Safety lighting for vehicle outside mirrors

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10760157
Examiner Adam C Rehm, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Adam C Rehm
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Nixon, John, Applicant
Officer/Director, Virtu Financial, Inc.

Represented by John Nixon

Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Nixon, John, Brighton, MI (US)
Filing Date January 20, 2004
Status Abandoned -- Failure to Respond to an Office Action
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number
Confirmation Number 8989
Group Art Unit 2875
Class / Sub-Class 362 / 487
Timeline
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Assignments (0) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (14 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABN
Abandonment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
Miscellaneous Action with SSP (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment after Examiner Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM.NE
Claim-Amendment Not Entered (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A.I.
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (13 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Return TO OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Additional Application Filing Fees
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Additional Application Filing Fees
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Applicant has submitted new drawings to correct Corrected Papers problems
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Applicant has submitted a new specification to correct Corrected Papers problems
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Cleared by OIPE CSR
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?