USA v. Fitts
Criminal Case Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 2:08-cr-20031-MPM-DGB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 5, 2020 at 2:26 PM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene L Miller +1 217 373 5875 +1 217 373 5891 eugene.miller@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Scott J Fitts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Craig Medow +1 312 701 7060 +1 312 706 8657 jmedow@mayerbrown.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Urbana
Filed 6/3/2008
County Kankakee
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION (From June 2005, and continuing to about May 2008, defendant knowingly devised a scheme to defraud by means of a wire communication in violation of Title 18, USC Sections 1343 and 1346.)
Count 10
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 5324.F
Offense Level 4
315324.F STRUCTURING TRANSACTIONS TO EVADE REPORTING REQUIREMENTS (Beginning on or about 7/12/07 and continuing through at least 7/16/07, defendant, for the purpose of evading reporting requirements, structured a transaction with a financial institu
Count 6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
181001.F STATEMENTS OR ENTRIES GENERALLY (On or about 12/18/06, defendant did knowingly and willfully make materially false statements in violation of Title 18, USC Section 1001(a)(2))
Count 7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1503.F
Offense Level 4
181503.F INFLUENCE/INJURING OFFICER/JUROR/WITNESS (In or about January 2007, defendant corruptly endeavored to influence, obstruct and impede justice by providing false information in violation of Title 18, USC Section 1503)
Count 8
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206A.F FRAUD AND FALSE STATEMENTS (On or about 4/15/07, defendant willfully made and subscribed a US Individual Tax Return for 2006 which defendant did not believe to be true and correct as to every material matter in violation of Title 26, USC S
Count 9
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 5324.F
Offense Level 4
315324.F STRUCTURING TRANSACTIONS TO EVADE REPORTING REQUIREMENTS (Beginning on or about 5/30/06 and continuing through at least 5/31/06, defendant structured a transaction with a financial institution by depositing US currency as part of a pattern
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED - Sealed+
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED - Sealed+
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED - Sealed+
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Report and Order Terminating Supervision
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Status Conference
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held 9/3/08 before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. Appearance of AUSA Eugene Miller for Government. Appearance of SCOTT J FITTS with attorney Thomas Durkin via phone. Telephone Status Conference held. Oral motion by defendant to continue; no objection by Government. Motion granted. Status Conference set for 10/10/2008 at 1:15 PM by telephone (court will place call) before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. The Court finds the ends of justice have been met pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(8)(A). Time from 9/3/08 until 10/10/08 is excluded. Defendant's bond remains in effect. (Court Reporter LC.) (SKD, ilcd)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held 7/22/08 before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. Appearance of AUSA Eugene Miller for Government. Appearance of SCOTT J FITTS in person, with counsel Thomas M. Durkin. Final Pretrial not held. Motion hearing held re: [8] Joint MOTION to Continue filed by Scott J Fitts, USA. Motion granted. Jury Trial on 8/4/08 is VACATED. Status Conference set for 9/3/2008 at 9:00 AM by telephone (court will place call) before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. The Court finds the ends of justice have been met pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(8)(A). Time from 7/22/08 to 9/3/08 is excluded. Defendant's bond remains in effect. (Court Reporter LC.) (SKD, ilcd)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008, Terminated: 7/22/2008 Motion to Continue
                      Joint MOTION to Continue by Scott J Fitts, USA as to Scott J Fitts. (Miller, Eugene)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                        NOTICE OF HEARING: A hearing on the [8] First Joint Motion to Continue as to Scott J Fitts is set for 7/22/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. (MB, ilcd)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                          Due to a scheduling conflict, the pretrial conference scheduled for 7/28/08 is VACATED. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2008 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. Entered by Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey on 07/08/2008. (DK2, ilcd)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                            NOTICE OF HEARING: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the pretrial conference as to Scott J Fitts set for 7/25/2008 at 3:00 PM is RESET for 7/28/2008 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom A before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. (MB, ilcd)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/4/08 at Manteno, IL as to Scott J Fitts. (KM, ilcd)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Scott J Fitts (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal on 6/4/08. (SKD, ilcd)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Bond
                                  Secured Bond Entered as to Scott J Fitts in amount of $ 90,000. (SKD, ilcd)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER as to Scott J Fitts Entered by Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal on 6/4/08. Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2008 at 3:00 PM; Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 8/4/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. (SKD, ilcd)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Initial Appearance
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held 6/4/08 before Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal. Appearance of AUSA Eugene Miller for Government. Appearance of SCOTT J FITTS in person, with counsel Sheila Finnegan for Thomas Durkin. Cause called for Initial Appearance. Defendant advised of charges and rights, including right to counsel. Cause called for Arraignment on Counts 1-5,6,7,8,9,10. Defendant sworn and questioned by the Court. Defendant advised of charges and possible penalties. Defendant enters plea of not guilty to all counts. Scheduling Order Entered. Cause called for Bond Hearing. Government agrees with recommendation in pretrial services report re: release of defendant. Recommendations of counsel heard. Defendant ordered released on $90,000 secured bond with special conditions. (Tape #UR-C 2:59 P.M.) (SKD, ilcd) Modified on 6/9/2008 to correct typographical error (SKD, ilcd).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Order on Motion to Unseal Case
                                        TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal. Pursuant to the request of AUSA Eugene Miller to unseal the case, the Court orders the case unsealed as to Scott J. Fitts (1). (SKD, ilcd)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008, Terminated: 6/4/2008 Motion to Unseal Case
                                          Oral MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Scott J Fitts. (SKD, ilcd)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Arrest
                                            Arrest of Scott J Fitts (SKD, ilcd)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Order
                                              TEXT ORDER as to Scott J Fitts Entered by Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal on 6/4/08. Initial Appearance set for 6/4/2008 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal. (SKD, ilcd)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Indictment - Original Signatures Sealed - +
                                                +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - INDICTMENT - ORIGINAL SIGNATURES. (SKD, ilcd)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Indictment
                                                  INDICTMENT as to Scott J Fitts (1) count(s) 1-5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10. (SKD, ilcd)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?