Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC v. ZyXEL Communications, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-01812

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 6:53 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farney Daniels PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Baker jbaker@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Saunders +1 424 268 5200 +1 424 268 5219 msaunders@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gurtej Singh tsingh@farneydaniels.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Tariq Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/05/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hemant Hari Kewalramani +1 714 335 4590 +1 714 602 9290 shashi@shklegal.com
No Logo Zyxel Communications, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tsai-yu Chen +1 650 838 2093 april.chen@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yitai Hu +1 650 838 2000 +1 650 838 2001 yitai.hu@alston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Hannah Rader +1 650 838 2008 +1 650 838 2001 elizabeth.rader@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan William Woolley +1 213 576 2521 +1 213 576 1100 evan.woolley@alston.com
v.
No Logo Zyxel Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tsai-yu Chen +1 650 838 2093 april.chen@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yitai Hu +1 650 838 2000 +1 650 838 2001 yitai.hu@alston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Hannah Rader +1 650 838 2008 +1 650 838 2001 elizabeth.rader@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan William Woolley +1 213 576 2521 +1 213 576 1100 evan.woolley@alston.com
No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farney Daniels PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Baker jbaker@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Saunders +1 424 268 5200 +1 424 268 5219 msaunders@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gurtej Singh tsingh@farneydaniels.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Tariq Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hemant Hari Kewalramani +1 714 335 4590 +1 714 602 9290 shashi@shklegal.com
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      FINAL JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT DUE TO COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 39 . See Judgment for more information. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
        Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Non-Infringement Due to Collateral Estoppel filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
            Joint STIPULATION to Reset filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Jonathan D Baker in place of Attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani for Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC 35 . (mt) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato, re Notice of Lodging 33 . Based on the stipulation of the parties and for good cause shown, IT IS SO ORDERED. (see document for details). (dro) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan 20 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Confidentiality Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato: Stipulated Protective Order and Proposed Order thereon [31-1]. For the reasons discussed below, the Court declines to issue the Proposed Order as drafted. (twdb) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan 20 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                Notice of Withdrawal of Disclosure 29 filed by Defendant ZyXEL Communications, Inc.. (Woolley, Evan) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Disclosure
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney (twdb) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                        Joint STIPULATION for Issuance of Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings AUG. 4, 2014 re Transcript 25 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Dellaneve, Maria) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on AUG. 4, 2014. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARIA BEESLEY, CSR, RMR, phone number 714-564-9259. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2014. (Dellaneve, Maria) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Cormac J. Carney: Court confers with counsel regarding assigning a lead case to proceed to trial first and the remaining cases to follow. Counsel meet and confer and the Court assigns case number SACV 13-01812-CJC(ANx) as the lead case. Court confers further with counsel regarding case management and directs plaintiffs counsel to prepare and file a proposed stipulated case management order with proposed dates as stated on the record.Court Reporter: Maria Dellaneve. (twdb) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, granting Stipulation to Continue 22 .( Status Conference continued to 8/4/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney.) (twdb) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from July 25, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. to August 4, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Status Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                        JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Counter Defendant Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC.. (Saunders, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF INTENT TO SCHEDULE THE CASE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD, notice is hereby given that on May 20, 2014 the Court will issue a Scheduling Order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) establishing dates for the completion of discovery, the filing of motions, pretrial conference, and trial in the above entitled case. No scheduling conference will be held unless ordered by the Court. (see document for details) (mu) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS [Dkt 13] filed by Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC.(Saunders, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael D Saunders on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Michael D Saunders added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Saunders, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gurtej Singh on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Gurtej Singh added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Singh, Gurtej) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant ZyXEL Communications, Inc. identifying ZyXEL Communications Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Rader, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ZyXEL Communications, Inc., identifying ZyXEL Communications Corporation and ZyXEL Communications, Inc.. (Rader, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWERJURY DEMAND. AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed by Defendant ZyXEL Communications, Inc..(Rader, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendant ZyXEL Communications, Inc..(Attorney Elizabeth H Rader added to party ZyXEL Communications, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rader, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, upon Defendant ZyXEL Communications, Inc. served on 12/17/2013, answer due 1/7/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hortensia Tafolla, Officer Manager/Person in charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan D Baker on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Jonathan D Baker added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:13-CV-1814, 8:13-CV-1815; 8:13-CV-1816; 5:13-CV-2119; 2:13-CV-8545; 2:13-CV-8548; 2:13-CV-8550 (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant ZyXEL Communications, Inc. (nbo) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (nbo) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. (nbo) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Corporate Disclosure Statement 4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) 3 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13001326 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?