Federal Deposit, et al v. Drepanos, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-12614
District Judge Edward F. Harrington, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 10:05 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Colucci, Colucci & Marcus, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/16/1993, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Flavin +1 617 698 6000 +1 617 698 3001 pflavin@coluccilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrisburg Civil Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrence L. Parker +1 617 491 2265 +1 617 461 7800 tparker612@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720
v.
No Logo Bank of Boston, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of Boston"
No Logo Baybank Middlesex, Defendant
No Logo Nicolas P. Drepanos, Defendant
No Logo Olympic International Bank & Trust Co., Defendant
No Logo Peoples Savings Bank, Defendant
No Logo Peter Demogenes, Defendant
No Logo Shawmut Bank, Defendant
No Logo Wiggin Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 12 U.S.C. § 1819
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/20/1994 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Judge Edward F. Harrington . Order of Dismissal entered. (fmr) (Entered: 07/20/1994)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/20/1994 Stipulation of Dismissal
    Stipulation of dismissal by Bank of Boston, People's Savings, Shawmut Bank, BayBank Middlesex, Olympic Internation, Wiggin Corporation, Nicolas P. Drepanos, Peter Demogenes, Federal Deposit with prejudice, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 07/20/1994)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/20/1994, Entered: 5/20/1994 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
      Judge Edward F. Harrington . Notice of Hearing/conference: set status conference for 2:00 7/18/94 . (fmr) (Entered: 05/20/1994)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/3/1994, Entered: 1/3/1994 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
        Judge Edward F. Harrington . Notice of Hearing/conference: set status conference for 2:00 2/3/94 (fmr) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/16/1993, Entered: 8/17/1993 Add and Terminate Attorneys
          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of attorney Paul K. Flavin for Federal Deposit filed (fmr) (Entered: 08/17/1993)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/11/1993, Entered: 8/12/1993 Notice of Appearance/
            Notice of attorney appearance for Federal Deposit by M. Ellen Carpenter, Terrence L. Parker filed. (fmr) (Entered: 08/12/1993)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Set Deadlines
              Notice of Hearing: set status conference for 10:00 7/30/92 entered, cc/cl (fmr) (Entered: 07/20/1993)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/13/1992, Entered: 11/16/1992 Set Deadlines
                Notice of Hearing: set status conference for 2:00 11/30/92 entered (fmr) (Entered: 11/16/1992)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/18/1992, Entered: 6/19/1992 Judgment*Court Filing
                  Judge Edward F. Harrington . Judgment for Federal Deposit against Wiggin Corporation, Entered, cc/cl. (tmc) (Entered: 06/19/1992)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/17/1992, Entered: 3/25/1992 Statement of Facts
                    Statement of damages by Federal Deposit in support Re: [22-1] motion for assessment of damages, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 03/25/1992)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/17/1992, Entered: 3/25/1992 Affidavit
                      Affidavit of Paul K. Flavin Re: [22-1] motion for assessment of damages, [22-2] motion for entry of separate and final judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(B) and 55(B)(1) against Wiggin Corporation, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 03/25/1992)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/17/1992, Entered: 3/25/1992 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        Motion by Federal Deposit for assessment of damages and for entry of separate and final judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(B) and 55(B)(1) against Wiggin Corporation , filed. (fmr) (Entered: 03/25/1992)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 3/5/1992 Motion to Continue
                          Motion by Federal Deposit to extend time to serve Deft Nicholas P. Drepanos for an additional 90 days , FILED.(c/s) (cmg) (Entered: 03/05/1992)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/29/1992, Entered: 2/10/1992 Court Filing
                            Judge Edward F. Harrington. Clerk's Notes: Hearing held on ex parte mtn to attach.; Granting [17-1] motion further ex parte motion to attach real estate of Nicholas P. Drepanos, granting [18-1] motion further ex parte motion for attachment on trustee process. (fmr) Modified on 02/10/1992 (Entered: 02/10/1992)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 2/10/1992 Affidavit
