Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC v. TRENDnet, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-08545

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 10, 2019 at 12:41 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farney Daniels PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Baker jbaker@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Saunders +1 424 268 5200 +1 424 268 5219 msaunders@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gurtej Singh tsingh@farneydaniels.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Tariq Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/05/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hemant Hari Kewalramani +1 714 335 4590 +1 714 602 9290 shashi@shklegal.com
v.
No Logo Trendnet, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell, Debbie L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jen-feng Lee +1 626 810 7200 +1 626 810 7300 jflee@ltpacificlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit Patent
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      FINAL JUDGMENT OF NON INFRINGEMENT DUE TO COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL by Judge Cormac J. Carney 38 . See Judgment for more information. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
        Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Non-Infringement Due to Collateral Estoppel filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
            Joint STIPULATION to Reset filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Jonathan D Baker in place of Attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani for Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC 34 (mt) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato, re Notice of Lodging 32 . (See document for details). (dro) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan 20 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Confidentiality Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato: Stipulated Protective Order and Proposed Order thereon (31-1). Rulings: For the reasons discussed below, the Court declines to issue the Proposed Order as drafted. (mt) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan 20 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The parties shall have until March 10, 2015 to conduct mediation proceedings.( Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/10/2015.) (twdb) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                    Joint STIPULATION for Issuance of Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings AUG. 4, 2014 re Transcript 26 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Dellaneve, Maria) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on AUG. 4, 2014. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARIA BEESLEY, CSR, RMR, phone number 714-564-9259. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2014. (Dellaneve, Maria) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Status Conference,, 24 , as to Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC Court Reporter. Court will contact Michael Saunders at msaunders@farneydaniels.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 08/04/2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Saunders, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Cormac J. Carney: Court confers with counsel regarding assigning a lead case to proceed to trial first and the remaining cases to follow. Counsel meet and confer and the Court assigns case number SACV 13-01812-CJC(ANx) as the lead case. Court confers further with counsel regarding case management and directs plaintiffs counsel to prepare and file a proposed stipulated case management order with proposed dates as stated on the record. Court Reporter: Maria Dellaneve. (twdb) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, granting Stipulation to Continue 22 ( Status Conference continued to 8/4/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney.) (twdb) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from July 25, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. to August 4, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Status Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                      JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC.. (Saunders, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF INTENT TO SCHEDULE THE CASE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD, notice is hereby given that on May 20, 2014 the Court will issue a Scheduling Order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) establishing dates for the completion of discovery, the filing of motions, pretrial conference, and trial in the above entitled case. No scheduling conference will be held unless ordered by the Court. (see document for details) (mu) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael D Saunders on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Michael D Saunders added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Saunders, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gurtej Singh counsel for Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. Adding Gurtej Singh as attorney as counsel of record for Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attorney Gurtej Singh added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Singh, Gurtej) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                              of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TRENDnet, Inc., (Lee, Jen-Feng) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWER filed by defendant TRENDnet, Inc..(Lee, Jen-Feng) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TRENDnet, Inc. answer now due 2/7/2014, filed by defendant TRENDnet, Inc..(Attorney Jen-Feng Lee added to party TRENDnet, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Jen-Feng) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, upon Defendant TRENDnet, Inc. served on 1/8/2014, answer due 1/29/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Roecna Samson, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan D Baker on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Jonathan D Baker added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:13-CV-1812; 8:13-CV-1814; 8:13-CV-1815; 8:13-CV-1816; 5:13-CV-2119; 2:13-CV-8548; 2:13-CV-8550 (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV 13-01812 CJC(ANx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi and Judge Margaret M. Morrow to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-08545 CJC(ANx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Judge Margaret M. Morrow is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. All proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at MMM_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rne) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant TRENDnet, Inc. (car) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (car) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) 4 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13003510 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?