AL-ANAZI et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00345
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 29, 2017 at 1:27 PM DT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, Petitioner
No Logo ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM, Petitioner
No Logo ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, Petitioner
No Logo ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Richard Berz +1 202 682 7000 +1 202 857 0940 gregory.bailey@weil.com
TERMINATED: 11/11/2008 David A. Hickerson +1 202 682 7000 +1 202 857 0940 david.hickerson@weil.com
TERMINATED: 11/11/2008 Anant Raut +1 202 682 7000 anant.raut@weil.com
No Logo ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, Petitioner
No Logo IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, Petitioner
No Logo METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, Petitioner
No Logo MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, Petitioner
No Logo NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, Petitioner
No Logo OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, Petitioner
No Logo BRYCE GYURISKO, Defendant
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "GEORGE WALKER BUSH"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Jean Lin +1 202 514 3716 +1 202 616 8470 jean.lin@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/27/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Judry Laeb Subar +1 202 514 3969 +1 202 616 8470 judry.subar@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAY HOOD, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (115) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER dismissing as moot habeas petitions of former detainees. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/1/10. (lctfh1) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/1/10. (lctfh1) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
      STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
        NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
          ERRATA regarding JOINT STATUS REPORT filed 11/9/09. (jeb, ) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Judge Leon order)(jeb) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (88 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 88 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 176 in 1:05-cv-00765-EGS, 176 in 1:05-cv-00765-EGS, 135 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 135 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 90 in 1:05-cv-00888-CKK, 90 in 1:05-cv-00888-CKK, 96 in 1:05-cv-01667-RBW, 96 in 1:05-cv-01667-RBW, 32 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 32 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 104 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 263 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 263 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 138 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 138 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 200 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 200 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 176 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 176 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 68 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 68 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 96 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 96 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 104 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 104 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 588 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 588 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 46 in 1:05-cv-01635-PLF, 46 in 1:05-cv-01635-PLF, 143 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 143 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 632 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 632 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 47 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 112 in 1:05-cv-01009-UNA, 112 in 1:05-cv-01009-UNA, 54 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 54 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 48 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 48 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 64 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 64 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 61 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 61 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 103 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 103 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 53 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 53 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 49 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 49 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 67 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 67 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 221 in 1:05-cv-01487-TFH, 221 in 1:05-cv-01487-TFH, 37 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 37 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 248 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 248 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 252 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 252 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 234 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 234 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 84 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 84 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 229 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 229 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 283 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 283 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 46 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 238 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 238 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 58 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 153 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 153 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 53 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR, 53 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR) Order, Set Deadlines (Petitioners Consolidated Supplemental Reply Brief Regarding Jurisdiction over Habeas Petitions of Petitioners Transferred from Guantanamo Bay) filed by MURAT KURNAZ, MARTIN MUBANGA, JAMIL EL-BANNA, SABAH SUNNRQROUT, BISHER AL-RAWI, JAHIDA SAYYADI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, SALAH ABDUL RASOOL AL BLOUSHI, ABDUL RASOOL ALI AL BLOUSHI, ISA ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, MOHAMAD ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, ADEL KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, ABDULLAH KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM, ABDUL-SALAM GAITHAN MUREEF AL-SHIHRY, AWADH AMER FARHAN AL-SHIHRY, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, MURTADHA ALI MAGRAM, RIYADH ALI MAGRAM, ABDULLAH IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, ABDULLATIF IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, AHMED ERRACHIDI, ABDELJABBAR ERRACHIDI, HAZI AHMED, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ELHAM BATTAYAV, SALIM MUHOOD ADEM, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABDUL RAHMAN, OMAR DEGHAYES, ALLADEEN, OMAR DEGHAYES, ISMAIL AL-MASHAD, CHAMAN, NAZUL GUL, NASRULLAH, RAHMATTULLAH, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ABDULLA MOHAMMED KAHN, ADEL HASSAN HAMAD, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, AMINULLAH, ABDUL MAJID MOHAMMADI, AHSANULLAH PIRZAI, IHSAN ULLAH PEERZAI, EHSAN ULLAH, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, MOHAMMED AMON, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMAD AKHTIAR, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MUSA'AB AL MADHWANI, YOUSIF ABDULLAH AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLAH SALEH AL-RUBAISH, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, MUHAMMED QASIM, ABDANNOUR SAMEUR, ABU ABDUL AZIZ, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, FAWAZ NAMAN HAMOUD, BENDER AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, MOHAMMED AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, HAFIZULLAH AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, MOHAMMED BIN JAIED BIN ALADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, JAIED BIN HADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, BIJAD DEFALLA OTEIBI, SULTAN DEFALLA OTEIBI, ALGHAMDI ABDULRAHMAN OTHMAN A, ALGHAMDI AHMED OTHMAN A, MOHAMMED AL AMIN, SHAKER AAMER, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH GERAB ALSAAEI, ALI SALEH BIN GERAB AL-ABDULLAH OWN SAARI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ABDULLAH AL SALI AL ASORIYA, FAYIZ AL KANDARI, OMAR RAJIB AMIN, SALEH ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, HANI SAEED MOHAMMED BANA AL-KALF AL-GAMDI, HANNAN SAEED MOHAMMED BANAN AL-GAMDI, FAHD UMAR ABDULMAJID AL SHAREEF, ANWAR KHAN, HAIDER KHAN, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDUL MATIN, MOHAMMED YOUNIS, ABDUL MAJID, MOHAMMED MOSA YAAKOOBI, AMEENULLAH TOUKH, NASIR AHMAD, MOHAMMED NASEEM, ASEEL KHAN, WASIM, QAYED, GULBAS KHAN, SHER MOHAMMED, ZABARDAST, SAED FARHAN AL-MALIKI, NASER FARHAN AL-MALIKI, KHALED MALLOUH SHAYE ALGAHTANI, SHABIB MALLOUH SHAYE ALGAHTANI, AHMED ZAID SALEM ZUHAIR, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, BASHIR GHALAAB, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, MUSTAFA AHMED HAMLILY, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, MAMDOUH HABIB. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Reply to Petitioners' Supplemental Memorandum (08-cv-444, dkt. 112) Regarding Mootness filed by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (88 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 88 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 176 in 1:05-cv-00765-EGS, 176 in 1:05-cv-00765-EGS, 135 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 135 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 90 in 1:05-cv-00888-CKK, 90 in 1:05-cv-00888-CKK, 96 in 1:05-cv-01667-RBW, 96 in 1:05-cv-01667-RBW, 32 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 32 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 104 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 263 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 263 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 138 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 138 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 200 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 200 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 176 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 176 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 68 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 68 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 96 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 96 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 104 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 104 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 588 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 588 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 46 in 1:05-cv-01635-PLF, 46 in 1:05-cv-01635-PLF, 143 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 143 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 632 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 632 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 47 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 112 in 1:05-cv-01009-UNA, 112 in 1:05-cv-01009-UNA, 54 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 54 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 48 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 48 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 64 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 64 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 61 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 61 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 103 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 103 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 53 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 53 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 49 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 49 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 67 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 67 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 221 in 1:05-cv-01487-TFH, 221 in 1:05-cv-01487-TFH, 37 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 37 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 248 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 248 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 252 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 252 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 234 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 234 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 84 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 84 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 229 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 229 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 283 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 283 