in reference to Dkt. Nos. 164 and 167 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/29/2015. (jrg3)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 157 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE by Google, Inc. OF U.S. PATENT TRIAL AND APPEAL BOARD SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING COVERED BUSINESS METHOD REVIEW [DKT. 167] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Kevin)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Google, Inc. (Bufe, John)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 157 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James Judah, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Affidavit of Kevin A. Smith, # 18 Exhibit 1, # 19 Exhibit 2, # 20 Affidavit of Roy Batista, # 21 Affidavit of Steve Ellis, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 173 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 158 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/13/15. (mll, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 158 Opposed MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING ON SMARTFLASH'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited re 158 Opposed MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING ON SMARTFLASH'S MOTION TO COMPEL Smartflash LLC's and Smartflash Technologies Limited's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Expedite Briefing on Smartflash's Motion to Compel (Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 5/12/2015 (sm, ).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 171 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC to 167 Defendant Google Inc.'s Response to the Court's May 4, 2015 Order (Dkt. 164) and Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Covered Business Method Review. filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summers Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER resetting Markman Hearing for 6/4/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/08/15. (mll, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 167 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion,, 164 Order Notice of Filing of Covered Business Method Review Petitions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Kevin)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE Regarding Briefing by Google, Inc. re 150 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS (Smith, Kevin)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Google, Inc. to 164 Order And MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING COVERED BUSINESS METHOD REVIEW. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kevin A. Smith, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) Modified on 5/7/2015 (sm, ).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Joint Claim Construction Chart by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION to Stay and Response to Court's May 4, 2015 Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) Modified on 5/7/2015 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDERED that the parties file briefing on the issue of whether the case should also be stayed pending the CBM reviews that have been instituted on the patents-in-suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 5/4/2015. (gsg)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD..*** ORDERED that the parties file briefing on the issue of whether the case should also be stayed pending the CBM reviews that have been instituted on the patents-in-suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 5/4/2015. (gsg) Modified on 5/4/2015 (gsg).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 150 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Nemunaitis Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Nemunaitis Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 158 Opposed MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING ON SMARTFLASH'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Google, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited JOINT NOTICE OF ESTIMATED AMOUNT OF TIME FOR MARKMAN HEARING (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Opposed MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING ON SMARTFLASH'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 McManis Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 McManis Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Cassady Declaration, # 18 Benfatto Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 1 to Benfatto Declaration, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER that the Court's Sealed Memorandum Opinion and Order (Doc. No. 138) be UNSEALED and made part of the public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/22/15. (mll, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE by Google, Inc. DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S NOTICE REGARDING GOOGLES OBJECTIONS TO THE MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING GOOGLES MOTION TO TRANSFER AND GOOGLES MOTION TO STAY (Smith, Kevin)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: 4/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            RESPONSE to 144 Sealed Google's OBJECTIONS TO THE MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA AND DENYING GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 124 SEALED MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY TO MELVIN SIMPSON filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 122 SEALED MOTION GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY TO HERMEN HULST filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  SEALED Responsive Claim Construction Brief to 134 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38)(Smith, Kevin)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 150 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kevin A. Smith, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 130 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting leave to file a motion for summary judgment of invalidity. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/17/15. (mll, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 145 Motion to Expedite. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Smartflash LLC and Smartflash Technologies, Ltd. shall file their response to Defendants Motion to Stay no later than April 21, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/17/2015. (gsg)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: 4/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER, The Petition for a writ of mandamus is dismissed. (dlc, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 130 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. Filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Letter Brief)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Objections To Order Denying Transfer by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 144 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                SEALED OBJECTIONS to Order [1250 denying SEALED MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Smith, Kevin)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 143 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 124 SEALED MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY TO MELVIN SIMPSON filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James D. Judah, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit P, # 6 Exhibit Q, # 7 Exhibit R, # 8 Exhibit S)(Judah, James)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Objections to Magistrate's Order Denying Motion to Transfer by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) Modified on 4/13/2015 (sm, ).