Hickman v Hartshorn

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 2:08-cv-02198-HAB-DGB
District Judge Harold A. Baker, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Harold A. Baker
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo William K Hickman, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Colin Ostenburg, Defendant
No Logo Jason Boyd, Defendant
No Logo Lynn Galloway, Defendant
No Logo Pat Hartshorn, Defendant
No Logo Scott Crawley, Defendant
Attributes
Office Urbana
Filed 8/19/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Vermilion
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PRISONER, PROSE, REFER
Timeline
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Order
TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 9/2/2008. This case is set for a hearing on the plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis [2]. The court must dismiss a case proceeding in forma pauperis at any time if the court determines that the action is frivolous, malicious or fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Accordingly, the court will grant leave to proceed in forma pauperis only for cognizable claims. The plaintiff must be prepared to identify each of his claims and defendants during the hearing. IFP and Merit Review Hearing set for September 25, 2008 at 1:30 PM by telephone (court will place call) before Judge Harold A. Baker. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (KW, ilcd)
LREF
Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
PETITION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William K Hickman. Responses due by 9/15/2008 (KW, ilcd)
LREF
Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
PETITION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William K Hickman. Responses due by 9/5/2008 (KW, ilcd)
LREF
Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Complaint
COMPLAINT against Pat Hartshorn, Lynn Galloway, Scott Crawley, Colin Ostenburg, Jason Boyd, filed by William K Hickman.(KW, ilcd)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Order
TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal on 8/19/08. This Court has received and reviewed Plaintiffs Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit [2]. The application does not have Plaintiffs signature. Therefore, within twenty-one (21) days, Plaintiff is directed to resubmit the application with his original signature on page two. Failure to do so may result in termination of his case. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. ( Miscellaneous Deadline 9/9/2008) (KW, ilcd)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Merit Review Order
TEXT MERIT REVIEW ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal on 8/19/08. This case is set for merit review. The court is required by 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A to ''screen'' the plaintiff's complaint, and through such process to identify and dismiss any legally insufficient claim, or the entire action if warranted. A claim is legally insufficient if it ''(1) is frivolous, malicious, or fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; or (2) seeks monetary relief from a defendant who is immune from such relief.'' The plaintiff must be prepared to identify each of his claims and defendants during the hearing. Merit Review Hearing set for 9/25/2008 at 1:30 PM by telephone (court will place call) before Judge Harold A. Baker. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff at his home address.(KW, ilcd)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 120 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?