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 46 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 238 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 238 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 58 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 153 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 153 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 53 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR, 53 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR) Order, Set Deadlines (Petitioners Consolidated Supplemental Brief Regarding Jurisdiction over Habeas Petitions of Petitioners Transferred from Guantanamo Bay) filed by MURAT KURNAZ, RABIYE KURNAZ, MARTIN MUBANGA, KATHLEEN MUBANGA, JAMIL EL-BANNA, SABAH SUNNRQROUT, BISHER AL-RAWI, JAHIDA SAYYADI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, SALAH ABDUL RASOOL AL BLOUSHI, ABDUL RASOOL ALI AL BLOUSHI, ISA ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, MOHAMAD ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, ADEL KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, ABDULLAH KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM, ABDUL-SALAM GAITHAN MUREEF AL-SHIHRY, AWADH AMER FARHAN AL-SHIHRY, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, MURTADHA ALI MAGRAM, RIYADH ALI MAGRAM, ABDULLAH IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, ABDULLATIF IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, AHMED ERRACHIDI, ABDELJABBAR ERRACHIDI, HAZI AHMED, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ELHAM BATTAYAV, SALIM MUHOOD ADEM, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABDUL RAHMAN, OMAR DEGHAYES, ALLADEEN, OMAR DEGHAYES, ISMAIL AL-MASHAD, CHAMAN, NASRULLAH, RAHMATTULLAH, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ABDULLA MOHAMMED KAHN, ADEL HASSAN HAMAD, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, AMINULLAH, ABDUL MAJID MOHAMMADI, AHSANULLAH PIRZAI, IHSAN ULLAH PEERZAI, EHSAN ULLAH, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, MOHAMMED AMON, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMAD AKHTIAR, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, YOUSIF ABDULLAH AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLAH SALEH AL-RUBAISH, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, MUHAMMED QASIM, ABDANNOUR SAMEUR, ABU ABDUL AZIZ, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, FAWAZ NAMAN HAMOUD, BENDER AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, MOHAMMED AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, HAFIZULLAH AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, MOHAMMED BIN JAIED BIN ALADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, JAIED BIN HADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, BIJAD DEFALLA OTEIBI, SULTAN DEFALLA OTEIBI, ALGHAMDI ABDULRAHMAN OTHMAN A, ALGHAMDI AHMED OTHMAN A, MOHAMMED AL AMIN, SHAKER AAMER, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ALI SALEH BIN GERAB AL-ABDULLAH OWN SAARI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ABDULLAH AL SALI AL ASORIYA, FAYIZ AL KANDARI, OMAR RAJIB AMIN, SALEH ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, HANI SAEED MOHAMMED BANA AL-KALF AL-GAMDI, HANNAN SAEED MOHAMMED BANAN AL-GAMDI, FAHD UMAR ABDULMAJID AL SHAREEF, ANWAR KHAN, HAIDER KHAN, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDUL MATIN, MOHAMMED YOUNIS, ABDUL MAJID, MOHAMMED MOSA YAAKOOBI, AMEENULLAH TOUKH, NASIR AHMAD, MOHAMMED NASEEM, ASEEL KHAN, WASIM, QAYED, GULBAS KHAN, SHER MOHAMMED, ZABARDAST, SAED FARHAN AL-MALIKI, NASER FARHAN AL-MALIKI, KHALED MALLOUH SHAYE ALGAHTANI, SHABIB MALLOUH SHAYE ALGAHTANI, AHMED ZAID SALEM ZUHAIR, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, MUSTAFA AHMED HAMLILY, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, MAMDOUH HABIB, MAHA HABIB, RICK BACCUS. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Respondents' Mootness Briefs Regarding Transferred Petitioners filed by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                      STATUS REPORT With Current Information Regarding Petitioners Previously Detained At Guantanamo Bay by BARACK OBAMA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Chart)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER requiring additional briefing on transferred or released petitioners. (Supplemental Briefs due by 11/10/2009. Replies due by 11/20/2009). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/9/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER directing the parties to provide the Court with additional information. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/8/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (46 in 1:05-cv-01008-JDB, 46 in 1:05-cv-01008-JDB, 54 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 54 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 97 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 97 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 38 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 38 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 136 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 136 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 46 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR, 30 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 30 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 39 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 39 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 96 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 96 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 79 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 79 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 39 in 1:05-cv-00621-PLF, 39 in 1:05-cv-00621-PLF, 38 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 38 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 42 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 42 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 57 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 57 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 25 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 25 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 59 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 59 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 128 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 128 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 47 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 47 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 46 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 46 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 105 in 1:05-cv-01009-JDB, 105 in 1:05-cv-01009-JDB, 40 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 