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION Rule 72 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order (Dkt. 138) Denying Motion to Transfer by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Smith, Kevin) Modified on 4/13/2015 (sm, ).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 140 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 122 SEALED MOTION GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY TO HERMEN HULST filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Chao, Timothy)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 125 SEALED MOTION Motion To Stay Pending Resolution of Google Inc.'s Motion To Transfer filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/06/15. (mll, ) UNSEALED PER 156 ORDER. Modified on 4/28/2015 (mll, ). (Main Document 138 replaced on 4/28/2015) (mll, ). (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER. Smartflash LLC and Smartflash Technologies Limited are directed to respond to the petition within five days of the date of this order. Any reply is due within three days of service of the response. Entered by USCA-Federal Circuit on 4/6/15.(dlc, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE OF DOCKETING. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Case No. 15-131. (Attachments: # 1 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Filing Fee Letter, # 2 Petition for Writ of Mandamus)(dlc, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Declaration of Justin Nemunaitis contained in main document): 134 Claim Construction Brief Declaration of Justin T. Nemunaitis (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C33, # 2 Exhibit C34, # 3 Exhibit C35, # 4 Exhibit C36, # 5 Exhibit C37, # 6 Exhibit C38, # 7 Exhibit C39, # 8 Exhibit C40, # 9 Exhibit C41, # 10 Exhibit C42, # 11 Exhibit C43, # 12 Exhibit C44, # 13 Exhibit C45, # 14 Exhibit C46, # 15 Exhibit C47, # 16 Exhibit C48, # 17 Exhibit C49, # 18 Exhibit C50, # 19 Exhibit C51, # 20 Exhibit C52, # 21 Exhibit C53, # 22 Exhibit C54, # 23 Exhibit C55, # 24 Exhibit C56, # 25 Exhibit C57)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin T. Nemunaitis, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit A4, # 6 Exhibit A5, # 7 Exhibit A6, # 8 Exhibit A7, # 9 Exhibit B1, # 10 Exhibit B2, # 11 Exhibit B3, # 12 Exhibit B4, # 13 Exhibit C1, # 14 Exhibit C2, # 15 Exhibit C3, # 16 Exhibit C4, # 17 Exhibit C5, # 18 Exhibit C6, # 19 Exhibit C7, # 20 Exhibit C8, # 21 Exhibit C9, # 22 Exhibit C10, # 23 Exhibit C11, # 24 Exhibit C12, # 25 Exhibit C13, # 26 Exhibit C14, # 27 Exhibit C15, # 28 Exhibit C16, # 29 Exhibit C17, # 30 Exhibit C18, # 31 Exhibit C19, # 32 Exhibit C20, # 33 Exhibit C21, # 34 Exhibit C22, # 35 Exhibit C23, # 36 Exhibit C24, # 37 Exhibit C25, # 38 Exhibit C26, # 39 Exhibit C27, # 40 Exhibit C28, # 41 Exhibit C29, # 42 Exhibit C30, # 43 Exhibit C31, # 44 Exhibit C32)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 132 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Motion re 124 SEALED MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY TO MELVIN SIMPSON filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 131 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Motion re 122 SEALED MOTION GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY TO HERMEN HULST filed by Smartflash LLC and Smartflash Technologies Limited (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 130 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            SEALED Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. Requesting Leave to File Motion For Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 126 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Google Inc.'s Motion To Stay (Botzenhart, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 126 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Google Inc.'s Motion To Stay filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Google Inc.'s Motion To Stay by Google, Inc.. (Botzenhart, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2015: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION Motion To Stay Pending Resolution of Google Inc.'s Motion To Transfer by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Adam Botzenhart, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D-1, # 6 Exhibit D-2, # 7 Exhibit E)(Botzenhart, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2015: # 8 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY TO MELVIN SIMPSON by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit of James D. Judah, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Judah, James)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER appointing David Keyzer to the position of technical advisor in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 03/17/15. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 122 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY TO HERMEN HULST by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Chao, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2015: # 13 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited JOINT NOTICE REGARDING TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Timothy K Chao on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5082423. (Chao, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time of various case deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/05/15. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 1/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF VARIOUS CASE DEADLINES by Google, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 116 Motion for Extension of the Patent Rule 4-2 Exchange and Preliminary Identification of Expert Testimony on Indefiniteness. The deadline is hereby extended from January 23, 2015 up to and including January 30, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/29/2015. (gsg)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PATENT RULE 4-2 EXCHANGE AND PRELIMINARY IDENTIFICATION OF EXPERT TESTIMONY ON INDEFINITENESS by Google, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Hearing re 100 SEALED MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of California by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Botzenhart, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 111 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION to Motion re 100 SEALED MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James DuBois Judah on behalf of Google, Inc. (Judah, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended ANSWER to 58 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Google, Inc..