USA v. Jordan
Criminal Case Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 4:08-cr-40053-MMM-JAG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 22, 2020 at 1:30 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J Cannon +1 309 793 5884 +1 309 793 5895 matt.cannon@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Evander Allen Jordan, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey P Campbell +1 309 788 5297 +1 309 793 0538 g.campbell@vlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Rock Island
Filed 8/20/2008
County Rock Island
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED - Sealed+
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Early Termination of Probation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013 Letter
          Letter from dft Jordan requesting copy of docket sheet. (Copy of docket sheet mailed to dft Jordan at FCI Milan, MI) (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Statement of Reasons +
            +++ STATEMENT OF REASONS FOR IMPOSING SENTENCE as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Sealed Document +
              +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - Originally signed Judgment for dft Evander Jordan. (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Judgment*Court Filing
                JUDGMENT Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 6/23/09 as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr (1). Dft committed to the custody of the BOP for 51 months on each of Counts 1S and and 2S to run concurrently. On Count 3S, dft is sentenced to 84 months to be served consecutively to Counts 1S and 2S. Dft placed on Supervised Release for 3 years on each of Counts 1S, 2S and 3S to run concurrently. No fine imposed. Dft ordered to pay Restitution in the amount of $112,140.00, jointly and severally with co-dft Christopher Myles. Interest is waived on the restitution. Dft ordered to pay $300.00 Special Assessment immediately. Count(s) 1 is dismissed on motion of the Govt.. (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Sentencing Recommendation +
                  +++ SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr. (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Presentence Investigation Report - AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION
                    +++ PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      MOTION for Fingerprints and Palm Prints by USA as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr. (McCoy, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: 10/1/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr, Christopher Scott Myles Entered by Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields on 10/1/08. (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr. Previously set hearing for Wednesday, 9/3/08 at 1:30 PM is VACATED. Arraignment is reset for Friday, 9/12/2008 at 11:30 AM before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields in Rock Island. (TP, ilcd)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                            PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 9/25/08 granting 11 Motion for Protective Order as to Evander Allen Jordan Jr (1). (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr. This case is set for Arraignment on Wed., 9/3/2008 at 01:30 PM before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields in person in Rock Island Federal Court. (DK, ilcd)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 Indictment - Original Signatures Sealed - +
                                +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT - ORIGINAL SIGNATURES.. (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Indictment - Original Signatures Sealed - +Court Filing
                                  +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - INDICTMENT - ORIGINAL SIGNATURES.. (DK, ilcd) -- Filed & Entered: 08/21/2008 Notice of Hearing NOTICE OF HEARING as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr. This case is set for Arraignment on Wed., 9/3/2008 at 01:30 PM before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields in person in Rock Island Federal Court. (DK, ilcd) -- Filed & Entered: 08/26/2008 Notice of Hearing NOTICE OF HEARING as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr. Previously set hearing for Wednesday, 9/3/08 at 1:30 PM is VACATED. Arraignment is reset for Friday, 9/12/2008 at 11:30 AM before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields in Rock Island. (TP, ilcd)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 Indictment
                                    INDICTMENT as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, Christopher Scott Myles (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Indictment
                                      INDICTMENT as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr (1) count(s) 1. (DK, ilcd)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                        MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Jencks Materials by USA as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr. (McCoy, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Case Unsealed
                                          Case unsealed as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr as Indictment was handed down and not sealed. Complaint remains sealed. (DK, ilcd)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER Entered by Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields on 9/12/08 as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr.. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 10/27/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Michael M. Mihm in person in Rock Island. Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2008 at 10:30 AM before Judge Michael M. Mihm in person in PEORIA. (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                              ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr Entered by Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields on 08/11/2008. (TP, ilcd)[4:08-mj-06408-JAG *SEALED*]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Detention Hearing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields. Parties present in open court with Attys Cannon/Campbell and dft personally for Detention Hearing as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr held on 8/8/2008. Dft waives detention hearing at this time. Court orders dft detained pending trial. Dft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (DK, ilcd)[4:08-mj-06408-JAG *SEALED*]
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Preliminary Examination
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields. Parties present in open court with Attys Cannon/Campbell and dft personally for Preliminary Examination as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr held on 8/5/2008. Govt presents evidence. Govt rests. Argument by counsel re: preliminary exam. Court finds that there is probable cause and this case is bound over to the Grand Jury. Dft requests a continuance of the detention hearing. So ordered. The Detention Hearing is RESET to Friday, 8/8/2008 at 03:00 PM before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields in person in Rock Island. Dft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (DK, ilcd)[4:08-mj-06408-JAG *SEALED*]
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Status Conference
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields. Parties present in open court with Attys Cannon/Campbell and dft personally for Status Conference as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr held on 8/1/2008. Added attorney Geoffrey P Campbell for Evander Allen Jordan, Jr. As Atty Campbell has just been retained, he requests a continance of this hearing. So ordered. This case is RESET for Detention Hearing/Preliminary hearing on Tuesday, 8/5/2008 at 11:00 AM before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields in person in Rock Island. Dft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (DK, ilcd)[4:08-mj-06408-JAG *SEALED*]
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr Entered by Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields on 7/29/08. (DK, ilcd)[4:08-mj-06408-JAG *SEALED*]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Status Conference
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields. Parties present in open court with Atty Cannon and dft personally for Status Conference/first appearance as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr held on 7/29/2008. Dft advised of rights. Dft indicates he or his family will be hiring an attorney. Govt requests detention of this dft. Court orders dft detained pending a Detention Hearing/Preliminary Exam on Friday, 8/1/2008 at 09:00 AM before Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields in person in Rock Island. Govt makes oral motion for this case to remain sealed. So ordered. Dft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (DK, ilcd)[4:08-mj-06408-JAG *SEALED*]
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/28/08 as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr. (DK, ilcd)[4:08-mj-06408-JAG *SEALED*]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Order on Motion to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER Entered by Mag. Judge Thomas J. Shields on 7/28/08 granting [2] Motion to Seal Case as to Evander Allen Jordan Jr (1). (DK, ilcd)[4:08-mj-06408-JAG *SEALED*]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008, Terminated: 7/28/2008 Motion to Seal Case
                                                              MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Evander Allen Jordan, Jr. (DK, ilcd)[4:08-mj-06408-JAG *SEALED*]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Arrest
                                                                Arrest of Evander Allen Jordan, Jr (DK, ilcd)[4:08-mj-06408-JAG *SEALED*]
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 341 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?