40 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 193 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 193 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 77 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 77 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 57 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 57 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 221 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 221 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 47 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW) Order,, Set Deadlines, (Petitioners' Consolidated Reply Brief Regarding Jurisdiction over Habeas Petitions of Petitioners Transferred from Guantnamo Bay) filed by MURAT KURNAZ, RABIYE KURNAZ, MARTIN MUBANGA, KATHLEEN MUBANGA, JAMIL EL-BANNA, SABAH SUNNRQROUT, BISHER AL-RAWI, JAHIDA SAYYADI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, SALAH ABDUL RASOOL AL BLOUSHI, ABDUL RASOOL ALI AL BLOUSHI, ISA ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, MOHAMAD ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, ADEL KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, ABDULLAH KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM, ABDUL-SALAM GAITHAN MUREEF AL-SHIHRY, AWADH AMER FARHAN AL-SHIHRY, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, JOHN DOES, MURTADHA ALI MAGRAM, RIYADH ALI MAGRAM, ABDULLAH IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, ABDULLATIF IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, WAHIDOF ABDUL MOKIT, AHMED ERRACHIDI, ABDELJABBAR ERRACHIDI, HAZI AHMED, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ELHAM BATTAYAV, SALIM MUHOOD ADEM, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, CHAMAN, NAZUL GUL, NASRULLAH, RAHMATTULLAH, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ABDULLA MOHAMMED KAHN, ADEL HASSAN HAMAD, HABIBULLAH MANGUT, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, AMINULLAH, ABDUL MAJID MOHAMMADI, AHSANULLAH PIRZAI, IHSAN ULLAH PEERZAI, EHSAN ULLAH, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, MOHAMMED AMON, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMAD AKHTIAR, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, RASHID AWAD AL AWEDA, RASHID AWADH RASHID AL-UWAIDAH, THAMIR AL-UWAIDAH, THAMER AL AWEDA, YOUSIF ABDULLAH AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLAH SALEH AL-RUBAISH, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, MUHAMMED QASIM, ABDANNOUR SAMEUR, ABU ABDUL AZIZ, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, FAWAZ NAMAN HAMOUD, BENDER AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, MOHAMMED AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, HAFIZULLAH AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, MOHAMMED BIN JAIED BIN ALADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, JAIED BIN HADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, BIJAD DEFALLA OTEIBI, SULTAN DEFALLA OTEIBI, ALGHAMDI ABDULRAHMAN OTHMAN A, ALGHAMDI AHMED OTHMAN A, MOHAMMED AL AMIN, SHAKER AAMER, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH GERAB ALSAAEI, ALI SALEH BIN GERAB AL-ABDULLAH OWN SAARI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ABDULLAH AL SALI AL ASORIYA, FAYIZ AL KANDARI, OMAR RAJIB AMIN, SALEH ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, HANI SAEED MOHAMMED BANA AL-KALF AL-GAMDI, HANNAN SAEED MOHAMMED BANAN AL-GAMDI, FAHD UMAR ABDULMAJID AL SHAREEF, ANWAR KHAN, HAIDER KHAN, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDUL MATIN, MOHAMMED YOUNIS, ABDUL MAJID, MOHAMMED MOSA YAAKOOBI, AMEENULLAH TOUKH, NASIR AHMAD, MOHAMMED NASEEM, ASEEL KHAN, WASIM, QAYED, GULBAS KHAN, SHER MOHAMMED, SANGAR YAR MULLAH RAHMATTULLAH, HAJI NAQIBULLAH, ABDUL GAFOOR AKHOUZADA, ABDUL SALAM, ZABARDAST, SAED FARHAN AL-MALIKI, NASER FARHAN AL-MALIKI, KHALED MALLOUH SHAYE ALGAHTANI, SHABIB MALLOUH SHAYE ALGAHTANI, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, YAKUBI, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, MUSTAFA AHMED HAMLILY, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MAMDOUH HABIB, MAHA HABIB. (Kadidal, Shayana) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE to Petitioners' Consolidated Brief Regarding Jurisdiction Over Habeas Petitioners Transferred From Guantanamo Bay filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3-4)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Briefs re. Jurisdiction over Claims of Transferred or Released Petitioners by MURAT KURNAZ, RABIYE KURNAZ, MARTIN MUBANGA, KATHLEEN MUBANGA, JAMIL EL-BANNA, SABAH SUNNRQROUT, BISHER AL-RAWI, JAHIDA SAYYADI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, SALAH ABDUL RASOOL AL BLOUSHI, ABDUL RASOOL ALI AL BLOUSHI, ISA ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, MOHAMAD ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, ADEL KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, ABDULLAH KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM, ABDUL-SALAM GAITHAN MUREEF AL-SHIHRY, AWADH AMER FARHAN AL-SHIHRY, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, JOHN DOES, MURTADHA ALI MAGRAM, RIYADH ALI MAGRAM, ABDULLAH IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, ABDULLATIF IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, WAHIDOF ABDUL MOKIT, AHMED ERRACHIDI, ABDELJABBAR ERRACHIDI, HAZI AHMED, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ELHAM BATTAYAV, SALIM MUHOOD ADEM, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, CHAMAN, NAZUL GUL, NASRULLAH, KARIN BOSTAN, RAHMATTULLAH, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ABDULLA MOHAMMED KAHN, ADEL HASSAN HAMAD, HABIBULLAH MANGUT, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, AMINULLAH, ABDUL MAJID MOHAMMADI, AHSANULLAH PIRZAI, IHSAN ULLAH PEERZAI, EHSAN ULLAH, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, MOHAMMED AMON, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMAD AKHTIAR, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, RASHID AWAD AL AWEDA, RASHID AWADH RASHID AL-UWAIDAH, THAMIR AL-UWAIDAH, THAMER AL AWEDA, YOUSIF ABDULLAH AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLAH SALEH AL-RUBAISH, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, MUHAMMED QASIM, ABDANNOUR SAMEUR, ABU ABDUL AZIZ, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, FAWAZ NAMAN HAMOUD, BENDER AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, MOHAMMED AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, HAFIZULLAH AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, MOHAMMED BIN JAIED BIN ALADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, JAIED BIN HADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, BIJAD DEFALLA OTEIBI, SULTAN