(Botzenhart, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 108 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/04/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 109 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 SEALED MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Botzenhart, # 2 Exhibit P, # 3 Exhibit Q, # 4 Exhibit R, # 5 Exhibit S, # 6 Exhibit T, # 7 Exhibit U)(Botzenhart, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as part of Google's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Transfer by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Botzenhart, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 100 SEALED MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Declaration of Patrick Racz, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Service of Patent Rule 3-4(a) Disclosures (Botzenhart, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Service of Additional Disclosures Pursuant to the Court's Discovery Order (Botzenhart, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S DISCOVERY ORDER (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 99 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document: 100 SEALED MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of California.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Authorization, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Baily, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of California by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Dubey Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Botzenhart Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L-1, # 13 Exhibit L-2, # 14 Exhibit L-3, # 15 Exhibit L-4, # 16 Exhibit L-5, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Google Inc.'s Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 96 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC, Bonus XP, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant Bonus XP Inc are DISMISSED without prejudice. All costs and expenses relating to this litigation shall be borne solely by the party incurring the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/24/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Bonus XP, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Robert Faulkner added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/22/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. First Mediation to be completed by 1-16-2015; Second Mediation Completion due by 1/15/2016. Dispositive Motions/Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/22/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Jury Selection set for 3/28/2016 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Jury Trial set for 3/28/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Markman Hearing set for 5/14/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/22/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/22/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/22/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/22/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Google, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited Joint Notice of Revised Docket Control, ESI, and Protective Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B ESI Order, # 3 Exhibit C Protective Order)(Baily, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/13/2014, Entered: 9/13/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference Proceedings held on 9/4/14 before Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2014. (sms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that parties shall submit revised versions of their Docket Control, ESI Order, and Protective Order in accordance with the Court's rulings within five business days. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/11/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Scheduling Conference held on 9/4/2014. (Court Reporter Shea Soan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (leh, ) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/4/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time. The current deadline for submission of an ESI Order, Docket Control Order, Protective Order, and Mediator is extended to no later than 11:00 AM 9-01-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/04/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/4/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 80 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/04/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Telephone Conference held on 9/2/2014. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (leh, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Adam Botzenhart on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4814785. (Botzenhart, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Discovery Order, ESI Order, Docket Control Order, Protective Order, and Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/02/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 9/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document JOINT NOTICE OF AGREEMENT AS TO THE ENTRY OF A DISCOVERY ORDER AND DISPUTE AS TO THE ENTRY OF A DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ESI ORDER, PROTECTIVE ORDER AND MEDIATOR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit B Docket Control Order, # 3 Exhibit C ESI Order, # 4 Exhibit D Protective Order, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit F-1, # 8 Exhibit F-2A, # 9 Exhibit F-2B, # 10 Exhibit F-3, # 11 Exhibit F-4, # 12 Exhibit F-5, # 13 Exhibit F-6)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 09/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/1/2014, Entered: 9/1/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Seal JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL JOINT NOTICE OF AGREEMENT AS TO THE ENTRY OF A DISCOVERY ORDER AND DISPUTE AS TO THE ENTRY OF A DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ESI ORDER, PROTECTIVE ORDER AND MEDIATOR by Google, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Order, ESI Order, Docket Control Order, Protective Order and Mediator by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Hill, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Order, ESI Order, Docket Control Order, Protective Order, and Mediator by Bonus XP, Inc., Gearbox Software, LLC, Google, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McManis, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Google, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties (Baily, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. (Baily, Melissa) Modified on 8/27/2014 (mjc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS' CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 58 Amended Complaint by Bonus XP, Inc..(Dunwoody, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 58 Amended Complaint by Google, Inc..