Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC v. Hawking Technologies, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-01815

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2020 at 8:47 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farney Daniels PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Baker jbaker@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Saunders +1 424 268 5200 +1 424 268 5219 msaunders@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gurtej Singh tsingh@farneydaniels.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Tariq Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/05/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hemant Hari Kewalramani +1 714 335 4590 +1 714 602 9290 shashi@shklegal.com
No Logo Hawking Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Tsang, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN D. VAN LOBEN SELS +1 650 517 9800 +1 650 517 9898 jvanlobensels@fishiplaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/24/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen Jean Wang +1 650 517 9802 +1 949 943 8358 ewang@fishiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whgc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/24/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca A. Bellow +1 949 833 8483 RebeccaBellow@whgclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whgc Plc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/02/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Chengpang Wang +1 949 833 8483 +1 949 833 2281 jeffreywang@whgclaw.com
v.
No Logo Hawking Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Tsang, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN D. VAN LOBEN SELS +1 650 517 9800 +1 650 517 9898 jvanlobensels@fishiplaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/24/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen Jean Wang +1 650 517 9802 +1 949 943 8358 ewang@fishiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whgc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), TERMINATED: 11/24/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca A. Bellow +1 949 833 8483 RebeccaBellow@whgclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whgc Plc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/24/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Chengpang Wang +1 949 833 8483 +1 949 833 2281 jeffreywang@whgclaw.com
No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farney Daniels PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Baker jbaker@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Saunders +1 424 268 5200 +1 424 268 5219 msaunders@farneydaniels.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Tariq Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hemant Hari Kewalramani +1 714 335 4590 +1 714 602 9290 shashi@shklegal.com
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      FINAL JUDGMENT OF NON INFRINGEMENT DUE TO COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. See Judgment for more information. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
        Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Non-Infringement Due to Collateral Estoppel filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
            Joint STIPULATION to Reset filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Jonathan D Baker in place of Attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani for Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC 52 (mt) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato, re Notice of Lodging 50 . (See document for details). (dro) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan 22 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Confidentiality Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato: Stipulated Protective Order and Proposed Order thereon [47-1]. For the reasons discussed below, the Court declines to issue the Proposed Order as drafted. (twdb) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting 46 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey C Wang; Rebecca Anne Bellow and Ellen Jean Wang terminated. (twdb) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan 22 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ellen Jean Wang counsel for Counter Claimant Hawking Technologies, Inc., Defendant Hawking Technologies, Inc.. Changing address and firm name to Fish & Tsang, LLP, 303 Twin Dolphin Drive, 6th Floor, Redwood City, CA 94065. Changing email to ewang@fishiplaw.com. Filed by defendant/counterclaimant Hawking Technlogies, Inc.. (Wang, Ellen) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney John D Van Loben Sels counsel for Counter Claimant Hawking Technologies, Inc., Defendant Hawking Technologies, Inc.. Changing address and firm name to Fish & Tsang, LLP, 303 Twin Dolphin Drive, 6th Floor, Redwood City, CA 94065. Changing email to jvanlobensels@fishiplaw.com. Filed by defendant/counterclaimant Hawking Technlogies, Inc.. (Van Loben Sels, John) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 36 , Miscellaneous Document 35 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel. Other error(s) with document(s): Error in Document 35 and 36: Document indicates Ellen Wang should be added and removed. Document indicates John Van Loben Sels should be added and removed. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 32 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 31 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney (twdb) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint STIPULATION for Issuance of Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings AUG. 4, 2014 re Transcript 27 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Dellaneve, Maria) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on AUG. 4, 2014. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARIA BEESLEY, CSR, RMR, phone number 714-564-9259. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2014. (Dellaneve, Maria) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Cormac J. Carney: Court confers with counsel regarding assigning a lead case to proceed to trial first and the remaining cases to follow. Counsel meet and confer and the Court assigns case number SACV 13-01812-CJC(ANx) as the lead case. Court confers further with counsel regarding case management and directs plaintiffs counsel to prepare and file a proposed stipulated case management order with proposed dates as stated on the record. Court Reporter: Maria Dellaneve. (twdb) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, granting Stipulation to Continue 24 . ( Status Conference continued to 8/4/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney.) (twdb) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from July 25, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. to August 4, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Status Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Counter Defendant Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC.. (Saunders, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF INTENT TO SCHEDULE THE CASE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD, notice is hereby given that on May 20, 2014 the Court will issue a Scheduling Order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) establishing dates for the completion of discovery, the filing of motions, pretrial conference, and trial in the above entitled case. No scheduling conference will be held unless ordered by the Court. (see document for details) (mu) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            ANSWER to the counterclaims of Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff Hawking Technologies, Inc. filed by Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC.(Attorney Michael D Saunders added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:cd))(Saunders, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael D Saunders on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Michael D Saunders added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Saunders, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gurtej Singh on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Gurtej Singh added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Singh, Gurtej) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Hawking Technologies, Inc., re Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 15 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 16 served on 2/3/14. (twdb) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Hawking Technologies, Inc. (twdb) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC filed by defendant Hawking Technologies, Inc. Jury Demand.(Attorney Ellen Jean Wang added to party Hawking Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft))(twdb) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hawking Technologies, Inc. (Van Loben Sels, John) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hawking Technologies, Inc. answer now due 2/2/2014, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), 12 filed by Defendant Hawking Technologies, Inc..(Attorney John D Van Loben Sels added to party Hawking Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Van Loben Sels, John) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, upon Defendant Hawking Technologies, Inc. served on 12/13/2013, answer due 1/3/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ivan Tobin, Director of Sales in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan D Baker on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Jonathan D Baker added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:13-CV-1812; 8:13-CV-1814; 8:13-CV-1816; 5:13-CV-2119; 2:13-CV-8548; 2:13-CV-8545; 2:13-CV-8550 (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 08.05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV13-01812 CJC (ANx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato for DISCOVERY. The case number will now read as follows: SACV13-01815 CJC (ANx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. (dro) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant Hawking Technologies, Inc. (nbo) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (nbo) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (nbo) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) 4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13002897 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?