DEFALLA OTEIBI, ALGHAMDI ABDULRAHMAN OTHMAN A, ALGHAMDI AHMED OTHMAN A, MOHAMMED AL AMIN, SHAKER AAMER, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH GERAB ALSAAEI, ALI SALEH BIN GERAB AL-ABDULLAH OWN SAARI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ABDULLAH AL SALI AL ASORIYA, FAYIZ AL KANDARI, OMAR RAJIB AMIN, SALEH ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, HANI SAEED MOHAMMED BANA AL-KALF AL-GAMDI, HANNAN SAEED MOHAMMED BANAN AL-GAMDI, FAHD UMAR ABDULMAJID AL SHAREEF, ANWAR KHAN, HAIDER KHAN, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDUL MATIN, MOHAMMED YOUNIS, ABDUL MAJID, MOHAMMED MOSA YAAKOOBI, AMEENULLAH TOUKH, NASIR AHMAD, MOHAMMED NASEEM, ASEEL KHAN, WASIM, QAYED, GULBAS KHAN, SHER MOHAMMED, SANGAR YAR MULLAH RAHMATTULLAH, HAJI NAQIBULLAH, ABDUL GAFOOR AKHOUZADA, ABDUL SALAM, ZABARDAST, SAED FARHAN AL-MALIKI, NASER FARHAN AL-MALIKI, KHALED MALLOUH SHAYE ALGAHTANI, SHABIB MALLOUH SHAYE ALGAHTANI, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, YAKUBI, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, MUSTAFA AHMED HAMLILY, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MAMDOUH HABIB, MAHA HABIB, RICK BACCUS, WILLIAM L. CLINE (Kadidal, Shayana) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (46 in 1:05-cv-01008-JDB, 46 in 1:05-cv-01008-JDB, 54 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 54 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 97 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 97 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 38 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 38 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 136 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 136 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 46 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR, 30 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 30 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 39 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 39 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 96 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 96 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 79 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 79 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 39 in 1:05-cv-00621-PLF, 39 in 1:05-cv-00621-PLF, 38 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 38 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 42 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 42 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 57 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 57 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 25 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 25 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 59 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 59 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 128 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 128 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 47 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 47 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 46 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 46 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 105 in 1:05-cv-01009-JDB, 105 in 1:05-cv-01009-JDB, 40 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 40 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 193 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 193 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 77 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 77 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 57 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 57 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 221 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 221 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 47 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW) Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by MURAT KURNAZ, RABIYE KURNAZ, MARTIN MUBANGA, KATHLEEN MUBANGA, JAMIL EL-BANNA, SABAH SUNNRQROUT, BISHER AL-RAWI, JAHIDA SAYYADI, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, SALAH ABDUL RASOOL AL BLOUSHI, ABDUL RASOOL ALI AL BLOUSHI, ISA ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, MOHAMAD ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, ADEL KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, ABDULLAH KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM, ABDUL-SALAM GAITHAN MUREEF AL-SHIHRY, AWADH AMER FARHAN AL-SHIHRY, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, JOHN DOES, MURTADHA ALI MAGRAM, RIYADH ALI MAGRAM, ABDULLAH IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, ABDULLATIF IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, WAHIDOF ABDUL MOKIT, AHMED ERRACHIDI, ABDELJABBAR ERRACHIDI, HAZI AHMED, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ELHAM BATTAYAV, SALIM MUHOOD ADEM, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, CHAMAN, NAZUL GUL, NASRULLAH, KARIN BOSTAN, RAHMATTULLAH, ABDULLA MOHAMMED KAHN, ADEL HASSAN HAMAD, HABIBULLAH MANGUT, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, AMINULLAH, ABDUL MAJID MOHAMMADI, AHSANULLAH PIRZAI, IHSAN ULLAH PEERZAI, EHSAN ULLAH, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, MOHAMMED AMON, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMAD AKHTIAR, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, RASHID AWAD AL AWEDA, RASHID AWADH RASHID AL-UWAIDAH, THAMIR AL-UWAIDAH, THAMER AL AWEDA, YOUSIF ABDULLAH AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLAH SALEH AL-RUBAISH, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, MUHAMMED QASIM, ABDANNOUR SAMEUR, ABU ABDUL AZIZ, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, FAWAZ NAMAN HAMOUD, BENDER AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, MOHAMMED AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, HAFIZULLAH AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, MOHAMMED BIN JAIED BIN ALADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, JAIED BIN HADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, BIJAD DEFALLA OTEIBI, SULTAN DEFALLA OTEIBI, ALGHAMDI ABDULRAHMAN OTHMAN A, ALGHAMDI AHMED OTHMAN A, MOHAMMED AL AMIN, SHAKER AAMER, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH GERAB ALSAAEI, ALI SALEH BIN GERAB AL-ABDULLAH OWN SAARI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ABDULLAH AL SALI AL ASORIYA, FAYIZ AL KANDARI, OMAR RAJIB AMIN, SALEH ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, HANI SAEED MOHAMMED BANA AL-KALF AL-GAMDI, HANNAN SAEED MOHAMMED BANAN AL-GAMDI, FAHD UMAR ABDULMAJID AL SHAREEF, ANWAR KHAN, HAIDER KHAN, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDUL MATIN, MOHAMMED YOUNIS, ABDUL MAJID, MOHAMMED MOSA YAAKOOBI, AMEENULLAH TOUKH, NASIR AHMAD, MOHAMMED NASEEM, ASEEL KHAN, WASIM, QAYED, GULBAS KHAN, SHER MOHAMMED, SANGAR YAR MULLAH RAHMATTULLAH, HAJI NAQIBULLAH, ABDUL GAFOOR AKHOUZADA, ABDUL SALAM, ZABARDAST, SAED FARHAN AL-MALIKI, NASER FARHAN AL-MALIKI, KHALED MALLOUH SHAYE ALGAHTANI, SHABIB MALLOUH SHAYE ALGAHTANI, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, YAKUBI, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, MUSTAFA AHMED HAMLILY, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MAMDOUH HABIB, MAHA HABIB. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibits A-G)(Kadidal, Shayana) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT Regarding Petitioners Transferred or Released From Guantanamo filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JOHN DOES, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, PORTER J. GOSS, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, AMEENULLAH TOUKH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUNSFELD, RICK BACCUS, WILLIAM L. CLINE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER requiring briefing on transferred or released petitioners. (Brief due by 2/6/2009. Replies due by 2/20/2009.) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/12/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by David Richard Berz on behalf of NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI Substituting for attorney David A. Hickerson and Anant Raut (Berz, David) (Entered: 11/11/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE DIRECTOR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, PORTER J. GOSS, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Subar, Judry) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                            STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's July 3, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                              STATUS REPORT by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Hickerson, David) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY; status reports due by 5:30 p.m. on Monday, July 14, 2008. (gt, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER transferring case to Senior Judge Thomas F. Hogan for coordination and management as reflected in the July 1, 2008 Resolution of the Executive Session. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/3/2008. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING of Motion for designation of Paragraph 9 of the 2/8/08 Declaration of Rear Admiral Mark H. Buzby (filed 2/13/08) as protected information under the protective orders by GEORGE W. BUSH,et al. (jeb, ) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                      N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, ) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 12/31/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 83 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G)(Subar, Judry) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 83 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Petitioners' Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss by ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Notice of Filing)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# 2 Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# 3 Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# 4 Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# 5 Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# 6 Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# 7 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ). (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents. (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Response To Minute Order Dismissing Habeas Corpus Petition Of Ibrahim Al-Rubaish filed by IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH. (Raut, Anant) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Response to Minute Order Dismissing Habeas Corpus Petition of Ibrahim Al-Rubaish by IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Notice of Filing)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 72 MOTION for Reconsideration re 71 Order on Motion to Compel, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE Regarding The Unconstitutionality Of The Military Commissions Act Of 2006 by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI re 74 Notice (Other) (Raut, Anant) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              RESPONSE to Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's September 25, 2006 Order Addressing Privilege Team's Responsibilities Under the Protective Order filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI. (Raut, Anant) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Response to Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's September 25, 2006 Order Addressing the Privilege Team's Responsibilities Under the Protective Order by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI (Attachments: # 1 Attachement to Notice of Filing)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Military Commission Act by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Military Commision Act of 2006) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    ERRATA by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO 72 MOTION for Reconsideration re 71 Order on Motion to Compel, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH,, DONALD RUMSFELD,, JAY HOOD,, BRYCE GYURISKO,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 71 Order on Motion to Compel, by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Compel and 49 Motion to Compel (redacted version). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 9/25/2006. (lckay1, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2006 (lckay1, ). (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 64 MOTION For Restoration of Petitioners' Mail Priviledges In Accordance With The Protective Order filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI. (Raut, Anant) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Reply to Respondents' Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Restore Mail Priviledges and to Compel Compliance with the Protective Order by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Notice of Filing)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              AMENDED MEMORANDUM ORDER granting MOTION of respondents for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 9/20/06. (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 64 MOTION For Restoration of Petitioners' Mail Priviledges In Accordance With The Protective Order filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting MOTION of