(Smith, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Joseph McCarty, III on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (McCarty, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Franklin Summers on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Summers, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Scott McManis on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (McManis, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher S Stewart on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Stewart, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Thomas Nemunaitis on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Nemunaitis, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hamad M Hamad on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Hamad, Hamad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Pearson on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Pearson, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/24/2014, Entered: 8/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-1 AND P.R. 3-2 (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 9/3/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/11/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 59 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/11/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of non-opposition to motion by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited re 59 MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Telephone Conference re Deadlines held on 8/1/2014. (Court Reporter L Hardwick.) (leh, ) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A First Amended Complaint)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2014: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Bonus XP, Inc., Google, Inc., filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Caldwell, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Google, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bonus XP, Inc. (Dunwoody, Samuel) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Bonus XP, Inc..(Dunwoody, Samuel) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Anthony Mathews on behalf of Google, Inc. (Mathews, Christopher) (Entered: 07/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 22 Sealed Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 48 Motion to Seal Plaintiffs Smartflash LLC and Smartflash Technologies Limited's Surreply to Google Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/26/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 22 SEALED MOTION Google, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS SURREPLY TO GOOGLE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Gearbox Software, LLC.( Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 SEALED MOTION Google, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan In Support of Google Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bonus XP, Inc..( Dunwoody, Samuel) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph B Martin on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4716118. (Martin, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jordan B Kaericher on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4716087. (Kaericher, Jordan) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristin J Madigan on behalf of Google, Inc. (Madigan, Kristin) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO Document # 37 Sealed Response, to show that document was not distributed through the e-filing system. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 22 SEALED MOTION Google, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2014: # 16 Corrected Certificate of Service) (mjc, ). (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO GOOGLE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE UNDER SEAL by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin A Smith on behalf of Google, Inc. (Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 23 Motion to Expedite Briefing Regarding Motion to Consolidate. Response due 6-20-2014; Reply due 6-24-2014. Google is ORDERED to disclose to Plaintiff's counsel the full extent of its knowledge and involvement, in the 6:13cv448 case by 6-17-2014 at 5:00 PM CDT. This includes its involvement, if any, in the claim construction proceedings so far. Until the Motion to Consolidate 22 is ruled on, Google may actively participate with Defendant Samsung in the claim construction proceedings for the 6:13cv448 case. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 31 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 23 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Google, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate (Dkt. No. 22) filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS SURREPLY TO MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/11/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/11/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/10/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Google, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate (Dkt. No. 22) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER A. MATHEWS, # 2 Exhibit A)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING ON ITS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 23 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Google, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate (Dkt. No. 22) filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Declaration of Bradley W. Caldwell, # 6 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Google, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate (Dkt. No. 22) by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION Google, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Mathew's Declaration in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 11), # 4 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 11), # 5 Exhibit B (Part 3 of 11), # 6 Exhibit B (Part 4 of 11), # 7 Exhibit B (Part 5 of 11), # 8 Exhibit B (Part 6 of 11), # 9 Exhibit B (Part 7 of 11), # 10 Exhibit B (Part 8 of 11), # 11 Exhibit B (Part 9 of 11), # 12 Exhibit B (Part 10 of 11), # 13 Exhibit B (Part 11 of 11), # 14 Exhibit C, # 15 Exhibit D, # 16 Exhibit E, # 17 Exhibit F, # 18 Exhibit G, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Google, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. (Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Google, Inc.. (Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Google, Inc..(Baily, Melissa) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Google, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Google, Inc. on 5/9/2014, by personal service; answer due: 5/30/2014. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bonus XP, Inc..( Dunwoody, Samuel) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Gearbox Software, LLC.( Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smartflash LLC. Gearbox Software, LLC served on 5/9/2014, answer due 5/30/2014. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smartflash LLC. Bonus XP, Inc. served on 5/9/2014, answer due 5/30/2014. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Curry, John) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dodd Cassady on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Bonus XP, Inc., Gearbox Software, LLC, Google, Inc.and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Smartflash LLC (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Bonus XP, Inc., Gearbox Software, LLC, Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4647995.), filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?