                              Affidavit of Frank Ferentchak in support Re: [17-1] motion further ex parte motion to attach real estate of Nicholas P. Drepanos, [18-1] motion further ex parte for attachment on trustee process, filed. (Copy) (fmr) Modified on 02/10/1992 (Entered: 02/10/1992)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 2/10/1992 Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                Further ex parte motion by Federal Deposit further ex parte for attachment on trustee process , filed. (fmr) (Entered: 02/10/1992)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 2/10/1992 Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                  Further ex parte motion by Federal Deposit further ex parte motion to attach real estate of Nicholas P. Drepanos , filed. (fmr) Modified on 02/10/1992 (Entered: 02/10/1992)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/1992, Entered: 1/10/1992
                                    Notice of default as to Wiggin Corporation issued, granting [15-1] motion for entry of default as to Wiggin Corporation. cc/parties. (fmr) (Entered: 01/10/1992)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/13/1991, Entered: 1/3/1992 Motion for Entry of Default
                                      Motion by Federal Deposit for entry of default as to Wiggin Corporation , filed, c/s. (fmr) (Entered: 01/03/1992)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/28/1991, Entered: 11/14/1991 Writ Returned
                                        Writ of attachment executed re: Peter Demogenes in the amount of $725,000.00 on 10/11/91, w/Register of Deeds at Cambridge, MA, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 11/14/1991)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/28/1991, Entered: 11/14/1991 Writ Returned
                                          Writ of attachment executed re: Peter Demogenes in the amount of $725,000.00 on 10/11/91, w/Register of Deeds at Lowell, MA, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 11/14/1991)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/28/1991, Entered: 11/14/1991 Writ Returned
                                            Writ of attachment executed re: Wiggin Corporation in the amount of $600,000.00 on 10/11/91, w/Register of Deeds at Cambridge, MA, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 11/14/1991)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/28/1991, Entered: 11/14/1991 Writ Returned
                                              Writ of attachment executed re: Wiggin Corporation in the amount of $600,000.00 on 10/11/91, w/Register of Deeds at Lowell, MA, filed. (fmr) Modified on 11/14/1991 (Entered: 11/14/1991)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/28/1991, Entered: 11/14/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                Return of service executed as to Peter Demogenes on 10/16/91, filed. Answer due on 11/5/91 for Peter Demogenes. (fmr) (Entered: 11/14/1991)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/28/1991, Entered: 11/14/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                  Return of service executed as to Wiggin Corporation on 10/15/91, filed. Answer due on 11/4/91 for Wiggin Corporation. (fmr) (Entered: 11/14/1991)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/9/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991 Court Filing
                                                    Judge Edward F. Harrington. Clerk's Notes: Hearing held on ex parte request for R. E. Attach. & for Proc. Server, granting in the amount of $725,000.00 [2-1] motion to attach real estate of Peter Demogenes, granting [3-1] motion to attach real estate of Wiggin Corporation, granting [7-1] motion for appointment of process server. (fmr) Modified on 10/22/1991 (Entered: 10/22/1991)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/9/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      Motion by Federal Deposit for appointment of process server , filed. (fmr) (Entered: 10/22/1991)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991 Affidavit
                                                        Affidavit of Frank Ferentchak in support Re: [5-1] motion for attachment on trustee process, [4-1] motion to attach real estate of Nicholas P. Drepanos, [3-1] motion to attach real estate of Wiggin Corporation, [2-1] motion to attach real estate of Peter Demogenes, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 10/22/1991)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991 Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                                          Ex parte motion by Federal Deposit for attachment on trustee process , filed. (fmr) (Entered: 10/22/1991)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991 Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                                            Ex parte motion by Federal Deposit to attach real estate of Nicholas P. Drepanos , filed. (fmr) (Entered: 10/22/1991)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991 Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                                              Ex parte motion by Federal Deposit to attach real estate of Wiggin Corporation , filed. (fmr) (Entered: 10/22/1991)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991 Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                                                Ex parte motion by Federal Deposit to attach real estate of Peter Demogenes , filed. (fmr) (Entered: 10/22/1991)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/8/1991, Entered: 10/10/1991 Complaint
                                                                  Complaint filed (fmr) (Entered: 10/10/1991)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                    Space Space

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 354 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?