respondents for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials . Signed by Judge James Robertson on 9/15/06. (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 64 MOTION For Restoration of Petitioners' Mail Priviledges In Accordance With The Protective Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION For Restoration of Petitioners' Mail Priviledges In Accordance With The Protective Order by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion# 2 Exhibit A To Memorandum# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Of Motion For Restoration Of Petitioners' Mail Priviledges In Accordance With The Protective Order by ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI (Raut, Anant) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER TRANSFERRING to Judge James Robertson, with his consent and pursuant to L. Civ. R. 40.6(a), 46 respondents' motion relating to the impoundment and review of certain potentially privileged materials collected from detention facilities at the United States Naval Station in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/24/2006. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Order of Court 206 directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel filed by Respondents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Chart regarding seized materials and privileged communications) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM correcting July 7, 2006 MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and response to supplemental memoranda of certain petitioners filed by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C-Supplemental Declaration of Kisthardt)Associated Cases: (jeb, ) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Petitioners' Response to Minute Order Dismissing Habeas Corpus Petition of Adel Egla Hassa Al-Nussairi filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER directing counsel for petitioners to file a notice by 8/15/06 identifying any petitioner as to whom counsel lacks a good-faith belief that any attorney-client communications occurred prior to 6/18/06; directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel (either through written correspondence or in-person conversation) prior to 6/18/06. (See order for full details) Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/4/06. (jeb) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT Dismissing Habeas Corpus Petition of Adel Egla Hassan Al-Nussairi filed by ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Raut, Anant) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Response to Minute Order Dismissing Habeas Corpus Petition of Adel Egla Hussan Al-Nussari by ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI (Attachments: # 1)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 46 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 46 MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(lc, ) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE to Respondents' Motion for Procedures Related to Review of Certain Detainee Materials and Request for Expedited Briefing, Cleared by CSO for Public filing (related document(s) 50 ) filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Raut, Anant) Modified on 7/26/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing Petitioners' Response to Respondents' Motion for Procedures Related to Review of Certain Detainee Materials and Request for Expedited Briefing by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI re 46 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 49 MOTION to Compel (Redacted, Public Version) Privilege Team Compliance with the Amended Protective Order filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI. (Raut, Anant) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel (Redacted, Public Version) Privilege Team Compliance with the Amended Protective Order by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER sealing motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 7/14/2006. (lckay1, ) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE regarding steps taken in the wake of the Supreme Court's recent decision in Hamdan v. Rumsfeld by Respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. (jeb, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and Motion for expedited briefing by Respondents, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Harry B. Harris# 2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Carol Kishardt# 3 Text of Proposed Order for Briefing# 4 Text of Proposed Order regarding review of detainee materials)Associated Cases: (jeb) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Transfer by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Waxman Declaration# 2 Exhibit Prosper Declaration)(Schwartz, James) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 40 MOTION to Compel Privilege Team Compliance with the Amended Protective Order filed by ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI. (Raut, Anant) (SEALED DOCUMENT ) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawl of Reply Brief by ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI (Raut, Anant) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing by ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Notice of Filing)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 40 Respondents' Opposition To Petitioners' Motion To Compel Privilege Team Compliance With Amended Protective Order filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Privilege Team Compliance with the Amended Protective Order by ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Koslowe, Neil)(SEALED DOCUMENT ). (Entered: 03/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER assigning special litigation team. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 3/2/2006. (lckay1, ) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing by ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Notice of Filing)(Koslowe, Neil) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, and DONALD RUMSFELD, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jeb, ) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER referring all motions pertaining to interpretation or construction of any protective order which has been entered in any of these cases to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay; referring to Magistrate Judge Kay all disputes pertaining to logistical issues, such as communications with or visits to clients and counsel. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler, Chair of Calendar and Case Management Committee, on 11/2/05. (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER finding as moot 31 Motion for Preservation Order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/28/2005. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preservation Order, Cleared for Public Filing by CSO (Related document 33 ) filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I# 2 Exhibit J# 3 Exhibit K)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 10/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Reply in Support of Motion for Preservation Order by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 10/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to motion re 31 Respondents' Opposition to Petitioners' Motion for Preservation Order filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, James) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order for Preservation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for Preservation Order# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H)(Raut, Anant) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Anant Raut on behalf of NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM (Raut, Anant) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by David A. Hickerson (Hickerson, David) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Naief Fahad Mutlaq Al-Otaibi (Factual Return) and Notice of Submission Under Seal filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Ibrahim Suleiman Al-Rubaish (Factual Return) and Notice of Submission Under Seal filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Abdulaziz Sa'ad Oshan (Factual Return) and Notice of Submission Under Seal filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Abdulla Thani Faris Al-Anazi (Factual Return) and Notice of Submission Under Seal filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Adel Egla Hussan Al-Nussairi (Factual Return) and Notice of Submission Under Seal filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION denying Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and granting Respondents' Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/21/2005. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 3 Petitioners' Motion for Order to Show Cause, granting 6 Respondents' Motion to Stay the case, and denying 7 Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Respondents' obligation to show cause why the petition should not be granted is stayed. The Court enters by way of reference protective orders. Respondents shall provide factual returns to the Court and Petitioners' counsel within 120 days of this Order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/21/2005. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on April 13, 2005 before Judge John D. Bates. Court Reporter: Bryan A.Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (lc, ) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Third) to Petitioners' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P.# 2 Affidavit of Service.)(Hickerson, David) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Second) to Petitioners' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K.# 2 Exhibit L.# 3 Exhibit M.# 4 Exhibit N.# 5 Exhibit O.)(Hickerson, David) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Petitioners Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H# 2 Exhibit I# 3 Exhibit J# 4 Affidavit of service)(Hickerson, David) (Entered: 04/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM TO PETITIONERS MOTION FOR THE IMMEDIATE ISSUANCE OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2243 OR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H# 2 Affidavit of service)(Hickerson, David) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM TO PETITIONERS MOTION FOR THE IMMEDIATE ISSUANCE OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2243 OR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G# 2 Affidavit of service)(Hickerson, David) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM TO PETITIONERS MOTION FOR THE IMMEDIATE ISSUANCE OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2243 OR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E# 2 Exhibit F# 3 Affidavit of service)(Hickerson, David) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR......Supplemental MOTION for Order to Show Cause, Supplemental MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H# 2 Affidavit of Service)(Hickerson, David) Modified on 3/31/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR......Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C# 2 Exhibit D# 3 Affidavit of Service)(Hickerson, David) Modified on 3/31/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to 8 In Support of Petitioners' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Thirty Days' Notice filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Affidavit of Service)(Hickerson, David) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 6 to Stay Pending Related Appeals and for Continued Coordination filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to motion re 6 to Stay Pending Related Appeals filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit C# 3 Exhibit D# 4 Exhibit E# 5 Exhibit F# 6 Exhibit G# 7 Exhibit B (part 1)# 8 Exhibit B (part 2))(Hickerson, David) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to motion re 7 preliminary injunction filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A# 2 Exhibit Ex. B# 3 Exhibit Ex. C# 4 Exhibit Ex. D)(Katerberg, Robert) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Memorandum and Proposed Order by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Hickerson, David) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Pending Related Appeals and For Continued Coordination by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR......Supplemental MOTION for Order to Show Cause, Supplemental MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G# 2 Affidavit of service)(Hickerson, David) Modified on 3/31/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR......Supplemental MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E# 2 Exhibit F# 3 Affidavit of Service)(Hickerson, David) Modified on 3/31/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 03/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause# 6 Affidavit of Service)(Hickerson, David) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM. Case related to Case Nos. 02cv299, 02cv828, 02cv1130, 04cv1135, 04cv1137, 04cv1144, 04cv1163, 04cv1164, 04cv1194, 04cv1227, 04cv1254, 04cv1897, 04cv1937, 04cv2022, 04cv2035, 04cv2046, 04cv2215, 05cv22, 05cv23, 05cv270, and 05cv301. (cp, ) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) filed by NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM.(cp, ) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 254 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?