USA v. Prather
Criminal Case Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-10013-JBM-JAG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley W Murphy +1 309 671 7050 +1 309 671 7259 brad.murphy@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo William P Prather, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald L Hamm +1 309 671 9701 +1 309 676 5489 hammr36@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CUSACK FLEMING GILFILLAN & O'DAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel G O'Day(Designation Pro Bono) +1 309 637 5282 +1 309 637 5788 doday@cfgolaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Peoria
Filed 4/3/2008
County Peoria
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206C.F
Offense Level 4
267206C.F - DECLARE UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY - On or about 4/10/02 in Peoria County, dft did willfully make and subscribe a 2001 income tax return Form 1040, which was verified by a written declaration that it was made under the penalties of perjury
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
TEXT ORDER granting [11] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to William P Prather (1): Sentencing of 09/12/08 is VACATED and RESET to Friday, 11/21/2008 at 10:30 AM, in person, in Courtroom D before Judge Joe Billy McDade. Objections to the Presentence Report should be submitted to the probation office no later than Friday, 10/03/08. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 08/18/08. (JBM2, ilcd)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Motion to Continue
    MOTION to Continue Trial Date by William P Prather. (O'Day, Daniel)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
      TEXT ORDER granting [10] Motion to Continue as to William P Prather (1)):Sentencing set for 07/18/08 is VACATED and RESET to Friday, 09/12/08 at 1:30 PM, in person, in Courtroom D before Judge Joe Billy McDade. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 06/09/08. (JBM2, ilcd)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 6/9/2008 Motion to Continue
        First MOTION to Continue by William P Prather. (O'Day, Daniel)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification
          Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification: Clerk re-generates NEF to Attys Hamm & O'Day re: [2] Information. Clerk modifies minute entry to reflect BLIND PLEA (HK, ilcd)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Sealed Document +Court Filing
            +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - unredacted Order Setting Conditions Of Release. (ML, ilcd) -- Filed & Entered: 04/04/2008 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification: Clerk re-generates NEF to Attys Hamm & O'Day re: [2] Information. Clerk modifies minute entry to reflect BLIND PLEA (HK, ilcd) 10 Filed & Entered: 06/06/2008Terminated: 06/09/2008 Motion to Continue First MOTION to Continue by William P Prather. (O'Day, Daniel) -- Filed & Entered: 06/09/2008 Order on Motion to Continue TEXT ORDER granting [10] Motion to Continue as to William P Prather (1)):Sentencing set for 07/18/08 is VACATED and RESET to Friday, 09/12/08 at 1:30 PM, in person, in Courtroom D before Judge Joe Billy McDade. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 06/09/08. (JBM2, ilcd) 11 Filed & Entered: 08/11/2008Terminated: 08/18/2008 Motion to Continue MOTION to Continue Trial Date by William P Prather. (O'Day, Daniel) -- Filed & Entered: 08/18/2008 Order on Motion to Continue TEXT ORDER granting [11] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to William P Prather (1): Sentencing of 09/12/08 is VACATED and RESET to Friday, 11/21/2008 at 10:30 AM, in person, in Courtroom D before Judge Joe Billy McDade. Objections to the Presentence Report should be submitted to the probation office no later than Friday, 10/03/08. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 08/18/08. (JBM2, ilcd)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
              Redacted ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to William P Prather (1) $10,000 (OR) entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 4/3/08. (ML, ilcd)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Sealed Document +Court Filing
                +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - unredacted Appearance Bond. (ML, ilcd) 8 Filed & Entered: 04/03/2008 Order Setting Conditions of Release Redacted ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to William P Prather (1) $10,000 (OR) entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 4/3/08. (ML, ilcd) 9 Filed & Entered: 04/03/2008 Sealed Document +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - unredacted Order Setting Conditions Of Release. (ML, ilcd) -- Filed & Entered: 04/04/2008 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification: Clerk re-generates NEF to Attys Hamm & O'Day re: [2] Information. Clerk modifies minute entry to reflect BLIND PLEA (HK, ilcd) 10 Filed & Entered: 06/06/2008Terminated: 06/09/2008 Motion to Continue First MOTION to Continue by William P Prather. (O'Day, Daniel) -- Filed & Entered: 06/09/2008 Order on Motion to Continue TEXT ORDER granting [10] Motion to Continue as to William P Prather (1)):Sentencing set for 07/18/08 is VACATED and RESET to Friday, 09/12/08 at 1:30 PM, in person, in Courtroom D before Judge Joe Billy McDade. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 06/09/08. (JBM2, ilcd) 11 Filed & Entered: 08/11/2008Terminated: 08/18/2008 Motion to Continue MOTION to Continue Trial Date by William P Prather. (O'Day, Daniel) -- Filed & Entered: 08/18/2008 Order on Motion to Continue TEXT ORDER granting [11] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to William P Prather (1): Sentencing of 09/12/08 is VACATED and RESET to Friday, 11/21/2008 at 10:30 AM, in person, in Courtroom D before Judge Joe Billy McDade. Objections to the Presentence Report should be submitted to the probation office no later than Friday, 10/03/08. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 08/18/08. (JBM2, ilcd)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Bond
                  Redacted Appearance(OR) Bond Entered as to William P Prather in amount of $ $10,000.(ML, ilcd)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER ON IMPLEMENTATION OF SENTENCING GUIDELINES as to William P Prather Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 4/3/08. (ML, ilcd)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Sealed Document +
                      +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - unredacted Waiver of IND. (ML, ilcd)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Waiver of Indictment
                        Redacted WAIVER OF INDICTMENT signed by William P Prather (ML, ilcd)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Information - Felony
                          Redacted INFORMATION as to William P Prather (1) count(s) 1. (ML, ilcd)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Information - Original Signatures Sealed - +
                            +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - INFORMATION - ORIGINAL SIGNATURES.. (ML, ilcd)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Change of Plea Hearing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joe Billy McDade: Parties present in open court by AUSA Brad Murphy/Attorneys Dan O'Day/Ronald Hamm with dft William P Prather for Waiver/Filing/Plea Hearing as to William P Prather held on 4/3/2008. Dft advised of right to proceed by information or indictment. Dft files written Waiver of Indictment in open court. Information filed. NO WRITTEN PLEA AGREEMENT FILED. BLIND Guilty Plea entered by Willam P Prather (1) to Count 1 of Information. Matter is referred to Probation Office for a Presentence Investigation and Report. Judgment of conviction entered. Sentencing is set for Friday, 7/18/2008, at 01:15 PM in Courtroom D before Judge Joe Billy McDade. Order on Implementation of Sentencing Guidelines entered. Court sets Appearance Bond of $10,000 (OR) and orders conditions of release. Dft released on bond. (Court Reporter NM.) (ML, ilcd) Modified on 4/4/2008 (HK, ilcd).
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                Attorney update in case as to William P Prather: Attorney Daniel G O'Day for Wililam P Prather, Ronald L Hamm for Wililam P Prather added. (ML, ilcd)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?