INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. v. SPACECO, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-04037

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2020 at 9:34 AM EST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Innovative Office Products, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHEN B. GOLDMAN +1 908 654 5000 sgoldman@ldlkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samantha Melanie Kameros +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 skameros@ldlkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES PATRICK KENNEDY +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ckennedy@ldlkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCausland, Keen & Buckman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GLENN S GITOMER +1 610 341 1000 ggitomer@mkbattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 205

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damon Andrew Neagle +1 610 395 4900 +1 610 680 3312 damonneagle@designip.com
No Logo Spaceco,. Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keeling Patents And Trademarks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/29/2008 KEVIN ALAN KEELING +1 713 579 3001 +1 713 579 3002 KevinK@keelinglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nexsen Pruet PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Elizabeth Allen +1 864 282 1168 +1 864 477 2601 aahinson@nexsenpruet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Elizabeth Allen +1 864 282 1168 +1 864 477 2601 aahinson@nexsenpruet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Hardaway, III +1 864 370 2211 +1 864 477 2607 jhardaway@nexsenpruet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ratner & Prestia, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul F. Prestia +1 610 407 0700 pprestia@ratnerprestia.com
v.
No Logo Haworth, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Spaceco Business Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodcock Washburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID R. BAILEY, ESQUIRE
No Logo Spaceco,. Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keeling Patents And Trademarks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/29/2008 KEVIN ALAN KEELING +1 713 579 3001 +1 713 579 3002 KevinK@keelinglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nexsen Pruet PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Elizabeth Allen +1 864 282 1168 +1 864 477 2601 aahinson@nexsenpruet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Hardaway, III +1 864 370 2211 +1 864 477 2607 jhardaway@nexsenpruet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ratner & Prestia, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul F. Prestia +1 610 407 0700 pprestia@ratnerprestia.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ratnerprestia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin E. Leace +1 610 407 0700 +1 610 407 0701 beleace@ratnerprestia.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodcock Washburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID R. BAILEY, ESQUIRE
No Logo Innovative Office Products, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES PATRICK KENNEDY +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ckennedy@ldlkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES PATRICK KENNEDY +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ckennedy@ldlkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCausland, Keen & Buckman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GLENN S GITOMER +1 610 341 1000 ggitomer@mkbattorneys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GLENN S GITOMER +1 610 341 1000 ggitomer@mkbattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 205

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damon Andrew Neagle +1 610 395 4900 +1 610 680 3312 damonneagle@designip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damon Andrew Neagle +1 610 395 4900 +1 610 680 3312 damonneagle@designip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damon Andrew Neagle +1 610 395 4900 +1 610 680 3312 damonneagle@designip.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (157) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Decision - Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Telephone Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Telephone Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                      STATUS REPORT by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC.. (NEAGLE, DAMON) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE BY PAT CARDELLA RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS WITH COURT APPROVAL; ETC.(jl, ) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                          STATUS REPORT by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (NEAGLE, DAMON) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE/ORDER THAT ALL PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO GIVE A STATUS REPORT IN WRITING WITHIN 10 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF THIS NOTICE. IN THE EVENT NO STATUS REPORT IS RECEIVED WITHIN THE ABOVE TIME LIMIT, THE MATTER WILL BE DISMISSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 7/27/10. 7/27/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 7/28/2010 (afm, ). (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                              Consent to Substitute Attorney filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Certificate of Service.(NEAGLE, DAMON) Modified on 2/20/2009 (nd). (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS IN THIS CASE. THE PARTIES SHALL ADVISE THE COURT PROMPTLY UPON THE CONCLUSION OF THESE REEXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS SO THAT A SCHEDULE MAY BE SET FOR COMPLETING ALL PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS IN THIS MATTER. THIS STAY IS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO ANY PARTY MOVING TO REOPEN THE CASE BEFORE THE CONCLUSION OF THE ABOVE-NOTED REEXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS FOR GOOD CAUSE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 10/30/08. 10/31/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (jl, ). (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION RE: ORDER STAYING ACTION by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(GITOMER, GLENN) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 10/24/2008 (nd, ). (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE CONSTRUCTION FOR THE VOIDS CLAIM LIMITATION IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 10/6/08. 