Scrum Alliance, Inc. v. Vmedu, Inc.

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91217690-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Scrum Alliance, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. PERRY +1 215 569 5767 perry@blankrome.com
v.
No Logo Vmedu, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Vmedu, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vmedu, Inc.
Attributes
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ROBERT COGGINS
Date in Location 8/4/2014
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
Timeline
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Dismissed W/ Prej
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None N
W/draw Of Opposition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None W
Stip To Susp Pend Settl Negotiations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None P
Stip Noted And Approved
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None T
Change Of Corresp Address
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None T
Change Of Corresp Address
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None N
Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None T
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 13 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?