10/7/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BENJAMIN E. LEACE on behalf of SPACECO, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(LEACE, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 08/28/2008. 08/29/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SPACECO, INC. AND SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE CONSTRUCTION FOR THE VOIDS CLAIM LIMITATION. (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE CONSTRUCTION FOR THE VOIDS CLAIM LIMITATION IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 8/12/08.8/12/08 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Defendants to File Reply on Motion for Reconsideration of Claim Construction re 126 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support Of Motion To Reconsider The Construction For The Voids Claim Limitation filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Claim Construction, # 2 Certificate of Service)(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support Of Motion To Reconsider The Construction For The Voids Claim Limitation filed by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Reply)(BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by DAVID R. BAILEY(BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 123 MOTION for Reconsideration re 98 Memorandum & Opinion,, of the Construction for the Voids Claim Limitation MOTION for Reconsideration re 98 Memorandum & Opinion,, of the Construction for the Voids Claim Limitation filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 98 Memorandum & Opinion,, of the Construction for the Voids Claim Limitation filed by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC..Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, part 3, # 5 Exhibit 2, part 4, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Text of Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Service)(BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL REBUTTAL REPORTS THAT WERE DUE ON OR BEFORE 4/11/08 ARE NOW DUE ON OR BEFORE 4/25/08, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 4/9/08. 4/9/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. jpd) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Expert Discovery Rebuttal Reports by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC.. (BAILEY, DAVID) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/8/2008 (nd). (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 4/4/08 and was not placed on the record. (ky, ) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 4/3/08 and was not placed on the record. (ky, ) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 4/1/08 and was not placed on the record. (ky, ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: An In Person Settlement Conference was held on 3/31/08 and was not placed on the record. (ky, ) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DUE DATE FOR DEFENDANTS' EXPERT REPORT ON PATENT INVALIDITY SHALL BE MOVED FROM 3/20/08 TO 3/24/08. ALL REBUTTAL REPORTS ARE NOW DUE ON OR BEFORE 4/11/08; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/26/08. 3/26/08 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Expert Discovery Deadlines by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC.. (BAILEY, DAVID) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 3/27/2008 (nd). (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KEVIN ALAN KEELING on behalf of SPACECO, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (KEELING, KEVIN) Modified on 3/3/2008 (afm, ). (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          Statement of Clarified Designation of Representative Claims by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before the HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL re: A Telephone Conference was held on 2/15/08 and was not placed on the record. (ky, ) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 1/31/08 AT 9:30 A.M. HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 3/31/2008 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 1/24/08. 1/25/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND SERVED BY CHAMBERS. (ky, ) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 1/16/08 and was not placed on the record. (ky, ) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit with Certificate of Service re 106 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of the Reexaminations by the USPTO of the Patents-in-Suit filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles P. Kennedy in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Statement of Designation of Representative Claims and Certificate of Service by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AMENDED TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 1/7/08 AT 2:00 P.M. HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 1/16/2008 AT 1:30 P.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 1/3/08. 1/3/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND SERVED BY CHAMBERS. (ky, ) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of the Reexaminations by the USPTO of the Patents-in-Suit filed by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K - 1 of 2, # 12 Exhibit K - 2 of 2, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P)(BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ORDER THAT AN IN PERSONAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED WILL BE HELD ON 1/31/08 AT 9:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 12/20/07. 12/21/07 ENTERED AND MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/ STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/7/08 AT 2:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 12/20/07. 12/21/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 12/19/07. 12/20/07 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 12/21/07. ALL RESPONSES THERETO SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 1/15/08; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 12/19/07. 12/20/07 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL: Telephone Conference held on 12/19/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Response to Request for Scheduling Order re 99 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G) (BAILEY, DAVID) Modified on 10/26/2007 (nd). (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. of Entry of Order Granting Relief From Automatic Stay and Request for Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Order Granting Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay# 2 Appendix Judgment on Innovative's Motion for Relief from Stay# 3 Appendix Notice of Entry on Docket# 4 Certificate of Service)(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT "ROLLER" MEANS AN ELONGATED BODY WITH A CENTRAL PORTION BETWEEN THE SIDEWALLS OF THE CHANNEL AND ENDS WHICH EXTEND OUTWARD OF THE SIDEWALLS OF THE CHANNEL. "INTEGRALLY CAST" MEANS FORMED BY CAST MOLDING AS PART OF THE SAME PIECE. "PROJECTION" MEANS A PART WHICH PROJECTS OR JUTS OUT FROM THE SIDEWALL OF THE END CAP. "BUSHING" MEANS A HOLLOW CYLINDER. "SUPPORT BLOCK" MEANS A BLOCK TO SUPPORT OTHER COMPONENTS. "ROTATING PLATE" MEANS A PLATE WHICH ROTATES; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 8/23/07. 8/23/07 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/11/2007 09:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL.(pac,) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/27/07 before Judge STENGEL. Court Reporter: JUDY MACK. MARKMAN HEARING (jl, ) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge LAWRENCE F. STENGEL re: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 4/13/07. (ky, ) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 4/9/07. 4/10/07 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by SPACECO, INC. Suggestion of Bankruptcy Notice, Certificate of Service. (KEELING, KEVIN) Modified on 4/5/2007 (np). (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. Suggestion of Bankruptcy Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS G & H by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC. TO THEIR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(jl, ) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 88 Order on Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer filed by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC..Declaration, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit G# 7 Exhibit H# 8 Exhibit I-1# 9 Exhibit I-2# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit F (Part 1 of 3)# 12 Exhibit F (Part 2 of 3)# 13 Exhibit F (Part 3 of 3))(BAILEY, DAVID) Modified on 4/2/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL IS DENIED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/14/07.3/15/07 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/14/07.3/15/07 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              LETTER/Report Of Claim Construction by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC.. (ALLEN, AMY) Modified on 3/12/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge LAWRENCE F. STENGEL re: MARKMAN HEARING proceeding held in READING, PA. Attorneys for PLAINTIFF and DEFENDANT present argments and respond. COURT takes matter under advisement. (ky, ) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum Supplemental Markman Brief on Additional Claim Term and Certificate of Service by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 78 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Frank Zeigafuse in Support of Opposition to Motion to Amend# 2 Affidavit Declaration of Howard M. Williams in Support of Opp. to Motion for Leave to Amend# 3 Affidavit Declaration of Charles P. Kennedy in Support of Opp. to Motion for Leave to Amend# 4 Certificate of Service)(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge LAWRENCE F. STENGEL : Telephone Conference held on 2/20/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/20/2007 AT 1:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL. DEFENSE COUNSEL, DAVID R. BAILEY, WILL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL.(pac,) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC..(BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Response to Defendants' Initial Markman Brief by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits K-O to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Initial Markman Brief# 2 Certificate of Service) (GITOMER, GLENN) Modified on 2/13/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Response Defendants' Responsive Markman Brief by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T# 2 Exhibit U) (BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, (AMENDED ANSWERS ATTACHED).. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(BAILEY, DAVID) Modified on 2/9/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC. (BAILEY, DAVID) Modified on 2/9/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Initial Markman Brief and Exhibits in Support of Initial Markman Brief by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 # 3 Certificate of Service) (GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Initial Markman Brief by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit Exhibit S) (BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ARE TO PRODUCE THE REQUESTED BOARD MINUTES IN REDACTED FORM FORTHWITH; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/18/07. 1/19/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/8/06.1/8/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge LAWRENCE F. STENGEL : Telephone Conference held on 1/4/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION TO INCLUDE SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC. TO THE PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/3/07. 1/3/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2007 (jl, ). (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Document Production and Deposition Appearances from Plaintiff filed by SPACECO, INC..Certificate of Service and Proposed Order.(KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 66 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Witnesses for Depositions and Provide Responsive Documents filed by SPACECO, INC.. (Attachments: # 1)(KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 66 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Witnesses for Depositions and Provide Responsive Documents filed by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Darcy Firkus)(BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order to include SpaceCo Business Solutions, Inc. to the Protective Order filed by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC..Certification.(BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Witnesses for Depositions and Provide Responsive Documents filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Declaration, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by DAVID R. BAILEY (BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Spaceco Business Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC..(BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Innovative Office Products, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant SpaceCo, Inc. by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS,INC.'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 10/5/06. 10/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2006 (jl, ). (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDERED THAT THE COURT'S PREVIOUS SCHEDULING ORDER ISSUED ON 6/7/06 IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: ALL NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 1/30/07; THE MARKMAN HEARING SHALL BE HELD ON 2/27/06 AT 10:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 10/5/06. 10/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. re: Felina Swaba served Summons and Complaint upon SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. by Personal. SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 9/25/2006, answer due 10/16/2006. (GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint filed by SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BAILEY, DAVID) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SpaceCo Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. by SPACECO, INC..(KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS MOOT. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE DATE OF THE MARKMAN HEARING IS GRANTED AND THE MARKMAN HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 9/22/06 WILL BE CONTINUED; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/19/06. 9/20/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECON AMENDED COMPLAINT against SPACECO BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., SPACECO, INC. , filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT D THROUGH F# 2 EXHIBIT G THROUGH H)(jl, ) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge LAWRENCE F. STENGEL : Telephone Conference held on 9/18/06 (jl, ) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief on Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Certificate of Service.(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 51 MOTION to Continue the Date of the Markman Hearing and Proposed Order filed by SPACECO, INC., SPACECO, INC.. (KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 48 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ; Proposed Order and Certificate of Service filed by SPACECO, INC., SPACECO, INC.. (KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue the Date of the Markman Hearing and Proposed Order filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Certificate of Service.(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Innovative's Initial Markman Brief by SPACECO, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I) (KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response To SpaceCo's Initial Markman Brief by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., Certificate of Service. (GITOMER, GLENN) Modified on 9/7/2006 (np). (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PATENT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by SPACECO, INC., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(KEELING, KEVIN) Modified on 8/17/2006 (np). (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INITIAL MARKMAN BRIEF by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B# 2 Exhibit C-D# 3 Exhibit E-G) (GITOMER, GLENN) Modified on 8/17/2006 (np). (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT AMY ALLEN IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR THE DEFENDANT SPACECO, INC.; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/1/06. 8/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT CHARLES KENNEDY IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFF INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/1/06. 8/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, ) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Limited Admission for Amy E. Allen, Esquire filed by SPACECO, INC..Declaration, Order, Certificate of Service.(KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Limited Admission of Charles P. Kennedy, Esquire filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Declaration, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order.(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER IS GRANTED. ALL NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 9/22/06; A MARKMAN HEARING SHALL BE HELD ON 9/22/06 AT 1:30 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 6/6/06. 6/7/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines, 26 Order, Set Hearings filed by SPACECO, INC..Certificate of Service, Proposed Order.(KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT SPACECO'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE (DOCKET NO. 33) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 5/15/06. 5/16/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SPACECO INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO BIFURCATE IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 5/3/06.5/4/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer to Motion re 36 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Bifurcate filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., Certificate of Service. (GITOMER, GLENN) Modified on 4/18/2006 (np). (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Bifurcate filed by SPACECO, INC..Certificate of Service.(KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 04/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer to 33 MOTION to Bifurcate ,Memorandum of Law, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (GITOMER, GLENN) Modified on 4/10/2006 (fh) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. As To Haworth, Inc. Only, Certificate of Service. (GITOMER, GLENN) Modified on 4/7/2006 (fh) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Bifurcate filed by SPACECO, INC., SPACECO, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/23/06. 3/23/06 ENTERED.(jl, ) (mk, ). (Entered: 03/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED AND THE PROTECTIVE ORDER ATTACHED TO THE MOTION AS "EXHIBIT A" IS APPROVED; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 3/22/06.3/23/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2006 (jl, ). (Entered: 03/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Counterclaim of SpaceCo Inc by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (GITOMER, GLENN) Modified on 3/22/2006 (np). (Entered: 03/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. by SPACECO, INC., SPACECO, INC..(PRESTIA, PAUL) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Approval of Protective Order filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., Spaceco, Inc., Certification, Certificate of Service.(GITOMER, GLENN) Modified on 3/14/2006 (cdd, ). (Entered: 03/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against SPACECO, INC., HAWORTH, INC. , filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBITS D-E# 2 EXHIBITS F-H# 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(jl, ) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT ALL NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 8/18/06; A MARKMAN HEARING SHALL BE HELD ON 8/18/06 AT 10:00; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 11/22/05. 11/22/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE UNCONTESTED MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME WITHIN WHICH HAWORTH, INC. MAY RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS MOOT; ETC. . SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 11/22/05.11/22/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (jl, ) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge LAWRENCE F. STENGEL re: An In-Person Status Conference held on 11/18/05. This proceeding was not placed on the record. (ky, ) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Order, Certification, Certificate of Service.(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer to Counterclaims of Defendant, SpaceCo., Inc. by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., Certificate of Service. (GITOMER, GLENN) Modified on 10/26/2005 (np). (Entered: 10/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/18/2005 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT STATION IN READING, LOCATED IN THE MADISON BUILDING, 400 WASHINGTON STREET. (pac,) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SPACECO MOTION FOR JOHN HARDAWAY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 10/19/05. 10/20/05 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, ) Modified on 10/20/2005 (jl, ). (Entered: 10/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SPACECO, INC. MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOHN HARDAWAY III, ESQUIRE, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(jl, ) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Disclosure with Certificate of Service by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE UNCONTESTED MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME WITHIN WHICH HAWORTH, INC. MAY RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS GRANTED AND HAWORTH, INC. SHALL FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 11/18/05; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 10/11/05. 10/12/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 10/12/2005 (jl, ). (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Limited Admission for John B. Hardaway III, Esq. filed by SPACECO, INC..Declaration, Order, Certificate of Service.(KEELING, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Certification, Order and Certificate of Service.(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by SPACECO, INC. (PRESTIA, PAUL) Modified on 10/6/2005 (fh) (Entered: 10/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM and Certificate of Service against INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. by SPACECO, INC. (PRESTIA, PAUL) Modified on 10/6/2005 (fh) (Entered: 10/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT SPACECO., INC. MAY FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 10/6/05; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/28/05. 9/28/05 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 9/28/2005 (jl, ). (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT HAWORTH, INC. MAY FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 10/21/05; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/27/05. 9/27/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, ) (mk, ). (Entered: 09/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT SAMANTHA KAMEROS IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO PARTICIPATE BEFORE THIS COURT IN THIS CASE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/27/05. 9/27/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, ) (mk, ). (Entered: 09/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT STEPHEN GOLDMAN IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO PARTICIPATE BEFORE THIS COURT IN THIS CASE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/27/05. 9/27/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, ) (mk, ). (Entered: 09/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Certification, Order and Ceritificate of Service.(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Limited Admission for Samantha M. Kameros, Esq. filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Declaration, Order and Certificate of Service.(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Limited Admission for Stephen B. Goldman, Esq. filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC..Declaration, Order and Certificate of Service.(GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by SPACECO, INC..Proposed Order; Certificate of Service.(LEACE, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. re: Joe Farbinath served Summons and Complaint upon HAWORTH, INC. by Personal. HAWORTH, INC. served on 8/15/2005, answer due 9/6/2005. (GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC. re: Felina Swaba served Summons and Complaint upon SPACECO, INC. by Personal. SPACECO, INC. served on 8/10/2005, answer due 8/30/2005. (GITOMER, GLENN) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of Form to Commissioner of Patents. (ss, ) (Entered: 07/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against SPACECO, INC., HAWORTH, INC. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 919528.), filed by INNOVATIVE OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBITS D& E# 2 DESIGNATION FORM# 3 CASE MANAGEMENT FORM)(ss, ) (Entered: 07/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?